Mink v. Continental Airlines, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00174
District Judge William M. Skretny, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 12:31 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jonah Mink, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Ilyas Akbari +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 iakbari@baumhedlundlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Greaves +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 jgreaves@baumhedlundlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul J. Hedlund +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 phedlund@baumhedlundlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald L M Goldman +1 310 207 3233 +1 310 820 7444 rgoldman@baumhedlundlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rivette & Rivette, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis R. Rivette +1 315 478 1122 +1 315 461 1243 rrivette@rivette.us
No Logo Plaintiffs Liaison & Hugh M. Russ, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hodgson Russ LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh M. Russ, III +1 716 856 4000 +1 716 849 0349 hruss@hodgsonruss.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hagerty & Brady

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Brady +1 716 856 9443 +1 716 856 0511 mbrady@hagerty-brady.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Treece, Alfrey, Musat & Bosworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED L. Richard Musat +1 303 292 2700 +1 303 295 0414 lrmusat@tamlegal.com
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrance P. Flynn +1 716 200 5050 +1 716 200 5201 tflynn@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
TERMINATED: 09/29/2011 Tara Elizabeth Nicola +1 609 520 6028 +1 609 951 0824 tnicola@reedsmith.com
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Harrington +1 212 894 6780 +1 212 370 4453 dharrington@condonlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Segalla LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A. Goldberg +1 716 566 5400 +1 716 566 5401 ngoldberg@goldbergsegalla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/18/2009 Alan D. Reitzfeld +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010 alan.reitzfeld@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/18/2009 Christine Tramontano +1 212 513 3598 +1 212 385 9010 christine.tramontano@hklaw.com
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Bombardier Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Cross-Claimant
No Logo Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Cross-Claimant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (201) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 201 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 200 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
Sealed Document-Decision and Order Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 199 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
    Sealed Document-Attorney's Declaration in Support of Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 198 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
      Sealed Document-Application for Compromise Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(SG) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION for Settlement Approval by Jonah Mink.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(Akbari, A.) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/27/2011. Damage depositions of plaintiffs being conducted. Liability depositions ongoing. Settlements as to several cases being completed/considered. Proposed order to be submitted as to Motion to Compel on non-party County of Erie. ESI terms continue to be narrowed. Plaintiffs request oral argument on all outstanding motions. Court will schedule same if necessary. Counsel to confer as to briefing schedule on 668 Motion to Compel and advise Court. Court directs parties to continue to work expediously. Notice/Conflict issue discussed. CM/ECF errors to be reduced by contacting Suzanne Grunzweig with any and all questions. An additional status conference is scheduled for 7/13/2011 at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Justin Green. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS -- Relates to All Cases: GRANTING Plaintiffs' 643 Motion to Compel. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/2/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh M. Russ, III on behalf of Hugh M. Russ, III (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00619-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT JOINT MEMORANDUM by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 192 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 579 MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 4/22/2011 (SG). (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                      MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Pan v. Bombardier, Inc. 1:11-01474 in the Eastern District of New York shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None
                        Mediation Certification by Richard F. GriffinAssociated Cases: 1:10-cv-00034-WMS et al.(Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                          MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER directing that Kausner et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 3:11-00117 in the Middle District of Florida shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel 4/5/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: None
                            First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                              MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER adjusting the later-stage discovery deadlines. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 4/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                First MOTION to Compel Requested Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Sealed Legal Document 184 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
                                  Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                    REPLY/RESPONSE to re (56 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 44 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 31 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 111 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 137 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 120 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 49 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 437 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 58 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 51 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 121 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 119 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (114 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 126 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 110 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 579 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 154 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 152 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 66 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 153 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 144 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 101 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 170 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 133 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 91 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 107 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 71 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 86 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 128 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 82 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 165 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS) MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                                      TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is EXTENDED from April 15, 2011, to April 22, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Pamela Jones. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00981-WMS et al.(O'Grady, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                          REPLY/RESPONSE to re (77 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 135 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 74 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 47 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 114 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 30 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 61 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 122 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 103 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 123 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 91 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 52 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 69 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 486 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 71 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 124 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 54 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 140 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 36 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care filed by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                            ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. This Order is a duplicate of document 613 reentered in order to serve all parties.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/9/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' combined reply in further support of its 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and response to 579 Plaintiffs' Choice of Law cross motion is extended from March 11, 2011, to March 25, 2011. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, Defendants' memorandum shall not exceed 25 pages. FURTHER, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs' reply in further support of their 579 Choice of Law cross motion is extended from April 1, 2011, to April 15, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER AMENDING 3 Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.J. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES. Pursuant to the 608 Sitpulation of Dismissal, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, all crossclaims and third-party actions by defendants COLGAN AIR,INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. against defendants BOMBARDIER, INC. andBOMBARDIER AEROSPACE CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other, and all crossclaims and counterclaims by BOMBARDIER, INC. and BOMBARDIER AEROSPACECORP. against COLGAN AIR, INC. and PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. be and the same are hereby discontinued and dismissed on the merits, with prejudice and without costs or further recourse to the other. FURTHER, that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate said crossclaims, counterclaims and third-party actions. SO ORDERED. ISSUED by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/9/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER directing that Eckert v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00189 in the District of Connecticut, Mauer et al v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-00648 in the District of New Jersey, Korczykowski v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0791 in the Southern District of New York and Safran v. Bombardier, Inc. et al 11-0908 in the Eastern District of Pennsylvania shall be transferred under 28:1407 to the Western District of New York for the reasons stated in the Order of October 6, 2009.. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel on 3/2/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION re (71 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 41 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 90 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 48 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 85 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 134 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 108 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 116 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 118 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 393 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 46 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 55 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 88 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00619-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 117 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 115 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 77 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 80 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS) MDL Case Management Order Non-Party Discovery by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 2/9/2011. Court updated as to discovery, ESI (search terms), mediation. Outstanding motions discussed. Schedule set as to 579 Motion. Response due 3/11/2011. Reply due 4/1/2011. Request made as to advance notification of decision date on outstanding punitive damage motion. Bombardier will accept service as discussed. Court schedules further status conference for 4/27/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter, Jolene Lamphire, Jack W. Hunt & Associates, Inc.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, THAT upon consent of counsel, the deadline for Defendants' reply in further support of its 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from February 25, 2011, to March 11, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/16/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                              STATUS REPORT. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re (45 in 1:10-cv-00755-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  Sealed Document exhibit 18 (continuation of exhibits to item # 581) (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 19, # 2 exhibit 20, # 3 exhibit 21, # 4 exhibit 22, # 5 exhibit 23, # 6 exhibit 24, # 7 exhibit 25, # 8 exhibit 26, # 9 exhibit 27, # 10 exhibit 28, # 11 exhibit 29, # 12 exhibit 30, # 13 exhibit 31, # 14 exhibit 32, # 15 exhibit 33, # 16 exhibit 34 part 1, # 17 exhibit 34 part 2, # 18 exhibit 35, # 19 exhibit 36)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 exhibit 1, # 2 exhibit 2, # 3 exhibit 3, # 4 exhibit 4, # 5 exhibit 5, # 6 exhibit 6, # 7 exhibit 7, # 8 exhibit 8, # 9 exhibit 9, # 10 exhibit 10, # 11 exhibit 11, # 12 exhibit 12, # 13 exhibit 13, # 14 exhibit 14, # 15 exhibit 15, # 16 exhibit 16, # 17 exhibit 17)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(DZ) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TEXT ORDER RELATES to ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Plaintiffs' 578 Motion for Leave to File a Brief in Excess of 25 Pages is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/21/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION Choice of Law re (92 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages, (95 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS) MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Sealed Document. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION re (62 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS) First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER DENYING Defendants' 564 Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/14/2011. (155) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (123) in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (144) in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (143) in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (134) in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (115) in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (160) in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (117) in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (116) in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (142) in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (100) in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (104) in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (564) in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (107) in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (97) in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (114) in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (120) in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (91) in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (93) in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (81) in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (77) in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (76) in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (81) in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (72) in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS; (56) in case 1:10-cv-00619-WMS; (61) in case 1:10-cv-00755-WMS; (11) in case 1:10-cv-01007-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re (11 in 1:10-cv-01007-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Second Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: ALL CASES IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Plaintiffs shall file a response to 564 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Friday, January 14, 2011, at noon . This Court will file an Order in the afternoon of January 14, 2011, relative to the upcoming scheduled depositions. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/11/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re (564 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order Supplemental Affidavit of David J. Harrington by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Stay Discovery and for a Protective Order by Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TEXT ORDER RELATES TO: All cases IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that upon consent of counsel, the deadline for responses to 437 Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages and 486 Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care is extended from December 22, 2010, to January 21, 2011. The deadline for replies is extended from January 21, 2010, to February 25, 2011. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/16/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 12/9/2010. Decision and Order on outstanding Motions to Remand in five (5) cases to be filed Monday. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Settlement reached as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Stipulation to be filed. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence in January. Schedule set as to 437 486 Motions. Responses due 12/22/2011. Replies due 1/21/2011. Schedule to be worked out as to 501 528 by parties. Court schedules further status conference for 2/9/2011 at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Ken Nolan, Doug Latto, Warren Willinger, Justin Green, Dan Rose, Mike Krzak and James Kreindler appeared by telephone.) (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on Plaintiffs' 501 Motion to Compel. Relates to: All Cases. Response due by 1/14/2011. Reply due by 2/1/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/14/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Sealed Document-Exhibits 4-6 and 8 from 504 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 9 and 10 from 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Sealed Document-Exhibit 7 re 504 Continuation of Exhibits, re 502 Memorandum of Law and Exhibits 11 and 12 re 505 Continuation of Exhibits re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 149 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Sealed Document-Exhibit 4 re 501 Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Memorandum) by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [504-1]; [504-2]; [504-3]; [504-5]; [505-1]; [505-2]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 12/2/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TEXT ORDER IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court is directed to STRIKE the following documents from the docket: [501-5]; [501-6]; [501-7]; [501-9], [501-10], [501-11]; [504-4]; [505-3]; [505-4]. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel is directed to provide the Clerk of the Court hard copies of the above-referenced documents, as well as a disk containing.pdf versions of the documents, for filing under seal pursuant to the 3 Protective Order in this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 11/30/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments:All exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11 , # 4 Exhibit 12 )Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 to strike remaining exhibits(SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Hugh M. Russ, III re 502 Memorandum of Law (Attachments: All Exhibits have been struck # 1 Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit 5, # 3 Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit 7 , # 5 Exhibit 8)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title and terminated document as a motion on 11/29/2010 (SG). Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibit (SG). Modified on 12/7/2010 striking remainder of exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion to Compromise by Dana Hartman.Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00140-WMS et al.(Rose, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 501 Motion to Compel by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified document title on 11/29/2010 (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Compel Continental Airlines to Answer Interrogatories and to Produce Documents by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 STRUCK, # 6 Exhibit 5 STRUCK, # 7 Exhibit 6 STRUCK, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8 STRUCK, # 10 Exhibit 9 STRUCK, # 11 Exhibit 10 STRUCK, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) Modified on 12/1/2010 striking exhibits (SG). (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/6/10, before Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 10/6/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation/settlement. Agreement reached in principle as to contribution between Colgan and Bombardier to resolve 3rd party actions. Court updated as to discovery. Next round of depositions to commence 10/25/2010. Procedural issues resolved as to depositions. Parties working to resolve disputes as to interrogatories. Progress being made. Court to issue decision as to Protective Order as to Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Court to resolve remand motions. Issues relating to state court cases discussed. Parties to resolve concerns through stipulations. Defendants will be filing Choice of Law motion. Court schedules further status conference for 12/9/2010 at at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE UNEDITED COCKPIT VOICE RECORDER AUDIO RECORDING. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 486 Colgan's Motion for Application of a Federal Standard of Care. Responses due by 12/22/2010. Replies due by 1/21/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (Relates to: All Cases) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER on 437 Colgan's Motion for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages. Responses due by 12/10/2010. Replies due by 1/10/2011. Oral Argument will be scheduled by the Court if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 10/29/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for the Application of a Federal Standard of Care by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the CD-ROMs containing the downloaded audio files from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder that was provided to this Court for its in camera review shall be manually filed under seal; that Plaintiffs Joint Motion to Compel Production of Recording (Docket No. 286) is GRANTED; that counsel for all parties are directed to confer and submit to this Court by email an appropriate protective order, consistent with 49 U.S.C. § 1154 (a)(4), by Monday, October 25, 2010 and that following this Courts entry of the protective order, copies of the CD-ROMs containing the download from Continental Connection Flight 3407's cockpit voice recorder will be made available to the parties. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, United States District Court on 10/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Continental Airlines, Inc. re 131 Answer to Amended Complaint (Third) of Plaintiff Jonah Mink (Nicola, Tara) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Jonah Mink by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Nicola, Tara) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 125 Amended Complaint by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 126 Amended Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law on Punitive Damages by Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Supplement Addendum, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint by All Parties by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jonah Mink.(Goldman, Ronald) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jonah Mink.(Goldman, Ronald) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jonah Mink. Third Amended Complaint. (Goldman, Ronald) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. The 413 Stipulation in 1:09-md-2085 and 121 in 1:09-md-174S to File a Third Amended Complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Plaintiff Mink shall file the Third Amended Complaint within 7 days of this Order. Defendants shall file Answers or otherwise move within 20 days of the filing of the Third Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/20/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS (MEAL) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 121 Stipulation allowing plaintiff Mink to file third amended complaint (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION allowing plaintiff Mink to file third amended complaint by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION allowing plaintiff Mink to file third amended complaint by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants shall file a response to the Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jonah Mink (Docket No. 117 in 09-CV-174; Docket No. 370 in 09-md-2085) on or before September 24, 2010. Plaintiff Jonah Mink may file a reply, if any, by October 1, 2010. The motion will be taken under advisement without oral argument. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 9/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(MEAL) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (Third Amended Complaint) by Jonah Mink. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Akbari, A.) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER regarding the filing of motions to compromise under seal. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER setting deadlines for later-stage discovery and trial. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 8/19/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 7/8/2010. Counsel update Court on mediation. One action has settled. Mediation continues in all other cases. Sealing of settlement papers discussed. Court reiterates importance of confidentiality in the mediation process. Attorney Harrington advises that Defendants may be filing Choice of Law motion. Court advises that it issued an Order granting in camera review of the Cockpit Voice Recorder recording. Protocol for downloading the recording discussed. Counsel to agree on procedure and provide Court with proposed Order. Court advises it will extend deadline for providing recording by 30 days. Court advises that it will issue separate order if oral argument is needed on Motions to Remand. Counsel update Court on progress of discovery, including ESI. Counsel advise that they are unable to agree on discovery schedule. Court hears limited argument and advises it will issue Scheduling Order. Court schedules further status conference for October 6, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Douglas A. Latto. For defts. - David Harrington, Neil Goldberg, Richard Musat, Michael Brady.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING AGREED PROTOCOL FOR TRANSMISSION OF THECVR RECORDER AND DFDR RECORDER AND FOR DOWNLOAD OF THE CVR RECORDING FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to provide a copy of the unedited cockpit voice recorder under seal to the Court for in camera review. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 7/7/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant/Cross-Claimant Colgan Air, Inc.'s ANSWER to 108 Answer to Crossclaim, Counterclaim of Bombardier by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Mediation Certification by Mary HelenbrookAssociated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS(SG) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 103 Crossclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against Colgan Air, Inc. by Bombardier, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REGARDING THE DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI). Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 5/18/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief of up to 15 pages in length. Signed by William M. Skretny on 5/10/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY/RESPONSE to re (18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Reply in Further Support of Motion to Compel CVR filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 4a, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4b, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY/RESPONSE to re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSSCLAIM against Bombardier, Inc., filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Defendants Colgan Air, Inc., and Pinnacle Airlines Corp.'s oral request for a conference with the Court and Defendants to discuss mediation is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 5/1/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel, (47 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 89 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 87 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 28 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 97 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 34 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 46 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 26 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 95 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 51 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 60 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 66 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 68 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 79 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 104 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 294 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 21 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 96 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 33 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS) MOTION for Joinder Opposition to Plaintiffs' Committee's Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Tape filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/13/10, before Chief Judge Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 4/13/2010. Court APPROVES parties' joint proposed briefing schedule relating to Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder: Response due April 23, 2010; Replies due May 10, 2010. Court instructs counsel to make return dates for future motions "at a date and time to be set by the court," and that the Court will then issue an order setting the briefing schedule. There being no objection, court APPROVES Defendant Bombardier's proposed modification to the confidentiality designation it will use on documents to account for certain technical limitations. Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request to make a single, joint presentation to mediators on liability and punitive damages. Court extends the deadline for submission of mediation memos from April 19 to May 3, 2010. Counsel reports that the first mediation is scheduled for May 18, 2010. Court rules that mediation sessions may take place outside the courthouse only if all parties agree to an alternate location. Court strongly encourages counsel to agree on mutually agreeable schedule for depositions. Court and counsel agree that an informal conference regarding the proposed ESI order will facilitate reaching a final order. Informal meeting scheduled for April 21, 2010, at 10 a.m. between counsel and the Court's law clerk and IT representative. Court sets a further status conference for July 8, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the Bombardier Defendants' 294 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED. The Bombardier Defendants are deemed to have joined Plaintiffs' 286 Motion to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. (95) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (76) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00266-WMS; (79) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00267-WMS; (97) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00294-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00379-WMS; (96) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00378-WMS; (66) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00423-WMS; (87) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00424-WMS; (65) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00436-WMS; (67) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00432-WMS; (104) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00440-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00488-WMS; (70) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00487-WMS; (89) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00514-WMS; (47) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00632-WMS; (53) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00727-WMS; (57) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00769-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS; (51) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (294) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (60) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00961-WMS; (50) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00977-WMS; (68) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00978-WMS; (73) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00981-WMS; (42) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00979-WMS; (43) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-00980-WMS; (33) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01043-WMS; (48) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01039-WMS; (45) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01040-WMS; (46) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01041-WMS; (44) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01042-WMS; (41) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01087-WMS; (31) Motion for Joinder in case 1:09-cv-01118-WMS; (28) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00003-WMS; (34) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00034-WMS; (26) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00078-WMS; (21) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00140-WMS; (18) Motion for Joinder in case 1:10-cv-00194-WMS Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (MEAL) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, the deadline for completion of the initial mediation session set forth in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to June 30, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 4/5/2010. (39 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 59 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 35 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 83 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 37 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 31 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 26 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 81 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 55 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 82 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 72 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 6 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 56 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 53 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 21 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 16 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 52 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder in Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of the Cockpit Voice Recorder Recording by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Musat, L.) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS) MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder byHugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION signed by Michael S. Krzak, Esq. re (23 in 1:10-cv-00078-WMS, 94 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 84 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 29 in 1:10-cv-00034-WMS, 48 in 1:09-cv-00929-WMS, 63 in 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 70 in 1:09-cv-00981-WMS, 62 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-01087-WMS, 23 in 1:10-cv-00003-WMS, 39 in 1:09-cv-00979-WMS, 100 in 1:09-cv-00440-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS, 43 in 1:09-cv-01041-WMS, 18 in 1:10-cv-00140-WMS, 15 in 1:10-cv-00194-WMS, 64 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 40 in 1:09-cv-00980-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00488-WMS, 73 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 65 in 1:09-cv-00978-WMS, 47 in 1:09-cv-00977-WMS, 28 in 1:09-cv-01118-WMS, 41 in 1:09-cv-01042-WMS, 45 in 1:09-cv-01039-WMS, 57 in 1:09-cv-00961-WMS, 50 in 1:09-cv-00727-WMS, 30 in 1:09-cv-01043-WMS, 92 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 38 in 1:09-cv-00825-WMS, 54 in 1:09-cv-00769-WMS, 76 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 44 in 1:09-cv-00632-WMS, 67 in 1:09-cv-00487-WMS, 93 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 86 in 1:09-cv-00514-WMS, 42 in 1:09-cv-01040-WMS, 286 in 1:09-md-02085-WMS) MOTION to Compel filed by Hugh M. Russ, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Compel Production of Cockpit Voice Recorder by Hugh M. Russ, III.Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING the Bombardier Defendants' 275 Motion to Amend. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/23/2010. Associated Cases: (275) 1:09-md-02085-WMS; (90) 1:09-cv-00174; (71) 1:09-cv-00266; (74) 1:09-cv-00267; (92) 1:09-cv-00294; (91) 1:09-cv-00379; (91) 1:09-cv-00378; (82) 1:09-cv-00424; (94) 1:09-cv-00440; (65) 1:09-cv-00488; (65) 1:09-cv-00487; (82) 1:09-cv-00514; (48) 1:09-cv-00727; (52) 1:09-cv-00769; (36) 1:09-cv-00825; (46) 1:09-cv-00929; (68) 1:09-cv-00981; (27) 1:10-cv-00034; (16) 1:10-cv-00140; (12) 1:10-cv-00194. (MEAL) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION modification of Court Order to allow separate Confidential Mediation Memoranda by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp..Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT the deadline for submission of the Confidential Mediation Memorandum required in this Court's 185 ADR Order is extended to April 19, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 3/15/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. Relates to: ALL CASES.(MEAL) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Hugh M. Russ, III. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00267-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Designation of Mary M. Helenbrook as Mediator in this case.. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 3/3/10. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS, 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 1:09-cv-00423-WMS, 1:09-cv-00727-WMS(SG) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Selection of Mediators by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Margaret Eckert, Colgan Air, Inc., Rana Beth Lang, John Lang, Rana Lang, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Pamela Jones, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Kathleen Johnston, FlightSafety, Inc., Tina Siniscalco, Cheryl Borner, FlightSafety International Inc., Justine M. Krasuski, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Karen F. Wielinski, Veneita Reid, Lawrence Korczykowski, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Andy Harel, Michael Monachino, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson, Robert R. Perry, Scott A. Maurer, Theresa A. Maurer, Howard R. Pettys, Dana Hartman, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT, by agreement of counsel, the deadline for submission of the ESI Plan or Motion for Entry of ESI Plan is March 15, 2010. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 2/11/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al. (ALL)(MEAL) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny, Chief Judge: Status Conference held on 1/27/2010. Court construes Defendant FlightSafety, Inc.s 174 Motion for Relief from Application of Initial CMO as Motion to Stay, without prejudice. Motions to Stay 174 179 200 granted from the Bench with no objection or opposition. Stay of the CMO is in effect until Motions to Remand are resolved and stay applies only to cases 09-CV-1039, 1040, 1041, 1042, 1087. Court schedules briefing on 191 207 Motions to Remand, with Defendants Joint Response due by February 22, 2010, and Plaintiffs Replies due by March 8, 2010. Oral argument will be scheduled by separate Order, if necessary. Court extends deadline for submission of ESI Plan or Motion for the Court to Enter an ESI Plan, to February 12, 2010. ESI issues discussed. Court acknowledges that deadlines in CMO may need to be adjusted for later-filed cases. Plaintiffs Committee stipulates that it represents ground claimants. Both sides acknowledge that they will make best efforts at rolling discovery. Court introduces four appointed mediators and interview proceedings take place. Court schedules additional status conference for April 13, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. For the pltfs. - Hugh Russ, Phillip Rimmler. For defts. - David Harrington, Richard Musat, Michael Brady. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED THAT Defendant Bombardier's (32) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED. Further, that this admission extends to each of the current and future individual actions filed in this multi-district litigation. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge U.S.D.C. on 1/26/2010. (32) in case 1:09-cv-00174-WMS; (17) in case 1:09-cv-00825-WMS;(28) in case 1:09-cv-00929-WMS; (MEAL) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Robert R. Perry, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Xiaojun Pan, John Lang, Rana Lang, Margaret Eckert, Pamela Jones, Jeanie Bryson, Gurly Niewood, Marilyn A. Marzolf, Justine M. Krasuski, Cheryl Borner, Tina Siniscalco, Kathleen Johnston, Karen F. Wielinski, Lawrence Korczykowski, Andy Harel, Lisa Richardson, Dylan Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR ORDER. Signed by William M. Skretny, Chief Judge, U.S.D.C. on 1/4/2010. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kathleen Johnston. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-01042-WMS et al.(Martoche, Amy) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended (#37) by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 76 Answer to Complaint (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Bombardier, Inc..(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER AMENDING 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re Admission of Attorneys, Appearances and Local Counsel Requirement. Signed by William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. on 12/2/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 11/18/2009. Court denies pending Motions to Consolidate in each individual case as MOOT in light of the MultiDistrict Litigation Panels Order, with no objections. Court directs counsel to meet and confer on submission for Court's consideration regarding a possible amendment of the Case Management Order concerning attorney admission. Counsel reports that the case is progressing and that they are adhering to the deadlines in the Case Management Order. Counsel agree to discuss and attempt to agree on completing several "paperless" depositions before the next status conference. Attorney Musat advises court that additional NTSB proceedings are scheduled for mid-February 2010. Attorney Harrington advises that one case is close to settling and others are being discussed. Court advises counsel that it is working on a Mediation Order that will issue soon. Counsel discuss their respective positions on mediation. Court sets additional status conference for January 27, 2010, at 11:30 a.m. before William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. For plaintiffs, Paul Perlman, James Kreindler. For defendants, David Harrington, Richard Musat. (Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(MEAL) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner, James M. Zuffoletto, Ping Wang, John G. Roberts, Jr, Carole Ann Roberts, Ashley Johnson, Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Xiaojun Pan, Colgan Air, Inc., Air Crash Near Clarence Center, New York, On February 12, 2009, Bombardier, Inc., Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Linda L. Davidson, Deceased), Carrie C. Davidson(as Administrator of the Estate of Ronald D. Davidson, Deceased), Jonah Mink, Karen A. Kuklewicz, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Michael Monachino, Robert R. Perry, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 11/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Hon. William M. Skretny on 11/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 10/6/09. Associated Cases: 1:09-md-02085-WMS et al.(SG) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J.: Status Conference held on 9/9/2009. Court advises that it has Motions to Consolidate under advisement. Arguments before the Multi-District Litigation Panel scheduled for September 24, 2009; decision expected in early November. Plaintiffs report being close to retaining court-reporting service and litigation consultants. Parties continuing to work through proposed case management and protective orders. Counsel to provide Court with additional submissions to assist in streamlining objections. Court to issue order if oral argument is required. Plaintiffs have served Rule 26 letter and want Rule 26(f) conference. Defendants oppose Rule 26(f) conference at this stage. Court defers issue of Rule 26(f) conference until after case management and protective orders are finalized. Counsel report still discussing mediation issues. Court approves Plaintiffs proposed counsel organization plan. Attorney Harrington is lead defense counsel. Counsel inquire about filing procedures for the multiple cases. Court directs counsel to work with Courtroom Deputy on resolving filing issues. Court advises that Defendants obligation to file Answers is STAYED, pending final resolution of the case management and protective orders, with an Order to follow. An additional status conference is scheduled for 11/18/2009 at 12:00 noon before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. For plaintiffs, Hugh Russ, Michael Krzak. For defendants, David Harrington.(Court Reporter Michelle McLaughlin.) (MEAL) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. Letter attaching redline CMO and PO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CMO Redline, # 2 Exhibit PO Redline)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Case Management Order filed by Defendants Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/14/09, before Judge William M. Skretny. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle McLaughlin, Telephone number (716) 332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2009. (DZ) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Proposed Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information filed by Defendants Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 63 Status Report by Defendants (Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Defendants by Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. The Notice for Substitution of Attorney for Defendants Colgan Air, Inc. and Pinnacle Airlines, Corp. is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 8/25/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Patrick Flynnh on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Flynnh, Terrance) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER. The 55 Stipulation extending Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Time to Answer or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is HEREBY APPROVED. Time is extended to 9/23/2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 8/17/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT OF DEFENDANTS by Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Aerospace Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT of Plaintiffs by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel, Lynn Kushner, Julius Kushner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. of Substitution of Attorney for Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Continental Airlines, Inc.'s Time to Answer the Complaint by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. The 51 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Bombardier, Inc. is HEREBY APPROVED. Time is extended to and including 9/23/2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 8/7/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the status conference scheduled for September 3, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. is ADJOURNED to September 9, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. FURTHER, that the August 14, 2009 deadline for the submissions discussed at the July 14, 2009 status conference is EXTENDED to August 21, 2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 7/30/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 51 Stipulation AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) Text Modified on 8/6/2009 (DZ). (Entered: 08/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J: Status Conference held on 7/14/2009. Multidistrict panel will not hear argument on 7/30/2009. The following submissions are due by 8/14/2009: Proposed Case Management Order, Proposed Discovery Plan, Proposed Mediation Plan, Proposed Protective Order, Plaintiff's recommendation as to structual organization. An additional Status Conference is scheduled for 9/3/2009 at 2:00 PM before William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. For the pltfs. - James Kreindler, Hugh Russ. For the defts. - L. Richard Muszek, Michael Brady, David Harrington, Neil Goldberg. ATTACHMENT: Attorney Sign in Sheet. (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ORDER. The 47 Stipulation extending the time for Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc. to answer or otherwise move with respect to the Second Amended Complaint is HEREBY APPROVED. Time is extended to 8/14/2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 7/22/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint until 9/15/09 by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc.. (Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Continental's Time to Answer or Otherwise Move with Respect to the Second Amended Complaint to August 14, 2009 by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ORDER. The 39 Stipulation extending Defendant Bombardier, Inc.'s time to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint is HEREBY APPROVED. Time is extended to and including 8/14/2009. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 7/10/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. re 43 Status Report,, (Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. re 42 Reply to Response to Motion, 41 Declaration,, (Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Joint Status Memo by Jonah Mink, Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Jennifer West, Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Robin Tolsma, Continental Airlines, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corp., James L. Neill, Bombardier, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Carrie C. Davidson, Bombardier Aerospace Corp., Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION signed by David J. Harrington re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. in Reply to the Motion to Consolidate filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Errata 1)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc., re 39 Stipulation extending date to answer (Brady, Michael) Modified filers on 7/9/2009 (SG). (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION extending date to answer by Bombardier, Inc., (Brady, Michael) Modified filers on 7/9/2009 (SG). (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION signed by Hugh M. Russ, III re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel filed by Jonah Mink, Jennifer West, Robin Tolsma, James L. Neill, Carrie C. Davidson, Carrie C. Davidson, Dianne Mossop, Veneita Reid, Michael Monachino, Kelly C. Ries, Shawn Ries, Paul Beiter, Michele Beiter, Howard R. Pettys, Ann M. Danowski, Kara Beutel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Russ, Hugh) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jonah Mink. SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER. The 27 28 29 30 31 Stipulation: Consent for Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint is HEREBY SO ORDERED. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file his Second Amended Complaint within 10 days. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 6/18/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER. A status conference has been scheduled before this Court for July 14, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the Motion to Consolidate that has been filed in several of these actions. Plaintiffs shall file their responses by July 2, 2009. Any replies must be filed by July 9, 2009. General case management issues will also be discussed at the conference. Counsel shall confer and file a single Joint Status Memo by July 9, 2009, not to exceed 10 pages, that identifies and summarizes the issues counsel would like to address at the July 14 status conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, U.S.D.J. on 6/18/09. (JDK) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 33 Stipulation (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION extending date to answer by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ORDER. IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of L. Richard Musat is GRANTED, subject to payment of the requisite fee. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny U.S.D.J. on 6/9/2009. (MEAL) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to file second amended complaint by Jonah Mink. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to file second amend complaint - PINNACLE AIRLINES CORP. by Jonah Mink. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to file second amend complaint - CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC. by Jonah Mink. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION to file second amend complaint, COLGAN AIR, INC. by Jonah Mink. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to file second amend complaint by Jonah Mink. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc. re 25 First MOTION for Limited Admission of L. Richard Musat, Esq. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Limited Admission of L. Richard Musat, Esq. by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of Pro Hac petition, # 2 Affidavit of pro hac applicant L. Richar Musat, # 3 attorney oath, # 4 Atty's civility oath)(Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonah Mink. Continental Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonah Mink. Pinnacle Airlines Corp. waiver sent on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonah Mink. Colgan Air, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2009, answer due 7/20/2009. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonah Mink. Bombardier, Inc. waiver sent on 5/27/2009, answer due 7/27/2009. (Greaves, John) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation re 19 Response in Support of Motion to consolidate (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bombardier, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bombardier, Inc.. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Brady on behalf of Bombardier, Inc. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION signed by David J. Harrington re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp. filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-11)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re (11 in 1:09-cv-00424-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00266-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00436-WMS, 19 in 1:09-cv-00294-WMS, 11 in 1:09-cv-00267-WMS, 14 in 1:09-cv-00174-WMS, 13 in 1:09-cv-00432-WMS, 18 in 1:09-cv-00379-WMS, 17 in 1:09-cv-00378-WMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Colgan Air, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00174-WMS et al.(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Alan David Reitzfeld on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. (Reitzfeld, Alan) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Tramontano on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tramontano, Christine) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Airlines Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle Airlines Corp. for Colgan Air, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Harrington on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Harrington, David) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Continental Airlines, Inc. re 5 Notice of Appearance (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Neil A. Goldberg on behalf of Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc. (Goldberg, Neil) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver K. Beiersdorf on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bombardier, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., filed by Jonah Mink.(Greaves, John) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L.M. Goldman on behalf of Jonah Mink (Goldman, Ronald) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Greaves on behalf of Jonah Mink (Greaves, John) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Continental Airlines, Inc., Pinnacle Airlines Corp., Colgan Air, Inc., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 11471.), filed by Jonah Mink; Jury Trial Demanded.(DZ) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 330 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?