Alliance for Open Society International, Inc. et al v. United States Agency for International Development et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-08209
District Judge Victor Marrero, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2020 at 10:07 AM ST (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan Center for Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Klein Abel +1 212 988 6737 +1 212 995 4550 laura.abel@nyu.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebekah Ruth Diller +1 212 992 8635 +1 212 995 4550 rebekah.diller@nyu.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aziz Huq +1 212 992 8632 +1 212 995 4550 aziz.huq@nyu.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Burt Neuborne +1 212 998 6172 +1 212 995 4341 burt.neuborne@nyu.edu
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Stuart Udell +1 212 998 6720 +1 212 995 4550 david.udell@nyu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Hale & Dorr LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Johnston +1 617 526 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David W. Bowker +1 202 663 6558 david.bowker@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Global Health Council, Plaintiff
No Logo Open Society Institute, Plaintiff
No Logo Pathfinder International, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Andrew Natsios, Defendant
No Logo Henrietta Fore, Defendant
No Logo Julie Louise Gerberding, Defendant
No Logo Michael O. Leavitt, Defendant
No Logo United States Agency For International Development, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rottenberg Lipman Rich, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Edward Rosberger +1 212 822 5729 rrosberger@rlrpclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
No Logo AIDS Action et al., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAUDIA FLORES +1 212 519 7816 +1 212 549 2580 cflores@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Ingrid Magdo +1 212 841 1252 +1 646 441 9252 cmagdo@cov.com
No Logo Apne Aap et.al [Amicus], Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Equality Now

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Neuwirth +1 212 586 0906 +1 212 586 1611 jneuwirth@equalitynow.org
No Logo Interaction, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbons PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAWRENCE S. LUSTBERG +1 973 596 4731 llustberg@gibbonslaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (131) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Appeal Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
    ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 127 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Andrew Natsios USCA Case Number 15-0974. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appealpursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 05/22/2015. (nd) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: Upon the application of the defendants and with the consent of plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Decision and Order granting a permanent injunction, entered in this action on January 30, 2015, is stayed until and through August 11, 2015. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/21/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: Upon the application of the defendants and with the consent of plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Decision and Order granting a permanent injunction, entered in this action on January 30, 2015, is stayed until and through May 22, 2015. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/21/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 127 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from 124 Order,,, 118 Order,,,,,. Document filed by Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, Andrew Natsios, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
            LREF
            Blank 126 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Upon the application of the defendants and with the consent of plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Decision and Order granting permanent injunction, entered in this action on January 30, 2015, is stayed until and through April 23, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/20/2015) (ama) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
              LREF
              Blank 125 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: Upon the application of the defendants and with the consent of plaintiffs, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Decision and Order granting a permanent injunction, entered in this action on January 30, 2015, is stayed until and through March 23, 2015. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/19/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                LREF
                Blank 124 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                AMENDED ORDER re: 118 Order: that the "Introduction" section on page one (1) of this Court's Decision and Order dated January 30, 2015 (Dkt. No. 118) be amended to state "Plaintiffs Alliance for Open Society International ("AOSI"), Open Society Institute ("OSI"), Pathfinder International ("Pathfinder"), InterAction ("InterAction"), and Global Health Council ("GHC") (collectively "Plaintiffs") brought action against defendants, the United States Agency for International Development ("USAID"), the United States Department of Health and Human Services ("HHS"), and the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention ("CDC") (collectively "Defendants," or the "Agencies," or the "Government"). " (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/10/2015) (tn) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                  LREF
                  Blank 123 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David W. Bowker dated 2/4/2014 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request that this Court issue an amended version of its January 30, 2015 Decision and Order that names InterAction as a plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/5/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                    LREF
                    Blank 122 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 119 Motion to Stay. Upon the application of the defendants, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's Decision and Order granting a permanent injunction, entered in this action on January 30, 2015, is stayed for 14 days from the entry of this Order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/5/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                      LREF
                      Blank 121 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Susan Keller Pascocello in Support re: 119 MOTION to Stay re: 118 Order,,,,, .. Document filed by Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, Andrew Natsios, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                        LREF
                        Blank 120 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 119 MOTION to Stay re: 118 Order,,,,, . . Document filed by Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, Andrew Natsios, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                          LREF
                          Blank 119 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Stay re: 118 Order,,,,, . Document filed by Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, Andrew Natsios, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                            LREF
                            Blank 118 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, it is hereby ORDERED that the Government is permanently enjoined from issuing any official communications -- including but not limited to RFAs, RFPs, solicitations, and any guidance -- that include the Policy Requirement without also including a clear exemption for Plaintiffs and their domestic and foreign affiliates; and it is further ORDERED that the Government is permanently enjoined from applying the Policy Requirement to Plaintiffs or their domestic and foreign affiliates; and it is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' request that USAID be ordered to use different language in its grant contracts to exempt Plaintiffs from the Policy Requirement is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' request that the Defendants be ordered to pay Plaintiffs' fees, costs, and expenses incurred in connection with this matter, is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' request for an order imposing fines for any further violation of the Court's orders is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the Government show cause why this Court should not bar it from enforcing the Policy Requirement against any organization and why allowing the Government to continue to apply the Policy Requirement would not violate the Supreme Court's decision in this matter. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/30/2015) (lmb) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                              LREF
                              Blank 117 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 10/30/2014 re: We write respectfully in response to the Court's direction to submit supporting materials regarding the plaintiffs' proposed motion for a permanent injunction. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Government. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/31/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                LREF
                                Blank 116 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David W. Bowker dated 10/30/2014 re: I write on behalf of plaintiffs Alliance for Open Society International, Pathfinder International, InterAction and its members, and Global Health Council and its members ("Plaintiffs") in the above-referenced matter, in response to your Honor's request for the submission of any declarations and other evidence that Plaintiffs relied upon at the October 16 conference regarding Plaintiffs' request for a permanent injunction. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter submitted to the Court by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/31/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 115 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Carlos Carrazana (Re Plaintiffs Arguments at the 10/16/2014 Conference). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Global Health Council, InterAction, Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International. (Bowker, David) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of Helene D. Gayle (Re Plaintiffs Arguments at the 10/16/2014 Conference). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Global Health Council, InterAction, Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 2 - Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 2 - Part 6, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8)(Bowker, David) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Purnima Mane (Re Plaintiffs Arguments at the 10/16/2014 Conference). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Global Health Council, Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Bowker, David) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of David W. Bowker (Re Plaintiffs Arguments at the 10/16/2014 Conference). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit D - Part 3, # 7 Exhibit D - Part 4, # 8 Exhibit D - Part 5, # 9 Exhibit D - Part 6, # 10 Exhibit D - Part 7, # 11 Exhibit D - Part 8, # 12 Exhibit D - Part 9, # 13 Exhibit D - Part 10, # 14 Exhibit D - Part 11, # 15 Exhibit D - Part 12, # 16 Exhibit D - Part 13, # 17 Exhibit E, # 18 Exhibit F, # 19 Exhibit G, # 20 Exhibit H, # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit J, # 23 Exhibit K, # 24 Exhibit L)(Bowker, David) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 111 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 10/16/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 10/16/2014 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 109 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 10/22/2014 re: At the conference before the Court on October 16, 2014, Your Honor directed the parties to submit documents relevant to plaintiffs' proposed motion for an injunction by October 23, 2014. The government respectfully requests that the parties' deadline for such a submission be extended to October 30, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Request GRANTED. The time for the parties to submit the materials referred to above is extended to 10-30-14. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/22/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 108 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David W. Bowker dated 10/9/2014 re: Plaintiffs are entitled to a permanent injunction and any other relief the Court deems appropriate. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will consider evidence and arguments at a hearing on this matter on 10-16-14 at 9:30 a.m. At that time the Court will determine whether further proceedings or briefing is necessary., ( Status Conference set for 10/16/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/10/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 10/3/2014 re: The government thus respectfully requests that this Court hold a pre-motion conference, or, alternatively, direct the parties to submit a proposed briefing schedule on plaintiffs' motion. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs are directed to respond by 10-9-14 by letter not to exceed three (3) pages to the matter set forth above by the Government. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/3/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David W. Bowker dated 9/23/14 re: Plaintiffs seek a pre-motion conference in anticipation of a motion for a permanent injunction and other legal or equitable relief, as this Court deems appropriate and necessary. ENDORSEMENT: The Government is directed to respond by 10-3-14 by letter not to exceed three (3) pages, to the matter set forth above by plaintiffs, showing cause why the relief requested should not be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/29/2014) (mro) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Appeal Record Sent to United States Supreme Court (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding. US Supreme Court case number 12-0010. USCA Case Number 08-4917-cv, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Supreme Court. (nd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2013: # 1 U.S. Supreme Court Letter requesting records) (nd). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 4/24/2012 re: I am writing to inform the Court that the government has sought and obtained from the Supreme Court an extension of time in which to petition for certiorari from the Second Circuit's judgment of July 6, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Government. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/28/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 4/6/2012 re: Counsel for the parties write in joint response to the Court's Order, dated March 30, 2012, requiring the parties "to inform the Court by April 6, 2012, as to their contemplation regarding any further litigation before this Court, or to settle a final order reflecting a stipulated resolution that could serve as the basis for any further appellate proceedings." ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Government. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/10/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: With reference to the Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit dated February 21, 2012, the parties are directed to inform the Court by April 6, 2012 as to their contemplation regarding any further litigation before this Court, or to settle a final order reflecting a stipulated resolution that could serve as the basis for any further appellate proceedings. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/27/2012) (js) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding USCA Case Number 08-4917-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the District Court's grant of preliminary injunctive relief is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 02/17/2012. (nd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2012: # 1 Opinion) (nd). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding USCA Case Number 08-4917-cv. This appeal was disposed of by a so-ordered stipulation withdrawing the appeal when reinstated by the Defendants-Appellants timely submission of notice to that effect. Counsel for the Appellants has submitted a timely Notice of reinstatement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 1/14/2010. (nd) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding USCA Case Number 08-4917-cv. This appeal was disposed by a so-ordered stipulation withdrawing the appeal when reinstated by the Benjamin H. Torrance counsel for appellants timely submission of notice of that effect. Counsel for the appellants Alliance for Open Society International et al., has submitted a timely notice of reinstatement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal is reinstated. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 1/11/2010. (nd) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 1/6/2010 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs write to the Court to provide and updated report on the status of regulatory proceedings related to this matter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter this letter and enclosed document in the public record of this action. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/6/2010) (tro) (tro). (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding USCA Case Number 084917-cv. Order withdrawing appeal by consent without prejudice to reinstatement, the appeal is hereby withdrawn without costs and without attorney`s fees and without prejudice, subject to reactivation of the appeal by appellant`s counsel by written notice to the Clerk of this Court by 1/8/10. If not thus timely reactivated the appea shall be subject to dismissal. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 9/24/2009. (nd) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER PURSUANT TO MEMORANDUM FOR THE ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE U.S. COURTS, DATED JUNE 15TH, 1973: This case having been pending for more than three years, all presently contemplated proceedings having been completed, and there having been no action for more than twelve months, there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain this action as open for statistical purposes, the Clerk is instructed to complete a JS-6 closing report for this case. Nothing contained in this minute order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this minute order had not been entered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/29/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 7/28/2009 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that on July 24, 2009 the Court of Appeals entered the parties stipulation to withdraw the government's appeal without prejudice to reinstatement by January 8, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to file this letter in the public docket of this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/28/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura Abel dated 7/8/09 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs write in response to the Court's Order of 6/20/09, requiring Plaintiffs to "inform the Court, by 7/8/09, of the status of the regulatory proceedings that has been considered arising out of the matters at issue in this litigation, and of plaintiffs' contemplation with regard to further prosecution of this action. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's are directed to submit to the Court an updated report on the status of this matter within 60 days of the date of this Order, or any earlier date on which material development occurs regarding the matters described above. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/8/09) (tro) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: It is hereby ordered that plaintiffs inform the Court, by July 8, 2009, of the status of the regulatory proceedings that had been considered arising out of the matters at issue in this litigation, and of plaintiffs' contemplation with regard to further prosecution of this action. In the event no timely response to this Order is received, the Court may dismiss the action without further notice for lack of prosecution. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/30/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 6/23/08 re: Counsel writes in response to the government defendants letter. Counsel writes to advise the Court that there are no facts to discover here that would give rise to a rejudicatures defense. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Global Health Council, Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute.(mme) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin R. Torrance dated 6/20/08 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court of a recent decision by the Supreme Court of the United States that affects the res judicate argument advanced by the Government in its recent brief opposing plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services.(mme) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin R. Torrance dated 12/14/08 re: The parties have agreed on the following schedule: Plaintiffs' motion to be served by February 8, 2008; Government's opposition to be served by March 7, 2008; Plaintiffs' reply memorandum. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services.(mme) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from David S. Udell dated 12/23/2008 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs writes requesting that the Court enter the following correspondence into the docket: 12/14/2007 letter from Benjamin Torrance to the Hon. Victor Marrero; 6/23/2008 letter from Rebekah Diller to the Hon. Victor Marrero; and 6/20/2008 letter from Benjamin Torrance to the Hon. Victor Marrero. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter into the public docket of this action the three letters referred to above and attached to this letter from plaintiffs' counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/23/2008) (tve) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for 87 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Michael O. Leavitt, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding USCA Case Number 08-7917, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) (tp). (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL from 83 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (nd) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Henrietta Fore, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Related document: 84 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, InterAction, Global Health Council, Pathfinder International.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 8/25/2008 re: Counsel writes in response to the Court's request that the parties agree on a schedule for further proceedings in this case. The parties have agreed that any further proceedings in this case should await the issuance of a final regulation by HHS. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Further proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the rule making purpose by defendant's Department of Health and Human Services. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain this action on the Court's suspense docket. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/25/2008) (jfe) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 20 Amended Complaint,, against Henrietta Fore, Global Health Council, United States Agency for International Development, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services.Document filed by Global Health Council, InterAction, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. Related document: 20 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, Pathfinder International.(dle) (dle). (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, it is hereby ordered that the motion (docket no. 66) of plaintiffs Alliance for Open Society International (AOSI) and Pathfinder International (Pathfinder) for leave to file a second amended complaint to add Global Health Council (GHC) and InterAction as plaintiffs to this action is GRANTED. The motion of GHC and InterAction for a preliminary injunction, is GRANTED, as set forth herein. DKT, as member of GHC, shall be barred form benefiting from the preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/7/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Nils Daulaire in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 4/4/08 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs request permission to submit an overlength reply regarding Plaintiffs' motions to amend the complaint and to extend the preliminary injunction to cover Global Health Council and InterAction. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize plaintiff's to file a brief not to exceed 26 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint herein. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 4/4/08) (tro) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin H. Torrance on behalf of United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Benjamin H. Torrance in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HHS Guidance, # 2 Exhibit USAID AAPD, # 3 Exhibit GHC Member List, # 4 Exhibit DKT Complaint)(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/13/08 re: Counsel for defendant requests an enlargement of the Government's brief due on March 17, in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint and extend the preliminary injunction, from 25 to 40 pages. Plaintiffs previously obtained an equivalent enlargement of their opening brief, and have consented to this request. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize The Government to file a brief not to exceed 41 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint herein and extend the preliminary injunction. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/14/08) (js) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Benjamin H. Torrance dated 3/5/2008 re: This Office represents the defendants in the above-named case. I am writing to request an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint and extend the preliminary injunction to additional parties, as follows: Government's response (now due March 7): March 17; Plaintiffs' reply (now due March 28) April 7. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The briefing schedule with regard to the motion to amend the complaint herein is extended as set forth herein: motion papers submitted by response 3-17-08; reply 4-7-08. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 3/17/2008, Replies due by 4/7/2008.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/5/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Mark Sidel in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit B3, # 6 Exhibit B4, # 7 Exhibit B5, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Pape Gaye in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Helene Gayle in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Sam Worthington in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daniel E. Pellegrom in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Nils Daulaire in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Rebekah Diller in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Complaint and Motion by Global Health Council and Interaction for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute.(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 2/1/08 re: Counsel for plaintiffs request permission to submit an overlength brief regarding Plaintiffs' motions to amend the complaint and to extend the preliminary injunction to cover Global Health Council of Inter Action. Plaintiffs request leave to file a 40-page brief.. ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. The page limitations provision of the Court's Individual Practices is modified to authorize plaintiffs to file a brief not to exceed 40 pages in connection with the motion to amend the complaint and add a party herein. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 2/4/08) (js) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 57 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services USCA Case Number 06-4035-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the case is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings consistent with this order. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 12/21/2007. (nd) (Entered: 12/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER PLACING CASE ON SUSPENSE: This action be placed on the Court's Suspense Docket pending a ruling by the Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit on dft's appeal of this Court's Order dated 6/30/2006. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/2007) (jar) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Edward Rosberger on behalf of United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Laura Abel dated 11/13/06 re plntf request for a status conference: a status conf is set for 12/4/06 at 3:00 pm to address the matter described above by plaintiffs. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/15/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for 57 Notice of Appeal, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, USCA Case Number 06-4035, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2006 (tp, ). (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura Abel dated 10/13/06 re: counsel for plaintiffs request to provide the court with a further update on the progress and/or results of these surveys on or before 11/13/06. Request granted. The time for plaintiffs to update the court on the survey described above is extended to 11/13/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Appearance and Request for Electronic Notification. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.. (Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL from 53 Preliminary Injunction,. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (A.U.S.A.) (nd, ) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Laura K. Abel dated 8/16/2006 re: respectfully requesting a postponement of the status conference for 8/25/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The next status conference herein is rescheduled to 9/6/2006 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/21/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 8/9/06 re: Government defendants respond to Plaintiffs' letter, dated August 6, 2006, requesting a pre-motion conference; Request Granted. A status conference herein is scheduled for 8/25/06 at 2:00 p.m. to address the matter described above by defendants.. plaintiffs' prior correspondence in this regard.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/10/06) (djc, ) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 8/4/06 re: counsel for plaintiffs request permission to file a motion seeking leave to file a second amended complaint and permission to move for a preliminary injunction. Request granted. A status conference herein is scheduled for 8/11/06 at 1:30 p.m. to address the matter described above by plaintiffs, unless prior thereto the parties stipulate to the amendment of the complaint proposed. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 8/4/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: Pending entry of a final judgment on the merits of the parties' dispute in this action or until any reconsideration or modification of the order is authorized by the court; dfts are enjoined as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/26/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/2/06 before Judge Victor Marrero. (tro, ) (Entered: 06/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 6/9/06. ENDORSEMENT: request GRANTED. The time for the parties to submit a proposed preliminary injunction herein is extended to 6/12/06. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/9/06) (js, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Marrero from Richard Rosberger dated 5/23/06: the time for the parties to submit the proposed preliminary injunction hearing is extended to 6/24/06. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/23/06) (cd, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2006 (cd, ). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      DECISION AND ORDER that the parties to submit to the Court, with fourteen days of the date of this Order, a proposed preliminary injunction conforming with the determinations in this Decision. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 5/9/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/13/2006 @ 9:05 a.m. before Judge Victor Marrero. (lb, ) (Entered: 04/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that during the pendency of Pathfinder International's motion for a preliminary injunction, Pathfinder International will in good faith not take any action that it thinks violates the US Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaris Act of 2003, 22 USC 7631(f) CDC Funding Opportunity numbers 04263, 04208, and 04256 and Pathfinder International's related representations... (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER; granting 45 Motion for Richard A. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 3/2/06) (pl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for an order, admitting Richard A. Johnston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (sac, ) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Megan Lewis dated 1/30/06 re: Application GRANTED. The 36 Motion of InterAction, to participate in this action as amicus curiae is GRANTED. InterAction is authorized to file a memorandum of law. If the Government elects to respond seperately, it shall propose a briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/30/06) (db, ) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel E. Pellegrom in Support re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert Kushen in Support re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Rebekah Diller in Support re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Bowker on behalf of Alliance for Open Society International, Inc. (Bowker, David) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David William Bowker on behalf of Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute (Bowker, David) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Rebekah Diller dated 1/24/06 re: a request to file a reply brief not exceeding 43 pages in length. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. Plaintiff's reply brief herein may exceed to Court's page limititation up to a total of 43 pages as set forth above (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/24/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lawrence S. Lustberg on behalf of InterAction. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law of Proposed Amicus Curiae Interaction in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction)(Lustberg, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt.(Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Michael J. Garcia dated 1/10/06 re: Counsel writes to request that the date for defendants to answer the amended complaint be extended to 1/13/06. Request Granted. The time for defendant(s) to answer or otherwise move with respect to the complaint in this action is extended to 1/13/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER during the pendency of plaintiff Pathfinder's motion for a preliminary injunction, Pathfinder will in good faith not take any action that it thinks violates the United States Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis and Malaria Act of 2003,22 U.S.C. 7631(f)(the "Act"),etc. as further set forth in this Order. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/12/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 # 5 Exhibit E)(Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 1/3/2006 re: to Defendants request permission to file an opposition brief with a page length of up to 55 pages, as so that it may properly respond to all of the Plaintiff motions and to the amici briefs. Further, Defendants respectfully request that the date for Defendants submit their answer to the Amended Complaint be extended from January 3,2006 to January 10,2006. Plaintiffs have consented to the foregoing requests, and that their reply brief upon their motions be extended from January 24,2006 to January 25,2006.., United States Agency for International Development answer due 1/10/2006; Andrew Natsios answer due 1/10/2006; Julie Louise Gerberding answer due 1/10/2006; Michael O. Leavitt answer due 1/10/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention answer due 1/10/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due 1/10/2006. Replies due by 1/25/2006. Responses due by 1/4/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The briefing schedule with regard to the motion for preliminary injunction herein is extended as set forth herein motion papers submitted by response 1/4/2006; reply 1/25/2006. Defendants' brief may contain up to 55 pages. Defendants' time ro answer the amended complaint is extended to 1/10/2006. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/3/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit C)(Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Richard E. Rosberger in Opposition re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction., 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order., 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios, Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Rosberger, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 1/3/06 re: request granted; the briefing schedule with regard to the motion for preliminary injunction herein is extended as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 1/3/06) (pl, ) (Entered: 01/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. United States Agency for International Development served on 12/5/2005, answer due 2/3/2006; Andrew Natsios served on 12/5/2005, answer due 2/3/2006; Julie Louise Gerberding served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; Michael O. Leavitt served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006; United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/6/2005, answer due 2/6/2006. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.; Pathfinder International; Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Jessica Neuwirth on behalf of Apne Aap et.al [Amicus].(Neuwirth, Jessica) (Entered: 12/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Pathfinder International. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Pathfinder International. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel Pellegrom)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Pathfinder International, Open Society Institute.(sac, ) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Julie Louise Gerberding, Michael O. Leavitt, United States Centers of Disease Control and Prevention, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios.Document filed by Pathfinder International, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Open Society Institute, Alliance for Open Society International, Inc..(sac, ) (Entered: 12/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jane Manning dated 12/5/05 re: counsel requests to file their motion on 12/12/05 and a conference with the court if the court prefers counsel to follow a different procedure. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 12/6/05) (dle, ) (Entered: 12/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Christine I. Magdo dated 11/9/05 re: Request granted. Amici Curiae herein are granted leave to file Memorandum of Law in support of plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction.. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/10/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Maria Flores on behalf of AIDS Action et al. (Flores, Claudia) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance, Memorandum of Law served on Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute, United States Agency for International Development, Andrew S. Natsios on November 9, 2005. Service was made by Mail (Federal Express). Document filed by AIDS Action et al.. (Magdo, Christine) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Memorandum of Law of AIDS Action and 21 Other Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by AIDS Action et al.. (Magdo, Christine) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christine Ingrid Magdo on behalf of AIDS Action et al..(Magdo, Christine) (Entered: 11/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Richard E. Rosberger dated 10/19/05 re: The briefing schedule set forth in said letter with respect to plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order is approved. Defendants response served by 11/21/05, reply served by 12/9/05. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/19/05) (db, ) (Entered: 10/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/7/2005 before Judge Victor Marrero. (jar, ) (Entered: 10/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER that during the pendency of plntfs' motions for perliminary injunction and a TRO, AOSI will in good faith not take any action that they think violates the US Leadership against HIV et al. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/13/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Rebekah Diller# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Diller Declaration# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Diller Declaration# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Diller Declaration# 5 Text of Proposed Order Order to Show Cause with Temporary Restraining Order)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 10/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 10/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG DOCUMENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction). Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) Modified on 10/6/2005 (kg). (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Agency for International Development served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; Andrew Natsios served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005. Service was accepted by Daniel Green. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc.; Open Society Institute. (Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Burt Neuborne# 2 Declaration of Rossana Barbero# 3 Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 1 of 3)# 4 Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 2 of 3)# 5 Declaration of Chris Beyrer (Part 3 of 3)# 6 Delaration of Pedro Chequer# 7 Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 1 of 4)# 8 Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 2 of 4)# 9 Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 3 of 4)# 10 Declaration of Rebekah Diller (Part 4 of 4)# 11 Declaration of Robert Kushen# 12 Declaration of Ruth W. Messinger# 13 Declaration of Maurice I. Middleberg# 14 Declaration of Aryeh Neier# 15 Certificate of Service)(Diller, Rebekah) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc..(lb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (kco, ). (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against United States Agency for International Development, Andrew Natsios. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 556437)Document filed by Alliance for Open Society International, Inc., Open Society Institute.(lb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2005 (kco, ). (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?