Aga v. NAVY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00529-HG-BMK
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward J. Aga, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo FECA/Injury Compensation Division, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 1, Defendant
No Logo Linda D. Biggs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Navy Regional Security Hawaii, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
United States Navy United States Navy, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Department of the Navy"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
No Logo Wilson S. Kerisiano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 8/30/2004
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $450000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Honolulu
Terminated 1/10/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE - by Walter A.Y.H. Chinn, Clerk/A.F. Chang, Deputy Clerk - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to the "Order Denying Motion for Disqualification and Reconsideration and Dismissing Complaint" entered by U.S. District Judge Helen Gillmor on January 7, 2005. terminating case (cc: all counsel and/or parties of record) (afc)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Order
    ORDER denying motion for disqualification and reconsideration and dismissing complaint by JUDGE Helen Gillmor - [case is dismissed without prejudice] [14-1] (cc: all counsel and/or parties of record) (afc)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004, Terminated: 1/7/2005 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
      EX PARTE MOTION to the Chief, United Stated District Judge by plaintiff Edward J. Aga to vacate the orders of August 31, 2004 and November 4, 2004 and permit plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis or an alternate payment plan ; exhibits A-D; declaration of Edward J. Aga; notice of non-haring exparte motion; certificate of service - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (sm)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference continued to 3-24-05 @ 9 a.m. before Judge Barry Kurren. Helper to file Motion for Summary Judgment by 1-18-05. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment set for 2-22-05 @ 9 a.m. before Judge Helen Gillmor. Status Conference on Remaining Issues set for 3-24-05 @ 9 a.m. before Judge Barry Kurren. cc: Edward J. Aga, Thomas Helper (Ct Rptr: No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: 11/26/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; certificate of service - by plaintiff (afc)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Federal Defendants {defendants U.S. Dept of Navy, Navy Regional Security Hawaii, Wilson S. Kerisiano, & Linda D. Biggs}; certificate of service (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER Denying Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees by Judge Helen Gillmor [9-1] [failure to pay $150.00 filing fee to the Clerk of Court within 30 days will result in dismissal of plaintiff's complaint] (cc: Mr. Aga w/letter & due date of 12/06/04) (gs) Modified on 11/23/2004
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004, Terminated: 11/4/2004 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                APPLICATION by plaintiff Edward J. Aga to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying application to proceed without prepayment of fees - by Judge Helen Gillmor [3-1] (cc: Mr. Aga) [application is denied without prejudice; plaintiff has 30 days to submit an amended application explaining incongruity, or pay filing fee to Clerk; FAILURE to submit either will result in dismissal of pltf's complaint] (afc)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's REQUEST to a United States District Court Judge for the District of Hawaii, to RECONSIDER AND AMEND Order filed August 31, 2004 by the Honorable United States Magistrate Court Judge, Barry M. Kurren and allow plaintiff to serve his complaint and summons via in part, United States certified mail and personal service; and to further assign all case matters to be heard before a United States District Court Judge for the District of Hawaii; Title 28 USC 636(c), Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1 and 73.2 of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii, plaintiff choses [sic] not to consent - by MAG JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN [5-1][6-1] (cc: Mr. Edward J. Aga; HG) (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District CoCourt Filing
                      Plaintiff Edward J. Aga's REQUEST to a United States District Court Judge for the District of Hawaii to RECONSIDER AND AMEND Order filed August 31, 2004 by the Honorable United States Magistrate Court Judge Barry M. Kurren [5-1], and allow plaintiff to serve his complaint and summons via in part, United States certified mail and personal service; and to further assign all case matters to be heard before a United States District Court Judge for the District of Hawaii; Title 28 USC 636(c), Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1 and 73.2 of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii, plaintiff chooses not to consent - referred to JUDGE Helen Gillmor (cc: BMK) (afc)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 9/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying plaintiff's request for order to serve complaint and summons by United States Mail, pursuant to Title 28 USC 1915 and Rule 4(B),(i), and (iii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - by Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren [4-1] (cc: Mr. Edward J. Aga) (afc)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 8/31/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                          REQUEST by plaintiff for order to serve complaint and summons by U.S. Mail, pursuant to Title 28 USC 1915 and Rule 4(B),(i), and (iii) of FRCvP - referred to Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc) Modified on 09/15/2004
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 10/7/2004 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa PauperisCourt Filing
                            APPLICATION by plaintiff to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit - referred to Judge Helen Gillmor (afc)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 11/29/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT for damanges and other relief; demand for jury trial; summons (summons issued) (afc)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?