Santiago v. Kerry
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04535
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 7:15 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nereida Santiago, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoffner PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Smotritsky +1 718 554 3630 +1 718 679 9196 srlawfirm@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Secratary of State John Kerry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 08 U.S.C. § 1503(a)
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Kerry, Nereida Santiago. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/10/2014) (tn) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
    ANSWER to 1 Complaint in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by John Kerry.(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated January 9, 2014. Document filed by John Kerry.(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: In light of the fact that the courthouse was closed today due to weather, the initial status conference scheduled for today is rescheduled to January 10, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. (Initial Conference set for 1/10/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/3/2014) (rsh) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Stanley Smotritsky, Esq and Kirti Reddy, Esq dated 1/2/2014 re: Pre-trial conference. Document filed by John Kerry, Nereida Santiago.(Smotritsky, Stanley) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/3/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. By 12/27/2013, the parties are ordered to submit a joint letter, not to exceed 5 pages, providing the information further set forth in this Order. By 12/27/2013, the parties are ordered to jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/14/2014) (tn) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 3 Letter filed by John Kerry. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for defendant to respond is extended to December 23, 2013. John Kerry answer due 12/23/2013. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/18/2013) (tn) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated October 18, 2013 re: extension request to file answer. Document filed by John Kerry.(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of John Kerry. (Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against John Kerry (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401070915).Document filed by Nereida Santiago.(jd) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 209 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?