Method For Detecting And Locating Sources Of Communication Signal Interference Employing Both A Directional And An Omni Antenna

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08766723
Examiner Joseph Leon Felber, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Joseph Leon Felber
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lazar, Steven, Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid 1 +1 +1 +1
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Lazar, Steven, Los Angeles, CA (US)
Filing Date December 13, 1996
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D-315
Confirmation Number 7826
Group Art Unit 2855
Class / Sub-Class 342 / 383
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Assignments (3) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/11/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Received to Match Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/14/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Ordered to Match Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/12/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Supplemental Response
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Informal or Non-Responsive Amendment after Examiner Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Ex Parte Quayle Action (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Quayle action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Transfer Inquiry
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 7 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?