Gps Patch Antenna Attitude Reference System

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 09866045
Examiner Gregory C Issing, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Gregory C Issing
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Gan-Tai Tseng, Rancho Palos Verdes, CA, Applicant

Represented by City of Jacksonville, Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid 1 +1 +1 +1
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Gan-Tai Tseng, Rancho Palos Verdes, CA, ()
Filing Date May 24, 2001
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-400
Confirmation Number 4167
Group Art Unit 3662
Class / Sub-Class 342 / 357
Timeline
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Patent Issue Date Used in PTA Calculation
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Received
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow -Received 85b - Unmatched
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Corrected Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt into Pubs
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Dispatch to Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Corrected Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Dispatched from OIPE
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Finished
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?