Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc. v. Porat
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-02051
District Judge Donovan W. Frank, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 10:21 PM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce D Manning +1 612 543 1785 bruce.manning@court.state.mn.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtney E Carter +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 cethompson@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher William Madel +1 612 349 8703 +1 612 339 4181 cwmadel@rkmc.com
No Logo Digital River, Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Affiliads LLC, Defendant
No Logo Eric Porat, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 380 - Personal Property: Other Personal Property Damage
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Pursuant to the Stipulation to Release Bond filed on October 27, 2011, (Doc. No. 30 ), the Clerk of Court shall release the $10,000 bond filed by Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc. on May 20, 2010 to Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 10/28/2011. (BJS) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Digital River, Inc. re 30 Stipulation to Release Bond (Madel, Christopher) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
      STIPULATION to Release Bond by Affiliads LLC, Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Eric Porat. (Madel, Christopher) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER FOR FINAL JUDGMENT re 26 Stipulation filed by Affiliads LLC, Digital River, Inc., Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Eric Porat. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/27/2010. (BJS) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Status Conference held on 8/27/2010. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (BJS) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: None
              STIPULATION RE FINAL JUDGMENT by all parties. (Madel, Christopher) Modified filers and text on 8/25/2010 (akl). (Entered: 08/25/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: Affiliads LLC answer due 8/31/2010; Eric Porat answer due 8/31/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 7/28/10. (akl) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Affiliads LLC, Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Eric Porat. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE of Setting Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/27/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (rlb) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: Affiliads LLC answer due 7/23/2010; Eric Porat answer due 7/23/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/24/10. (akl) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) Modified filers and text on 6/25/2010 (akl). (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER: Defendants Eric Porat and Affiliads LLC shall have until June 24, 2010, to answer or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint brought by Plaintiffs Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc. d/b/a Direct Response Technologies and Digital River, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 6/23/10. (jam) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Affiliads LLC, Digital River Marketing Solutions, Inc., Digital River, Inc., Eric Porat. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Affiliads LLC, Eric Porat re 16 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution, 17 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Affiliads LLC. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Affiliads LLC, Eric Porat. (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: 1. The matter is unsealed. 2. The existing TRO remains in full force and effect until further order of the Court. 3. Status Conference set for 7/15/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 6/3/10. (LPH) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Status Conference held on 6/3/2010. Order to issue. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (LPH) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Porat, Affiliads LLC. Eric Porat served on 5/15/2010, answer due 6/7/2010; Affiliads LLC served on 5/15/2010, answer due 6/7/2010. (kt) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None
                                          RECEIPT number 44641045527 in the amount of $10,000 issued to Digital River. (TSS) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER regarding 8 May 14, 2010 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 5/17/10. (VEM) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2010 re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Digital River, Inc. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (VEM) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 4 ) filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 05/14/2010. (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of Scott A. Richter filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibits 1 - 10, #2 Exhibits 11 -20, #3 Exhibits 21-30, #4 Exhibits 31-34, #5 Exhibit 35. (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Kate G. Cohen filed by Plaintiffs (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 1) (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Declaration of Gary P. Olden filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                          PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM in Support of Their Motion for an Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. No. 2 ). (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                            PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE of MOTION for EX PARTE TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs. (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                COMPLAINT against Defendants filed by Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 44641045378). Assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Attachment(s): #1 Copy of Order Sealing Case, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (TSS) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 682 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?