Torres v. Peoria County Jail, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-01030-RJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ramon A Torres, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Palmer, Defendant
No Logo Evan Bayh, Defendant
No Logo Henry Vellnon, Defendant
No Logo JAMES THOMPSON, Defendant
No Logo John Ashcrost, Defendant
No Logo Medical Center for Federal Prisoners, Defendant
No Logo Metropolitan Correctional Center, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
No Logo Peoria County Jail, Defendant
No Logo Peoria County Sheriff, Defendant
No Logo St Frances (Hospital) Medical Center, Defendant
No Logo U S Marshals, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Camp Elreno Okla, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Camp Terre Haute IN, Defendant
No Logo U S Penitentiary Leavenworth Kansas, Defendant
Office Peoria
Filed 2/20/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Peoria
Terminated 5/2/1991
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 91-2138[Danville]
Def Custody Status
Flags 22, CLOSED, PRISONER, REFER, TRANSF
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 5/2/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Michael M. Mihm transferring case to the Danville Division New case number in Danville is 91-2138; old case number in Peoria Division was 91-1030. File mailed to Danvile Division; all futher pleadings are to filed in Danville. (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/2/1991, Entered: 5/2/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
    MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Michael M. Mihm terminating the case (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/8/1991 Description not availableCourt Filing
      SIGNED PETITION to PROCEED IFP filed; forwarded to the judge for review (complaint received). Case referred to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Kauffman (VB, ilcd) Modified on 04/08/1991
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 4/8/1991, Entered: 4/8/1991 Response
        RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER OF MARCH 19, 1991 (FILED AS MOTION TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 19, 1991 ORDER, DIRECTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A SIGNED PETITION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF COSTS AND FEES, IFP) by plaintiff Ramon A Torres (VB, ilcd)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/1991, Entered: 3/19/1991 Minutes-Miscellaneous
          MINUTE-ENTRY: by Judge Michael M. Mihm. Plaintiff submitted documents for initiating a civil rights action under 42:1983. The Clerk accepted the documents due to the statements of the filer, who indicated that the case had to be filed by 2/20/91 to avoid limitation problems. However, the Clerk is directed now to return the petition to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees for the plaintiff's signature. Failure to return the signed petition within 21 days will result in summary denial of leave to proceed ifp, and dismissal of this case. The plaintiff's undocketed motion to waive the Court's trust fund ledger requirement is allowed. Court sets misc ddl of 4/9/91 for petitioner to return signed ifp. (cc: all counsel) (CL, ilcd)
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/1991, Entered: 2/27/1991 Description not availableCourt Filing
            PETITION to PROCEED IFP filed; forwarded to the judge 2/27/91 for review (complaint received). Case referred to Magistrate Judge Robert J. Kauffman (HK, ilcd)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 22 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?