Tauveli v. Ridge, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00317-HG-LEK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Clay Chapman Crumpton Iwamura & Pulice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Egan +5358 535 535 8400
Space James A. Stanton +5358 535 535 8400 +1 808 275 3338
v.
No Logo John Ashcroft, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Tom Ridge, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/14/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/7/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION for dismissal of petition for writ of habeas corpus for immigration deportee filed May 14, 2004 with prejudice as to all parties and all issues and ORDER; certificate of service by Judge Helen Gillmor : terminating case by Petitioner Asipeli Tauveli (bbb)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference not held. Status Conference; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9:00 12/13/04, LEK.; rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/13/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ( Ct Rptr : C7-no record) JUDGE Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER denying petitioner's motion for stay of removal [9-1] by Judge Helen Gillmor (cc: all counsel) (bbb)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EO: Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 08/09/2004 09:00:00 AM to 10/18/2004 09:00:00 AM before LEK. John Robert Egan to notify all parties. rule 16 conference set for 9:00 10/18/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi () JUDGE Mag Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          EP : PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Argument made. The motion is taken under submission. The stay of removal is extended until the filing of the Court's decision on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction [9-1] ( Ct Rptr : Stephen Platt) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Reply
            petitioner Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli's REPLY to respondents memorandum in opposition to request for stay of removl; certificate of service re [11-1] (bbb)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM of respondents Tom Ridge and John Ashcroft in opposition to petitioner's requests for stay of removal [9-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004 Exhibit
                petitioner Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli's EXHIBITS a-h [9-1]; certificate of service (bbb)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004, Terminated: 8/17/2004 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                  petitioner Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli's MOTION for stay of removal ; declaration of John Robert Egan; memorandum in support; certificate of service - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (bbb)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                    Respondent's STIPULATION; ORDER by Judge Helen Gillmor [2-1] (bbb)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon respondent Tom Ridge on 5/17/04 (bbb)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon respondent John Ashcroft on 5/17/04 (bbb)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EP: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order-Plaintiff Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli is present. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is being withdrawn. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction will be filed by June 08, 2004; Memorandum in Opposition to be filed by June 18, 2004; Reply Memorandum to be filed by June 25, 2004; Hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for July 06, 2004 @9:00 a.m. before Judge Gillmor. [2-1] ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge Helen Gillmor (bbb)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER: Hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for Wednesday, May 19, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. IT IS ORDERED that Tom Ridge, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security response to the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order be filed by noon on Tuesday, May 18, 2004. cc: James A. Stanton, Esq. Michelle Nacion, Esq. Judge Gillmor's Chambers` by Judge Helen Gillmor [2-1] (bbb)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/9/04 before Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                EX PARTE MOTION for temporary restraining order ; affidavit of counsel; certificate of service by petitioner Asipeli Potauaine Tauveli - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (bbb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Complaint
                                  PETITION for writ of habeas corpus for immigration deportee; certificate of service (bbb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt # 222925 (bbb)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?