Joe Clinton Mobley
Bankruptcy Case California Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-20348
District Judge Michael S. McManus, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 9:40 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Carol Ann Mobley, Joint Debtor
No Logo Joe Clinton Mobley, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of C. Anthony Hughes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hughes, C. Anthony +1 916 485 1111
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U.S. Trustee"
No Logo Tracy Hope Davis, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jason M. Blumberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason M. Blumberg +1 916 930 2076
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
Certificate/Proof of Service of 17 Status Report [CAH-1] (bons) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
    Status Report [CAH-1] Filed by Joint Debtor Carol Ann Mobley, Debtor Joe Clinton Mobley (bons) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
      Order Granting 13 Motion/Application to Employ [CAH-4] (bons) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
        Certificate/Proof of Service of 13 Motion/Application to Employ Christopher West as Realtor(s) [CAH-4], 14 Declaration (bons) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
          Declaration of Christopher S. West in support of 13 Motion/Application to Employ Christopher West as Realtor(s) [CAH-4] (bons) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
            Motion/Application to Employ Christopher West as Realtor(s) [CAH-4] Filed by Joint Debtor Carol Ann Mobley, Debtor Joe Clinton Mobley (bons) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
              Disclosure of Attorney Compensation (bons) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                Certificate/Proof of Service of 5 Order Scheduling Deadlines (bons) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                    Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Meeting of Creditors as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) (Entered: 01/19/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                      Copy of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case if Documents Are Not Timely Filed as transmitted to BNC for service. (bons) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines as transmitted to BNC for service. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 2/13/2014 at 02:30 PM at Office of the UST (7-500). Last day to oppose discharge: 4/14/2014. Proofs of Claim due by 5/14/2014. (Wolny, Susan) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (bons) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                            Order Scheduling Deadlines for Disclosure of Single Asset Real Estate,Filing Preliminary Status Report,Preliminary Status Conference Re: 1 Voluntary Petition; Status Conference to be held on 2/18/2014 at 10:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 28, Department A (bons) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                              Statement of Social Security Number(s) (ltas) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                Master Address List (auto) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case If Documents Are Not Timely Filed. (ltas) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                    Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Missing Document(s): Attorney's Disclosure Stmt.; Document(s) due by 01/29/2014. (Fee Paid $1213.00) (eFilingID: 5083551) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 142 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?