AL ODAH v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01420
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 1:22 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by LEWIS BAACH PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Leslie Lewis +1 202 833 8900 +1 202 466 5738 eric.lewis@lewisbaach.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
President of the United States Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHARLES T. HAGEL, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHUCK HAGEL, Respondent
No Logo RICHARD W. BUTLER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Rear Admiral, Commander, Joint Task Force Guantanamo, U.S. Southern Command Guantanamo Bay Naval Base, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy Burke Walthall +1 202 305 0692 +1 202 305 2685 timothy.walthall@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 463 - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None USCA Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 33 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH ; ORDERED that the motion be granted and that this appeal be dismissed as moot in light of appellant's transfer from the United States Naval Base at Guantanamo Bay, Cuba. USCA Case Number 14-5233. (md, ) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Supplemental Filing by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 23 Memorandum in Opposition,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X, # 2 Exhibit Y, # 3 Exhibit Z, # 4 Exhibit AA, # 5 Exhibit BB, # 6 Exhibit CC)(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHARLES T. HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to reply: Reply due by 2/28/2014. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/11/14. (dot ) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Burke Walthall on behalf of All Defendants (Walthall, Timothy) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Governments Reply by RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHARLES T. HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                            REPLY re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. (See Docket Entry 23 to view document). (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                              Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Response to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's Response to Plaintiff's Petition by RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Julia A. Berman on behalf of RICHARD W. BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (11) Issued as to RICHARD W BUTLER, CHUCK HAGEL, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Requesting Government's Response to Plaintiff's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Declaratory Judgment by no later than October 23, 2013. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 23, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                              REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o USAO by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA c/o DOJ by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE BARACK OBAMA by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                    REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE BARACK OBAMA c/o USAO by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                      REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE BARACK OBAMA c/o DOJ by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                        REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE CHUCK HAGEL by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE CHUCK HAGEL c/o USAO by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                            REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE CHUCK HAGEL c/o DOJ by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                              REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE REAR ADMIRAL RICHARD W. BUTLER by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE REAR ADMIRAL RICHARD W. BUTLER c/o USAO by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE REAR ADMIRAL RICHARD W. BUTLER by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH re 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Related document: 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH.(Lewis, Eric) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER Establishing Procedures for Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, Signed on September 19, 2013. (SM) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Case related to Case No. 02-828. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....COMPLAINT PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DECLARATORY JUDGMENT by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH filed by FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH AL ODAH. Filing Fee: $5.00 Paid, Receipt No. 4616059430 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Counsel/Party NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF RELATED CIVIL CASE)(Lewis, Eric) Modified on 9/19/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?