USA v. Debolt
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:04-cr-10029-MMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A Keith +1 309 671 7050 +1 309 671 7259 tom.keith@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Peoria
Filed 3/17/2004
County Peoria
Terminated 7/20/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO - In or about April 2000, Dft did knowingly distirbute and knowingly attempt to distribute child pornography in violation of 18 USC 2252A(a)(2)(A)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
182252A.F ACTIVITIES RE MATERIAL CONSTITUTING/CONTAINING CHILD PORNO - On or about 3/4/04, Dft did knowingly possess and knowingly attempt to possess child pornography in violation of 18 USC 2252A(a)(5)(B)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2253.F
Offense Level 4
182253.F CRIMINAL FORFEITURE IN VIOLATION OF EXPLOITATION OF MINORS - Criminal forfeiture of various computer hardware and software as set forth in the Indictment pursuant to 18 USC 2253
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2252A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2253.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Receipt
Receipt for Presentence Report #14, Sentencing Recommendation #15, Statement of Reasons #20 as to Roy Debolt by US Probation. (CL, ilcd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document
    TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [22] Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and the Notice of Appeal is withdrawn as to Roy Debolt (1). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/12/05. (SPH, ilcd)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005, Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw Document
      First MOTION to Withdraw Document 21 by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roy Debolt (Penn, Thomas)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Statement of Reasons +Court Filing
          +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd) 21 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roy Debolt (Penn, Thomas) 22 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw Document First MOTION to Withdraw Document 21 by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas) -- Filed & Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [22] Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and the Notice of Appeal is withdrawn as to Roy Debolt (1). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/12/05. (SPH, ilcd) 23 Filed: 01/10/2006Entered: 01/11/2006 Receipt Receipt for Presentence Report #14, Sentencing Recommendation #15, Statement of Reasons #20 as to Roy Debolt by US Probation. (CL, ilcd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Sealed Document +Court Filing
            +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non redacted J & C as to Debolt (CL, ilcd) 20 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Statement of Reasons +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd) 21 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roy Debolt (Penn, Thomas) 22 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw Document First MOTION to Withdraw Document 21 by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas) -- Filed & Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [22] Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and the Notice of Appeal is withdrawn as to Roy Debolt (1). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/12/05. (SPH, ilcd) 23 Filed: 01/10/2006Entered: 01/11/2006 Receipt Receipt for Presentence Report #14, Sentencing Recommendation #15, Statement of Reasons #20 as to Roy Debolt by US Probation. (CL, ilcd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
              JUDGMENT as to Roy Debolt (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 2s, 3, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 1s, Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 168 months; 3 years supervised release; no fine; $100 special assessment; Count(s) 3s, Forfeiture is made . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/20/05. (CL, ilcd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Roy Debolt . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/19/05. (CL, ilcd)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Letter
                  Letters in mitigation filed by defendant (CL, ilcd)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
                    +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Roy Debolt, Roy Debolt. (CL, ilcd) 17 Filed: 07/18/2005Entered: 07/19/2005 Letter Letters in mitigation filed by defendant (CL, ilcd) 16 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2005 Order FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Roy Debolt . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/19/05. (CL, ilcd) 18 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Judgment JUDGMENT as to Roy Debolt (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 2s, 3, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 1s, Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 168 months; 3 years supervised release; no fine; $100 special assessment; Count(s) 3s, Forfeiture is made . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/20/05. (CL, ilcd) 19 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non redacted J & C as to Debolt (CL, ilcd) 20 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Statement of Reasons +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd) 21 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roy Debolt (Penn, Thomas) 22 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw Document First MOTION to Withdraw Document 21 by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas) -- Filed & Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [22] Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and the Notice of Appeal is withdrawn as to Roy Debolt (1). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/12/05. (SPH, ilcd) 23 Filed: 01/10/2006Entered: 01/11/2006 Receipt Receipt for Presentence Report #14, Sentencing Recommendation #15, Statement of Reasons #20 as to Roy Debolt by US Probation. (CL, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Presentence Investigation ReportCourt Filing
                      +++ PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd) 15 Filed: 07/18/2005Entered: 07/19/2005 Sentencing Recommendation +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Roy Debolt, Roy Debolt. (CL, ilcd) 17 Filed: 07/18/2005Entered: 07/19/2005 Letter Letters in mitigation filed by defendant (CL, ilcd) 16 Filed & Entered: 07/19/2005 Order FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Roy Debolt . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/19/05. (CL, ilcd) 18 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Judgment JUDGMENT as to Roy Debolt (1), Count(s) 1, 2, 2s, 3, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 1s, Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 168 months; 3 years supervised release; no fine; $100 special assessment; Count(s) 3s, Forfeiture is made . Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/20/05. (CL, ilcd) 19 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non redacted J & C as to Debolt (CL, ilcd) 20 Filed: 07/20/2005Entered: 07/22/2005 Statement of Reasons +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd) 21 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment NOTICE OF APPEAL by Roy Debolt (Penn, Thomas) 22 Filed & Entered: 07/27/2005Terminated: 12/12/2005 Motion to Withdraw Document First MOTION to Withdraw Document 21 by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas) -- Filed & Entered: 12/12/2005 Order on Motion to Withdraw Document TEXT ONLY ORDER granting [22] Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and the Notice of Appeal is withdrawn as to Roy Debolt (1). Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 12/12/05. (SPH, ilcd) 23 Filed: 01/10/2006Entered: 01/11/2006 Receipt Receipt for Presentence Report #14, Sentencing Recommendation #15, Statement of Reasons #20 as to Roy Debolt by US Probation. (CL, ilcd)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Keith/Atty Penn with defendant present in person andSentencing held on 7/18/2005 for Roy Debolt as follows: Count(s) 1, 2, 2s, 3, are dismissed upon oral motion of Government; On Count(s) 1s, Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 168 months; 3 years supervised release; no fine; $100 special assessment; Count(s) 3s, Forfeiture is made. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Publication by USA as to Roy Debolt (Sanchez, Esteban)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Roy Debolt: Sentencing set for 7/18/2005 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. PLEASE NOTE THIS IS A CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.) (CG, ilcd)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                              Text ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Roy Debolt (1) Sentencing set for 7/18/2005 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm.. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 6/21/05. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.)(CG, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005, Terminated: 6/21/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Presentence Report by Roy Debolt. (Penn, Thomas)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                  PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/29/05 as to defendant Roy Debolt. SEE ORDER. (CC: all counsel/USM/Prob)(KB, ilcd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Plea Agreement
                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to Roy Debolt (CL, ilcd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/17/2005 Order on Motion for Release from Custody
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Keith/Atty Penn with defendant present in person and change of plea hearing held on 3/17/2005 as to Roy Debolt. Defendant is withdrawing [9] Motion for Release from Custody. Guilty Plea entered by Roy Debolt as to Counts 1s,2s. Court accepts plea and judgment of conviction is entered. Sentencing set for Fri 7/8/2005 03:15 PM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005 Motion for Release from Custody
                                        MOTION for Pretrial Release from Custody by defendant Roy Debolt. (CL, ilcd)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                          TEXT ONLY ORDER vacating 3/14/05 jury trial setting. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/28/05. (KK, ilcd)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Order
                                            TEXT ONLY ORDER as to Roy Debolt. Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/3/05 at 4:00 p.m. and jury trial set for 3/14/05 are VACATED. Change of Plea Hearing is reset for 3/17/2005 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/28/05. (KK, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Pretrial Conference
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA T. Keith/Atty Penn with Defendant present in person and Pending Motion/Pretrial Conference as to Roy Debolt held on 1/27/2005. Defendant requests a change of plea hearing. Same allowed. Excludable started as to Roy Debolt (XT). Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/3/2005 04:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Trial previously set 2/7/05 is vacated and Jury Trial is RESET for 3/14/2005 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to continue this case and further finds the time from today to 3/14/05 is excludable pursuant to Speedy Trial Act.(Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: 1/24/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Roy Debolt: Pretrial Conference previously set for 1/28/05 is cancelled and reset for 1/27/2005 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.) (CG, ilcd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Pretrial Conference
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Campbell/Atty Penn with Dft Debolt present in person and Pending motions/Pretrial Conference as to Roy Debolt held on 11/18/2004. Dft requests additional time pursuant to Blakely. Same allowed. Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to continue this case and further finds the time from today to 2/7/05 is excludable pursuant to Speedy Trial Act. Excludable started as to Roy Debolt. (XT) : Trial previously set 12/13/04 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for 2/7/2005 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Supplemental Pending Motions/Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 1/28/2005 10:00 AM. Both in person before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Keith/Atty Penn with Dft Debolt present in person and Pending Motion/Pretrial Conference as to Roy Debolt held on 9/16/2004. Parties request continuance pursuant to Blakeley issues. Same allowed. Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to continue this matter and further finds the time from today to 12/13/04 is excludable pursuant to Speedy Trial Act. Excludable started as to Roy Debolt (XT). Trial previously set 9/27/04 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for 12/13/2004 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Pending Motions/Pretrial Conference set for Thurs 11/18/2004 10:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (cc: all counsel/Prob/USM/Crt Rptr)(Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present in open court by AUSA Keith/Attorney Penn with Defendant Roy Debolt for Arraignment on Superceding Indictment and Possible Change of Plea. Superceding Arraignment held on 7/27/04. Defendant waives reading of Indictment in open court and enters plea of not guilty to all counts. Parties request the Court to reset date for possible Change of Plea. Possible Change of Plea reset for Thursday, 9/16/2004 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Jury Trial of 8/2/04 is hereby vacated and Jury Trial reset for Monday, 9/27/2004 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court finds it in the interest of justice that time between today's date and 9/27/04 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (cc: all counsel, USM, USPO, court report) (Court Reporter KH.) (CAD, ilcd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                        Arraignment on superseding indictment set in conjunction with possible change of plea hearing on 7/27/2004 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/23/04. (KK, ilcd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE of Special Findings as to dft Roy Debolt re [7] Superceding Indictment (ML, ilcd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Indictment
                                                            Superceding INDICTMENT as to Roy Debolt (1) adding count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s. (ML, ilcd)
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 1,420 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?