TCYK, LLC v. Albino
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01345

Tags
Last Updated October 8, 2016 at 4:52 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Fly Yant +1 813 229 8008 cyant@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Eneida Albino, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Related case/Interested persons/ECF-2
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: 9/4/2013 Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Copyright Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013 Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 96 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?