Maitland v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00615-JMS-KSC
District Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Frankie Maitland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Preston W. Easley, Jr. +1 310 832 5315 maritime@earthlink.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeanne M. Franken +1 415 436 6644 +1 415 436 6632 jeanne.franken@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Office Hawaii
Filed 10/14/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 340 - Personal Injury: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County Honolulu
Terminated 3/30/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 65 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re [64] Consent Judgment as to Frankie Maitland by United States of America. (gls, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 64 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Consent JudgmentCourt Filing
    CONSENT JUDGMENT . Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/25/06. (ecs, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Certificate Of Service.
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland (gls, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 62 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATED ORDER of Contingent Dismissal [61] [60] . Signed by Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/7/06. [Ordered that plaintiff's complaint and action, and all claims herein, be dismissed, without costs and w/o prejudice to the right of entry of a consent judgment thereon or, upon good cause shown, within ninety days to have this Order of Dismissal set aside and the action and the claims reinstated if the recommended settlement is not approved by all parties](ecs, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 61 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER Regarding Stipulated Order of Contingent Dismissal [60] . Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/7/06. [Judge Mollway withdraws her approval of the "Stipulated Order of Contingent Dismissal" and VACATES the order she signed. Judge Seabright will be delivered a copy of the Stipulated Order for his consideration which will be deemed to be the ORIGINAL and will be stamped as such](ecs, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [62] Stipulated Order of Contingent Dismissal, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 4/10/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Court's Certificate of Service
              COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [61] Order Regarding Stipulated Order of Contingent Dismissal, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 4/7/06. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (ecs, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 60 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                Stipulated ORDER of DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/30/06. (ecs, )[Ordered that plaintiff's complaint and action, and all claims herein, be dismissed, without costs and w/o prejudice to the right of entry of a consent judgment thereon or, upon good cause shown, within ninety days to have this Order of Dismissal set aside and the action and the claims reinstated if the recommended settlement is not approved by all parties]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland [Re: Stipulated Order of Contingent Dismissal] (ecs, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland (gls, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland (gls, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland (gls, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland (gls, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland re Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents to Defendant United States of America, set no Eight (gab, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland re Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Defendant United States of America, Set No Six (gab, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland er Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to United States of America Set No. Two (gab, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frankie Maitland re Notice of Deposition to Defendant United States of America (gab, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Notice of Deposition of Norman Bradley (Seaward Marine Services, Inc. Employee) by Frankie Maitland (gab, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 48 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Plaintiff's Interrogatories by Frankie Maitland (gab, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 1/12/06. (gls, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 46 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 45 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EP: Status conference: Judge Seabright disclosed that he was employed at the U. S. Attorney's Office until May 16, 2005. Judge Seabright explained Canon 3C (1) and 3C (1) (e) of the Code of Conduct for United States Judges and 28 U. S. C. Section 455. Judge Seabright disclosed that he reviewed the entire file in this matter and had no recollection, and did not believe, that he had contact with or participated in this matter while employed at the U. S. Attorney's Office. Jeanne M. Franken confirmed that Judge Seabright did not participate in this matter while employed at the U. S. Attorney's Office. Counsel for plaintiff Preston Easley stated that he had no objection to Judge Seabright presiding over this matter. The Court therefore found no basis for disqualification under the canon of ethics or the laws of the United States. Mr. Easley informed the Court that he is willing to waive 455(a). Court found no basis for disqualification under 455(b) (3) (Ct Rptr: Sharon Ross) by Judge J. M. Seabright (gs)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EO: Status conference set for 9:45 11/2/05 before Judge J. M. Seabright by Judge J. M. Seabright (gs)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 43 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Re-Assigning Civil Cases by Judge David A. Ezra Case assigned to Judge J. M. Seabright (gs)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (bbb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (bbb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (sealed)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  EP: Rule 16 Scheduling conference; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held; Rule 16 Scheduling Conference order to be issued ; 1. Non-jury trial on September 12, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before SOM 2. Final Pretrial Conference on August 1, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. before KSC 3. Final Pretrial Conference before District Judge N/A 4. Final Pretrial Statement by July 25, 2006 5. File motions to Join/Add Parties/Amend Pleadings by February 10, 2006 6. File other Non-Dispositive Motions by June 14, 2006 7. File Dispositive Motions by April 12, 2006 8a. File Motions in Limine by August 22, 2006 8b. File opposition memo to a Motion in Limine by August 29, 2006 11a. Plaintiff's Expert Witness Disclosures by March 13, 2006 11b. Defendant's Expert Witness Disclosures by April 12, 2006 12. Discovery deadline July 14, 2006 13. Settlement Conference set for 4/28/2006 at 10:00am before KSC 14. Settlement Conference statements by 4/21/2006 20. Submit Voir Dire Questions, Special Verdict Form, Concise Statement of Case and Jury Instructions by N/A 21. File Final witness list by August 22, 2006 24. Exchange Exhibit and Demonstrative aids by August 15, 2006 25. Stipulations re: Authenticity/Admissibility of Proposed Exhibits by August 22, 2006 26. File objections to the Exhibits by August 29, 2006 28a. File Deposition Excerpt Designations by August 22, 2006 28b. File Deposition Counter Designations and Objections by August 29, 2006 29. File Trial Brief by August 29, 2006 30. File Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by August 29, 2006 (Ct Rptr: no record) Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                            SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT of Defendant United States of America, and Certificate of Service (gs)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Description not available
                                                                                                              Initial DISCLOSURE OF Defendant, United States of America, and Certificate of Service (gs)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Scheduling Conference Statement
                                                                                                                    Report of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT by plaintiff Frankie Maitland; Certificate of service (gs)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Report of Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                          REPORT OF PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; Certificate of Service by plaintiff Frankie Maitland (gs)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER of Defendant United States of America, to plaintiff's complaint; and Certificate of Service to [1-1] (gs)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              EO: At Counsel's request the Rule 16 scheduling conference currently set for 1/10/05 at 9:00 a.m. has been continued to 2/22/05 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Chang; Jeanne Franken to participate by phone and notify all parties Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant United States of Ame thru Stephen Lehto on 10/26/04 (gs)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 1/10/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (sealed)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT for Damages; Summons issued (sealed)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document -- Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 225757 (sealed)
                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?