Linda Birdette v. Asset Acceptance, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 12-11654

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 1:08 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106930212 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
Writ of Certiorari filed as to Appellant Linda A. Birdette is DISMISSED. SC# 12-8214.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106867784 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
    Notice of Writ of Certiorari filed as to Appellant Linda A. Birdette. SC# 12-8214.
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106764329 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
      ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Linda A. Birdette has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106718925 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None
        ORDER: Motion for reconsideration of single judge's order filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette is DENIED. [6646863-2] RB and AJ
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106664937 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
          MOTION for reconsideration of single judge's order filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6646863-1]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106645678 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
            ORDER: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette is DENIED. [6543660-2] RB
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106550684 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              USDC order: ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Plaintiff's Answer to the Order, which was construed as a Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Julie E. Carnes on 5/14/12. as to Appellant Linda A. Birdette was filed on 05/14/2012. Docket Entry 16.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106514215 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6543660-1]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106514205 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                  Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Linda A. Birdette.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 5 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?