Nakashima v. Prudential Equity, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00337-ACK-BMK
District Judge ALAN C KAY, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brian K. Nakashima, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hiatt & Hiatt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David R. Harada-Stone +1 808 885 3400 +1 808 885 6765 dhs@hiattlaw.com
Space Jerry M. Hiatt +1 808 885 3400 jh@hiattlaw.com
v.
No Logo Doe Entities 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Prudential Equity Group, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Prudential Financial, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Havenwood Ventures Inc
Officer/Director, Tortoise Mlp Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
No Logo Wachovia Securities, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marr Jones & Wang LLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rand +5364 536 536 4900 +5366 536 536 6700 rrand@marrjones.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 5/25/2004
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 12/22/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 'CA #06-15151'['9CCA']
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, PROTO
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 USCA Order
[Uncertified] ORDER of USCA as to [74] Notice of Appeal filed by Brian K. Nakashima re: CA #06-15151. (bbb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 USCA Case Number
    USCA Case Number CA #06-15151 for [74] Notice of Appeal filed by Brian K. Nakashima,. (bbb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 USCA Scheduling Order
      USCA Time Schedule Order as to [74] Notice of Appeal filed by Brian K. Nakashima,. (bbb, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [74] Notice of Appeal (lmg, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 74 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [71] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, [73] Clerk's Judgment; representation statement; certificate of service by Brian K. Nakashima. Filing fee $ 255. (bbb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 73 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Clerks JudgmentCourt Filing
            CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge ALAN C KAY on 12/22/2005. (bbb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 72 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Order of Entry
              EO: Motions terminated: [66] MOTION to Continue filed by Brian K. Nakashima,. (bbb, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 71 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                ORDER granting Defendants' [25] Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge ALAN C KAY on 12/14/2005. (bbb, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 70 Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                  Defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Wachovia Securities, LLC.'s OPPOSITION to Plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima's [66] MOTION to Continue trial, amend deadline set forth in Rule 16 scheduling order, extend discovery cutoff and compel discovery; declarationof Tamara M. Gerrard; exhibits a-gg; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 69 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 ERRATA
                    SUPPLEMENTAL submission [64] in Support of Defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, f.k.a. Prudential Securities, Inc.; Prudential Financial, Inc., and Wachovia Securities Motion for summary judgment; exhibits a-c; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                      EP: Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge ALAN C KAY: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2005 re [25] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Prudential Equity Group, LLC, Prudential Financial, Inc., Wachovia Securities, LLC. - MOTION TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. (Court Reporter Stephen B. Platt.) (bbb, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 67 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                        Ex Parte Motion to shorten time for hearing on Plaintiff Brian Nakashima's [66] MOTION to Continue trial, amend deadlines set forth in Rule 16 scheduling order, extend discovery cutoff and compel discovery; declaration of David R. Harada-Stone; Order granting ex parte motion shortening time for hearing on Plaintiff Brian Nakashima's [66] MOTION to Continue trial, amend deadlines set forth in Rule 16 scheduling order, extend discovery cutoff and compel discovery; certificate of service. Signed by Judge BARRY M KURREN on 12/09/2005. (bbb, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 66 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005, Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Continue
                          Notice of hearing motion; Plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima's MOTION to Continue trial, amend deadlines set forth in Rule 16 scheduling order, extend discovery cutoff and compel discovery; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Brian K. Nakashima; declaration of David R. Harada-Stone; exhibits 1-40; certificate of service. (bbb, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Motions Taken Under Advisement
                            Motions Taken Under Advisement: [25] Motion for Summary Judgment [see minutes taken on 12/12/2005, docket entry #68]. (bbb, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
                              Set hearing as to [66] MOTION to Continue. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2005 08:45 AM before JUDGE BARRY M KURREN. [see docket entry #66]. (bbb, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 65 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/14/2005 Final Pretrial Conference-MagCourt Filing
                                EP: Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge #BARRY M KURREN:Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/8/2005. Motions due by 12/16/2005. - Final Pretrial Conference held.Parties agreed on 45 minute opening statements and exchange potential Motions in Limine by 12-16-05.(FTR-Ctrm C6 9:00-9:15.) (bbb, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 64 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of Defendant Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities' motion for summary judgment [25-1] filed September 19, 2005; declaration of Tamara M. Gerrard; declaration of Richard M. Rand; exbhibits a-h; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (bbb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 63 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                    Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT of Defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, f.k.a. Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities; certificate of service (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 62 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                      Final PRETRIAL STATEMENT by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima; certificate of service (gab)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 61 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        EO : final pretrial conference continued from 12/7/2005 9:00 a.m. to 9:00 12/8/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren Gloria from Hiatt's office to notify parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 60 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                          PART 2 OF 2: Plaintiff's SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS submitted in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; declaration of David R. Harada-Stone; exhibits 1-21 [part 2 of this document includes exhibits 5-21]; certificate of service[25-1] (afc)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 59 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Statement in Opposition to Motion
                                            PART 1 OF 2: Plaintiff's SEPARATE CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS submitted in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; declaration of David R. Harada-Stone; exhibits 1-21 [part 1 of this document includes exhibits 1-4]; certificate of service [25-1] (afc)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 58 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment [25-1]; certificate of service (afc)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 57 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (afc)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (afc)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (afc)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (afc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (afc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial, and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                            EO: Court's response to Letter Briefs: Based upon a review of the letters of counsel dated October 18 and 19, 2005, the objections to the remaining discovery issues are sustained. cc via email: Richard Rand/Tamara Gerard, Jerry Hiatt () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Description not available
                                                              DECLARATION of David R. Harada-Stone; exhibits 1-2; certificate of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: 11/7/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Original Signature submitted
                                                                              Notice of SUBMISSION of original declaration of Michael Carroll attached to Defendant Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities' motion for summary judgment [25-1] filed on September 19, 2005; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                EO: At the request of plaintiff's counsel, the court has reviewed certain email communications involving lawyers who worked for Prudential during the relevant period of time. The documents in question do not disclose a basis for any waiver of the privilege. Accordingly, they need not be produced in discovery. The documents provided will be placed in the court file under seal should any further review be necessary. () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        EP: Settlement Conference held. No settlement at this time. Further conference on call. ; settlement/status conference held 10/13/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : In chambers) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiffs Brian K. Nakashima, Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  EP : Discovery Conference- Counsel discussed with Court the Deposition Schedule of upcoming Depositions. Counsel also discussed with Court other matters that were outlined in the Letter Briefs that were submitted for this Court's review. Mr. Hiatt to prepare the Order as to the Court's rulings and agreement with Counsel as to Discovery Matters. ( Ct Rptr : No Reporter) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gab)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                    EO: Discovery Conference set for 10/06/2005 02:30:00 PM before BMK. Notified: David Harada Stone, Richard Rand ; in court hearing set for 2:30 10/6/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        Amended CERTIFICATE of service by Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                              Separate Concise STATEMENT of facts by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities in support of Defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, f.k.a. Prudential Securities, Inc.; Prudential Financial, Inc.; and Wachovia Securities motion for summary judgment [25-1]; declaration of counsel; exhibit A-M; certificate of complaince; certificate of service (gab)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005, Terminated: 12/14/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities for summary judgment memorandum in support of motion; declaration of counsel; exhibits A-M; declaration of Michael Carroll; certificate of compliance; certificate of service; set for 10:30 12/12/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay (gab)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                  Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities, LLC's first supplement to INITIAL DISCLOSURE, filed September 3, 2004; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to extend dispoitive motions deadline and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : ; Motion filing ddl set for 9/19/05 (bbb)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (afc)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by Defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding discovery between defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC fka Prudential Securities, Inc.; Prudential Financial, Inc.; Wachovia Securities, LLC and plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima and order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by Defendants (bbb)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to continue trial date and amend deadlines set forth in the Rule 16 scheduling order filed 08/27/2004 and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren : ; Jury trial set for 9:00 1/18/06 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/7/05; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 10/13/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren by Plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                EO: Continued : [Jury Selection/Trial to Follow ] from 09/13/2005 09:00:00 AM to 01/18/2006 09:00:00 AM before ACK Settlement Conference continued to 10/13/2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 12/7/2005 at 9:00 am BMK ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 1/18/06 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 12/7/05 settlement/status conference set for 2:00 10/13/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Judge Alan C. Kay (bbb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by defendant Prudential Equity, defendant Prudential Financial, defendant Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                      INITIAL DISCLOSURE: certificate of service by defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial, and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (eps)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on September 13, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before ACK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on July 14, 2005 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by July 7, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by March 31, 2005 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by June 15, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by June 13, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by August 23, 2005 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by August 30, 2005 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 14, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 13, 2005 12. Discovery deadline July 15, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for June 30, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by June 23, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by August 30, 2005 21. File Final witness list by August 23, 2005 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by August 16, 2005 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by August 23, 2005 26. File objections to the Exhibits by September 6, 2005 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by August 23, 2005 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by August 30, 2005 29. File Trial Brief by August 30, 2005 30. cc: Tammy Kimura ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 9/13/05 before Judge Alan C. Kay , ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 7/14/05 ; Discovery ddl set for 7/15/05 ; Motion filing ddl set for 6/13/05 ; settlement/status conference set for 2:00 6/30/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ; rule 16 conference held on 9:00 8/23/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ( Ct Rptr : C6 no record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by defendants Prudential Equity, Prudential Financial and Wachovia Securities (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                  defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, fka Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc., and Wachovia Securities, LLC's SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                    plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima's SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (gab)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/1/2004 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                        REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; certificate of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/25/2004, Entered: 6/25/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of David R. Harada-Stone re: service of first amended complaint on defendant Prudential Financial, Inc., exhibit 1; certificate of service by plaintiff Brian K. Nakashima re [1-1] (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                            defendants Prudential Equity Group, LLC, f.k.a Prudential Securities, Inc., Prudential Financial, Inc. and Wachovia Securities LLC's ANSWER to first amended complaint [1-1] filed April 26, 2004; certificate of service (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 8/23/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL of State Court Action to Federal Court; exhibit a; certificate of service: removed from Circuit Court of the First Circuit State of Hawaii Case Number: CV 04-1-0475-03 RWP (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 223059 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 778 times.

                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?