Schlea v. Minor, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00586-SPK-BMK
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aliya Schlea, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah A. McNulty +1 808 874 1010
Space Timothy P. McNulty +8741 874 874 1010
v.
No Logo Doe Corporations 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Doe Partnerships 1-5, Defendant
No Logo James Minor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin Sumida & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lance S. Au +3562 356 356 2600 lau@sthawaii.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Matsui Chung Sumida & Tsuchiyama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Y.S. Chung +5363 536 536 3711 +1 808 599 2979 info@triallawhawaii.com
No Logo John Does 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Roe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Roe Non-Profit Corporations 1-5, Defendant
Office Hawaii
Filed 9/29/2004
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maui
Terminated 5/13/2005
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 04-1-0170(3)[]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Certificate Of Service.
CERTIFICATE of service by defendant James Minor (emt)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
    STIPULATION for dismissal with prejudice of all claims and all parties and ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King terminating case (emt)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Certificate Of Service.
        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Certificate Of Service.
          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Certificate Of Service.
            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
              RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (cc: all counsel) (afc)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                CERTIFICATE of service by defendant (afc)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE of service by defendant James Minor (gs)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Court to prepare scheduling order. 1. Jury trial on February 14, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before SPK 2. Final Pretrial Conference on January 3, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before BMK 3. 4. Final Pretrial Statement by December 27, 2005 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by July 15, 2005 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by November 16, 2005 7. File Dispositive Motions by September 14, 2005 8a. File Motions in Limine by January 24, 2006 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by January 31, 2006 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by August 15, 2005 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by September 14, 2005 12. Discovery deadline December 16, 2005 13. Settlement Conference set for November 28, 2005 at 2:00 p.m. before BMK 14. Settlement Conference statements by November 21, 2005 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by January 31, 2006 21. File Final witness list by January 24, 2006 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by January 17, 2006 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by January 24, 2006 26. File objections to the Exhibits by January 31, 2006 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by January 24, 2006 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by January 31, 2006 29. File Trial Brief by January 31, 2006 30. cc: Tammy Kimura [rule 16 scheduling conference held on 9:00 1/7/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren ; Jury Trial set for 9:00 2/14/06 before Judge Samuel P. King ; final pretrial conference set for 9:00 1/3/06; Discovery ddl set for 12/16/05; Motion filing ddl set for 9/14/05; settlement conference set for 2:00 11/28/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren] (Ct Rptr: C6-No Record Taken) JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (afc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005 Scheduling Conference Statement
                      SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/29/2004 Scheduling Conference Statement
                        SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; Certificate of Service by defendant James Minor (sm)
                          LREF
                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 Initial Disclosure
                          Defendant James Minor's INITIAL DISCLOSURES; certificate of service (lmg)
                            LREF
                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Initial Disclosure
                            Rule 26(a) INITIAL DISCLOSURE; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Report of Planning Meeting
                              REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; Certificate of Service re: Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting by plaintiff Aliya Schlea (sm)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                EO :Continued : [Rule 16 Scheduling Conference] from 12/27/2004 09:00:00 AM to 01/07/2005 09:00:00 AM before BMK. Scheduling Conference Statements due 01/04/2005. cc: Timothy P. McNulty/Deborah A. McNulty, Randall Y. S. Chung rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/7/05 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren () JUDGE Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Answer
                                  Defendant James Minor's Answer to Complaint, filed on 4/12/04; demand for jury trial; certificate of service [1-1]; jury demand (sm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 12/27/04 before Mag Judge Barry M. Kurren (sm)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Exhibits A and B; Certificate of Service from Circuit Court Case Number: 04-1-0170(3) (sm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 225352 (sm)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?