Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Applicant Has Filed a Verified Statement of Small Entity Status in Compliance with 37 CFR 1.27
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Notification Mailed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Received
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Issue Fee Payment Verified
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Receipt into Pubs
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Dispatch to Publications
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Mail Notice of Allowance
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Application Dispatched from OIPE
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Correspondence Address Change
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Initial Exam Team nn
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Finished
|
|
|
 |
|
|
|
Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: None |
Transaction History |
|
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
|
|
|
 |