Linda Farwell v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 13-1904

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 4, 2016 at 12:37 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:12-cv-03180-RWT.. [13-1904] (SAW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999291729] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45). Copies to all parties. [13-1904] (SAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
      RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Linda E. Farwell re: failure to file brief (FRAP 28). Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. [13-1904] (SAW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
        ORDER filed [999260654] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 1/8/2014, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/08/2014. Response brief due 02/11/2014. Copies to all parties. [13-1904] (SAW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999246121] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/4/2013, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/04/2013. Response brief due 01/07/2014 Copies to all parties.. [13-1904] (SAW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
            Supplemental TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Linda E. Farwell for Lisa Bankins. [13-1904] Douglas Gottron
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 11/19/2013. Response Brief due 12/23/2013 [13-1904] (SAW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                Docket correction requested from Mr. Douglas Neil Gottron for Linda E. Farwell. Re: [9] transcript order acknowledgement and failure to make satisfactory financial arrangements. Access to transcript order acknowledgement has been restricted to case participants. [13-1904] (CAD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER DEFICIENCY NOTICE by Lisa K. Bankins. Failure to make satisfactory financial arrangements. [13-1904] (CAD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                    Initial mediation conference scheduled. [13-1904] (SLW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee MTGLQ Investors, LP. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999170046] [13-1904] Christopher Corchiarino
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 193 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?