USA v. Iong, et al
Criminal Case Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00117-HG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie E. Osborne, Jr. +5412 541 541 2850 les.osborne@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Hawaii
Filed 3/23/2005
County Honolulu
Terminated 7/2/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-2
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 ATTEMPT TO EVADE OR DEFEAT TAX
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY
Count 11
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1028A.F
Offense Level 4
181028(a)(4) FRAUD WITH IDENTIFICATION DOCUMENTS
Count 3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7201.F
Offense Level 4
267201 ATTEMPT TO EVADE OR DEFEAT TAX
Count 4-9
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, sentencing to Counts 3 and 11 of the indictment as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, held on 06-07-2007, before Chief Judge Helen Gillmor. Court Reporter: Steve Platt. (sp@hid.uscourts.gov) 60 pages.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Receipt for Passport
    Receipt for RETURN of Passport as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong Passport Number 120949827 (bbb, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Judgment Returned Executed
      Judgment Returned Executed as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong on 07/26/2007 to FDC Honolulu HI. (bbb, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 96 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Sentencing Recommendation +
        SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION (Original sealed and held in probation office) as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (bbb, )
          LREF
          Blank 95 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Presentence Investigation Report
          PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT ((Original sealed and held in probation office) as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (bbb, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
            COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of a SIGNED [94] SOR has been reserved by First Class Mail to Mr. Brian Hershman at the addresses of record on 07/05/2007 and re-distributed to USA, USPO, USPTS & USM. (bbb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10, Government's Oral Motion to Dismiss the counts 1, 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 of the Indictment as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong is GRANTED.; Count(s) 11, Imprisonment: 24 MONTHS as to each of Counts 3 and 11, to run concurrently.; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 YEARS as to Counts 3 and 1 YEAR as to Count 11, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00 ($100.00 as to each of Counts 3 and 11); Count(s) 3, Imprisonment: 24 MONTHS as to each of Counts 3 and 11, to run concurrently.; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 YEARS as to Counts 3 and 1 YEAR as to Count 11, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00 ($100.00 as to each of Counts 3 and 11). Signed by Chief Judge HELEN GILLMOR on July 1, 2007. (bbb, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [94] Judgment as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong has been served by First Class Mail to Deft's counsel Brian Hershman at the addresses of record w/SOR on 07/03/2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb, )
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                  EP: SENTENCING AS TO COUNTS 3 AND 11 OF THE INDICTMENT AS TO DEFENDANT (01) KENNETH CHIO HENG IONG held on 6/7/2007 - The defendant is present on bond.; 1:43 CST Stephen Hawkins.; The Memorandum of Plea Agreement is accepted.; ADJUDGED: Count(s) 11 and Count(s) 3, Imprisonment: 24 MONTHS as to each of Counts 3 and 11, to run concurrently.; SUPERVISED RELEASE: 3 YEARS as to Counts 3 and 1 YEAR as to Count 11, to run concurrently; Special Assessment: $200.00 ($100.00 as to each of Counts 3 and 11); Government's Oral Motion to Dismiss Count(s) 1 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, and 10 of the Indictment as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong is GRANTED.; Advised of rights to appeal the sentence, etc.; US Attorney Leslie E. Osborne, jr., Florence Poon-URS, Jason Pa-ICE, (01) Brian Hershman and Roy T. Kawamoto-USPO present. (Court Reporter Stephen B. Platt.) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1;# (2) Exhibit 2;# (3) Exhibit 4 (SEALED);# (4) Exhibit 5 (SEALED);# (5) Exhibit 6 (SEALED);# (6) Exhibit 8;# (7) Exhibit 3;# (8) Exhibit 7) (Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR ) (bbb, ) Modified on 7/17/2007 (afc).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                    SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (cc: HG) [SEALED] (bbb, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                      Government's REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S BUSINESS AND COMMUNITY INFORMATION; Certificate of Service as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (cc: HG) [SEALED] (bbb, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Sentencing Memorandum
                        SENTENCING Position MEMORANDUM by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (Attachments: # (1) Index of Exhibits & Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Exhibit G# (8) Exhibit H# (9) Exhibit I# (10) Exhibit J# (11) Exhibit K# (12) Exhibit L# (13) Exhibit M# (14) Exhibit N# (15) Exhibit O# (16) Exhibit P# (17) Exhibit Q# (18) Exhibit R# (19) Exhitib S# (20) Exhibit T# (21) Exhibit U# (22) Exhibit V# (23) Exhibit W# (24) Exhibit X# (25) Certificate of Service)(gab, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Sentencing Statement
                          SENTENCING STATEMENT Government's Sentencing Statement and Certificate of Service by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (Osborne, Leslie)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Sentencing Statement
                            Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's SENTENCING STATEMENT AND OBJECTIONS TO PRESENTENCE REPORT. (cc: HG) (bbb, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Mail Returned
                              Mail Returned [85] as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DEFENDANT KENNETH CHIO HENG IONG (01). (bbb, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Findings and Recommendations on CJA Compensation CCourt Filing
                                FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on CJA Compensation Claim as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. Signed by Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 4/9/2007. (gab, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Acceptance of Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                  ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY, ADJUDICATION OF GUILT AND NOTICE OF SENTENCING as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong - Signed by Judge HELEN GILLMOR (emt, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                    COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [85] "ACCEPTANCE OF PLEA OF GUILTY, ADJUDICATION OF GUILT AND NOTICE OF SENTENCING" as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on April 5, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Terminate Motions
                                      EO: DEFENDANT KENNETH CHIO HENG IONG'S MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING [80] is DENIED. As the Government pointed out in their March 16, 2007 response to the Defendant's motion to continue, this case has been continued numerous times at the request of the Defendant. The Court notes the Government has made discovery available to the new defense attorney since February 23, 2006. The defense has an additional two and one-half more months prior to sentencing. There is ample time to deal with the issues presented here. cc: AUSA Leslie E. Osborne, Jr., Esq.; (01) Leighton K. Lee, Esq.; (01) Brian D. Hershman, Esq. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(afc)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [80] MOTION to Continue Sentencing (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Motion to Continue
                                          Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING HEARING;# (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion;# (2) Declaration of Brian D. Hershman;# (3) Certificate of Service. (cc: HG) (bbb, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE OF PASSPORT - RETURNED TO Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung on 03/13/2007. (bbb, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                              Stuart N. Fujioka's EX PARTE MOTION TO UNSEAL [35] 6/21/06 Ex Parte Motion to Incur Litigation Expenses AND ORDER;# (1) Declaration of Movant;# (2) Exhibit A;# (3) ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. Signed by Magistrate Judge LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on March 5, 2007.(bbb, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Order to DismissCourt Filing
                                                Government's MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung., ***Update Disposition Information: Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (2), Count(s) 10, ORDER TO DISMISS - GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge HELEN GILLMOR on March 5, 2007. (bbb, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                  Certificate of Service by USA as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re: Motion and Order to Dismiss (Osborne, Leslie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's ORDER Granting [70] Application for Brian D. Hershman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (re [69] Filing Fee Received). Signed by Magistrate Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on February 23, 2007. (bbb, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT Kenneth Chio Heng Iong; ORDER. [Added attorney Leighton K. Lee for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong.] Signed by Magistrate Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on February 23, 2007. (bbb, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Report and Recommendations on Guilty PleaCourt Filing
                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on Plea of Guilty as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on February 23, 2007. (bbb, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Plea Agreement
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (bbb, )
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Consent to Rule 11 PleaCourt Filing
                                                            CONSENT to Rule 11 Plea in a Felony Case Before United States Magistrate Judge by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (bbb, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                              EP: MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF NOT GUILTY PLEA AND TO PLEAD ANEW as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong Hearing held on 2/23/2007 - Defendant present, not in custody.; Memorandum of Plea Agreement signatures verified and filed.; Plea of GUILTY as to Counts 3 and 11 of the Indictment entered by the Defendant.; Sentencing set for 6/7/2007 01:30 PM before Chief JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (FTR-Ctrm C5 2:09 - 2:33.) (Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(bbb, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S [70] EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR BRIAN D. HERSHMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge BARRY M. KURREN on February 22, 2007. (bbb, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Filing Fee Received
                                                                  PRO HAC VICE filing fee : $ 225.00, receipt number 238509 for attorney BRIAN D. HERSHMAN as to Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (bbb, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR BRIAN D. HERSHMAN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE;# (1) Consent;# (2) Declaration of Leighton K. Lee;# (3) Declaration of Brian D. Hershman, [69] Filing Fee Received. (bbb, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      REPORT OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, MINUTES AND ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [67]. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/12/07. (afc)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
                                                                        COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [68] REPORT OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, MINUTES AND ORDER, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 13, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                          EP : Final Pretrial Conference. Defendant 01 present, not in custody.Presence waived as to Defendant 02. Motion for Withdrawal of Not Guilty Plea and toPlead Anew as to Defendant 01 set 2/23/07 at 2:00pm before Judge Chang. CRIMINAL FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCEJury Trial before Judge Helen Gillmor on March 13, 2007 at 9:00.a.m.. Pretrial Conference before HG at 8:30am on March 5, 2007.(FTR-Ctrm C5; 9:59:35-10:03:46 a.m..) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(gab, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                            EO :Kenneth Chio Heng Iong: Motion for Withdrawal of Not Guilty Plea and to Plead Anew as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong set for 2/23/2007 02:00 PM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Findings and Recommendations on CJA Compensation CCourt Filing
                                                                              FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS on CJA Compensation Claim as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [27] CJA 20 - Appointment - attorney DAVID KLEIN, ESQ. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 02/02/07. (afc)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act; ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, ***Excludable started as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung:, ***Excludable(s) stopped as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 3/13/2007 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR.. Signed by Judge HELEN GILLMOR on 10/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Order) (gab, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2006 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Kenneth Iong's [45] MOTION to Sever Count 11, [44] MOTION to Suppress Statement Made November 6, 2003, [46] MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment, [58] MOTION to Continue by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong; Certificate of Service. (gab, )
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Terminate Motions
                                                                                    Minute Order : Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's MOTION to Continue 10/24/06 TrialDate and (02) Defendant Chiu Lai Yung's Joinder in Defendant Kenneth Iong's MOTIONto Continue October 24, 2006 Trial Date, Filed September 15, 2006 has been renderedMOOT.The parties have stipulated to a new trial date of March 13, 2007. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                      Minute Order : Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 3/13/2007 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                        Joinder in Defendant Kenneth Iong's [58] MOTION to Continue October 24, 2006 Trial Date, Filed September 15, 2006 by Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung; Certificate of Service (gab, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                          MOTION to Continue 10/24/06 Trial Date by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Motion# (2) Declaration of Counsel# (3) Certificate of Service)(gab, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel; ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Added attorney David F. Klein for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. Attorney John S. Edmunds terminated in case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. . Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 9/6/2006. (gab, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                              CJA 20 as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong: Appointment of Attorney Stuart N. Fujioka for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. . Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/25/2006. (gab, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                EP : FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE -DEFENDANT (01) KENNETH CHIO HENG IONG?S MOTION:1. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL -2. TO SUPPRESS STATEMENT MADE NOVEMBER 6,2003 -3. TO SEVER COUNT II -4. TO DISMISS COUNT 1 OF THE INDICTMENT - Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc.49) is GRANTED. The Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Oral Motion to Withdraw[doc. 46] Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Dismiss Count 1 of theIndictment (Doc. 46) is GRANTED. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Suppress Statement Made onNovember 6, 2003 and Motion to Sever Count 11 - continued to October 6, 2006 at 9:00a.m. before Judge Gillmor.The Final Pretrial Conference before Magistrate Judge Kobayashi on August 28,2006 is continued to September 22, 2006 at 10:00 am. before Magistrate Judge Kurren.The Final Pretrial Conference is set for October 17, 2006 at 8:30 a.m. beforeJudge Gillmor.The Jury Trial is continued from September 12, 2006 to October 24, 2006 at 9:30a.m. before Judge Gillmor. The Court orders that the periodfrom September 12, 2006 to and including October 24, 2006 be excluded fromcomputation under the Speedy Trial Act.(Court Reporter Debra Chun.) (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [46] MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment United States' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Certificate of Service)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [45] MOTION to Sever Count 11 United States' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Sever Count 11 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law# (2) Certificate of Service)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [44] MOTION to Suppress Statement Made November 6, 2003 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law# (2) Certificate of Service)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                        EO :Set/Reset Hearings as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: At defendant's request, Final Pretrial Conference set 8/21/06 has been continued to 8/28/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong [49] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David F. Klein.: Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (dhh)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006, Terminated: 8/25/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David F. Klein. by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Counsel# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, David)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                              E.O. :Set/Reset Hearings as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (dhh)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong [46] MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment, [45] MOTION to Sever Count 11, [44] MOTION to Suppress Statement Made November 6, 2003: Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (dhh)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 8/25/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Indictment by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, David)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Sever Count 11 by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, David)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2006 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Suppress Statement Made November 6, 2003 by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Motion# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, David)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [42] Terminate Motions, Set Hearings, Order, Speedy Trial - Excludable Start, Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop,,,,,,,,,, Order Continuing Trial (Osborne, Leslie)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Government's ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 9/12/2006 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. [Motions terminated as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: [37] MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline ***Excludable started 08/15/2006 thru Excludable(s) stopped 09/11/2006 as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung]. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on July 24, 2006. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                            EP: 1. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's [37]MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND PRETRIAL MOTION DEADLINE 2. Final Pretrial Conference Hearing as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung held on 7/17/2006 - [Reset Hearings:, ***Excludable started 08/15/2006:, ***Excludable(s) stopped 09/11/2006] Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline - GRANTED; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 9/12/2006 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (FTR-Ctrm C5 10:47 - 10:58.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG ) (bbb, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [37] MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Leslie E. Osborne, Jr.)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong [37] MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline: Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2006 at 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (wnn, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: 7/5/2006, Terminated: 7/24/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Counsel# (2) Certificate of Service)(Klein, David)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    EX PARTE MOTION TO SEAL [35] Ex Parte Motion to Incur Litigation Expenses #1; Declaration of Counsel; AND ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong . Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on June 21, 2006. [SEALED] (bbb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bbb, ).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Deft's EX PARTE MOTION To Incur Litigation Expenses #1; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibit a AND ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong . Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on June 21, 2006. [SEALED] (bbb, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2007 (bbb, ). Modified on 3/15/2007 - UNSEALING pursuant to [81] Order (bbb, ).
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                        WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong re [31] First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release COS filed by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, and COS (Klein, David)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          EO :Motion terminated as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong-[31] First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong set for hearing 5/18/2006 before Judge Chang is hereby vacated. A Withdrawal of this Motion will be submitted by Defendant's Counsel David Klein. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(lls, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong [31] Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's Motion to Amend Terms of Release set for 5/18/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (sna, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006, Terminated: 5/18/2006 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release COS by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. (Klein, David)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 1/2/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER to allow travel to Nevada - as to(02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung - leaving on 12/31/05 and returning on or before 01/08/06. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/29/05. (lmg, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Order of Entry
                                                                                                                                                  EO: Trial Setting Conference set for 12/12/2005 10:00:00 AM before KSC is vacated. Parties will stipulate to new trial date/deadlines. in case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong: Appointment of Attorney David F. Klein for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong. Signed by Judge BARRY M KURREN on 11/30/2005. (bbb, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      EP: MINUTES: Hearing Re Appointment of Counsel as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong - deft present on bail. Deft was previously sworn to the Financial Affidavit. Oral Motioni for Appt of Counsel GRANTED. CJA counsel to be appointed. Trial date vacated. Trial Setting Conference set for 12-12-05 @ 10 a.m., KSC. EO: David Klein appointed as CJA counsel.; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Loretta A. Faymonville present (Ct Rptr: C6 10:08-10:13) by Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                        FINANCIAL Affidavit as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (gs)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on Hearing Re Appointment of Counsel as to (01) Kenneth C.H. Iong is set for 11-30-05 @ 10 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. cc: Leslie Osborne Notified by phone: (01) Kenneth C.H. Iong (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting trial date and finding excludable time; certificate of service by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; jury trial set for 9:00 1/10/06; pretrial conference set for 10:00 12/12/05 for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung , time excluded between 08/30/2005 thru 01/09/2006 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting trial date and finding excludable time; certificate of service by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; jury trial set for 9:00 1/10/06; pretrial conference set for 10:00 12/12/05 for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung , time excluded between 08/30/2005 thru 01/09/2006 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - 08/01/2005 - ORIG - ( Juvelynn Punzal/ESR ) - pp 10 ;as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  EP: MINUTES: Final Pretrial Conference not held. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong present, not in custody. Defendant (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung not present, presence waived. Defendant (01)'s Oral Motion to Continue Trial Granted. Case declared Complex. Jury Selection/Trial is continued to 9:00 1/10/06, HG. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 10:00 12/12/05, KSC. Defendant's Motions due 11/28/05. Government's Response due 12/12/05. Time excluded from 8/30/05 thru 1/10/06 from the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Govt to prepare Order. , ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Loretta A. Faymonville, Kenneth Choi Heng Ion-Pro Se present ( Ct Rptr: C7 10:09-10:17) by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - 05/02/05 - ORIG - ( ESR transcriber: Juvelynn Punzal ) - pp 23 ;as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      EP: MINUTES: Status Conference Re: New Counsel for Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong; Trial Setting Conference: Defendants (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, present, not in custody. Court questions Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong extensively. Defendant wishes to represent himself in the CR matter. Blank Financial Affidavit given to Defendant. Defendant may fill out affidavit and submit under seal tot he Court if he wishes to. Court finds that the Defendant has knowingly and voluntarily waived his right to counsel. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong will be proceeding as pro se. Govt's Oral Motion to Designate Case Complex Granted. New trial date and deadlines given. Jury Selection/Trial set for 9:00 8/30/05, HG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 8/1/05, LEK. Defendant's Motions due 7/18/05. Government's Response due 8/1/05. Time excluded from 5/24/05 thru 8/30/05 from the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Govt to prepare Order. Defendants (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung's current conditions of release to continue.; time excluded between 05/24/2005 thru 08/30/2005 ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Donna Gray for Loretta Faymonville present ( Ct Rptr: C7 10:45-11:06) by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        PS UNexecuted on 4/1/05 as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - 04/18/05 - ORIG - ( ESR Juvelynn Punzal ) - pp 8 ;as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (lmg)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            EP: MINUTES: Status Conference Re New Counsel and Trial Date of May 24, 2005 as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong - deft present on bail. Deft's request for more time to retain counsel granted. Further Status Conference and Trial Setting Conference set for 5-2-05 @ 10:30 a.m., LEK. Trial date of 5-24-05 vacated. Leslie Osborne to notify Loretta Faymonville. jury trial held on 4/18/05 ; status hearing set for 10:30 5/2/05 for Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr. present ( Ct Rptr: C6 10:37-10:43) by Judge Barry M. Kurren (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE and Receipt of Passport - 751413653 Passport Number (placed in vault) by defendant Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung ( $10,000.00 UNSECURED posted ) by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Detention - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE BOND ( $10,000.00 UNSECURED) posted by Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung signed by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                    FINANCIAL Affidavit as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      EP: MINUTES: Initial Appearance and A & P to Indictment - deft present not in custody. Deft sworn to Financial Affidavit. Oral M/Court Appt Atty GRANTED. Arrn waived. Plea of NOT GUILTY entered. Dates given: JS/JT 5-24-05 @ 9 a.m., HG FPT 5-2-05 @ 10 a.m., LEK Motions due 4-13-05 Response due 4-27-05 Bail set at: $10,000 unsecured bond (7b) Comply with pretrial services supervision, and abide by all conditions of release as directed by Pretrial Services. (7g1) Surrender any passport and all travel documents to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office. Do not apply for/obtain a passport. Surrender no later than: April 15, 2005. (7h1) Travel is restricted to State of Hawaii; inter-island travel must be approved in advance by Pretrial Services. In addition to the Special Conditions of Release as specified above, you are subject to the following conditions: You shall not commit any offense in violation of federal, state, or local law while on release in this case. You shall appear at all proceedings as required and shall surrender for service of any sentence imposed as directed. ; Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Donna Gray present ( Ct Rptr: C5 10:46-10:50) by Judge Kevin S. C. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Detention - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                        BOND ($) posted $100,000.00 by American Surety Company for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PS issued as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung ; arraignment set for 10:30 4/8/05 for Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on Initial Appearance; A & P to the Indictment as to Defendant (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung set 4/8/05 at 10:30am before Judge Chang. Penal Summons to be issued AUSA: Leslie Osborne AFPD: duty AFPD (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong ( $250,000.00 SECURED posted ) by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Detention - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPEARANCE BOND ($250,000.00 SECURED) posted by Kenneth Chio Heng Iong signed by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (bbb) Modified on 04/01/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Receipt for Passport
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE and Receipt of Passport - 120949827 Passport Number (placed in vault) by defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ARREST Warrant returned executed as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong on 3/23/05 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST of defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong on 3/23/05 (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EP: MINUTES: Detention Hearing - defendant present, in custody. John Edmunds making a special appearance for purposes of this bail hearing only. Motion denied. Bail- Execute an unsecured bond in the amount of $250,000, secured by a posting of $100,000 in cash, property or surety bond. The defendant is released forthwith prior to the posting of surety. A Status Hearing will be scheduled to verify that this condition has been satisfied. In the event surety is posted prior to the hearing date, the Court directs defense counsel to contact the courtroom manager to cancel the hearing. The Status Hearing to be held: 4/7/05 at 10:30am before Judge Chang. (7b) Comply with pretrial services supervision, and abide by all conditions of release as directed by Pretrial Services. (7g1) Surrender any passport and all travel documents to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office. Do not apply for/obtain a passport. Surrender no later than: close of business on March 28, 2005. (7h1) Travel is restricted to State of Hawaii; inter-island travel must be approved in advance by Pretrial Services. (7i) Do not change residence without the advance approval of Pretrial services. (7p3) Comply with the Electronic Monitoring program under the direction of Pretrial Services. You are restricted to your residence at all times except as pre-approved by Pretrial Services. The Court authorizes release under the CURFEW restriction. Unless otherwise ordered in Special Condition (7o), the curfew hours will be determined by Pretrial Services. (7s1) You are prohibited from owning, possessing, or controlling any firearm or ammunition. Immediately surrender all firearms and ammunition to an agent approved by Pretrial Services. (7y) You must contribute toward the costs of the services required by this bond, to the extent you are financially able to do so, as determined by Pretrial Services. (8n) Provide Pretrial Services with any and all requested financial information regarding your financial status including, but not limited to: employment and all sources of income, bank accounts, assets and liabilities, and investments. You are required to sign and execute an Authorization to Release Financial Information as requested by Pretrial Services. (8o) Pretrial Services is authorized to run credit reports on a random and "as needed" basis during the course of supervision to ensure compliance with pretrial release conditions. You are required to sign and execute any necessary release forms including, but not limited to an Authorization to Release Financial Information, as requested by Pretrial Services. Other Conditions: Defendant shall not commit any offense in violation of federal, state, or local law while on release in this case. Defendant shall appear at all proceedings as required and shall surrender for service of any sentence imposed as directed. [4-1] detention hearing held on 3/24/05 , $250,000.00 SECURED by a posting of $1000,000.00 in CASH; Bond set for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong , ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., John S. Edmunds present (Ct Rptr: C5 2:47-3:07:15) by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to detain defendant without bail by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (bbb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            EP: MINUTES: Initial Appearance; A&P to the Indictment - defendant present, in custody. Arraignment waived, plea of Not Guilty entered. Jury Selection/Trial: 5/24/05, 9:00am, Judge Gillmor Final Pretrial Conference: 5/2/05, 10:00am, Judge Kobayashi Motions due: 4/13/05 Response due: 4/27/05 Over the defendant's objection, Detention Hearing set 3/24/05 at 2:45pm before Judge Chang. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS.; INITIAL APPEARANCE of Kenneth Chio Heng Iong ; , , , case unsealed ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., David W. Hall for John S. Edmunds present ( Ct Rptr: C5 3:10-3:14:25) by Judge S.C. Chang (sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ARREST Warrant issued for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong bail set for NO BAIL by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (gs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                EP: INDICTMENT by USA Counts filed against Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-9, 10, 11, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (2) count(s) 10; Warrant ordered ( Wendy Char ) by Mag Judge Chang (gs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 648 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?