Asia Pacific Environ, et al v. Integrated Evironmen, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00744-SPK-KSC
District Judge SAMUEL P KING, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Asia Pacific Environmental Technology, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal K. Aoki +5233 523 523 3900 naoki@koshibalaw.com
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
Space Andrew D. Stewart +5233 523 523 3900 astewart@koshibalaw.com
No Logo Hawaii Medical Vitrification, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Koshiba Agena & Kubota

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal K. Aoki +5233 523 523 3900 naoki@koshibalaw.com
Space James E.T. Koshiba +5233 523 523 3900 jkoshiba@koshibalaw.com
Space Charles A. Price cprice@koshibalaw.com
Space Andrew D. Stewart +5233 523 523 3900 astewart@koshibalaw.com
v.
No Logo Doe Defendants 1-50, Defendant
No Logo Integrated Invironmental Technologies, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa L. Keyes +1 206 623 7580

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodsell Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill S.M. Baldemor +5475 547 547 5600 jbaldemor@goodsill.com
Space Patricia M. NaPier +5475 547 547 5600 pnapier@goodsill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bart J. Freedman +1 206 623 7580
Space Jonathan H Harrison +1 206 623 7580 jonathan.harrison@klgates.com
Office Hawaii
Filed 12/22/2004
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Honolulu
Terminated 6/3/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags TERMED, TRANSF
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
EP : Defendants Motion to Dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative Motion to Transfer Venue-Oral Argument Held. The Motion will be granted as to the Motion to Transfer Venue. This case will be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington. Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Defendant's Action filed before the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington-This Motion is hereby Denied. Court will issue a written order. re [5-1], re [4-1] ( Ct Rptr : Debra Chun) JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (eps)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Samuel P. King transfering action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington - granting the alternative motion to transfer venue [5-1], denying the motion to stay defendant's action [4-1] as moot. Case transferred to Dist of: ED WA (cc: all counsel, CRM) (eps)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Original Signature submitted
      SUBMISSION by defendant Integrated Evironmen of original declaration of Jeffrey E Surma to reply memorandum in support of defendant Integrated Environmental Technologies LLC motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative, motion to transfer venue, filed January 18, 2005; declaration of Jeffrey Surma; certificate of service [14-1] (eps)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant Integrated Evironmen in support of motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative motion to transfer venue [5-1]; filed January 18, 2005; declaration of Jeffrey E Surma; declaration of Jill Murakami Baldemor; exhibit f-g; certificate of service (eps)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: 5/18/2005 Original Signature submitted
          SUBMISSION by defendant Integrated Evironmen of original declaration of Jeffrey E Surma to memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to stay defendant's action filed before the United States District Court for the E D of Washington [11-1] filed on January 14, 2005; declaration of Jeffrey E Surma; certificate of service (eps)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Certificate Of Service.
            AMENDED CERTIFICATE of service by plaintiffs (afc)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
              MEMORANDUM by defendant Integrated Evironmen in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to stay defendant's action filed before the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington [4-1]; filed on January 14, 2005; declaration of Jill Murakami Baldemor; exhibit d; fax declaration of Jeffrey E Surma; exhibits e; certificate of service (eps)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                MEMORANDUM by plaintiff Asia Pacific Environ, plaintiff Hawaii Medical Vitri in opposition to motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative motion to transfer venue [5-1]; declaration of Neal K Aoki; exhibits a-e; certificate of service (eps)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Ex Parte Motion and orderCourt Filing
                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice of Bart J Freedman, Theresa L Keyes, and Jonathan H Harrison; declaration of Patricia M NaPier; declaration of Bart J Freedman, declaration of Theresa L Keyes; declaration of Jonathan H Harrison; and Order; certificate of service - by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang on behalf of defendant Integrated Evironmen granting leave for attorney Bart J to appear pro hac vice , granting leave for attorney Theresa L Keys to appear pro hac vice , granting leave for attorney Jonathan H Harrison to appear pro hac vice (eps)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Filing Fee Received
                    FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 225, receipt # 229155; Jonathan H Harrison, pro hac vice (eps)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Filing Fee Received
                      FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 225, receipt # 229154; Theresa L Key, pro hac vice (eps)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Filing Fee Received
                        FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 225.00, receipt # 229153; Bart J Freedman, pro hac vice (eps)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          EO : At defendant's request, Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 3/21/2005 at 9:00 AM has been continued to 6/21/2005 at 9:00 AM before Judge Chang. Ms. Napier to notify all parties. ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Original Signature submitted
                            SUBMISSION of original declaration of Jeffrey E Surma, attaching exhibit a in support of defendant Integrated Evironment motion to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative motion to transfer venue [5-1] filed on January 18, 2005; certificate of service (eps)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              EO : Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Defendant's Action filed before the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington filed on January 14, 2005 will be set for hearing on June 03, 2005 @l0:00 a.m. before Judge Samuel P. King. This Motion should have been set for hearing before Judge Samuel P. King and not Magistrate Judge Chang. Also set on June 03, 2005 before Judge Samuel P. King is the Defendants Motion to Dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative motion to transfer venue. cc: All Counsel of Record by Fax [4-1] ; ( Ct Rptr : ) JUDGE Judge Samuel P. King (eps)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005, Terminated: 6/3/2005 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by defendant Integrated Evironmen to dismiss for improper venue or in the alternative motion to transfer venue ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Jeffrey E Surma; exhibit a; declaration of Patricia M Napier; exhibits b-c; certificate of service - set for 10:00 6/3/05 before Judge Samuel P. King (eps)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF MOTION and motion by plaintiff Asia Pacific Environ, plaintiff Hawaii Medical Vitri to stay defendant's action filed before the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington ; memorandum in support of motion; declaration of Samuel YK Liu; exhibits a-n; certificate of service - set for 9:30 2/28/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005 Service - Miscellaneous
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Integrated Evironmen thru Jeffrey Surma on 1/5/05 (gs)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge David A. Ezra rule 16 conference set for 9:00 3/21/05 before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (eps)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (eps)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Filing Fee Received
                                          FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $ 150.00, receipt # 226929 (eps)
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?