Steve Dafnis v. Amtrvst Reo I LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:12-cv-00870
District Judge Cormac J. Carney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 3:44 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Steve Dafnis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Amtrvst Reo I LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A Coleman +1 213 236 0600 jeff@thecolemanfirm.com
No Logo Thomas H Casey, Mediator (ADR Panel)

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas H Casey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Harrington Casey +1 949 766 8787 +1 949 766 9896 tomcasey@tomcaseylaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1640
Nature of Suit 220 - Foreclosure (Diversity)
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference held before Judge Cormac J. Carney:, ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney The hearings originally scheduled have been rescheduled: Jury Trial continued to 6/19/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney.Court Reporter: Maria Dellaneve. (twdb) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
          Witness List filed by defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC.. (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
            Exhibit List filed by defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC.. (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 23 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                AMENDED ANSWER filed by Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: re Approval of Stipulation for the Filing of a First Amended Answer 20 . (mba) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION to Amend filed by Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                      MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Thomas H Casey: Mediation held on August 7, 2013. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Casey, Thomas) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Thomas H Casey has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: This matter is assigned for all purposes to the Honorable Cormac J. Carney, United States District Judge, Courtroom 9B, Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California, 92701-4516. The Courts mandatory procedures and requirements for Settlement, the Pre-Trial Conference and Trial are as follows: (See document for details.) IT IS SO ORDERED. (rla) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties submissions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), now ORDERS as follows: Discovery cut-off 3/7/2014. Motions due by 5/9/2014. Jury Trial set for 6/17/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (See document for further details.) (rla) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                              JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT REPORT of scheduling conference filed by Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF INTENT TO SCHEDULE THE CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (see document for details). (dro) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE Amtrvst Reo I LLC. NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/24/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC.(Coleman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/24/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Entry of Default against Amtrvst Reo I LLC 10 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as No proof of service on file as to the clerks entry of default #10. (twdb) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
                                        APPLICATION for Entry of Default against DefendantSteve Dafnis, First APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Steve Dafnis filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFF FILING A RESPONSE: In light of Plaintiff's response, the Court hereby ORDERS the OSC discharged. (rla) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnisto Order on Ex Parte Application for TRO,, 7 (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying 5 Ex Parte Application for TRO; ORDER to Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim: For the reasons discussed below, Mr. Dafnis' ex parte application is DENIED. (See document for details.) In light of the deficiencies in his Complaint, the Court ORDERS Mr. Dafnis to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a cognizable claim. Mr. Dafnis must file a written opposition to this order to show cause by Monday, June 25, 2012. Amtrvst shall file a response, if any, by Monday, July 2, 2012. The matter will stand submitted upon receipt of all the papers. (rla) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Foreclosure of Real Property. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday throu 5 served on 6/7/2012. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                  EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Foreclosure of Real Property. If this is filed during normal business hours, please contact the courtroom deputy assigned to the judge. If you are filing this document after 5:00 Monday through Friday, on a weekend or holiday, and need immediate judicial review, please call 213-894-2485 to advise that a Temporary Restraining Order has been electronically filed. Failure to call the courtroom deputy, or the after hours filing contact number, may result in a delay of judicial review. Ex Parte Application filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Declaration Re Service)(Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Arleen Atogiue, Secretary in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Faler, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(lwag) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATION and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis. (lwag) (dg). (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          COMPLAINT against Defendant Amtrvst Reo I LLC. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato.(Filing fee $350 Paid). Filed by Plaintiff Steve Dafnis.(lwag) (dg). (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 332 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?