USA v. Iong, et al
Criminal Case Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-00117-HG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie E. Osborne, Jr. +5412 541 541 2850 les.osborne@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Hawaii
Filed 3/23/2005
County Honolulu
Terminated 3/5/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 10
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014 LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
NOTICE OF PASSPORT - RETURNED TO Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung on 03/13/2007. (bbb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Order to DismissCourt Filing
    Government's MOTION AND ORDER TO DISMISS as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung., ***Update Disposition Information: Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (2), Count(s) 10, ORDER TO DISMISS - GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge HELEN GILLMOR on March 5, 2007. (bbb, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Certificate Of Service.
      Certificate of Service by USA as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re: Motion and Order to Dismiss (Osborne, Leslie)
        LREF
        Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
        REPORT OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, MINUTES AND ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [67]. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/12/07. (afc)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Court's Certificate of Service
          COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of [68] REPORT OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, MINUTES AND ORDER, has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on February 13, 2007. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (afc)
            LREF
            Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
            EP : Final Pretrial Conference. Defendant 01 present, not in custody.Presence waived as to Defendant 02. Motion for Withdrawal of Not Guilty Plea and toPlead Anew as to Defendant 01 set 2/23/07 at 2:00pm before Judge Chang. CRIMINAL FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCEJury Trial before Judge Helen Gillmor on March 13, 2007 at 9:00.a.m.. Pretrial Conference before HG at 8:30am on March 5, 2007.(FTR-Ctrm C5; 9:59:35-10:03:46 a.m..) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(gab, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
              STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act; ORDER as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, ***Excludable started as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung:, ***Excludable(s) stopped as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 3/13/2007 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR.. Signed by Judge HELEN GILLMOR on 10/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Order) (gab, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Terminate Motions
              Minute Order : Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's MOTION to Continue 10/24/06 TrialDate and (02) Defendant Chiu Lai Yung's Joinder in Defendant Kenneth Iong's MOTIONto Continue October 24, 2006 Trial Date, Filed September 15, 2006 has been renderedMOOT.The parties have stipulated to a new trial date of March 13, 2007. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                Minute Order : Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2007 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2007 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 3/13/2007 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 ~Motion for Joinder
                  Joinder in Defendant Kenneth Iong's [58] MOTION to Continue October 24, 2006 Trial Date, Filed September 15, 2006 by Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung; Certificate of Service (gab, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                    EP : FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE -DEFENDANT (01) KENNETH CHIO HENG IONG?S MOTION:1. TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL -2. TO SUPPRESS STATEMENT MADE NOVEMBER 6,2003 -3. TO SEVER COUNT II -4. TO DISMISS COUNT 1 OF THE INDICTMENT - Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc.49) is GRANTED. The Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Oral Motion to Withdraw[doc. 46] Defendant Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Dismiss Count 1 of theIndictment (Doc. 46) is GRANTED. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong?s Motion to Suppress Statement Made onNovember 6, 2003 and Motion to Sever Count 11 - continued to October 6, 2006 at 9:00a.m. before Judge Gillmor.The Final Pretrial Conference before Magistrate Judge Kobayashi on August 28,2006 is continued to September 22, 2006 at 10:00 am. before Magistrate Judge Kurren.The Final Pretrial Conference is set for October 17, 2006 at 8:30 a.m. beforeJudge Gillmor.The Jury Trial is continued from September 12, 2006 to October 24, 2006 at 9:30a.m. before Judge Gillmor. The Court orders that the periodfrom September 12, 2006 to and including October 24, 2006 be excluded fromcomputation under the Speedy Trial Act.(Court Reporter Debra Chun.) (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR )(gab, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 51 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                      EO :Set/Reset Hearings as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: At defendant's request, Final Pretrial Conference set 8/21/06 has been continued to 8/28/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG )(sna, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 48 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                        E.O. :Set/Reset Hearings as to (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (dhh)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                          Certificate of Service by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [42] Terminate Motions, Set Hearings, Order, Speedy Trial - Excludable Start, Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop,,,,,,,,,, Order Continuing Trial (Osborne, Leslie)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Terminate MotionsCourt Filing
                            Government's ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 9/12/2006 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. [Motions terminated as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung: [37] MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline ***Excludable started 08/15/2006 thru Excludable(s) stopped 09/11/2006 as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung]. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on July 24, 2006. (bbb, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                              EP: 1. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong's [37]MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND EXTEND PRETRIAL MOTION DEADLINE 2. Final Pretrial Conference Hearing as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung held on 7/17/2006 - [Reset Hearings:, ***Excludable started 08/15/2006:, ***Excludable(s) stopped 09/11/2006] Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline - GRANTED; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2006 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2006 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 9/12/2006 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (FTR-Ctrm C5 10:47 - 10:58.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG ) (bbb, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Response in Opposition
                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung re [37] MOTION to Continue Trial and to Extend Pretrial Motion Deadline Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Leslie E. Osborne, Jr.)(Osborne, Leslie)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 1/2/2006 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION and ORDER to allow travel to Nevada - as to(02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung - leaving on 12/31/05 and returning on or before 01/08/06. Signed by Judge KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/29/05. (lmg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005 Order of Entry
                                  EO: Trial Setting Conference set for 12/12/2005 10:00:00 AM before KSC is vacated. Parties will stipulate to new trial date/deadlines. in case as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung. (bbb, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on Hearing Re Appointment of Counsel as to (01) Kenneth C.H. Iong is set for 11-30-05 @ 10 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. cc: Leslie Osborne Notified by phone: (01) Kenneth C.H. Iong (bbb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER setting trial date and finding excludable time; certificate of service by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; jury trial set for 9:00 1/10/06; pretrial conference set for 10:00 12/12/05 for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung , time excluded between 08/30/2005 thru 01/09/2006 (bbb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER setting trial date and finding excludable time; certificate of service by Mag Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi ; jury trial set for 9:00 1/10/06; pretrial conference set for 10:00 12/12/05 for Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung , time excluded between 08/30/2005 thru 01/09/2006 (bbb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Transcript
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings - 08/01/2005 - ORIG - ( Juvelynn Punzal/ESR ) - pp 10 ;as to Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            EP: MINUTES: Final Pretrial Conference not held. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong present, not in custody. Defendant (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung not present, presence waived. Defendant (01)'s Oral Motion to Continue Trial Granted. Case declared Complex. Jury Selection/Trial is continued to 9:00 1/10/06, HG. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 10:00 12/12/05, KSC. Defendant's Motions due 11/28/05. Government's Response due 12/12/05. Time excluded from 8/30/05 thru 1/10/06 from the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Govt to prepare Order. , ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Loretta A. Faymonville, Kenneth Choi Heng Ion-Pro Se present ( Ct Rptr: C7 10:09-10:17) by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              EP: MINUTES: Status Conference Re: New Counsel for Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong; Trial Setting Conference: Defendants (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, present, not in custody. Court questions Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong extensively. Defendant wishes to represent himself in the CR matter. Blank Financial Affidavit given to Defendant. Defendant may fill out affidavit and submit under seal tot he Court if he wishes to. Court finds that the Defendant has knowingly and voluntarily waived his right to counsel. Defendant (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong will be proceeding as pro se. Govt's Oral Motion to Designate Case Complex Granted. New trial date and deadlines given. Jury Selection/Trial set for 9:00 8/30/05, HG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10:00 8/1/05, LEK. Defendant's Motions due 7/18/05. Government's Response due 8/1/05. Time excluded from 5/24/05 thru 8/30/05 from the requirements of the Speedy Trial Act. Govt to prepare Order. Defendants (01) Kenneth Chio Heng Iong and (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung's current conditions of release to continue.; time excluded between 05/24/2005 thru 08/30/2005 ; Kenneth Chio Heng Iong, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Donna Gray for Loretta Faymonville present ( Ct Rptr: C7 10:45-11:06) by Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi (bbb)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 5/2/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                PS UNexecuted on 4/1/05 as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Receipt for Passport
                                                  NOTICE and Receipt of Passport - 751413653 Passport Number (placed in vault) by defendant Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung ( $10,000.00 UNSECURED posted ) by Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005 Detention - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      APPEARANCE BOND ( $10,000.00 UNSECURED) posted by Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung signed by Judge Kevin S.C. Chang (bbb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                        FINANCIAL Affidavit as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (bbb)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          EP: MINUTES: Initial Appearance and A & P to Indictment - deft present not in custody. Deft sworn to Financial Affidavit. Oral M/Court Appt Atty GRANTED. Arrn waived. Plea of NOT GUILTY entered. Dates given: JS/JT 5-24-05 @ 9 a.m., HG FPT 5-2-05 @ 10 a.m., LEK Motions due 4-13-05 Response due 4-27-05 Bail set at: $10,000 unsecured bond (7b) Comply with pretrial services supervision, and abide by all conditions of release as directed by Pretrial Services. (7g1) Surrender any passport and all travel documents to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office. Do not apply for/obtain a passport. Surrender no later than: April 15, 2005. (7h1) Travel is restricted to State of Hawaii; inter-island travel must be approved in advance by Pretrial Services. In addition to the Special Conditions of Release as specified above, you are subject to the following conditions: You shall not commit any offense in violation of federal, state, or local law while on release in this case. You shall appear at all proceedings as required and shall surrender for service of any sentence imposed as directed. ; Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung, USA Attorney Leslie E. Osborne Jr., Donna Gray present ( Ct Rptr: C5 10:46-10:50) by Judge Kevin S. C. Chang (bbb)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                            PS issued as to Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung ; arraignment set for 10:30 4/8/05 for Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung before Mag Judge Kevin S. Chang (bbb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                              NOTICE of hearing setting hearing on Initial Appearance; A & P to the Indictment as to Defendant (02) Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung set 4/8/05 at 10:30am before Judge Chang. Penal Summons to be issued AUSA: Leslie Osborne AFPD: duty AFPD (bbb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005 IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                EP: INDICTMENT by USA Counts filed against Kenneth Chio Heng Iong (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-9, 10, 11, Dorothy Chiu Lai Yung (2) count(s) 10; Warrant ordered ( Wendy Char ) by Mag Judge Chang (gs)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 441 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?