Smith v. Ahitow, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-01001-MMM
District Judge Michael M. Mihm, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bebe Stores, Inc, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Larry Smith"
v.
No Logo Rodney J. Ahitow, Defendant
No Logo Roland W Burris, Defendant
Office Peoria
Filed 1/3/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Peoria
Terminated 1/13/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 11, CLOSED, HABEAS, TRANSF
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Archives File Sent to FRC
ARCHIVES FILE sent to FRC, Chicago on 9/5/00, Accession No. 021-00-0174 Box No. 36 of 40 Location 291185 (SH, ilcd)
    LREF
    Blank 2 Filed: 1/13/1995, Entered: 1/17/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Chief Judge Michael M. Mihm Case transferred to Dist of: Northern District of Illinois which is the district in which the state court convicted and sentenced Petitioner. (cc: all counsel/plaintiff/ND IL) (LR, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
      PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (LR, ilcd)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/1995, Entered: 1/5/1995 Filing Fee Received
        FILING FEE PAID on 1/3/95 in the amount of $ 5.00 receipt # 018292. (LR, ilcd)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 65 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?