Aviation Finance Group, LLC v. Duc Housing Partners, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00535
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 2:24 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS AND HAWLEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason D Scott +1 208 344 6000 jscott@hawleytroxell.com
No Logo Aviation Securitization, LLC, Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo Bank National Association"
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
v.
No Logo Daniel A Duc, Defendant
No Logo Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Defendant

Represented by EBERLE BERLIN KADING TURNBOW & MCKLVEEN, CHARTERED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel A Diddle +1 208 344 8535 +1 208 344 8542 sdiddle@eberle.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel A Diddle +1 208 344 8535 +1 208 344 8542 sdiddle@eberle.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 66 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE by Daniel A Duc, Duc Housing Partners, Inc re 61 Judgment, Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment (Diddle, Samuel)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 62 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC.(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Daniel A Duc, Duc Housing Partners, Inc. Replies due by 7/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Samuel A. Diddle, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Samuel A. Diddle)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Fees Jason D Scott appearing for Plaintiff Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/19/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Allowance of Attorney Fees, # 2 Declaration of Jason D. Scott, # 3 Exhibit A to Scott Declaration)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Aviation Finance Group, LLC and against Defedants Duc housing partners, Inc and Daniel A Duc, jointly and severally, in the amount of $829,040.72 (plus interest in the amount of $165.70 for each day, if any, after 6/8/2010, through the date of this Judgment). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Damages filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC.(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Damages filed by Daniel A Duc, Duc Housing Partners, Inc. Replies due by 6/11/2010.(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Status Conference held on 5/4/2010. (Court Reporter/ESR Jamie Gearhart.) (so) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Damages Jason D Scott appearing for Plaintiff Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Damages)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing CHANGING TELEPHONE NUMBER TO CONTACT THE COURT: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/2010 03:30 PM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the call through a conference call operator, once all parties are on the line the Court to be connected at 208-334-1362.(so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/4/2010 02:30 PM before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Judge Larry M. Boyle will be holding Court in Coeur d'Alene on this date and therefore the time is 2:30 Pacific Time/3:30 Mountain Time. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the call through a conference call operator, once all parties are on the line the Court to be connected at 208-665-6832. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jerry Dunn filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC Second Supplemental Declaration of Jerry Dunn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B to Second Supplemental Declaration of Jerry Dunn)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/18/2010, Entered: None
REPLY re 49 Response(generic) filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC Reply to Defendants' Response to Notice of Stipulation to Facts for Purposes of Summary Judgment Only. (Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Plaintiffs shall file a reply to Defendants' Response re 47 on or before January 25, 2010. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (md)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 47 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Daniel A Duc, Duc Housing Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas J. Neff)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Defendants shall file any memorandum in response to Plaintiff's Notice of Stipulation to Facts for Purposes of Summary Judgment Only 47 on or before Wednesday, January 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (md)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Stipulation to Facts for Purposes of Summary Judgment Only filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Jerry Dunn, # 2 Exhibit A to Dunn Declaration)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2009 Motion taken Under Advisement re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. (Court Reporter/ESR Vicki Jones.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff filed Response to 42 Motion for Leave to File indicating non-opposition to the Motion. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting 42 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by md)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Replies due by 12/21/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mary K. (Kathy) Kingston, # 2 Exhibit A to Kingston Declaration)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: 31 Oral MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. (Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum of Law Samuel A Diddle appearing for Defendants Daniel A Duc, Duc Housing Partners, Inc. Responses due by 12/14/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 31 Oral MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing, 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2009 09:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (md)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (dks) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Motion for Summary Judgment 28 , and the Rule 56(f) Motion 31 shall be referred to United States District Judge William F. Downes, United States District Judge for the District of Wyoming, sitting by special designation. Additionally, these hearings shall be moved from Judge Winmill's calendar on November 25, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. to Judge Downes's calendar on Thursday, November 19, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. at the James A. McClure Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 31 Oral MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Replies due by 11/9/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason D. Scott)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ken Wilson)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc Notice of Service of Deposition Duces Tecum Notices of Aviation Finance Group, LLC and O'Gara Aviation Company (Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc Notice of Service of Discovery (Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 31 Oral MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing : Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2009 08:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
MOTION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing Samuel A Diddle appearing for Defendants Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. Responses due by 10/22/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Samuel A. Diddle)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. Replies due by 10/16/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Brief, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Duc, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of Daniel Duc)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2009 08:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment Jason D Scott appearing for Plaintiff Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Declaration of John B. Foster, III, # 4 Declaration of Jerry Dunn, # 5 Exhibits A-D to Dunn Declaration, # 6 Exhibits E-J to Dunn Declaration, # 7 Exhibit K to Dunn Declaration)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Aviation Securitization, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc re 26 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/15/2009. (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Duc Housing Partners, Inc.(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER- Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2009. ADR Plan to be filed by 8/31/2009. Discovery due by 11/6/2009. Motions due by 11/25/2009.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. (Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2009 03:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss or transfer; denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the hearing scheduled on the Motions to Dismiss 5 8 on May 5, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. The matter shall be decided on the briefs and record currently before the Court. The matter shall be decided by The Honorable Tena Campbell, Chief Judge, United States District Court for the District of Utah, sitting by special designation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue filed by Daniel A Duc.(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC.(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue filed by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. Replies due by 4/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Luci Johnson, # 2 Exhibits A-B to Declaration of Luci Johnson)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daniel A Duc. Replies due by 4/13/2009.(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The Stay placed in this matter on January 23, 2009 13 is hereby lifted. The briefing schedule shall be as follows: (1) Each side's response to the other's pending motion shall be filed by March 27, 2009; (2) Any replies shall be filed by April 13, 2009. A hearing on the Motions to Dismiss 5 8 shall be held on Tuesday, May 5, 2009 at 8:30 a.m. in the James A. McClure Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. The hearing shall be conducted by The Honorable Tena Campbell, Chief Judge, United States District Court for the District of Utah, sitting by special designation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the TIME of the Motion to Dismiss 5 , and the Motion to Remand to State Court 8 shall be changed from 8:00 a.m. to 8:30 a.m. The hearings shall be conducted on Tuesday, May 5, 2009 at the James A. McClure Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. Additionally, the hearings shall be conducted by The Honorable Tena Campbell, Chief Judge, United States District Court for the District of Utah, sitting by special designation. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue, 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for February 20, 2009 at 8:00am has been rescheduld for hearing on 5/5/2009 08:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 12 of the parties' for a brief Stay of the case. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED THAT this action is STAYED through March 16, 2009. The Stay allows the parties to work toward a settlement of the issues without incurring further costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT if a settlement is not reached by March 16, 2009, each side's response to the other's pending motion shall be filed by March 27, 2009. Any replies shall be filed by April 13, 2009. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION TO STAY by Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Aviation Securitization, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association, Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. (Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Aviation Finance Group, LLC. (Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - A status conference was conducted with the Court this date. The parties have agreed to an extension of time for filing a response to the Motion to Dismiss 5 filed December 19, 2009. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the response brief shall be filed January 23, 2009 and the reply brief shall be filed February 9, 2009. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2009 08:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Remand to State Court Jason D Scott appearing for Plaintiffs Aviation Finance Group, LLC, Aviation Securitization, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Responses due by 1/26/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, # 2 Declaration of Jerry Dunn, # 3 Exhibits A-D to Declaration of Jerry Dunn)(Scott, Jason)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue : Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2009 08:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue filed by Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, Motion for Change of Venue Samuel A Diddle appearing for Defendants Duc Housing Partners, Inc, Daniel A Duc. Responses due by 1/12/2009 (Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2009 02:00 PM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT TO Notice of Removal by Duc Housing Partners, Inc., Daniel A Duc (Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal from Fourth Judicial District - Ada County, case number cv 0820285.(Filing fee $350 receipt number 09760000000000422110.) (Diddle, Samuel) by Duc Housing Partners, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint and attachments, # 2 Exhibit B-Ntc of Removal )(Diddle, Samuel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET by all defendants Duc Housing Partners, Inc. and Daniel A. Duc
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 362 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?