Marsoun v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00328-DAE-BMK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Marsoun, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/21/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7609 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 6/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 Supplement
United States' Submission of SUPPLEMENT the Record; Attachment 1; Certificate of Service [1-1] (sm)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/S. Mukawa - judgment entered in favor of defendant pursuant to the "Order Denying Plaintiff's Petition to Quash Summons" filed on June 8, 2004 terminating case (cc: all counsel) (sm)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Petiton to Quash Summons by Judge David A. Ezra [1-1] (cc: all counsel) (sm)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE of service by petitioner Michael Marsoun (sm)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra status conference set for 9:00 8/16/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004, Terminated: 6/8/2004 Complaint
            PETITION to Quash Summons (sm)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Filing Fee Received
              FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 223021 (sm)
                LREF

                Space Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 118 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?