Current Mode Transistor Circuit

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08883222
Examiner My Trang Ton, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner My Trang Ton
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Csanky, Geza, Applicant

Represented by DERRICK M. REID

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Reid 1 +1 +1 +1
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Csanky, Geza, Manhattan Beach, CA (US)
Filing Date June 26, 1997
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D318
Confirmation Number 4955
Group Art Unit 2816
Class / Sub-Class 327 / 543
Timeline
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fees - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition to Accept Late Payment of Maintenance Fee Payment Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Workflow incoming petition IFW
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/30/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/1/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/27/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/2/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/23/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Terminal Disclaimer Approved in TC
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/19/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/6/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Preexamination Location Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
IFW Scan & PACR Auto Security Review
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Initial Exam Team nn
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?