System And Method For Implementing A Mute Voice Signal Upon Reception Of A Adpcm Zero Nibble In Wireless Communications
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08850824
Examiner Emmanuel Bayard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Schnizlein, Paul G., Applicant

Represented by Zagorin O'Brien Graham LLP

Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Schnizlein, Paul G., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date May 2, 1997
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number M-5717US-
Confirmation Number 5321
Group Art Unit 2731
Class / Sub-Class 375 / 351
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Assignments (10) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
    Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: None Transaction History
      Correspondence Address Change
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
        Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
          Issue Notification Mailed
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
            Application Is Considered Ready for Issue
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: None Transaction History
              Workflow - Complete WF Records for Drawings
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                Workflow - Drawings Finished
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                  Workflow - Drawings Matched with File at Contractor
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                    Issue Fee Payment Verified
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                      Workflow - Drawings Received at Contractor
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                        Workflow - Drawings Sent to Contractor
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                          Workflow - File Sent to Contractor
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                              Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 8/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Amendment Crossed in Mail
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 8/23/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Response after Non-Final Action
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Non-Final Rejection
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                              Response after Non-Final Action
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                  Non-Final Rejection
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Preexamination Location Change
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/15/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                              Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Application Dispatched from OIPE
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                      Initial Exam Team nn
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?