District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Virginia Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

King et al v. Sebelius et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00630-JRS
District Judge James R. Spencer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 12:17 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Brenda Levy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Berry +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 jberry@jonesday.com
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
Space Walter D Kelley, Jr. +1 202 879 3763 +1 202 879 3763 wdkelley@jonesday.com
Space Jacob Moshe Roth +1 202 879 7658 +1 202 626 1700 yroth@jonesday.com
No Logo David King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Andrew Berry +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 jberry@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter D Kelley, Jr. +1 202 879 3763 +1 202 879 3763 wdkelley@jonesday.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob Moshe Roth +1 202 879 7658 +1 202 626 1700 yroth@jonesday.com
No Logo Douglas Hurst, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Berry +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 jberry@jonesday.com
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
Space Walter D Kelley, Jr. +1 202 879 3763 +1 202 879 3763 wdkelley@jonesday.com
Space Jacob Moshe Roth +1 202 879 7658 +1 202 626 1700 yroth@jonesday.com
No Logo Rose Luck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Berry +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 jberry@jonesday.com
Space Michael A Carvin +1 202 879 7643 +1 202 626 1700 macarvin@jonesday.com
Space Walter D Kelley, Jr. +1 202 879 3763 +1 202 879 3763 wdkelley@jonesday.com
Space Jacob Moshe Roth +1 202 879 7658 +1 202 626 1700 yroth@jonesday.com
v.
No Logo Daniel Werfel, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jacob J Lew, Defendant
Officially listed as "Jacob Lew"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Koskinen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kathleen Sebelius, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Holland Hambrick +1 804 819 5400 jay.h.hambrick@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Catherine Wu +1 804 819 5400 elizabeth.c.wu@usdoj.gov
No Logo American Hospital Association, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Lynn Ellsworth +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 JLEllsworth@hhlaw.com
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Earle Duncan Getchell, Jr. +1 804 775 4219 +6982 698 698 2061 dgetchell@mcguirewoods.com
No Logo Families Usa, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen Elizabeth Ittig +1 703 720 7035 +1 703 720 7399 Kristen.Ittig@aporter.com
No Logo Jonathan H. Adler, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Wendell DeLaquil +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mdelaquil@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Michael F. Cannon, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Wendell DeLaquil +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mdelaquil@bakerlaw.com
No Logo American Hospital Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Lynn Ellsworth +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 JLEllsworth@hhlaw.com
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Virginia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Earle Duncan Getchell, Jr. +1 804 786 2436 +1 804 371 0200 dgetchell@oag.state.va.us
No Logo Families Usa, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristen Elizabeth Ittig +1 703 720 7035 +1 703 720 7399 Kristen.Ittig@aporter.com
No Logo Jonathan H. Adler, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Wendell DeLaquil +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 mdelaquil@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Michael F. Cannon, Amicus Curiae
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Office Richmond
Filed 9/16/2013
Jury Demand None
Demand
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Spotsylvania
Terminated 2/18/2014
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 14-114[Supreme Court of the United States], 14-1158[United States Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (65) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Appeal Remark
US Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit Transmittal Sheet and Record forwarded to the Supreme Court of the United States re [54] Notice of Appeal : (jgra, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: 1/6/2015 Appeal Remark
    Supreme Court of the United States notice requesting the US Court of Appeals and US District Court records be transmittal to there office re [54] Notice of Appeal : (jgra, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Appeal Remark
      Transmitted by email to Elizabeth Brown, US Supreme Court the District Court docket sheet and electronic file re [61] Appeal Remark : (jgra, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 USCA Order
        ORDER of USCA, GRANTED motion for Clint A. Carpenter to withdraw from further representation on appeal as to [54] Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King (jgra, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Appeal Remark
          USCA received notice from the Supreme Court of the Unites States GRANTING the petition for a writ of certiorari re [54] Notice of Appeal : (jgra, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: 9/15/2014 USCA Mandate
            USCA Mandate re [54] Notice of Appeal : The judgment of this court, entered 7/22/2014, takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lbre, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 USCA Judgment
              USCA JUDGMENT, AFFIRMED judgment of the district court as to [54] Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King (jgra, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 USCA Opinion
                Opinion of USCA, AFFIRMED the judgment of the district court re [54] Notice of Appeal attached copy of judgment will not take effect until issuance of the mandate. (jgra, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  USCA Case Number
                  USCA Case Number 14-1158, Jeffrey Neal, case manager for [54] Notice of Appeal filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King. (jgra, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA
                    Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [54] Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lbre, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Notice of Appeal
                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [53] Order, by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0422-3856504. (Berry, Jonathan) Modified text on 2/19/2014 (tdai, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                        ORDER that this matter is before the Court on a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants; the Motion to Dismiss [30] is GRANTED; all remaining motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 2/18/14. (jtho, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 52 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 2/18/14. (jtho, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Opposition
                            Opposition to [50] MOTION to Strike [49] NOTICE filed by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion to Strike
                              MOTION to Strike [49] NOTICE by Internal Revenue Service, John Koskinen, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury. (Wu, Elizabeth)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Notice
                                NOTICE by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck of Related Filing (Attachments: # (1) Halbig v. Sebelius appellants' brief)(Berry, Jonathan)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Notice
                                  NOTICE of Substitution of Party by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel (Wu, Elizabeth) Modified to correct text on 2/5/2014 (tdai, ).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: 1/28/2014 Notice
                                    NOTICE by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Halbig v. Sebelius motion to expedite, # (2) D.C. Circuit expedited scheduling order)(Berry, Jonathan)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: 1/15/2014 Notice
                                      NOTICE by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Opinion in Halbig, et al., v. Sebelius, et al.)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Notice
                                        NOTICE by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck re [30] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Opinion in Carter v. Welles-Bowen Realty, Inc. (6th Cir. Nov. 27, 2013))(Berry, Jonathan)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Reply
                                          Reply in Support of Defendants' [30] Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Wu, Elizabeth). Modified docket entry on 12/06/2013. (walk, ).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: 12/3/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [39] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Memorandum. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/3/13. (tdai, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Memorandum
                                              Memorandum Amicus in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Order Granting Motion to File)(Getchell, Earle)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [38] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Memorandum. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 12/2/13. (tdai, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Opposition
                                                  Opposition to [30] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment , REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013, Terminated: 12/3/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Jonathan H. Adler, Michael F. Cannon. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amicus Brief)(DeLaquil, Mark)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013, Terminated: 12/2/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Memorandum by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amicus)(Getchell, Earle)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Notice
                                                        NOTICE by American Hospital Association Of Filing Memorandum As Amicus Curiae (Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Notice
                                                          NOTICE by Families USA Of Filing Memorandum As Amici Curiae (Ittig, Kristen)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [32] Motion for Leave to File memorandum as amici curiae; the parties are directed to file the amicus curiae memorandum of Families USA. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/20/13. (jtho, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [29] Motion for Leave to File memorandum as amici curiae; the parties are directed to file the amicus curiae memorandum of the American Hospital Association. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/20/13. (jtho, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Order on Motion for Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER denying [6] Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/20/13. (jtho, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Families USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Ittig, Kristen)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Memorandum in Support
                                                                    Memorandum in Support re [30] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by American Hospital Association. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # (2) Exhibit Local Civil Rule 7.1 Statement, # (3) Proposed Order)(Ellsworth, Jessica)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER re [27] Stipulation for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Defendants may file a brief in support of their cross motion for summary judgment, combined with their opposition to Plaintiffs' pending motion for summary judgment, not to exceed 40 pages. Plaintiffs may also file a brief in opposition to Defendants' cross motion for summary judgment, combined with their reply in support of their summary judgment motion, not to exceed 40 pages. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/14/13. (tdai, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER that the Defendants shall file a cross-motion for summary judgment, combined with their opposition to the Plaintiffs pending motion for summary judgment, by November 18, 2013; The Plaintiffs shall file a brief in opposition to the Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment, combined with their reply in support of their summary judgment motion, by November 27, 2013; The Defendants shall file their reply brief in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment by December 6, 2013; An answer to the Complaint need not be filed in this action. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 11/04/13. (kyou, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Stipulation
                                                                                STIPULATION to Establish Briefing Schedule by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge James R. Spencer:Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2013 re [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King. Motion for Preliminary Injunction -- DENIED. (Court Reporter Jeff Kull, OCR.)(khan, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Response
                                                                                    Response to [22] NOTICE, of Supplemental Authority filed by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Notice
                                                                                      NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck in Support of [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript of Oral Ruling in Halbig v. Sebelius (D.D.C.)). (Berry, Jonathan). Modified docket entry on 10/29/2013. (walk, ).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [19] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/21/13. (tdai, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013, Terminated: 10/21/2013 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1--Declaration of D. Moulds, # (2) Exhibit 2--Transcript of Hearing before H. Comm.)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [16] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. See order for details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/15/13. (tdai, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013, Terminated: 10/15/2013 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Hambrick, Jonathan)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Holland Hambrick on behalf of Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel (Hambrick, Jonathan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  set motion and R&R; deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines as to [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2013 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge James R. Spencer. (khan, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 So OrderedCourt Filing
                                                                                                        So Ordered re [10] Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel McElvain and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth Wu filed by United States Department of the Treasury, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Daniel Werfel, Internal Revenue Service. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10/3/13. (kyou, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction, on or before October 16, 2013; Plaintiffs will file a reply to Defendants response to the Preliminary Injunction by close of business on October 23, 2013; Defendants obligation to respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is deferred until after they have filed a responsive pleading or a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 10-3-13. (kyou, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Opposition
                                                                                                            Opposition to [11] MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule re [5] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule re [5] MOTION for Summary Judgment , [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013, Terminated: 10/3/2013 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel McElvain and Certification of Local Counsel Elizabeth Wu by Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel. (Wu, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 So OrderedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  So Ordered re [4] Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob M. Roth and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan A. Berry Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3671718. filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 09/23/13. (kyou, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 So OrderedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    So Ordered re [3] Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Carvin and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan A. Berry Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3671602. filed by Douglas Hurst, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, David King. Signed by District Judge James R. Spencer on 09/23/13. (kyou, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Certificate Reporting Service
                                                                                                                      Certificate Reporting Service by Jacob Lew, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel, Kathleen Sebelius, Internal Revenue Service, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Jacob Lew served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013; United States Department of the Treasury served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013; Daniel Werfel served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013; Kathleen Sebelius served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013; Internal Revenue Service served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/16/2013, answer due 11/15/2013. (jtho, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of W. Thomas Haynes)(Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of David King, # (2) Affidavit of Brittany La Couture, # (3) Affidavit of Douglas Hurst, # (4) Affidavit of Brenda Levy, # (5) Affidavit of Rose Luck)(Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013, Terminated: 9/23/2013 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacob M. Roth and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan A. Berry Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3671718. by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013, Terminated: 9/23/2013 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Carvin and Certification of Local Counsel Jonathan A. Berry Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3671602. by Douglas Hurst, David King, Brenda Levy, Rose Luck. (Berry, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury, Daniel Werfel, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (handed to counsel at counter to arrange for service). (jtho, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, Jacob Lew, Kathleen Sebelius, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of the Treasury (Filing fee: $400.00; receipt number 34683022458), filed by Brenda Levy, Rose Luck, Douglas Hurst, David King. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Receipt)(jtho, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 378 times.

                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?