Serevino v. Silverstein Properties et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01722
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 10:27 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony Serevino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, LLC., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Acrow Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Construction Management, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Defendant
No Logo ASG Pest Control, Defendant
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Concrete Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Bovis International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holdings Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona, Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Defendant
No Logo Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HP Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LIRO, INC, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo M.G. McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Medcore Medical and Hospital Supply, Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo MG McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Moody's Investors Service"
No Logo Moretrench American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, PC, Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Off Road Welding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners P.C., Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp.,, Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp.,, Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties LLC., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stier Anderson, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Summit Structures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Telenet Communication Inc., Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company,, Defendant
No Logo Tully Consulting Corp.,, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Turner/Plaza, Defendant
No Logo Turner/Plaza, A Joint Venture, Defendant
No Logo Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Lend, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates LLP., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield Corporation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, LLC., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., ADR Provider
City of New York City of New York, ADR Provider
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FINAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: (THIS STIPULATED ORDER PERTAINS TO ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DOCKET NUMBERS SET FORTH ON EXHIBIT A) IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED Plaintiffs and Settling Defendants have entered into a settlement agreement resolving all claims by Plaintiffs against Settling Defendants in the above-captioned action. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' claims against the Settling Defendants and each of them shall be dismissed, and hereby are dismissed, with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/2011) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/25/11) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(jw) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: None
    AMENDED COMPLAINT against ATC Associates, Inc., Acrow Corporation of America, Amec Construction Management, Inc.,, Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Holdings Limited, Bovis International, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc.,, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holdings Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consulting Engineers, P.C., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., DCM Erectors, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., ET Environmental, Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., En-Tech Corp., Evergreen Recycling of Corona, Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., HP Environmental, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., High-Rise Electric, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Laquila Construction Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liberty Mutual Managed Care, Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., M.G. McLaren, P.C., MG McLaren, P.C., MRA Engineering, PC, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Medcore Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, LLC., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners P.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Corp.,, Plaza Construction Management Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp.,, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Pro Safety Services LLC., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc.,, Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, Silverstein WTC Properties LLC., Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Silverstein WTC, LLC, Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC., Summit Structures LLC., Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., The City of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co, Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Construction Company,, Tully Consulting Corp.,, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Environmental, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc.,, Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, LLC., Turner/Plaza, Turner/Plaza, A Joint Venture, Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, United States Rebar, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates LLP., W Harris & Sons Inc., WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC., 1 World Trade Center, LLC, 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, 2 World Trade Center, LLC, 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, Westfield WTC, LLC., Whitney Contracting Inc., World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC, 4 World Trade Center, LLC, 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, 5 World Trade Center, LLC, A Russo Wrecking, ABM Industries, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., ASG Pest Control with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anthony Serevino.(mbe) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the Plaintiffs listed on the attached Schedule A, and the attorneys for defendants BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LP, BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., LLC, BFP Tower C Co. LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., LP, WFP Tower B Co., LP and WFP Tower D Co., LP (collectively the "Brookfield Parties") in these actions, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, the matters listed on the attached Schedule A are hereby discontinued without prejudice as against the above-named Brookfield Parties only, and without costs to any party... and as further set forth. Relates to All cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN ENUMERATED CIVIL ACTIONS: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment A, "Case to be Dismissed" column, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(ii) without prejudice and without cost to any party, and consolidated with the corresponding civil actions referenced in Attachment A, "To Consolidate With" column; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment B, "Case to be Dismissed from 21 MC 100" column, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii) without prejudice and without cost to any party, and consolidated with the corresponding civil actions referenced in Attachment B, "To Consolidate With the Following 21 MC 102 Cases" column; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment C, "Case to be Dismissed from 21 MC 100" column, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a)(1)(ii) without prejudice and without cost to any party, and consolidated with the corresponding civil actions referenced in Attachment C, "To Consolidate With the Following 21 MC 103 Cases" column; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that the civil actions referenced in Attachment D, "Multi-Plaintiff Cases to be Dismissed" column, be discontinued and dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(ii) without prejudice and without cost to any party, and consolidated with the corresponding civil actions referenced in Attachment D, "To Consolidate With" column; and it is further STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned, that for all cases consolidated and/or transferred pursuant to this Stipulation, Defendants will not raise the Statute of Limitations as a defense if the original action was timely filed and served, but that Defendants shall have all rights and defenses pursuant to New York Unconsolidated Laws Sections 7101 et seq. or any applicable statute of limitation that they have as of the date each action is discontinued pursuant to this Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/29/09) (tro) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
          DUPLICATE STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against Cushman and Wakefield, Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Josh Folger. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Whitney Contracting Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Turner Construction Company served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 3/24/2006, answer due 4/13/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 3/22/2006, answer due 4/11/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bovis Holdings Limited served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis International, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006; Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 4/11/2006, answer due 5/1/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Anthony Serevino. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against Bovis Holdings Limited, Bovis International, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc.,, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc.,, 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.,, Liberty Mutual Managed Care, Inc., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., Silverstein WTC, LLC, Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tully Construction Co, Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, LLC., 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, Turner Construction International, LLC., Turner/Plaza, A Joint Venture, Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC, LLC, Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, LLC, A Russo Wrecking, ABM Industries, Inc., Acrow Corporation of America, Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., 1 World Trade Center, LLC, Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling LLC., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., 2 World Trade Center, LLC, Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. LLC., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., 4 World Trade Center, LLC, C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consulting Engineers, P.C., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona, Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray, & Steficek, LLP., Gino Cracolici & Sons Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Amec Construction Management, Inc.,, Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., HP Environmental, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers P.C., Turner Construction Co., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Medcore Medical and Hospital Supply, Turner Construction Company, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, MG McLaren, P.C., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, PC, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, LLC., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Turner Construction International, LLC., Nicholson Construction Company, Nyc Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., OVE ARUP & PARTNERS P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Pro Safety Services LLC., Plaza Construction Management Corp.,, PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc.,, Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Plaza Construction Corp.,, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein WTC Properties LLC., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill LLP, Star Delta Electric, Inc., Stier Anderson, LLC., Summit Structures LLC., Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Survivair, Telenet Communication Inc., Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, United States Rebar, Inc., Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates LLP., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., WFP Tower D. Co., LP, Whitney Contracting Inc., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC, Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company,, Tully Environmental, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Tully Industries, Inc.,, Tully Consulting Corp.,, Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC, LLC., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Communications Holdings Company, Inc., Silverstein WTC, LLC, Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bovis Holdings Limited, Bovis International, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Liberty Mutual Managed Care, Inc., Turner/Plaza, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., 1 World Trade Center, LLC, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC., 2 World Trade Center, LLC, 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, LLC, 4 World Trade Center, LLC, 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, 5 World Trade Center, LLC, 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anthony Serevino, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC.(mbe, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER Plaintiffs shall serve their "Offer of Proof" upon Defts' Co-Liaison Counsel by not later than 10/5/05; Defendants shall serve their response to plaintiffs' "Offer of Proof" upon Plaintiffs' Co-Liaison Counsel by not later than 10/19/05; Liaison Counsel shall meet & confer to attempt to resolve any disputes concerning plaintiffs' "Offer of Proof" and defendants' response to plaintiffs' "Offer of Proof" by not later than 10/25/05; Liaison Counsel shall jointly report to the Court as to the status of the discussions related to plaintiffs' "Offer of Proof" and defendants' response to plaintiffs' "Offer of Proof" by not later than 11/2/05. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-00007-AKH,1:03-cv-08577-AKH,1:04-cv-00491-AKH,1:04-cv-03747-AKH, 1:04-cv-03800-AKH,1:04-cv-04982-AKH,1:04-cv-04983-AKH,1:04-cv-04984-AKH,1:04-cv-05175-AKH, 1:04-cv-05862-AKH,1:04-cv-06726-AKH,1:04-cv-06727-AKH,1:04-cv-06789-AKH,1:04-cv-06889-AKH, 1:04-cv-06890-AKH,1:04-cv-06891-AKH,1:04-cv-06892-AKH,1:04-cv-06893-AKH,1:04-cv-07239-AKH, 1:04-cv-07293-AKH,1:04-cv-07597-AKH,1:04-cv-07599-AKH,1:04-cv-07601-AKH,1:04-cv-07645-AKH, 1:04-cv-07647-AKH,1:04-cv-07725-AKH,1:04-cv-07727-AKH,1:04-cv-07903-AKH,1:04-cv-08034-AKH, 1:04-cv-08035-AKH,1:04-cv-08036-AKH,1:04-cv-08096-AKH,1:04-cv-08097-AKH,1:04-cv-08284-AKH, 1:04-cv-08285-AKH,1:04-cv-08286-AKH,1:04-cv-08287-AKH,1:04-cv-08288-AKH,1:04-cv-08289-AKH, 1:04-cv-08404-AKH,1:04-cv-08431-AKH,1:04-cv-08494-AKH,1:04-cv-08495-AKH,1:04-cv-08496-AKH, 1:04-cv-08497-AKH,1:04-cv-08498-AKH,1:04-cv-08499-AKH,1:04-cv-08500-AKH,1:04-cv-08501-AKH, 1:04-cv-08502-AKH,1:04-cv-08503-AKH,1:04-cv-08504-AKH,1:04-cv-08505-AKH,1:04-cv-08506-AKH, 1:04-cv-08507-AKH,1:04-cv-08508-AKH,1:04-cv-08674-AKH,1:04-cv-08675-AKH,1:04-cv-08676-AKH, 1:04-cv-08681-AKH,1:04-cv-08725-AKH,1:04-cv-08726-AKH,1:04-cv-08727-AKH,1:04-cv-08728-AKH, 1:04-cv-08729-AKH,1:04-cv-08730-AKH,1:04-cv-08731-AKH,1:04-cv-08732-AKH,1:04-cv-08733-AKH, 1:04-cv-08734-AKH,1:04-cv-08735-AKH,1:04-cv-08736-AKH,1:04-cv-08737-AKH,1:04-cv-08738-AKH, 1:04-cv-08739-AKH,1:04-cv-08740-AKH,1:04-cv-08741-AKH,1:04-cv-08742-AKH,1:04-cv-08743-AKH, 1:04-cv-08744-AKH,1:04-cv-08745-AKH,1:04-cv-08746-AKH,1:04-cv-08747-AKH,1:04-cv-08748-AKH, 1:04-cv-08749-AKH,1:04-cv-08750-AKH,1:04-cv-08751-AKH,1:04-cv-08752-AKH,1:04-cv-08753-AKH, 1:04-cv-08754-AKH,1:04-cv-08755-AKH,1:04-cv-08756-AKH,1:04-cv-08757-AKH,1:04-cv-08758-AKH, 1:04-cv-08770-AKH,1:04-cv-08771-AKH,1:04-cv-08772-AKH,1:04-cv-08773-AKH,1:04-cv-08774-AKH, 1:04-cv-08775-AKH,1:04-cv-08776-AKH,1:04-cv-08777-AKH,1:04-cv-08778-AKH,1:04-cv-08779-AKH, 1:04-cv-08785-AKH,1:04-cv-08811-AKH,1:04-cv-08812-AKH,1:04-cv-08813-AKH,1:04-cv-08814-AKH, 1:04-cv-08815-AKH,1:04-cv-08816-AKH,1:04-cv-08817-AKH,1:04-cv-08841-AKH,1:04-cv-08866-AKH, 1:04-cv-08867-AKH,1:04-cv-08868-AKH,1:04-cv-08869-AKH,1:04-cv-08870-AKH,1:04-cv-08871-AKH, 1:04-cv-09002-AKH,1:04-cv-09062-AKH,1:04-cv-09081-AKH,1:04-cv-09082-AKH,1:04-cv-09083-AKH, 1:04-cv-09116-AKH,1:04-cv-09150-AKH,1:04-cv-09151-AKH,1:04-cv-09152-AKH,1:04-cv-09153-AKH, 1:04-cv-09154-AKH,1:04-cv-09155-AKH,1:04-cv-09156-AKH,1:04-cv-09157-AKH,1:04-cv-09158-AKH, 1:04-cv-09159-AKH,1:04-cv-09160-AKH,1:04-cv-09161-AKH,1:04-cv-09162-AKH,1:04-cv-09163-AKH, 1:04-cv-09164-AKH,1:04-cv-09165-AKH,1:04-cv-09166-AKH,1:04-cv-09167-AKH,1:04-cv-09168-AKH, 1:04-cv-09169-AKH,1:04-cv-09170-AKH,1:04-cv-09171-AKH,1:04-cv-09172-AKH,1:04-cv-09173-AKH, 1:04-cv-09174-AKH,1:04-cv-09175-AKH,1:04-cv-09176-AKH,1:04-cv-09177-AKH,1:04-cv-09178-AKH, 1:04-cv-09179-AKH,1:04-cv-09180-AKH,1:04-cv-09181-AKH,1:04-cv-09182-AKH,1:04-cv-09244-AKH, 1:04-cv-09245-AKH,1:04-cv-09247-AKH,1:04-cv-09253-AKH,1:04-cv-09261-AKH,1:04-cv-09272-AKH, 1:04-cv-09341-AKH,1:04-cv-09342-AKH,1:04-cv-09343-AKH,1:04-cv-09366-AKH,1:04-cv-09367-AKH, 1:04-cv-09368-AKH,1:04-cv-09450-AKH,1:04-cv-09451-AKH,1:04-cv-09818-AKH,1:04-cv-09819-AKH, 1:04-cv-09820-AKH,1:04-cv-09821-AKH,1:04-cv-09832-AKH,1:04-cv-09833-AKH,1:04-cv-09834-AKH, 1:04-cv-09835-AKH,1:04-cv-09836-AKH,1:04-cv-09837-AKH,1:04-cv-09838-AKH,1:04-cv-09839-AKH, 1:04-cv-09840-AKH,1:04-cv-09841-AKH,1:04-cv-09842-AKH,1:04-cv-09843-AKH,1:04-cv-09844-AKH, 1:04-cv-09845-AKH,1:04-cv-09846-AKH,1:04-cv-09847-AKH,1:04-cv-09848-AKH,1:04-cv-09849-AKH, 1:04-cv-09850-AKH,1:04-cv-09851-AKH,1:04-cv-09852-AKH,1:04-cv-09853-AKH,1:04-cv-09854-AKH, 1:04-cv-09855-AKH,1:04-cv-09856-AKH,1:04-cv-09857-AKH,1:04-cv-09902-AKH,1:04-cv-09903-AKH, 1:04-cv-09904-AKH,1:04-cv-09905-AKH,1:04-cv-09906-AKH,1:04-cv-09907-AKH,1:04-cv-09908-AKH, 1:04-cv-09909-AKH,1:04-cv-09910-AKH,1:04-cv-09987-AKH,1:04-cv-09988-AKH,1:04-cv-09989-AKH, 1:04-cv-09990-AKH,1:04-cv-10072-AKH,1:04-cv-10284-AKH,1:05-cv-00117-AKH,1:05-cv-00118-AKH, 1:05-cv-00119-AKH,1:05-cv-00184-AKH,1:05-cv-00185-AKH,1:05-cv-00186-AKH,1:05-cv-00193-AKH, 1:05-cv-00194-AKH,1:05-cv-00195-AKH,1:05-cv-00209-AKH,1:05-cv-00210-AKH,1:05-cv-00211-AKH, 1:05-cv-00212-AKH,1:05-cv-00224-AKH,1:05-cv-00259-AKH,1:05-cv-00264-AKH,1:05-cv-00311-AKH, 1:05-cv-00405-AKH,1:05-cv-00406-AKH,1:05-cv-00407-AKH,1:05-cv-00408-AKH,1:05-cv-00409-AKH, 1:05-cv-00410-AKH,1:05-cv-00411-AKH,1:05-cv-00412-AKH,1:05-cv-00413-AKH,1:05-cv-00414-AKH, 1:05-cv-00415-AKH,1:05-cv-00416-AKH,1:05-cv-00417-AKH,1:05-cv-00418-AKH,1:05-cv-00419-AKH, 1:05-cv-00420-AKH,1:05-cv-00421-AKH,1:05-cv-00422-AKH,1:05-cv-00423-AKH,1:05-cv-00424-AKH, 1:05-cv-00425-AKH,1:05-cv-00426-AKH,1:05-cv-00665-AKH,1:05-cv-00666-AKH,1:05-cv-00667-AKH, 1:05-cv-00668-AKH,1:05-cv-00669-AKH,1:05-cv-00670-AKH,1:05-cv-00671-AKH,1:05-cv-00679-AKH, 1:05-cv-00708-AKH,1:05-cv-00719-AKH,1:05-cv-00720-AKH,1:05-cv-00722-AKH,1:05-cv-00724-AKH, 1:05-cv-00744-AKH,1:05-cv-00765-AKH,1:05-cv-00766-AKH,1:05-cv-00828-AKH,1:05-cv-00829-AKH, 1:05-cv-00830-AKH,1:05-cv-00831-AKH,1:05-cv-00832-AKH,1:05-cv-00833-AKH,1:05-cv-00835-AKH, 1:05-cv-00836-AKH,1:05-cv-00837-AKH,1:05-cv-00838-AKH,1:05-cv-00839-AKH,1:05-cv-00840-AKH, 1:05-cv-00841-AKH,1:05-cv-00842-AKH,1:05-cv-00843-AKH,1:05-cv-00844-AKH,1:05-cv-00845-AKH, 1:05-cv-00846-AKH,1:05-cv-00847-AKH,1:05-cv-00874-AKH,1:05-cv-00920-AKH,1:05-cv-00921-AKH, 1:05-cv-01047-AKH,1:05-cv-01048-AKH,1:05-cv-01062-AKH,1:05-cv-01063-AKH,1:05-cv-01064-AKH, 1:05-cv-01065-AKH,1:05-cv-01066-AKH,1:05-cv-01067-AKH,1:05-cv-01068-AKH,1:05-cv-01069-AKH, 1:05-cv-01070-AKH,1:05-cv-01071-AKH,1:05-cv-01072-AKH,1:05-cv-01073-AKH,1:05-cv-01074-AKH, 1:05-cv-01075-AKH,1:05-cv-01076-AKH,1:05-cv-01077-AKH,1:05-cv-01078-AKH,1:05-cv-01079-AKH, 1:05-cv-01080-AKH,1:05-cv-01081-AKH,1:05-cv-01082-AKH,1:05-cv-01083-AKH,1:05-cv-01089-AKH, 1:05-cv-01094-AKH,1:05-cv-01095-AKH,1:05-cv-01096-AKH,1:05-cv-01097-AKH,1:05-cv-01098-AKH, 1:05-cv-01099-AKH,1:05-cv-01100-AKH,1:05-cv-01101-AKH,1:05-cv-01102-AKH,1:05-cv-01103-AKH, 1:05-cv-01104-AKH,1:05-cv-01105-AKH,1:05-cv-01106-AKH,1:05-cv-01107-AKH,1:05-cv-01108-AKH, 1:05-cv-01109-AKH,1:05-cv-01110-AKH,1:05-cv-01111-AKH,1:05-cv-01112-AKH,1:05-cv-01113-AKH, 1:05-cv-01114-AKH,1:05-cv-01115-AKH,1:05-cv-01116-AKH,1:05-cv-01117-AKH,1:05-cv-01118-AKH, 1:05-cv-01119-AKH,1:05-cv-01120-AKH,1:05-cv-01121-AKH,1:05-cv-01122-AKH,1:05-cv-01123-AKH, 1:05-cv-01124-AKH,1:05-cv-01125-AKH,1:05-cv-01126-AKH,1:05-cv-01127-AKH,1:05-cv-01128-AKH, 1:05-cv-01129-AKH,1:05-cv-01130-AKH,1:05-cv-01131-AKH,1:05-cv-01132-AKH,1:05-cv-01133-AKH, 1:05-cv-01134-AKH,1:05-cv-01135-AKH,1:05-cv-01136-AKH,1:05-cv-01137-AKH,1:05-cv-01170-AKH, 1:05-cv-01171-AKH,1:05-cv-01172-AKH,1:05-cv-01173-AKH,1:05-cv-01174-AKH,1:05-cv-01180-AKH, 1:05-cv-01181-AKH,1:05-cv-01182-AKH,1:05-cv-01183-AKH,1:05-cv-01184-AKH,1:05-cv-01185-AKH, 1:05-cv-01186-AKH,1:05-cv-01187-AKH,1:05-cv-01188-AKH,1:05-cv-01189-AKH,1:05-cv-01190-AKH, 1:05-cv-01191-AKH,1:05-cv-01192-AKH,1:05-cv-01193-AKH,1:05-cv-01194-AKH,1:05-cv-01195-AKH, 1:05-cv-01196-AKH,1:05-cv-01197-AKH,1:05-cv-01198-AKH,1:05-cv-01199-AKH,1:05-cv-01200-AKH, 1:05-cv-01201-AKH,1:05-cv-01202-AKH,1:05-cv-01203-AKH,1:05-cv-01204-AKH,1:05-cv-01205-AKH, 1:05-cv-01206-AKH,1:05-cv-01207-AKH,1:05-cv-01208-AKH,1:05-cv-01209-AKH,1:05-cv-01210-AKH, 1:05-cv-01211-AKH,1:05-cv-01212-AKH,1:05-cv-01213-AKH,1:05-cv-01214-AKH,1:05-cv-01215-AKH, 1:05-cv-01216-AKH,1:05-cv-01217-AKH,1:05-cv-01218-AKH,1:05-cv-01219-AKH,1:05-cv-01220-AKH, 1:05-cv-01221-AKH,1:05-cv-01222-AKH,1:05-cv-01223-AKH,1:05-cv-01224-AKH,1:05-cv-01225-AKH, 1:05-cv-01226-AKH,1:05-cv-01227-AKH,1:05-cv-01228-AKH,1:05-cv-01229-AKH,1:05-cv-01230-AKH, 1:05-cv-01231-AKH,1:05-cv-01232-AKH,1:05-cv-01233-AKH,1:05-cv-01234-AKH,1:05-cv-01235-AKH, 1:05-cv-01236-AKH,1:05-cv-01237-AKH,1:05-cv-01238-AKH,1:05-cv-01239-AKH,1:05-cv-01240-AKH, 1:05-cv-01241-AKH,1:05-cv-01242-AKH,1:05-cv-01243-AKH,1:05-cv-01244-AKH,1:05-cv-01245-AKH, 1:05-cv-01246-AKH,1:05-cv-01247-AKH,1:05-cv-01248-AKH,1:05-cv-01249-AKH,1:05-cv-01250-AKH, 1:05-cv-01251-AKH,1:05-cv-01252-AKH,1:05-cv-01253-AKH,1:05-cv-01254-AKH,1:05-cv-01255-AKH, 1:05-cv-01256-AKH,1:05-cv-01257-AKH,1:05-cv-01258-AKH,1:05-cv-01259-AKH,1:05-cv-01260-AKH, 1:05-cv-01261-AKH,1:05-cv-01262-AKH,1:05-cv-01263-AKH,1:05-cv-01264-AKH,1:05-cv-01265-AKH, 1:05-cv-01266-AKH,1:05-cv-01267-AKH,1:05-cv-01268-AKH,1:05-cv-01269-AKH,1:05-cv-01270-AKH, 1:05-cv-01271-AKH,1:05-cv-01272-AKH,1:05-cv-01273-AKH,1:05-cv-01274-AKH,1:05-cv-01275-AKH, 1:05-cv-01276-AKH,1:05-cv-01277-AKH,1:05-cv-01278-AKH,1:05-cv-01279-AKH,1:05-cv-01280-AKH, 1:05-cv-01281-AKH,1:05-cv-01282-AKH,1:05-cv-01283-AKH,1:05-cv-01284-AKH,1:05-cv-01294-AKH, 1:05-cv-01326-AKH,1:05-cv-01327-AKH,1:05-cv-01328-AKH,1:05-cv-01329-AKH,1:05-cv-01330-AKH, 1:05-cv-01331-AKH,1:05-cv-01332-AKH,1:05-cv-01333-AKH,1:05-cv-01334-AKH,1:05-cv-01335-AKH, 1:05-cv-01336-AKH,1:05-cv-01337-AKH,1:05-cv-01338-AKH,1:05-cv-01339-AKH,1:05-cv-01340-AKH, 1:05-cv-01342-AKH,1:05-cv-01344-AKH,1:05-cv-01345-AKH,1:05-cv-01347-AKH,1:05-cv-01349-AKH, 1:05-cv-01350-AKH,1:05-cv-01352-AKH,1:05-cv-01354-AKH,1:05-cv-01355-AKH,1:05-cv-01359-AKH, 1:05-cv-01361-AKH,1:05-cv-01362-AKH,1:05-cv-01363-AKH,1:05-cv-01364-AKH,1:05-cv-01365-AKH, 1:05-cv-01367-AKH,1:05-cv-01369-AKH,1:05-cv-01371-AKH,1:05-cv-01372-AKH,1:05-cv-01375-AKH, 1:05-cv-01377-AKH,1:05-cv-01379-AKH,1:05-cv-01380-AKH,1:05-cv-01382-AKH,1:05-cv-01383-AKH, 1:05-cv-01384-AKH,1:05-cv-01385-AKH,1:05-cv-01387-AKH,1:05-cv-01392-AKH,1:05-cv-01394-AKH, 1:05-cv-01396-AKH,1:05-cv-01397-AKH,1:05-cv-01399-AKH,1:05-cv-01401-AKH,1:05-cv-01405-AKH, 1:05-cv-01408-AKH,1:05-cv-01410-AKH,1:05-cv-01412-AKH,1:05-cv-01417-AKH,1:05-cv-01418-AKH, 1:05-cv-01420-AKH,1:05-cv-01422-AKH,1:05-cv-01424-AKH,1:05-cv-01425-AKH,1:05-cv-01426-AKH, 1:05-cv-01427-AKH,1:05-cv-01428-AKH,1:05-cv-01429-AKH,1:05-cv-01430-AKH,1:05-cv-01432-AKH, 1:05-cv-01433-AKH,1:05-cv-01434-AKH,1:05-cv-01436-AKH,1:05-cv-01437-AKH,1:05-cv-01438-AKH, 1:05-cv-01440-AKH,1:05-cv-01442-AKH,1:05-cv-01451-AKH,1:05-cv-01452-AKH,1:05-cv-01462-AKH, 1:05-cv-01463-AKH,1:05-cv-01464-AKH,1:05-cv-01465-AKH,1:05-cv-01466-AKH,1:05-cv-01467-AKH, 1:05-cv-01468-AKH,1:05-cv-01469-AKH,1:05-cv-01470-AKH,1:05-cv-01471-AKH,1:05-cv-01472-AKH, 1:05-cv-01473-AKH,1:05-cv-01474-AKH,1:05-cv-01475-AKH,1:05-cv-01476-AKH,1:05-cv-01477-AKH, 1:05-cv-01478-AKH,1:05-cv-01479-AKH,1:05-cv-01480-AKH,1:05-cv-01481-AKH,1:05-cv-01482-AKH, 1:05-cv-01483-AKH,1:05-cv-01484-AKH,1:05-cv-01485-AKH,1:05-cv-01486-AKH,1:05-cv-01494-AKH, 1:05-cv-01495-AKH,1:05-cv-01496-AKH,1:05-cv-01497-AKH,1:05-cv-01498-AKH,1:05-cv-01499-AKH, 1:05-cv-01500-AKH,1:05-cv-01503-AKH,1:05-cv-01504-AKH,1:05-cv-01505-AKH,1:05-cv-01507-AKH, 1:05-cv-01508-AKH,1:05-cv-01509-AKH,1:05-cv-01510-AKH,1:05-cv-01511-AKH,1:05-cv-01513-AKH, 1:05-cv-01514-AKH,1:05-cv-01515-AKH,1:05-cv-01516-AKH,1:05-cv-01517-AKH,1:05-cv-01518-AKH, 1:05-cv-01519-AKH,1:05-cv-01520-AKH,1:05-cv-01521-AKH,1:05-cv-01522-AKH,1:05-cv-01523-AKH, 1:05-cv-01575-AKH,1:05-cv-01576-AKH,1:05-cv-01577-AKH,1:05-cv-01578-AKH,1:05-cv-01579-AKH, 1:05-cv-01580-AKH,1:05-cv-01581-AKH,1:05-cv-01582-AKH,1:05-cv-01583-AKH,1:05-cv-01584-AKH, 1:05-cv-01585-AKH,1:05-cv-01586-AKH,1:05-cv-01587-AKH,1:05-cv-01588-AKH,1:05-cv-01589-AKH, 1:05-cv-01590-AKH,1:05-cv-01591-AKH,1:05-cv-01592-AKH,1:05-cv-01593-AKH,1:05-cv-01594-AKH, 1:05-cv-01595-AKH,1:05-cv-01596-AKH,1:05-cv-01597-AKH,1:05-cv-01598-AKH,1:05-cv-01599-AKH, 1:05-cv-01600-AKH,1:05-cv-01601-AKH,1:05-cv-01602-AKH,1:05-cv-01603-AKH,1:05-cv-01604-AKH, 1:05-cv-01605-AKH,1:05-cv-01606-AKH,1:05-cv-01607-AKH,1:05-cv-01608-AKH,1:05-cv-01609-AKH, 1:05-cv-01610-AKH,1:05-cv-01611-AKH,1:05-cv-01612-AKH,1:05-cv-01613-AKH,1:05-cv-01614-AKH, 1:05-cv-01615-AKH,1:05-cv-01616-AKH,1:05-cv-01617-AKH,1:05-cv-01618-AKH,1:05-cv-01619-AKH, 1:05-cv-01620-AKH,1:05-cv-01621-AKH,1:05-cv-01622-AKH,1:05-cv-01623-AKH,1:05-cv-01624-AKH, 1:05-cv-01625-AKH,1:05-cv-01626-AKH,1:05-cv-01627-AKH,1:05-cv-01628-AKH,1:05-cv-01629-AKH, 1:05-cv-01630-AKH,1:05-cv-01631-AKH,1:05-cv-01632-AKH,1:05-cv-01633-AKH,1:05-cv-01634-AKH, 1:05-cv-01635-AKH,1:05-cv-01636-AKH,1:05-cv-01637-AKH,1:05-cv-01638-AKH,1:05-cv-01639-AKH, 1:05-cv-01640-AKH,1:05-cv-01641-AKH,1:05-cv-01642-AKH,1:05-cv-01643-RJH,1:05-cv-01644-AKH, 1:05-cv-01645-AKH,1:05-cv-01646-AKH,1:05-cv-01647-AKH,1:05-cv-01648-AKH,1:05-cv-01649-AKH, 1:05-cv-01650-AKH,1:05-cv-01651-AKH,1:05-cv-01652-AKH,1:05-cv-01653-AKH,1:05-cv-01654-AKH, 1:05-cv-01655-AKH,1:05-cv-01656-AKH,1:05-cv-01657-AKH,1:05-cv-01658-AKH,1:05-cv-01660-AKH, 1:05-cv-01662-AKH,1:05-cv-01663-AKH,1:05-cv-01664-AKH,1:05-cv-01665-AKH,1:05-cv-01666-AKH, 1:05-cv-01667-AKH,1:05-cv-01668-AKH,1:05-cv-01669-AKH,1:05-cv-01670-AKH,1:05-cv-01671-AKH, 1:05-cv-01673-AKH,1:05-cv-01674-AKH,1:05-cv-01675-AKH,1:05-cv-01676-AKH,1:05-cv-01677-AKH, 1:05-cv-01678-AKH,1:05-cv-01679-AKH,1:05-cv-01680-AKH,1:05-cv-01681-AKH,1:05-cv-01682-AKH, 1:05-cv-01683-AKH,1:05-cv-01684-AKH,1:05-cv-01685-AKH,1:05-cv-01686-AKH,1:05-cv-01687-AKH, 1:05-cv-01688-AKH,1:05-cv-01689-AKH,1:05-cv-01690-AKH,1:05-cv-01691-AKH,1:05-cv-01692-AKH, 1:05-cv-01693-AKH,1:05-cv-01694-AKH,1:05-cv-01695-AKH,1:05-cv-01696-AKH,1:05-cv-01697-AKH, 1:05-cv-01698-AKH,1:05-cv-01699-AKH,1:05-cv-01700-AKH,1:05-cv-01701-AKH,1:05-cv-01702-AKH, 1:05-cv-01703-AKH,1:05-cv-01704-AKH,1:05-cv-01705-AKH,1:05-cv-01706-AKH,1:05-cv-01707-AKH, 1:05-cv-01709-AKH,1:05-cv-01710-AKH,1:05-cv-01711-AKH,1:05-cv-01712-AKH,1:05-cv-01713-AKH, 1:05-cv-01714-AKH,1:05-cv-01715-AKH,1:05-cv-01716-AKH,1:05-cv-01717-AKH,1:05-cv-01718-AKH, 1:05-cv-01719-AKH,1:05-cv-01720-AKH,1:05-cv-01721-AKH,1:05-cv-01722-AKH,1:05-cv-01723-AKH, 1:05-cv-01724-AKH,1:05-cv-01725-AKH,1:05-cv-01726-AKH,1:05-cv-01727-AKH,1:05-cv-01729-AKH, 1:05-cv-01730-AKH,1:05-cv-01731-AKH,1:05-cv-01732-AKH,1:05-cv-01733-AKH,1:05-cv-01734-AKH, 1:05-cv-01735-AKH,1:05-cv-01736-AKH,1:05-cv-01737-AKH,1:05-cv-01738-AKH,1:05-cv-01739-AKH, 1:05-cv-01740-AKH,1:05-cv-01742-AKH,1:05-cv-01743-AKH,1:05-cv-01744-AKH,1:05-cv-01745-AKH, 1:05-cv-01746-AKH,1:05-cv-01747-AKH,1:05-cv-01748-AKH,1:05-cv-01749-AKH,1:05-cv-01750-AKH, 1:05-cv-01751-AKH,1:05-cv-01752-AKH,1:05-cv-01753-AKH,1:05-cv-01754-AKH,1:05-cv-01756-AKH, 1:05-cv-01757-AKH,1:05-cv-01758-AKH,1:05-cv-01759-AKH,1:05-cv-01760-AKH,1:05-cv-01761-AKH, 1:05-cv-01762-AKH,1:05-cv-01763-AKH,1:05-cv-01764-AKH,1:05-cv-01765-AKH,1:05-cv-01766-AKH, 1:05-cv-01767-AKH,1:05-cv-01768-AKH,1:05-cv-01769-AKH,1:05-cv-01770-AKH,1:05-cv-01771-AKH, 1:05-cv-01772-AKH,1:05-cv-01773-AKH,1:05-cv-01774-AKH,1:05-cv-01775-AKH,1:05-cv-01776-AKH, 1:05-cv-01778-AKH,1:05-cv-01779-AKH,1:05-cv-01780-AKH,1:05-cv-01781-AKH,1:05-cv-01782-AKH, 1:05-cv-01783-AKH,1:05-cv-01784-AKH,1:05-cv-01785-AKH,1:05-cv-01786-AKH,1:05-cv-01787-AKH, 1:05-cv-01788-AKH,1:05-cv-01789-AKH,1:05-cv-01790-AKH,1:05-cv-01791-AKH,1:05-cv-01792-AKH, 1:05-cv-01793-AKH,1:05-cv-01794-AKH,1:05-cv-01795-AKH,1:05-cv-01917-AKH,1:05-cv-02034-AKH, 1:05-cv-02035-AKH,1:05-cv-02037-AKH,1:05-cv-02135-AKH,1:05-cv-02136-AKH,1:05-cv-02178-AKH, 1:05-cv-02320-AKH,1:05-cv-02444-AKH,1:05-cv-02446-AKH,1:05-cv-02493-AKH,1:05-cv-02495-AKH, 1:05-cv-02496-AKH,1:05-cv-02497-AKH,1:05-cv-02498-AKH,1:05-cv-02499-AKH,1:05-cv-02500-AKH, 1:05-cv-02501-AKH,1:05-cv-02502-AKH,1:05-cv-02551-AKH,1:05-cv-02629-AKH,1:05-cv-02651-AKH, 1:05-cv-02726-AKH,1:05-cv-02866-AKH,1:05-cv-02988-AKH,1:05-cv-03162-AKH,1:05-cv-03303-AKH, 1:05-cv-03304-AKH,1:05-cv-03305-AKH,1:05-cv-03333-AKH,1:05-cv-03379-AKH,1:05-cv-03450-AKH, 1:05-cv-03692-AKH,1:05-cv-03693-AKH,1:05-cv-03694-AKH,1:05-cv-03695-AKH,1:05-cv-03712-AKH, 1:05-cv-03714-AKH,1:05-cv-03801-AKH,1:05-cv-03802-AKH,1:05-cv-03822-AKH,1:05-cv-04081-AKH, 1:05-cv-04109-AKH,1:05-cv-04110-AKH,1:05-cv-04111-AKH,1:05-cv-04147-AKH,1:05-cv-04214-AKH, 1:05-cv-04215-AKH,1:05-cv-04216-AKH,1:05-cv-04217-AKH,1:05-cv-04218-AKH,1:05-cv-04222-AKH, 1:05-cv-04223-AKH,1:05-cv-04224-AKH,1:05-cv-04225-AKH,1:05-cv-04226-AKH,1:05-cv-04227-AKH, 1:05-cv-04228-AKH,1:05-cv-04229-AKH,1:05-cv-04230-AKH,1:05-cv-04231-AKH,1:05-cv-04240-AKH, 1:05-cv-04241-AKH,1:05-cv-04242-AKH,1:05-cv-04272-AKH,1:05-cv-04273-AKH,1:05-cv-04335-AKH, 1:05-cv-04336-AKH,1:05-cv-04337-AKH,1:05-cv-04338-AKH,1:05-cv-04339-AKH,1:05-cv-04340-AKH, 1:05-cv-04341-AKH,1:05-cv-04442-AKH,1:05-cv-04443-AKH,1:05-cv-04537-AKH,1:05-cv-04853-AKH, 1:05-cv-04956-AKH,1:05-cv-05170-AKH,1:05-cv-05171-AKH,1:05-cv-05173-AKH,1:05-cv-05174-AKH, 1:05-cv-05175-AKH,1:05-cv-05480-AKH,1:05-cv-05509-AKH,1:05-cv-05510-AKH,1:05-cv-05581-AKH, 1:05-cv-05601-AKH,1:05-cv-05666-AKH,1:05-cv-05867-AKH,1:05-cv-05891-AKH,1:05-cv-05892-AKH, 1:05-cv-06063-AKH,1:05-cv-06137-AKH,1:05-cv-06205-AKH,1:05-cv-06213-AKH,1:05-cv-06214-AKH, 1:05-cv-06215-AKH,1:05-cv-06216-AKH,1:05-cv-06217-AKH,1:05-cv-06218-AKH,1:05-cv-06240-AKH, 1:05-cv-06269-AKH,1:05-cv-06284-AKH,1:05-cv-06285-AKH,1:05-cv-06308-AKH,1:05-cv-06310-AKH, 1:05-cv-06311-AKH,1:05-cv-06312-AKH,1:05-cv-06318-AKH,1:05-cv-06460-AKH,1:05-cv-06524-AKH, 1:05-cv-07031-AKH,1:05-cv-07142-AKH,1:05-cv-07148-AKH,1:05-cv-07149-AKH,1:05-cv-07150-AKH, 1:05-cv-07152-AKH,1:05-cv-07154-AKH,1:05-cv-07161-AKH,1:05-cv-07162-AKH,1:05-cv-07163-AKH, 1:05-cv-07164-AKH,1:05-cv-07165-AKH,1:05-cv-07166-AKH,1:05-cv-07167-AKH,1:05-cv-07168-AKH, 1:05-cv-07186-AKH,1:05-cv-07187-AKH,1:05-cv-07189-AKH,1:05-cv-07190-AKH,1:05-cv-07191-AKH, 1:05-cv-07205-AKH,1:05-cv-07206-AKH,1:05-cv-07207-AKH,1:05-cv-07208-AKH,1:05-cv-07210-AKH, 1:05-cv-07211-AKH,1:05-cv-07212-AKH,1:05-cv-07258-AKH,1:05-cv-07259-AKH,1:05-cv-07266-AKH, 1:05-cv-07267-AKH,1:05-cv-07273-AKH,1:05-cv-07289-AKH,1:05-cv-07290-AKH,1:05-cv-07291-AKH, 1:05-cv-07415-AKH,1:05-cv-07685-AKH,1:05-cv-07686-AKH,1:05-cv-07875-AKH,1:05-cv-07877-AKH, 1:05-cv-07878-AKH,1:05-cv-07879-AKH,1:05-cv-07937-AKH,1:05-cv-07986-AKH(rjm, ) (Entered: 09/27/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, 1 World Trade Center, LLC, 2 World Trade Center, LLC, 4 World Trade Center, LLC, 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Amec Construction Management, Inc.,, Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, LLC., Plaza Construction Management Corp.,, Plaza Construction Corp.,, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company,, Tully Environmental, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Tully Industries, Inc.,, Tully Consulting Corp.,, Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC, LLC., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Communications Holdings Company, Inc., Silverstein WTC, LLC, Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bovis Holdings Limited, Bovis International, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease Interiors, Inc., Liberty Mutual Managed Care, Inc., Turner/Plaza, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., World Trade Center Properties, LLC, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Anthony Serevino.(lb, ) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jeh, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against 2 WTC Holdings, LLC, 4 WTC Holdings, LLC, 5 WTC Holdings, LLC, 1 World Trade Center, LLC, 2 World Trade Center, LLC, 4 World Trade Center, LLC, 5 World Trade Center, LLC, Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Amec Construction Management, Inc.,, Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International, LLC., Plaza Construction Management Corp.,, Plaza Construction Corp.,, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company,, Tully Environmental, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Tully Industries, Inc.,, Tully Consulting Corp.,, Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding, LLC, Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield WTC, LLC., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Communications Holdings Company, Inc., Silverstein WTC, LLC, Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc.,, Consolidated Edison Development, Inc.,, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein WTC Management Co., LLC, Silverstein WTC Properties, LLC, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, LLC., World Trade Center Properties, LLC, 1 WTC Holdings, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 533696)Document filed by Anthony Serevino.(gf, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?