Turtle Island Restor, et al v. Commerce U.S. Dept, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00528-DAE-KSC
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Center for Biological Diversity, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Henry Achitoff +1 808 599 2436 +5216 521 521 6841 achitoff@earthjustice.org
No Logo Ka 'Iwa Kua Lele, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Henry Achitoff +1 808 599 2436 +5216 521 521 6841 achitoff@earthjustice.org
No Logo Turtle Island Restoration Network, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Henry Achitoff +1 808 599 2436 +5216 521 521 6841 achitoff@earthjustice.org
Space Isaac H. Moriwake +5992 599 599 2436 imoriwake@earthjustice.org
v.
No Logo Donald L. Evans, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore G. Meeker +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth M Barsky +1 202 305 0223 +1 202 305 0275 seth.barsky@usdoj.gov
Space Srinath Jay Govindan +1 202 305 0237 +1 202 305 0275 Jay.Govindan@usdoj.gov
Space John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
Space Jean E. Williams +1 202 305 0210 +1 202 305 0275 jean.williams@usdoj.gov
No Logo National Marine Fisheries Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore G. Meeker +5412 541 541 2850

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth M Barsky +1 202 305 0223 +1 202 305 0275 seth.barsky@usdoj.gov
Space Srinath Jay Govindan +1 202 305 0237 +1 202 305 0275 Jay.Govindan@usdoj.gov
Space John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
Space Jean E. Williams +1 202 305 0210 +1 202 305 0275 jean.williams@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Commerce United States Department of Commerce, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore G. Meeker +5412 541 541 2850
Space Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seth M Barsky +1 202 305 0223 +1 202 305 0275 seth.barsky@usdoj.gov
Space Srinath Jay Govindan +1 202 305 0237 +1 202 305 0275 Jay.Govindan@usdoj.gov
Space John Shaughnessy Most +1 202 616 3353 +1 202 305 0506 john.most@usdoj.gov
Space Jean E. Williams +1 202 305 0210 +1 202 305 0275 jean.williams@usdoj.gov
No Logo Hawaii Longline Association, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyons Brandt Cook & Hiramatsu

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George W. Brandt gbrandt@lbchlaw.com
Space Steven Y. Otaguro +5247 524 524 7030 sotaguro@lbchlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurie K. Beale +1 206 526 6327 laurie.beale@noaa.gov
Space Jeffrey W. Leppo +1 206 624 0900 +1 206 386 7500 jwleppo@stoel.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 8/30/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Honolulu
Terminated 1/4/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Appeal Record Returned
Appeal Record Returned: Notice of Appeal (clerk's files 4/ Bulky docs 11-13, 14-17, 18/ Transcripts 1) (ecs, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 68 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006 USCA Judgment
    USCA JUDGMENT as to Notice of Appeal [05-15035] (ecs, )(cc: DAE, TL, USA)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
      COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [68] USCA Judgment has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 5/25/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
        LREF
        Blank 67 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: 10/14/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCACourt Filing
        Original Record transmitted Fed Exp to Judge, 9CCA: Clerks files 4, bulky docs #1113, 1417, 18, transcript 1. (ecs)
          LREF
          Blank 66 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra denying plaintiffs'motion for injunction pending appeal [59-1] (cc: all counsel) (ecs)
            LREF
            Blank 65 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005, Terminated: 5/24/2006 Designation of Record on Appeal
            CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to 9th CCA (cc: all counsel) (afc)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Transcript
              ORIGINAL TRANSCRIPT filed ( Ct Rptr Jessica B. Cahill transcriber ) taken on 10/12/04 (ecs)
                LREF
                Blank 64 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                Intervenor-Defendant the Hawaii Longline Association's opposition to plaintiffs' motion for injunction pending appeal; third declaration of Sean C. Martin; exhibits A & B; certificate of service [59-1] (sm)
                  LREF
                  Blank 63 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/22/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  EO: Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal set for 01/27/2005 09:45:00 AM before DAE- TO BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT A HEARING All counsel notified by phone : vacating hearing re motion for injunction pending appeal [59-1] () JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                    LREF
                    Blank 62 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/22/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiffs (sm)
                      LREF
                      Blank 61 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/22/2005 Designation of Record on Appeal
                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form for dates: 10/12/04 Pltf's M/Preliminary Injunction re [57-1] (sm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 60 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                        Plaintiffs' REPLY to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal; Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; Exhibits 1-4; Certificate of Service [59-1] (sm)
                          LREF
                          Blank 59 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 4/21/2005 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                          Plaintiffs' NOTICE OF MOTION and Motion for injunction pending appeal ; Memorandum in support of motion; certificate of service set for 9:45 1/27/05 before Judge David A. Ezra (gs)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005, Terminated: 5/24/2006 Notice of Appeal
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL and copy of docket sheet sent to 9th CCA [57-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 58 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Federal Defendants' OPPOSITION to plaintiffs' motion for injunction pending appeal; certificate of service [57-1] (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 57 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL (preliminary injunction appeal); certificate of service - by plaintiffs from Dist. Court decision [55-1] (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 USCA Appeal Fees
                                  RECEIVED re [57-1] fee in amount of $ 255.00 (Receipt # 227076) (afc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 56 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                    JUDGMENT in a Civil Case - that this case is hereby dismissed pursuant to the "Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Granting Intervenor's Motion to Dismiss, and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction" filed on January 4, 2004 by Judge David A. Ezra re [55-1] terminating case (cc: all counsel) (sm)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 55 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005, Terminated: 1/4/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting defendats' motion to dismiss, granting intervenor's motion to dismiss, and denying plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction - by Judge David A. Ezra - granting defendants' motion to dismiss [30-1] [23-1]; denying plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction [3-1] (cc: all counsel and as instructed by Chambers of Judge David A. Ezra) (lmg)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 54 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                        EX PARTE MOTION to Shorten Time on Defendants' Motion for Stay of Hearing and Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, for Extension of Time; Declaration of Jay S. Govindan; Order - DENIED BY Judge Helen Gillmor for Judge David Ezra (sm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 53 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Miscellaneous Document
                                          Plaintiffs' CONCISE STATEMENT of undisputed material facts in support of their motion for summary judgment; certificate of service [52-1] (lmg)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 52 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs for summary judgment ; declaration of Brendan Cummings; declaration of Douglas L. Bevington; declaration of Todd Steiner; certificate of service; motion set for 9:00 1/27/05 before Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 51 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO :Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2004 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 1/05/2005 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. cc: all counsel via fax rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/5/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang () JUDGE Kevin S. Chang (sm)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 50 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                EO: Hawaii Longshore Line Association's Motion to Dismiss-set for 11/22/2004 09:45:00 AM before DAE. TO BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS WITHOUT A HEARING : vacating hearing re motion to dismiss [30-1] () JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                  Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Advance the Hearing on Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 23, 2004 or, in the Alternative, for Scheduling Conference to set Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed on August 30, 2004, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 24, 2004 and Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss filed on September 27, 2004; Declaration of Steven Otaguro; Order Granting Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Advance the Hearing on Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 23, 2004 or, in the Alternative, for Scheduling Conference to Set Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed on August 30, 2004, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 24, 2004 and Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 27, 2004; Certificate of Service - referred to Judge David A. Ezra by (sm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/27/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                    Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Consideration of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunctiton Filed on Augsut 30, 2004; Declaration of Steven Y. Otaguro; Exhibit 1; Order Granting Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Allow the Consideration of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed on August 30, 2004; Certificate of Service - referred to Judge Ezra (sm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      EP: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Strike. Arguments heard. Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [3-1] - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Strike [23-1][30-1] - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT (Ct Rptr: Aha Kupono, ESR) JUDGE Judge David A. Ezra (afc)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY by defendants in suuport of their motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, to strike [23-1]; table of contents; table of authorities; exhibits 1 and 2; certificate of compliance; certificate of service (afc)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Plaintiffs' REPLY to Hawaii Longline Association's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; Exhibits 1-5; Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Granting Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's ExParte Motion to Allow the Consideration of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Prleiminary Injunction Filed on August 30, 2004, and Allowing Plaintiff Until October 6, 2004 to File a Reply by Judge David A. Ezra (cc: all counsel by fax) (sm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Denying Intervenor hawaii Longline Association's ExParte Motionto Advance the Hearing on Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 23, 2004 or, in the Alternative, for Scheduling Conference to Set Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed on August 30, 2004 by Judge David A. Ezra (cc: all counsel by fax) (sm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 RequestCourt Filing
                                                                Unopposed REQUEST to shorten time; declaratio i support of unopposed request to shorten time; (S.Jay Govindan); Order - by Judge Ezra -Federal Defendants' Moitonto Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Strike shall be heard on10/12/04 at 9:45. (sm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                                  Notice of Filing Original Declaration in Support of Unopposed Request to Shorten Time (Jay Govindan); Original Declaration in Support of Unopposed Request to Shorten Time (Jay Govindan); Certificate of Service by federal defendants (sm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                                    Notice of Filing Original signed Certificate of Compliance; Original Signed Certificate of Complaince; Certificate of Service by federal defendants (sm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' to motion to dismiss or strike; certificate of service [23-1] (sm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Plaintiffs' Reply to NMFS's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; Exhibits a- 4; Certificate of Service [3-1] (sm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                          Plaintiffs' EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to File Separate Opposition and Reply Briefs; Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Separate Opposition and Reply Brief; Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; Certificate of Service by Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint; Certificate of Service by intervenor Hawaii Longline Association to [1-1] (sm)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                              Intervenor the Hawaii Longline Association's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Ex Parte Motion to Advance the Hearing on Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss filed on September 23, 2004 or, in the Alternative for Scheduling Conference to Set Hearings on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed on August 30, 2004, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 24, 2004 and Hawaii Longline Association's Motion to Dismiss Filed on September 27, 2004, filed on September 29, 2004; Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Response/Reply - Miscellaneous
                                                                                Plaintiffs' Opposition to Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Advance the Hearing of Hawaii Longlife Association's Moiton to Dismiss Filed ON September 23, 2004 or, in the Alternative, for Scheduling Conference by intervenor Hawaii Longline Association (sm)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                  Intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Ex Parte Motion to Allow The Consideration of its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injucntion filed on August 30, 2004; Exhibits 1 & 2, Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    Plaintiffs' opposition to intervenor Hawaii Longline Association's ex parte motion to allow the consideration of its opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction filed on August 30, 2004; declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; exhibit 1; certificate of service (sm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in support of combined motion to dismiss and opposition to motion for preliminary injunction; declaration of Sean C. Martin; Declaration of Paul Dalzell; exhibit 1-2; certificate of compliance; certificate of service by intervenor Hawaii Longline Asso [30-1] (sm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004, Terminated: 1/4/2005 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by intervenor Hawaii Longline Asso to dismiss ; certificate of service set for 9:45 11/22/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang denying plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of order granting application for admission pro hac vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale filed on September 24, 2004; [9-1] (sm)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Reply
                                                                                            Hawaii Longline Association's Reply in Support of Motion for Leave to Intervene; Certificate of Service re [5-1] (sm)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang granting in part and denying in part Hawaii Longline Association's motion for leave to intervene filed on September 21, 2004; [5-1] (sm)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                                                                Hawaii Longline Association's submission of original declaration of Jeffrey W. Leppo in support of its amended memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of order granting admission pro hac vice filed September 24, 2004; exhibit A; certificate of service [24-1] (sm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  EP: 1. Application for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale Mr. Meeker has no opposition to the intervention and supports the Pro Hac Vice application of Mr. Leppo. 1. Application for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene is granted in part and denied in part. Mr. Otaguro to prepare the order. 2. Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale is denied. Mr. Otaguro to prepare the order. Paul Achitoff Theodore Meeker Steven Otaguro Jeffrey Leppo, by phone present : [9-1], [5-1] ( Ct Rptr : FTR C5 8:56-9:37:33) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004, Terminated: 9/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Amended MEMORANDUM by intervenor Hawaii Longline Association in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of order granting admission pro hac vice; declaration of Stefan M. Reinke; declaration of Jeffrey W. Leppo; certificate of service Beale; [9-1] (sm)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by federal defendants to dismiss of in the alternataive, to strike; table of contents; table of authorities; memorandum in support of federal defendants; motion to dismiss or in the alternative, to strike; exhibits 1 and 2; certificate of service set for 9:45 11/22/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Hawaii Longline Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene; Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; Exhibit 1; Certificate of Service [5-1] (sm)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by intervenor Hawaii Longline Association in opposition to plaintiffs' to motion for reconsideration of order granting admission pro hac vice; declaration of Stefan M. Reinke; declaration of Jeffrey W. Leppo; certificate of service Beale; [9-1] (sm)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                            EXHIBITS 8 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                              EXHIBITS 7 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                EXHIBITS 6 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Volume II) [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS 6 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Volume 1) [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS 5 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS 4 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS 3 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS on behalf of defendant Commerce U.S. Dept [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS 2 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Volume 1) [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS 1 to Federal Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [10-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Federal defendants' memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction; table of contents table of authorities; exhibits 1-8; (under separate cover); certificate of compliance; certificate of service [3-1] (sm)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004, Terminated: 9/24/2004 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiffs for reconsideration of order granting application for admission pro hac vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; certificate of service; referred to Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sm)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale; Declaration of Steven Y. Otaguro; Declaration of Jeffrey W. Leppo; Declaration of Laurie K. Beale; Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale; Certificate of Service by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang by intervenor Hawaii Longline Asso for attorney Jeffrey W. Leppo; Laurie K. Beale to appear pro hac vice (sm)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Original Signature submitted
                                                                                                                                      Applicant for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's Submission of Original Declarations of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale in Support of its Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey W. Leppo and Laurie K. Beale Filed September 21, 2004; Exhibits A-B; Certificate of Service (sm)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 225.00, receipt # 225232 Pro Hac Vice for Laurie K. Beale. (sm)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 225.00, receipt # 225231 pro hac vice for Jeffrey W. Leppo. (sm)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            EO : Applicant for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten the Time for the Hearing on It's Motion for Leave to Intervene has been granted by Judge Chang. Applicant for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's Motion for Leave to Intervene set for 9/27/2004 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Opposition due: 9/24/04 at 12:00pm cc: Steven Otaguro, via fax Paul Achitoff, via fax Harry Yee, via fax granting Scheduling order to shorten time for hearing on its motion for leave to intervene [4-1] () JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sm)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004, Terminated: 9/27/2004 Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION and Applicant for Intervention Hawaii Longline Association's motion for leave to intervene; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Sean C. Martin; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service - hearing set 9/27/04 at 9:00 before Judge Chang (sm)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Application for Intervention Hawaii LongLine Association's EX PARTE MOTION and Order by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang to shorten time for hearing on its motion for leave to intervene ; declaration of Steven Y. Otaguro; Order granting applicant for intervention Hawaii Longline Association's exparte motion to shorten time for the hearing on its motion for leave to intervene; certificate of service (sm)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Turtle Island Restoration for preliminary injunction ; declaration of Paul H. Achitoff; exhibits 1 -19; certificate of service; set for 9:45 10/12/04 before Judge David A. Ezra (sm)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/29/04 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gab)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief; (Summons(es) issued) (gab)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 224834 (gab)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?