Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC v. Netgear Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01865
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2017 at 7:07 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney And Daniels

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Devlin +1 302 300 4626 tdevlin@farneydaniels.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Renee Wood +1 512 582 2824 +1 512 582 2829 swood@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stamatios Stamoulis +1 302 999 1540 +1 302 762 1688 stamoulis@swdelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Charles Weinblatt +1 302 999 1540 weinblatt@swdelaw.com
NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
NetGear, Inc. NetGear, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 657 4900 +1 302 657 4901 basmyth@duanemorris.com
No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 5,912,895; US 6,327,264 B1; US 6,587,473 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment)(nms) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Final Judgment of Non-Infringement Due To Collateral Estoppel (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/20/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01856-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
      PROPOSED Stipulated Final Judgment, by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 3/20/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
        STIPULATION For Entry of Final Judgment of Non-Infringement Due to Collateral Estoppel, by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 3/20/2015 (nms). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 2/18/2015 (nms). (Entered: 02/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Notice of Service of Subpoenas filed by Belkin International Inc., Aruba Networks Inc., Netgear Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Renck, Richard) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Timothy Devlin as co-counsel. Reason for request: Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, will continue to be represented by Stamatios Stamoulis and Richard C. Weinblatt, both members of the Bar of this Court, as well as Jonathan Baker, Michael Saunders, and Gurtej Singh of Farney Daniels, P.C.. (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 11/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Netgear Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Richard L. Renck. Attorney Gary W. Lipkin terminated. (Renck, Richard) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Initial Invalidity Contentions and Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art filed by Netgear Inc..(Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Infringement Contentions filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Stephanie Wood, by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard) Modified on 9/19/2014 (nms). (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/20/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01856-RGA et al.(ksr, ) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                          Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Timothy Devlin regarding Proposed Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME For the Parties to Produce Core Technical Documents, and Plaintiff to Serve its Initial Infringement Contentions and Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims to August 20, 2104 (Core Technical Documents), September 19, 2014 (Initial Infringement Contentions) - filed by Netgear Inc.. (Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed Protective Order to 08/15/2014 - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 8/11/2014 (nms). (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                                FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Netgear Inc.. (nms) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER Granting 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A First Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2014. (nms) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A First Amended Answer - filed by Netgear Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B - Redline)(Lipkin, Gary) Modified on 8/8/2014 (nms). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/8/2014) (nms). (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: On or before August 26, 2014, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the Order. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/5/14. (cak) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit a proposed Protective Order to 08/11/2014 - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 7/28/2014 (nms). (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Identification of Accused Products filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC.(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File proposed Protective Order to be extended to July 28, 2014 - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 7/14/2014 (nms). Modified on 7/14/2014 (nms). (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC.(Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/5/2014 at 10:00 AM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/24/14. (cak) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 8/8/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2014. Fact Discovery due by 1/26/2016. A Trial Setting Conference is set for 7/15/2016, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2016. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 6/30/2015. A Markman Hearing is set for 8/18/2015, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/20/2017, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 1/30/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 2/21/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 3/13/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Jury Trial is set for 4/3/2017, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01856-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                    PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 6/13/2014 (nms). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 05-22-14 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2014. (lad) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                        PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Devlin, Timothy) Modified on 5/21/2014 (nms). (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard C. Kim, L. Norwood Jameson, Matthew S. Yungwirth and Jeffrey S. Pollack - filed by Netgear Inc.. (Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/22/2014, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/19/2014. (nms) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Netgear Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Gary William Lipkin. Attorney Benjamin A. Smyth terminated. (Lipkin, Gary) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Devlin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Devlin, Timothy) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gurtej Singh and Michael Saunders of Farney Daniels PC - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate FMR LLC, Other Affiliate Royce and Associates LLC for Netgear Inc. filed by Netgear Inc.. (Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC by Netgear Inc..(Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer complaint to January 13, 2014 - filed by Netgear Inc.. (Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan Baker and Stephanie R. Wood - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance Jonathan Baker, # 2 Certificate of Compliance Stephanie Wood)(Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. Netgear Inc. served on 11/20/2013, answer due 12/11/2013. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (els) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 5,912,895; US 6,327,264 B1; US 6,587,473 B2;. (els) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Netgear Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1402370.) - filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?