Ilioulaokalani Co, et al v. Gates, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00502-DAE-BMK
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Henkin +5992 599 599 2436 dhenkin@earthjustice.org
Space Isaac H. Moriwake +5992 599 599 2436 imoriwake@earthjustice.org
No Logo Kipuka, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Henkin +5992 599 599 2436 dhenkin@earthjustice.org
No Logo Na 'Imi Pono, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. Henkin +5992 599 599 2436 dhenkin@earthjustice.org
v.
No Logo Francis J. Harvey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Space Barry Alan Weiner +1 202 305 0469 +1 202 305 0274 barry.weiner@usdoj.gov
Space Harry Yee +5412 541 541 2850 harry.yee@usdoj.gov
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Gette
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Space Barry Alan Weiner +1 202 305 0469 +1 202 305 0274 barry.weiner@usdoj.gov
Space Harry Yee +5412 541 541 2850 harry.yee@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 8/17/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Honolulu
Terminated
Origin 3
Reopened 11/2/2006
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-15334'['9CCA'], 05-15915[]
Def Custody Status
Flag REOPEN
  Entries (280) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 255 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Record of Decision for the Permanent Stationing of the 2/25th Stryker Brigade Combat Team Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 1-7, # (2) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 8-18, # (3) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 19-27)(Weiner, Barry)
    LREF
    Legal Document 254 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Sixth Periodic Progress Report dated March 31, 2008 Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sixth Periodic Progress Report dated March 31, 2008)(Weiner, Barry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 253 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Les Brownlee, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Fifth Periodic Progress Report dated December 31, 2007 Robert M. Gates, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Les Brownlee, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fifth Periodic Progress Report dated December 31, 2007)(Weiner, Barry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 252 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
        NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Fourth Periodic Progress Report dated October 1, 2007 Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fourth Periodic Progress Report dated October 1, 2007)(Weiner, Barry)
          LREF
          Legal Document 251 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Settlement Agreement
          SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT As To Attorneys' Fees, Costs And Expenses by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David) Modified on 9/26/2007 (gab, ). Modified on 9/27/2007 (gab, ).
            LREF
            Legal Document 250 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 USCA JudgmentCourt Filing
            Document re-entry: USCA JUDGMENT (Certified copy) filed and entered 10/05/06, Attest date: 07/19/07. (Attachments: # (1) Certified copy of USCA OPINION# (2) Certified Copy of Judge Bea's Dissenting opinion # (3) 9CCA Transmittal Sheet and Service List) (afc) ~ Judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, REMANDED ~ (afc) 251 Filed & Entered: 09/26/2007 Settlement Agreement SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT As To Attorneys' Fees, Costs And Expenses by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David) Modified on 9/26/2007 (gab, ). Modified on 9/27/2007 (gab, ). 252 Filed & Entered: 10/01/2007 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Fourth Periodic Progress Report dated October 1, 2007 Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fourth Periodic Progress Report dated October 1, 2007)(Weiner, Barry) 253 Filed & Entered: 12/31/2007 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Les Brownlee, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Fifth Periodic Progress Report dated December 31, 2007 Robert M. Gates, Donald H. Rumsfeld, Les Brownlee, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fifth Periodic Progress Report dated December 31, 2007)(Weiner, Barry) 254 Filed & Entered: 03/31/2008 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Filing of Sixth Periodic Progress Report dated March 31, 2008 Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sixth Periodic Progress Report dated March 31, 2008)(Weiner, Barry) 255 Filed & Entered: 04/15/2008 Notice (Other) NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey of Record of Decision for the Permanent Stationing of the 2/25th Stryker Brigade Combat Team Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 1-7, # (2) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 8-18, # (3) Exhibit Record of Decision, pages 19-27)(Weiner, Barry)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [249] USCA Bill of Costs and a copy of [250] USCA JUDGMENT with its attachments, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on July 25, 2007, and also served upon those individuals/addresses as reflected on the 9CCA service list. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Interoffice delivery on July 24 to: Chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra and Chambers of U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Respective courtroom managers notified by NEF. (afc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 249 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 USCA Order
                USCA Bill of Costs (certified copy) CA 05-15915. (afc)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 248 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 USCA Judgment
                  USCA JUDGMENT (Certified copy) filed and entered 10/05/06, Attest date:07/19/07. (Attachments: # (1) Certified copy of USCA OPINION # (2) 9CCA Transmittal Sheet and Service List) ~ Judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, REMANDED ~ (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Corrective Entry
                    CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Docket entry will be deleted for docket entry number [248] USCA JUDGMENT. Please be advised that the transaction was incomplete as it did not include the dissenting opinion. The USCA Judgment and attachments will be re-entered in its entirety. (afc)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 USCA Order
                      ORDER of USCA as to [183] Notice of Appeal - Appellants' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal is GRANTED. This Appeal is Dismissed. [9CCA 07-15334].(afc) 9CCA Service List added on 7/2/2007 (afc).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 246 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey Notice of Filing of Third Periodic Report Dated July 2, 2007 and Certificate of Service Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Periodic Report# (2) Attachment 1# (3) Attachment 2# (4) Attachment 3)(Yee, Harry)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [247] the USCA Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on July 2, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Interoffice delivery: Chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra, Chambers of U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren; respective CRM's. (afc)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 245 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                            Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "3" filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 244 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                              Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 17 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 243 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 16 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 242 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                  Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 15 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 241 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                    Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 14B of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 240 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                      Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 14A of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 239 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                        Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 13 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 238 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                          Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 12B of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 237 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                            Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2' (part 12A of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 236 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                              Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 11 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 10 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                  Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 9 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                    Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 8 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                      Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 7 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 231 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                        Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 6 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                          Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 5 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 229 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                            Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 4B of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 228 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                              Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 4A of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 227 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 3 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 226 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                  Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 2 of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 225 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                    Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 1B of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 224 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                      Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "2" (part 1A of 17) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 223 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                        Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 9 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 222 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                          Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 8 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 221 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                            Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 7 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 220 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                              Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 6 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 219 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 5 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 218 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                  Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 4 of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 217 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                    Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 3B of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 216 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                      Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 3A of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 215 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                        Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 2B of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 214 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                          Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 2A of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 213 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                            Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 1B of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 212 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                              Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Enclosure "1" (part 1A of 9) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 211 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Figures "1"-"24" (part 2 of 2) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 210 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits to [209] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Figures "1"-"24" (part 1 of 2) filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 209 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey Notice of Filing of Second Periodic Progress Report Relating to Range 11T; Exhibit "A"; Attachment "1"; Figures "1"-"24"; Enclosures "1"-"3" and Certificate of Service Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A"# (2) Attachment "1")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                      CORRECTIVE ENTRY - No counsel identification, caption and title page included as to the ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey, docket entry numbers [210] [211] [212] [213] [214] [215] [216] [217] [218] [219] [220] [221] [222] [223] [224] [225] [226] [227] [228] [229] [230] [231] [232] [233] [234] [235] [236] [237] [238] [239] [240] [241] [242] [243] [244] [245] - For the filing party's future reference, each ECF-filing transaction must be prefaced with a captioned cover sheet (to conform to requirements of LR 10.2 "Form of Papers; Copy"). These filings shall stand. (afc)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties [123] held on November 16, 2006 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. Court Reporter: ESR; Transcriber: Jessica B. Cahill. (afc)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 207 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING [202] PLAINTIFFS' APPEAL FROM MARCH 23, 2007 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/17/07. (afc) [March 23, 2007 Order: document [199]]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [207] the ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' APPEAL FROM MARCH 23, 2007 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on April 18, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Interoffice delivery: Chambers of U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. (afc)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 206 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [202] APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [199] OrderAPPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [199] Order Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's March 23, 2007 Order and Certificate of Service filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Declaration of Barry A. Weiner in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's March 23, 2007 Order# (4) Exhibit 1# (5) Exhibit 2# (6) Exhibit 3# (7) Exhibit 4# (8) Exhibit 5# (9) Exhibit 6)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING [203] PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING STATEMENT OF APPEAL FROM MARCH 23, 2007 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY - Court denies plaintiffs' motion for a hearing and to shorten time for a hearing - Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 4/4/07. (afc)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                  COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [205] ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING STATEMENT OF APPEAL FROM MARCH 23, 2007 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on April 4, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Response in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [203] Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Hearing Statement Of Appeal From March 23, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiffs Request For Supplemental Discovery Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Their Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's March 23, 2007 Order and Certificate of Service filed by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Barry A. Weiner in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Their Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's March 23, 2007 Order# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3)(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 203 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 4/4/2007 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                      Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Hearing Statement Of Appeal From March 23, 2007 Order Denying Plaintiffs Request For Supplemental Discovery by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration David L Henkin# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 202 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007, Terminated: 4/18/2007 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Co
                                                                                                                        APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [199] Order (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum In Support# (2) Declaration David L. Henkin# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3# (6) Exhibit 4# (7) Exhibit 5# (8) Exhibit 6# (9) Exhibit 7# (10) Exhibit 8# (11) Exhibit 9# (12) Exhibit 10# (13) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 200 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey Notice of Filing of First Periodic Progress Report and Certificate of Service Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit "A")(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 201 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT Designation and Ordering Form by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [183] Notice of Appeal, Cynthia Fazio: 11/6/06, 11/20/06, 12/18/06; ESR: 11/16/06 (gab, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 199 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 3/23/07. (emt, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [199] "ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY" has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on March 23, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (STATUS CONF & ORAL ARGUMENTS) held on 11/20/06 before Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA. Court Reporter: Cynthia Fazio. (30 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 195 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Discovery HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    EP: Discovery Conference Re: Letter Brief Submitted 3/14/07 held on 3/21/2007. Court to issue an Order. Court's inclination is to conclude that the formal discovery process is closed. (C6 - no record, 9:20-9:50am.) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN )(sna, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      EO: Discovery Conference is continued from 3/20/2007 to 3/21/2007 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 193 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [191] Motion for Clarification; Exhibits A-B; Certificate of Service. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 3/19/07. (afc)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [193] ORDER on Motion for Clarification has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on March 20, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 192 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            EO: The Federal Defendants' Motion for Clarification, filed 3/14/2007, is DENIED. The parties are to meet and confer. If the Federal Defendants want to address any issues in the Plaintiffs' 3/14/2007 letter brief, they may submit a letter brief to the court by 4:00 p.m. Hawaii time on 3/19/2007. The letter brief may be faxed to (808) 541-3500. A Discovery Conference is set for 3/20/2007 @ 9:00 a.m. Hawaii time. Any party who would like to participate by phone is to notify Richlyn Young @ (808) 541-3090 or richlyn_young@hid.uscourts.gov prior to the discovery conference date. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 191 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007, Terminated: 3/19/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                              MOTION Motion for Clarification; Exhibits "A" - "B"; Certificate of Service by Robert M. Gates, Francis J. Harvey. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Ching, Edric)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 190 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2007 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number 07-15334 for [183] Notice of Appeal, filed by Kipuka, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, Na 'Imi Pono. (emt, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2007 (afc, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 189 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [183] Notice of Appeal, Initial Notice re: Transcript Designation 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 188 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Letter
                                                                                                                                                    Letter/MEMO to 9CCA re: transmission of certified copy of amended NOA [186] (afc)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 187 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                                                                                                                                                      Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [183] Notice of Appeal. (afc) Additional attachments added on 3/3/2007.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 186 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [185] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Amended Notice of Appeal. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 185 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING [170] PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CLARIFY DECEMBER 29, 2006 ORDER SETTING INTERIM INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 3/1/07. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [185] ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CLARIFY DECEMBER 29, 2006 ORDER SETTING INTERIM INJUNCTION has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record for James D. Gette, Esq., Thomas L. Sansonetti, Esq. and Barry A. Weiner, Esq. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 184 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2007 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                              USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00, receipt number 238540 re [183] Notice of Appeal filed by plaintiffs.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 183 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007, Terminated: 7/2/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF APPEAL; Proof of Service. Appeal as to: [168] "Order Setting Interim Injunction," and from the orders related to this order, including, but not limited to: [131] Scheduling Order, and [140] Order denying Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties. Filing fee $ 455.00 (afc) Modified on 3/13/2007: 9CCA No. 07-15334. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 182 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY re [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration David L. Henkin# (2) Exhibit 8# (3) Exhibit 9# (4) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 181 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify; Table of Contents; Table of Authorities; Declaration of James D. Gette; Exhibits 1-5; Certification of Word Count; Certificate of Service filed by Robert M. Gates. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Declaration of James D. Gette# (4) Exhibit 1# (5) Exhibit 2# (6) Exhibit 3# (7) Exhibit 4# (8) Exhibit 5# (9) Certification of Word Count)(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 25(d)(1), it is hereby ORDERED that Robert M. Gates, Secretary of the United States Department of Defense, shall be substituted for Donald H. Rumsfeld, former Secretary of the United States Department of Defense, as a Defendant in the above entitled action.Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 2/12/07. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 179 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Robert M. Gates Notice of Substitution of a Party; Certificate of Service. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007 Motions Taken Under Advisement
                                                                                                                                                                          EO: Motions Taken Under Advisement: [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction. (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 178 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER granting [176] Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to [170] Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 2/1/07. Amending [177] Order. Defendants are granted an extension from January 30, 2007, until February 13, 2007 in which to submit their response to the Motion to Clarify. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [178] AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CLARIFY, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 1, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 177 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [176] Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to [170] Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 1/31/07. Defendants are granted an extension from January 30, 2007, until February 1, 2007 in which to submit their response to the Motion to Clarify. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                  COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [177] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CLARIFY, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on January 31, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 176 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify; Certificate of Service by Francis J. Harvey. (Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 175 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [174] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to [170] Plaintiffs' MOTION to Clarify. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 1/23/07. Defendants are granted an extension from January 23, 2007, until January 30, 2007, in which to submit their response to Plaintiffs Motion to Clarify. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 174 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007, Terminated: 1/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Clarify; Certificate of Service by Francis J. Harvey. (Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [175] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CLARIFY, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on January 23, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 173 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [172] Exhibit, [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction, [171] Exhibit, (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 172 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT 6 and 7 by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition... Related document: [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6# (2) Exhibit 7)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 171 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT 5 - Part 2 of 2 by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition... Related document: [170] MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5 - Part 2 of 2)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 170 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007, Terminated: 3/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Clarify Order Setting Interim Injunction by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum In Support Of Motion# (2) Declaration of David L. Henkin# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3# (6) Exhibit 4# (7) Exhibit 5 - Part 1 of 2)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADVISORY ENTRY re: docket entry number [173] Certificate of Service filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. Because the "Certificate of Service" document was filed as a new and separate ECF transaction (i.e. the COS was not appended to a motion, memorandum, etc.), Counsel identification should have been noted in the upper left-hand corner of the document (as required by Local Rule 10.2(b) "Counsel Identification"). No further action as to the filing is required by the filing party. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (ORAL ARGUMENT) held on 12/18/06 before Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA. Court Reporter: Cynthia Fazio. (91 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 168 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER SETTING [92] INTERIM INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on December 29, 2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [168] "ORDER SETTING INTERIM INJUNCTION" for Miscellaneous Relief has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 12/29/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 12/20/06 - granting [155] Motion to File an Oversized Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 162 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE Federal Defendants' Submissions Responding To Plaintiffs' Additional Declarations and Deposition Excerpts; Certificate of Service filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michelle Mansker# (2) Attachment "1"# (3) Memorandum Declaration of Lawrence Kawasaki# (4) Declaration "P")(Yee, Harry) Modified on 12/19/2006: Filing party phoned Clerk's office regarding title of attchment (4) (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2006 re [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld,, Motions Taken Under Advisement: [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 164 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of John Michael Castillo re [142], [92] - filed by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (This document will be placed in the case file; Exhibit A is a colored image)(afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 163 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL Declaration of Andrew P. Hood re [143], [92] - filed by plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B) (This document will be placed in the case file; Exhibit B is a colored image)(afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re Hood and Castillo Supplemental Decs and Exhibit 94 (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Errata re [156] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Brief and Certificate of Service Federal Defendants' Errata To Lawrence Kawasaki's Declaration In Support of Defendants' Supplemental Brief On the Scope Of Interim Injunctive Relief; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment "1"# (2) Attachment "2")(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald H. Rumsfeld re [156] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Brief and Certificate of Service Re: Federal Defendants' Supplemental Brief On The Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief (Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 157 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration re [155] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Permission to File Oversized Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief; Certificate of Service Amended Declaration of Harry Yee; Certificate of Service. (Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Brief and Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Memorandum of Col Banach# (4) Declaration of Ron Borne# (5) Declaration of MG Brandenburg# (6) Declaration of Lawrence Kawasaki# (7) Declaration of Michelle Mansker# (8) Mansker Exhibits1# (9) Mansker Exhibit 1, Part 2# (10) Mansker Exhibit 1, Part 3# (11) Mansker Exhibit 1, Part 4# (12) Mansker Exhibit 2# (13) Mansker Exhibit 3# (14) Mansker Exhibit 4# (15) Mansker Exhibit 5# (16) Declaration of Col Brown# (17) Declaration of James Gette# (18) Exhibit J# (19) Exhibit K# (20) Exhibit L# (21) Exhibit M# (22) Exhibit N# (23) Exhibit O)(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 155 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Motion for Permission to File Oversized Defendants' Supplemental Brief on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief; Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Harry Yee)(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 154 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Errata to Exhibit 72 to Henkin Declaration. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 21 to Exhibit 72)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 153 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Errata to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum re Interim Injunction. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 72 supplement# (2) # EXHIBIT 19 #(3) Exhibit)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006 (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 152 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Interim Injunction - Certificate of Service by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Interim Injunction Tables of Contents & Authorities by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Incorrect filing-event selected. No captioned cover page (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 151 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Interim Injunction Tables of Contents & Authorities by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is the TABLE OF CONTENTS AND TABLE OF AUTHORITIES. Incorrect filing-event selected. No captioned cover page (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 150 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibits 83 - 93 by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 83# (2) Exhibit 84# (3) Exhibit 85# (4) Exhibit 86# (5) Exhibit 87# (6) Exhibit 88# (7) Exhibit 89# (8) Exhibit 90# (9) Exhibit 91# (10) Exhibit 92# (11) Exhibit 93)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: "Main Document" caption does not correspond with the attached exhibits. Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 149 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibits 77 - 82 by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 77# (2) Exhibit 78# (3) Exhibit 79# (4) Exhibit 80# (5) Exhibit 81# (6) Exhibit 82)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: "Main Document" caption does not correspond with the attached exhibits. A photo-image marked "Exhibit 44" is attached to Exhibit 79. Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 148 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Henkin Exhibits 71 - 76 by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 71# (2) Exhibit 72# (3) Exhibit 73# (4) Exhibit 74# (5) Exhibit 75# (6) Exhibit 76)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: "Main Document" caption does not correspond with the attached exhibits. Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 147 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Exhibit 70B by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 70B)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is an EXHIBIT; exhibit attached described as "Exhibit 70B" . "Main Document" caption does not correctly identify exhibit attached. Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 146 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Henkin Exhibit 70A by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 70A)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a photo-image marked EXHIBIT A . "Main Document" caption does not correctly identify exhibit attached. Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 145 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Henkin Declaration by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cover Sheet 66 - 93# (2) Exhibit 66# (3) Exhibit 67# (4) Exhibit 68# (5) Exhibit 69)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DAVID L. HENKIN. . Incorrect filing-event selected. No counsel identification on document as required - LR 10.2(b). (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 144 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Quitevis Declaration - Exhibits by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Quitevis# (2) Exhibit Cover Sheet 63 - 65# (3) Exhibit 63# (4) Exhibit 64A# (5) Exhibit 64B# (6) Exhibit 64C# (7) Exhibit 65)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KAMOA QUITEVIS. Incorrect filing-event selected. The Attachment "Declaration Quitevis" is identical to the main document. (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 143 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Hood Declaration - Exhibits by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Andrew Hood# (2) Exhibit Cover Sheet 57 - 62# (3) Exhibit 57# (4) Exhibit 58# (5) Exhibit 59# (6) Exhibit 60# (7) Exhibit 61# (8) Exhibit 62)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. HOOD. Incorrect filing-event selected. The Attachment "Declaration Andrew Hood" is identical to the main document. (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 142 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Castillo by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Cover Page 48 - 56# (2) Exhibit 48# (3) Declaration Castillo# (4) Exhibit 49# (5) Exhibit 50# (6) Exhibit 51# (7) Exhibit 52# (8) EXHIBIT Errata 53# (9) Exhibit 54# (10) Exhibit 55# (11) Exhibit 56)(Henkin, David) Modified on 12/22/2006: This document is a DECLARATION OF JOHN MICHAEL CASTILLO . Incorrect filing-event selected. The Attachment "Declaration Castillo" is identical to the main document. (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 141 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/15/2006 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Interim Injunction by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Aila# (2) Exhibit Cover Page 45 - 47# (3) Exhibit 45# (4) Exhibit 46# (5) Exhibit 47)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/17/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADVISORY ENTRY re: pleadings filed by party 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, docket entry numbers [141], [142], [143], [144], [145], [146], [147], [148], [149], [150], [151], [152]; and pleading filed by party Donald H. Rumsfeld: docket entry number [156]. Incorrect filing event ("MOTION")was selected for these docket entries. As to the filings by party 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition: the Office of the Clerk will be adding to the docket text for the purpose of clarifying each entry. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OVERSIZED EXHIBITS submitted by plaintiffs in support of [141] SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re: Interim Injunction. Exhibits "14"-"16," "54," and "87". (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 14 # (2) Exhibit 15 # (3) Exhibit 16) [NOTE: Exhibits 54 and 87 are oversized multi-colored maps that could not be imaged and are thus not attached to to this entry. Exhibits 14, 15, 16: reduced-size image of multi-colored maps.] related document: [92] THIS DOCUMENT PLACED IN CASE FILE(afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 140 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [84] plaintiffs 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, Na 'Imi Pono, and Kipuka's MOTION to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 12/12/06. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO: Court's Order Re: Supplemental Briefing for Oral Argument (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(wnn, ) Modified on 12/13/2006: Pltfs' Supplemental Brief due 12/14/06 by mindnight. Defts' Supplemental Brief due 12/15/06 by 4:00 p.m. (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 LinkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EP: Discovery Conference held. The witness is to provide the draft declaration. (FTR-Ctrm Chambers, 11:45 - 11:50) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 137 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald H. Rumsfeld (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 136 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re Plaintiffs' Production of Documents In Response to Defendants' November 20, 2006 Letter (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/8/2006 09:00 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORRECTIVE ENTRY - WRONG FILE-EVENT SELECTED re: docket entry number [133] NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition Certificate of Service re: Plaintiffs' Disclosures Re: Potential Witnesses. As the document is a Certificate of Service, the relief "Certificate of Service" found under Civil Event "Service of Process" should have been selected. This filing shall stand. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 133 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition Certificate of Service re: Plaintiffs' Disclosures Re: Potential Witnesses 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 132 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/24/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Expedited Discovery related to Interim Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/22/06. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 131 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/22/06. [IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties identify their respective discovery requests by 8:00 p.m. on November 20, 2006. The parties confer and attempt to reach agreement on the scope and timing of discovery. By noon on November 21, 2006, the Parties shall notify this Court whether they have reached agreement regarding the scope and timing of discovery. If the Parties cannot reach agreement by Noon on November 21, 2006, each Party shall submit a statement with their proposal for the scope and timing of discovery by 5:00 p.m. on November 21, 2006. On November 22, 2006, this Court shall either approvethe Parties' agreement or, if the Parties do not reach an agreement, shall issue an order regarding what discovery will be permitted. Discovery shall be completed by December 7, 2006. A status conference shall be scheduled as soon as possible thereafter, at which time this Court shall establish a schedulefor submission or supplemental briefing. A hearing on the terms of an interim injunction shall be held no later than December 18, 2006.] (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 129 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Donald H. Rumsfeld Federal Defendants' Withdrawal of Their Request to Conduct Additional Training at Qualification Training Range 1; Certificate of Service. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT Re-submission of minutes for status conference held on 11/20/2006. (tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EO EP: Status Conference held on 11/20/2006. (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA ) (Ct Reporter: Cynthia Fazio) (tl, ) Modified on 11/29/2006: Please refer to docket entry number [134]. The image to docket entry [130] was not completely transmitted. (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Plaintiffs' [124] Motion for Leave to File Declaration of Kamoa Quitevis . Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/20/2006. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Defendants' [126] Motion for Leave to File Declarations of Ronald Borne, Michelle Mansker, and Laurie Lucking . Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/20/2006. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Declarations of Ronald Borne, Michelle Mansker, and Laurie Lucking and Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Ronald Borne# (2) Declaration of Michelle Mansker# (3) Declaration of Laurie Lucking# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit E# (7) Exhibit F# (8) Exhibit G# (9) Exhibit H# (10) Exhibit I)(Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [127] Order on Motion for Leave to File, [128] Order on Motion for Leave to File has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record of Barry Weiner and thomas Sansonetti on 11/20/2006. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration re [124] MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Kamoa Quitevis Declaration of Kamoa Quitevis. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 37# (2) Exhibit 38# (3) Exhibit 39# (4) Exhibit 40# (5) Exhibit 41# (6) Exhibit 42# (7) Exhibit 43# (8) Exhibit 44# (9) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Declaration of Kamoa Quitevis by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 123 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP: : [84] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties - DENIED w/o prejudice. James G. Gette to prepare the order. Motion terminated: [84] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties. (FTR-Ctrm C6F, 9:02 - 9:45) (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Federal Defendants' [113] Motion to Exceed the Page Limitation in Local Rule 7.5 . Signed by Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/16/06. (gab, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO: Status Conference set for 11/20/2006 09:45 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EO: [84] Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties set for 11/16/2006 at 9:30 AM is moved to 9:00 AM the same day before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (Judge BARRY M. KURREN)(rwy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re Notice of Uncited Authorities (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 118 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Exhibits Attachments 13 to 17 of 17 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 14# (2) Attachment 15# (3) Attachment 16# (4) Attachment 17)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits Attachments 8 to 12 of 17 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 9# (2) Attachment 10# (3) Attachment 11# (4) Attachment 12)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits Attachments 3 to 7 of 17 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 4# (2) Attachment 5# (3) Attachment 6# (4) Attachment 7)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition Uncited Authorities 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2# (3))(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Errata re [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service (Refiled Memorandum Only Per Court advisory entry). (Yee, Harry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTIVE ENTRY. Judge's Courtesy Copies was filed incorrectly in this case. The courtesy copies were redirected to Judge Kurren. (dat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRECAUTIONARY NOTICE: The entry docket number [114] Errata to MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service (Refiled Memorandum Only Per Court advisory entry) was filed with Mr. Thomas Helper's signature, however, docket reflects Mr. Harry Yee as the filer. Parties are cautioned to use the appropriate ATTY LOG-INS when efiling, due to the fact that atty log-ins do represent the signer of the document. NO FURTHER ACTION REQUIRED. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Federal Defendants' Motion to Exceed the Page Limitation in Local Rule 7.5; Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Attachments 29-31 of the Declaration of Laurie Lucking filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 29# (2) Attachment 30# (3) Attachment 31)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Attachments 21-28 of the Declaration of Laurie Lucking filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 21# (2) Attachment 22# (3) Attachment 23# (4) Attachment 24# (5) Attachment 25# (6) Attachment 26# (7) Attachment 27# (8) Attachment 28)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Attachments 8-20 of the Declaration of Laurie Lucking filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 8# (2) Attachment 9# (3) Attachment 10# (4) Attachment 11# (5) Attachment 12# (6) Attachment 13# (7) Attachment 14# (8) Attachment 15# (9) Attachment 16# (10) Attachment 17# (11) Attachment 18# (12) Attachment 19# (13) Attachment 20)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Attachments 1-7 of the Declaration of Laurie Lucking filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2# (3) Attachment 3# (4) Attachment 4# (5) Attachment 5# (6) Attachment 6# (7) Attachment 7)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Exhibits B to the Declaration of Thomas Helper filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit B (Part 6 of 10)# (2) Exhibit B (Part 7 of 10)# (3) Errata B (Part 8 of 10)# (4) Exhibit B (Part 9 of 10)# (5) Exhibit B (Part 10 of 10))(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Exhibits to [92] MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service Exhibits A and B to the Declaration of Thomas Helper filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B (Part 1 of 10)# (3) Exhibit B (Part 2 of 10)# (4) Exhibit B (Part 3 of 10)# (5) Exhibit B (Part 4 of 10)# (6) Exhibit B (Part 5 of 10)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition RE MEMORANDUM RE INTERIM INJUNCTION (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Exhibits 34 TO 36 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 35# (2) Exhibit 36)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Exhibits 29 TO 33 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 30# (2) Exhibit 31# (3) Exhibit 32# (4) Exhibit 33)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Exhibits 2 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Exhibits 23 TO 28 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 24# (2) Exhibit 25# (3) Exhibit 26# (4) Exhibit 27# (5) Exhibit 28)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Additional Exhibits 17-22 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 18# (2) Exhibit 19# (3) Exhibit 20# (4) Exhibit 21# (5) Exhibit 22)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits 11 TO 16 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 12# (2) Exhibit 13# (3) Exhibit 14# (4) Exhibit 15# (5) Exhibit 16)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Additional Exhibits 6 THROUGH 10 OF 36 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6# (2) Exhibit 7# (3) Exhibit 8# (4) Exhibit 9# (5) Exhibit 10)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Additional Exhibits 4 PART 2 OF 2 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Additional Exhibits 4 PART 1 OF 2 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Additional Exhibits 3 PART 4 OF 4 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Additional Exhibits 3 PART 3 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Additional Exhibits EXHIBIT 3 PART 2 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Additional Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Additional Exhibits EXHIBIT 3 PART 1 filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities# (3) Declaration of Thomas Helper# (4) Declaration of Ronald L. Borne# (5) Declaration of Laurie Lucking# (6) Declaration of Major General William H. Brandenburg# (7) Declaration of Colonel Stefan J. Banach (Part 1 of 3)# (8) Declaration of Colonel Stefan J. Banach (Part 2 of 3)# (9) Declaration of Colonel Stefan J. Banach (Part 3 of 3)# (10) Declaration of Colonel Robert B. Brown# (11) Memorandum of Michelle Mansker# (12) Declaration of Major General Dana T. Atkins# (13) Declaration of James J. Lovelace# (14) Declaration of Lieutenant General John M. Brown III)(Helper, Thomas) Modified on 12/20/2006: third page of main document states in part... Federal Defendants [file this] EMERGENCY MOTION FOR DECISION ON THE SCOPE OF INTERIM INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NINTH CIRCUIT'S REMAND] (afc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM RE: INTERIM INJUNCTION filed by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Abad# (2) Declaration Quitevis# (3) Declaration Tengan# (4) Declaration Henkin# (5) Exhibit One)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [84] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And To Join Necessary Parties Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties; Certificate of Service filed by Donald H. Rumsfeld. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents# (2) Table of Authorities)(Helper, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADVISORY ENTRY regarding docket entry number [92] MOTION/Federal Defendants' Memorandum on the Scope of Interim Injunctive Relief in Accordance With the Ninth Circuit's Remand and Certificate of Service. The "Main Document" portion of this pleading was replicated 5 additional times. This portion of the document thus reports that the Main Document consists of 384 pages rather than its true total of 64 pages. Although the remainder of the pleading is filed correctly, the Office of the Clerk requests that the filing party re-submit the "Main Document" portion only. Please use the Civil filing event "ERRATA" found under "Other Documents" and link to document [92]. (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition re [84] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And To Join Necessary Parties Notice of Filing Substitute Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition, 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exh. B - 2nd Amended Complaint# (2) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Order on Motion to Shorten time to hear MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [85]Ex Parte Motion to Shorten time for Hearing Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and to Join Necessary Parties. Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 11/9/06. (ecs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [84] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And To Join Necessary Parties: Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2006 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Any Opposition is due 11/14/2006.(wnn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [88] Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for hearing Motion has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 11/09/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion to Shorten Time to hear Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time to hear Motion re[84] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And To Join Necessary Parties by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Isaac H. Moriwake# (2) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint And To Join Necessary Parties by 'Ilio'ulaokalani Coalition. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum In Support Of Motion# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Certificate of Service)(Henkin, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 11/6/06 before Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA. Court Reporter: Cynthia Fazio. (37 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP: Status Conference held on 11/6/2006. (Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA )(tl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Federal Defendants' NOTICE of EMERGENCY REMAND From the Court of Appeals - by Donald H. Rumsfeld, Francis J. Harvey, [81] - (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Certificate of Service)(ecs, )(ORIG filed by DAE CRM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 11/6/2006 08:30 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (lls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 USCA OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA - Attest date 10/27/06 (Attachments: # (1) BEA, Circuit Judge's dissent# (2) Addendum to Order Granting Temporary Injunction and Remanding# (3) Service List)(ecs, )(cc: DAE, TL, USA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [81] USCA Order has been served by First Class Mail to Thomas L. Sansonetti and Barry A. Weiner at the addresses of record on 11/3/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to 9th CCA (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Debra Kekuna Chun) taken on 02/22/05 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' notice of filing original supplemental DECLARATIONS of Kehaunani Cachola Abad and Ty P. Kawika Tengan; exhibits 1-2; certificate of service [74-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 05-15915 appeal filed 05/03/05 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion for injunction pending appeal - by Judge David A. Ezra - court denies plaintiffs' motion for injunction pending appeal [69-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY memorandum by plaintiffs' in support of motion for injunction pending appeal; certificate of compliance; supplemental declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 16-21; supplemental declaration of Kehaunani Cachola Abad; supplemental declaration of Ty P. Kawika Tengan; certificate of service [69-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' notice of filing original DECLARATIONS of Kehaunani Cachola Abad and Ty P. Kawika Tengan; exhibits 1-2; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Federal defendants' MEMORANDUM in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for injunction pending appeal; table of contents; table of authorities; certificate of compliance; declaration of Harry Yee; exhibits A-J; certificate of service [69-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Ilioulaokalani Co, plaintiff Na Imi Pono, plaintiff Kipuka (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: 11/5/04, Cynthia Fazio, 2/22/05, Debra Chun re [67-1] (eps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EO: Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal-MOTION will be a non-hearing motion. Deadlines are as follows: Oppositions due: 5/13/2005 by 12 noon Replies due: 5/16/2005 by 4:00pm cc: All counsel [69-1] ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005, Terminated: 5/19/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs' for injunction pending appeal ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 1-14; declaration of Kehaunani Cachola Abad; declaration of Ty P. Kawika Tengan; exhibit 15; certificate of service - [non-hearing motion] referred to Judge David A. Ezra (lmg) Modified on 05/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Ex Parte Motion and order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' EX PARTE MOTION to shorten time for hearing motion for injunction pending appeal ; declaration of David L. Henkin; Order granting plaintiffs' ex parte motion to shorten time for hearing motion for injunction pending appeal; certificate of service (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [67-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff from Dist. Court decision, [66-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RECEIVED re [67-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 ( Receipt # 229181) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CIVIL JUDGMENT: that judgment is entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs, pursuant to the "order denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and granting defendants' cross motion for summary judgment" filed on April 25, 2005 - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/Laila M. Geronimo, Deputy Clerk re [65-1] terminating case (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005, Terminated: 4/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and granting defendants' cross motion for summary judgment - by Judge David A. Ezra - denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment, [40-1] granting defendants' motion cross-motion for summary judgment [50-1] (cc: all parties of record) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Initial Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' federal rule of civil procedure 7.1 DISCLOSURE statement; certificate of service (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting defendants' motion for a protective order quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests and denying plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery without prejudice - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - it is ordered that defendants motion for protective order quashing plaintiffs' first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents, documents dated 11/10/04 is granted; it is further ordered that defendants' motion for protective order barring all discovery is denied without prejudice; it is further ordered that defendants' motion to limit judicial review to the administrative record is denied without prejudice; it is further ordered that plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is denied without prejudice re [45-1] - on behalf of federal defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EP : Defendants' Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Arguments heard Defendants' Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment- TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to issue order. taking under advisement on the motion cross-motion for summary judgment [50-1]; taking under advisement on the motion for summary judgment [40-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by plaintiffs' of uncited authorities; copies of uncited authorities; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ERRATA to defendants' reply brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment [50-1] - on behalf of USA (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Harry Yee to defendants' reply brief in support of their opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment filed on February 16, 2005; certificate of service [40-1] - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA to substitute in the adminstratvie record a color copy of seis 2397 for the black and white copy; certificate of service [47-1] - on behalf of USA (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Table of CONTENTS and table of authorities defendants' reply brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; declaration of Harry Yee; exhibits A-E; certificate of compliance and certificate of service [50-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiffs' to defendants' concise statement of material facts in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; supplemental declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits M-P; certificate of service [50-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs' in support of their motion for summary judgment and in opposition to defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; certificate of service [50-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Cynthia Fazio) taken on 11/05/04 (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Original DECLARATION of Barry A. Weiner; certificate of service [50-1] - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants' RESPONSE to plaintiffs' concise statement of material facts in support of their motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; certificate of service [40-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONCISE STATEMENT by defendants' of material facts in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment [50-1]; certificate of compliance; and certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION; defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment ; table of contents; table of authorities; defendants' brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; certificate of service - set for 9:00 2/22/05 before Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Barry A. Weiner; exhibits A through C; certificate of service [48-1] - on behalf of defendants (2 of 2) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Barry A. Weiner; exhibits A through C; certificate of service [1-1] - on behalf defendant (1 of 2) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP : Federal Defendants' Motion to Limit to Review to the Administrative Record and for a Protective Order Barring Discovery and Quashing Plaintiffs' Prior Discovery Requests - GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Limit Review to the Administrative Record and for a Protective Order Barring Discovery and Quashing Plaintiff's Prior Discovery Requests - DENIED w/o Prejudice. Barry Weiner to prepare order; granting Federeal defendants' motion to limit to review to the administrative record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests [24-1]; denied without prejudice plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery and opposition to defendants' motion to limit review to the administrative record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests [31-1] ( Ct Rptr : C6 CD 10:57-11:48) JUDGE Mag Judge M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TABLE OF CONTENTS and table of authorities; defendants' reply brief in support of their motion to limit review to the adminitrative record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovey requests and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel; declaration of Harry Yee; declaration of Robert M. Lewis; certificate of compliance and certificate of service [45-1] - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005, Terminated: 2/25/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendants for permission to file an oversized reply memorandum in support of defendants' motion for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to compel ; declaration of Harry Yee; Order by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - GRANTED; certificate of service - set for 11:00 2/1/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' REPLY MEMORANDUM in support of their motion to compel discovery; supplemental declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 14-15; certificate of service [31-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' notice of filing original DECLARATION of Summer Nemeth; exhibit A; certificate of service [40-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONCISE STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiffs' in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; declaration of Victoria Holt Takamine; declaration of William Aila, Jr.; declaration of Summer Nemeth; affidavit of Michael K. Moran; exhibits A-F; declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits G-L; certificate of service [40-1], [41-1] (Part 2 of 2 Parts) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONCISE STATEMENT of material facts by plaintiffs' in support of motion for summary judgment; certificate of compliance; declaration of Victoria Holt Takamine; declaration of William Aila, Jr.; declaration of Summer Nemeth; affidavit of Michael K. Moran; exhibits A-F; declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits G-L; certificate of service [40-1] (Part 1 or 2 Parts) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005, Terminated: 4/25/2005 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF MOTION for summary judgment ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; appendix 1; certificate of service - set for 9:00 2/22/05 before Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re deadlines to file administrative record and schedule to resolve parties' discovery motions by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren - re [38-1] re [31-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD for the site-specific eis - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Federal defendants' NOTICE of lodging of the site-specific eis adminitrative record (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by federal defendants' to plaintiffs' first amended complaint for declaratory judgment and injunctive relief; certificate of service [29-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATION of the administrative record for the Programmatic Eis - on behalf of defendant [34-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Federal defendants' NOTICE of lodging of the partial administrative record (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF MOTION and motion to compel discovery and opposition to defendants' motion to limit review to the administrative record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests ; memorandum; declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 1-13; certificate of service - set for 11:00 2/1/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EO : ;Status Conference regarding a Priviledge Document set for 1/14/05 9;30 AM before BMK is vacated ; parties have resolved the situation; Barry Weiner to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP : Status Conference Re Administrative Record and Summary Judgment Motion Deadline- Administrative Record to be filed by January 18, 2005. Status Conference regarding a Confidential Document set for January 14, 2005 @9:30 a.m. before this Court. Briefing Schedule for this Status Conference is Letter Briefs to be submitted to Judge Kurren's Chambers by ll:30a.m. on January 13, 2005. As to Briefing Schedule as to the Federal Defendants' Motion to Limit to review to the Administrative Record and for a Protective Order barring Discovery and Quashing Plaintiffs' prior Discovery Requests set for hearing on February 01, 2005- Opposition to be filed by January 12, 2005 Reply by Defendant-January 27, 2005 Counsel and Court discussed Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment set for February 22, 2005 before Judge Ezra. ;Status conference set for 9:30 1/14/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren , ;counsel and court discussed defendant's motion for summary judgment for 2/22/05 before Judge Ezra ( Ct Rptr : none) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg) Modified on 02/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EO : ;Status conference re administrate record and the summary judgment motion deadline set for 11:15 1/22/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; David Henkin to notify parties ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First AMENDED COMPLAINT for declaratory judgment and injunctive relief [1-1] by plaintiff; certificate of service - terminating defendant Les Brownlee; adding Francis J. Harvey, secretary of the United States Department of the Army (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION to file first amended complaint; exhibit 1; certificate of service - ORDER approved and so ordered by Judge David A. Ezra - on behalf of plaintiffs (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING plaintiff's unopposed motion for order shorten time for briefing of and hearing on defendants' motion to limit review to the Administrative Record and for a protective order discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests [26-1] by by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EO: Federal Defendants' Motion to Limit to Review to the Administrative Record and for a Protective Order Barring Discovery and Quashing Plaintiffs' Prior Discovery Requests, filed on 12/17/04, is set for hearing on 2/1/05 @ 1:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren; Any party who would like to participate by phone is to notify Richlyn Young @ 541-3090 prior to the hearing date [24-1] by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (gs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004, Terminated: 12/23/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    plaintiffs Ilioulaokalani Co, Na Imi Pono and Kipuka's UNOPPOSED MOTION for order shorten time for hearing on defendants' motion to limit review to the Administrative Record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests ; declaration of David L. Henkin; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004, Terminated: 2/1/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by federal defendants' to limit to review to the administrative record and for a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests ; memorandum of points and authorities in support of federal defendants' motion to limit review to the administrative record and or a protective order barring discovery and quashing plaintiffs' prior discovery requests; table of contents; table of authorities; exhibits 1-5; proposed order; certificate of service - referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint STIPULATION and ORDER by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren to resolve the need for certain discovery until after a decision on the merits is reached - on behalf of defendants (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of APPEARANCE of Barry A. Weiner as co-counsel for the federal defendants Donald H. Rumsfeld and Les Brownlee (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EP : ;Rule 16 scheduling conference not held ; parties to discuss deadlines for submitting the administrative record and for filing cross motions for summary judgment and notify court by 11/19/04 ( Ct Rptr : No record taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT for the United States of American; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EP : Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction [5-1]; arguments heard; plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction - taken under advisement; court to issue order ( Ct Rptr : Cynthia Fazio) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [5-1] (cc: all counsel, media) (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA to the declaration of Laurie Lucking of defendants' opposition to motion for preliminary injunction filed on October 18, 2004; certificate of service [5-1] - by USA (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs' in support of motion for preliminary injunction; certificate of compliance; supplemental declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 29-37; supplemental declaration of William Aila, Jr.; certificate of service [5-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT OF PARTIES' discovery PLANNING MEETING by plaintiffs'; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/19/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' notice of filing original DECLARATIONS of William Aila, Jr., Eric Enos, and Thomas Lenchanko; exhibits A-C; certificate of service (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Federal defendants' ANSWER; certificate of service [1-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants' OPPOSITION to motion for preliminary injunction [8-1]; table of contents; table of authorities; exhibits 1-16; certificate of compliance; certificate of service [part 2 of 2] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/19/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' OPPOSITION to motion for preliminary injunction [5-1]; table of contents; table of authorities; exhibits 1-16; certificate of compliance; certificate of service [part 1 of 2] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing corrected declaration of Thomas Lenchanko; corrected declaration of Thomas Lenchanko; certificate of service [5-1] (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATED Agreement and ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra - the parties agree that the United States will refrain from taking the following actions prior to the Court's decision on the preliminary injuction motion [5-1] - on behalf of plaintiff (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004, Terminated: 11/5/2004 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs' for preliminary injunction ; memorandum in support of motion; certificate of compliance; declaration of William Aila, Jr.; declaration of Eric Enos; declaration of Thomas Lenchanko; declaration of David L. Henkin; exhibits 1-28; certificate of service - set for 10:30 11/5/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EO: Senior Judge Alan C. Kay recuses himself from this case; Chief Judge David Alan Ezra will re-assign Civil 04-00502 accordingly by Judge Alan C. Kay (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE - service of complaint and summons executed upon Edward H. Kubo, Jr., United States Attorney Hawaii thru Stephen Lehto, Receptionist; date of service: date stated as "4-17-04" (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/15/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for a declaratory judgment and injunctive relief; summons (Summons issued) (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 224678 (afc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?