Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc. et v. Ashcroft
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:03-cv-04872
District Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2016 at 11:33 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth Harrison Parker +1 415 356 3000 +1 415 356 3099 beth.parker@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah A. Adler ,. +1 415 393 2640 debbie.adler@bingham.com
(Inactive), ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Giselle Fahimian +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 giselle.fahimian@bingham.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa L. Federer +1 415 393 2000 +1 415 393 2286 teresa.federer@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Planned Parenthood Federation of America Inc- DC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eve C. Gartner +1 212 261 4617 +1 212 247 6811 eve.gartner@ppfa.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger K. Evans +1 212 261 4708 +1 212 247 6811
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helene T. Krasnoff +1 202 973 4800
No Logo Planned Parenthood Golden Gate, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kaija Marie Clark +1 202 514 3489 Kaija.Clark@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Preeya M. Noronha +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8202 preeya.noronha@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Quinlivan +1 617 748 3606 +1 617 748 3969 mark.quinlivan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED W. Scott Simpson +1 202 514 3495 +1 202 616 8470 scott.simpson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lye, Linda, Amicus Curiae
Officially listed as "American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Northern California, Inc."
No Logo California Medical Association, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Cox +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091 ecox@cov.com
TERMINATED: 01/30/2004, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roni R. Reed +1 415 591 6000 +1 415 591 6091
No Logo Professor David L. Faigman, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by University of California Hastings College of the Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Faigman +1 415 565 4739 faigmand@uchastings.edu
No Logo California Medical Association, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret Campbell Crosby +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 8437 mcrosby@aclunc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt G. Calia +1 202 662 6000 +6589 658 658 9420 kcalia@cov.com
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Suzanne Morris +1 415 554 3987 +1 415 554 3985 kathleen.morris@sfgov.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Therese Marie Stewart +1 415 554 4708 +1 415 554 4715 therese.stewart@sfgov.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aleeta Marie VanRunkle +1 415 554 4225 aleeta.van.runkle@sfgov.org
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (266) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
Appeal Record Returned (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
    RECEIPT FOR TRIAL EXHIBITS: Plaintiff's Deposition Designations received by Defendant. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE by John Ashcroft re 263 Clerks Notice to Withdraw Exhibits (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 12/11/2008) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
        CLERKS NOTICE re withdrawal of exhibits. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Change of Address by Margaret Campbell Crosby (Crosby, Margaret) (Filed on 5/8/2006) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
            CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
              USCA JUDGMENT. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
                MANDATE of USCA. The judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 16, 2004 (Volume 11, Pages 1694-1930) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 15, 2004 (Volume 10, Pages 1537-1693) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 13, 2004 (Volume 9, Pages 1343-1536) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 12, 2004 (Volume 8, Pages 1177-1342) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 8, 2004 (Volume 7, Pages 993-1176) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 8, 2004 (Volume 6, Pages 869-992) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 6, 2004 (Volume 5, Pages 697-868) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 5, 2004 (Volume 4, Pages 478-696) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 1, 2004 (Volume 3, Pages 374-477) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane e. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 30, 2004 (Volume 2, Pages 175-373) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman.. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 29, 2004 (Volume 1, Pages 1-174) before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 18, 2004 before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter: Diane E. Skillman. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/28/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/26/04 before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar.. (far, Court Staff) (Filed on 11/3/2004) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/7/04 before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 9/13/2004) (Entered: 09/13/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ORDERING FORM by John Ashcroft. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/27/2004) (Entered: 08/30/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by John Ashcroft. Appeal Record due by 9/1/2004. (Attachments: # 1)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 8/2/2004) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Stipulation & ORDER (Extension for Bill of Costs & Application for Fees & Expenses):...should be deferred until after and any all appeals have been heard and decided. By entering into this stipulation, Defendant does not concede Plaintiffs are or would be entitled to any fees, or costs, or that any particular basis for fees, expenses, or costs would apply in this case. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2004) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re bill of costs and application for fees and expenses by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 6/14/2004) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Stipulation & ORDER (Depositions Designations) Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/8/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2004) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                        EXHIBITS re 238 A to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed 6/4/04 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 238 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 6/7/2004) (Entered: 06/07/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION and [proposed order] that designations and counterdesignations be filed with the Court by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on June 1, 2004. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 6/1/2004) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING PERMANENT INJUNCTION; FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on June 1, 2004. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 6/1/2004) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by John Ashcroft Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/26/2004) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 4/26/2004) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER re: Exhibit A-40. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/26/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 4/26/2004) (Entered: 04/26/2004)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                      Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to the Admission of Exhibit A-40 230 filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7)(Clark, Kaija) (Filed on 4/23/2004) Modified on 4/26/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact by City and County of San Francisco City and County of San Francisco's Supplemental Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Van Runkle, Aleeta) (Filed on 4/23/2004) (Entered: 04/23/2004)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                          OBJECTIONS to the Admission of Exhibit A-40 by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 4/21/2004) (Entered: 04/21/2004)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            Trial Sheet filed. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/16/2004) (Entered: 04/19/2004)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                              TRIAL MINUTES: Bench Trial completed on 4/16/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2004) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Court Trial held on 4/15/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter continued to 4/16/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/15/2004) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ERRATA re 225 Order; Removing mis-filed order from docket for this case.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/15/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 4/15/2004) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ***ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, THIS ORDER IS FOR A DIFFERENT CASE*** ORDER denying petition for writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 04/15/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 4/15/2004) Modified on 4/16/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                      TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Bench Trial held on 4/13/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. 4/26/04 - Supplemental Findings. Matter was continued to 4/15/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2004) (Entered: 04/13/2004)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                        Minute Entry: Continued Court Trial held on 4/12/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter continued to 4/13/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2004) (Entered: 04/12/2004)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                          Minute Entry: Continued Court Trial held on 4/9/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter continued to 4/12/04 at 8:30 A.M. for Further Court Trial.(Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2004) (Entered: 04/09/2004)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                            TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Court Trial held on 4/8/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter was continued to 4/9/04 at 8:30 A.M. for Further Court Trial (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/8/2004) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 219 MOTION Request to Submit Expert Studies into Evidence filed by John Ashcroft. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/7/2004) (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION Request to Submit Expert Studies into Evidence filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2004 08:30 AM. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 4/7/2004) (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike Re-Direct Testimony of Dr. Doe filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 4/7/2004) (Entered: 04/07/2004)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                    TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Trial held on 4/6/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter continued to 4/8/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2004) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Re-Direct Testimony of Dr. Doe that was Beyond the Scope of Cross-Examination filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings, April 1, 2004# 2 Proposed Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2004) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION Request to Submit Expert Studies Into Evidence filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 4/6/2004) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE by John Ashcroft Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report of Watson A. Bowes, Jr., M.D.# 2 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report of M. LeRoy Sprang, M.D.)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/5/2004) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                            TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Court Trial held on 4/5/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Matter continued to 4/6/04 at 8:30 AM (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman) (lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2004) (Entered: 04/05/2004)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRIAL MINUTES: Continued Court Trial before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/1/04. Matter was continued to 4/5/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial. (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2004) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT A of 124 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate; FILED UNDER SEAL (Related document(s) 124 ) (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  JOINDER in Plaintiffs' "Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law" filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/30/2004) Modified on 3/31/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    TRIAL MINUTES:Continued Bench Trial held on 3/30/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton; continued to 4/1/04 at 8:30 AM for Further Court Trial.(Court Reporter Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2004) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Bench Trial began on 3/29/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton for 3 weeks. Matter continued to 3/30/04 at 8:30 AM (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2004) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Proposed Findings of Fact by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/29/2004) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Proposed Findings of Fact by John Ashcroft Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/29/2004) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d by Seventh Circuit in Northwestern Memorial Hospital v. Ashcroft filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Recent decision)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/26/2004) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Minute order re: final pretrial rulings.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/26/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 3/26/2004) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION & ORDER (Plfts' Objection to Publications Not Previously Disclosed):Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/25/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2004) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/25/2004) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Defendant's Exhibit List - Second Revised by John Ashcroft.. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 189 Objection Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Objection to Publications Not Previously Disclosed by John Ashcroft. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's use of Medical Records filed by John Ashcroft. (Clark, Kaija) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Helene T. Krasnoff in Support of 197 Request to File Confidential Deposition Designations of Dr. Joanna Cain Under Seal filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 197 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document Request to File Confidential Deposition Designations of Dr. Joanna Cain Under Seal filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 187 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Copyright Protected Materials Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Exclude Copyright Protected Materials filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER clarifying March 23 order. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/04. (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION & ORDER (Deliver Equipment to Courtroom for Trial): Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA re 189 to Objection to Publications Not Previously Disclosed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re 190 Leave to file a motion to seal one deposition designation. filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 190 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Leave to Deliver Equipment to Courtroom for Use at Trial by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/24/2004) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re March 23 filings. No further motions to be filed until first day of trial.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/23/04. (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 180 , 183 Publications Not Previously Disclosed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List objection to plaintiffs' amended exhibit list by John Ashcroft.. (Clark, Kaija) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Copyright Protected Materials filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3)(Clark, Kaija) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re 180 to Defendant's (Revised) Exhibit List by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Deborah A. Adler in Support of 184 Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant's Exhibits Containing Medical Records filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to re 180 Defendant's Exhibits Containing Medical Records by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Defendant's List of "Learned Treatises" by John Ashcroft.. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Order denying defendant's request re: admission of expert trial testimony. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/22/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 3/23/2004) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate.. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Defendant's Exhibit List - Revised by John Ashcroft.. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION & ORDER: (Documents Produced by California Medical Association) Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/22/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Documents Produced by California Medical Association by John Ashcroft. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/22/2004) (Entered: 03/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/12/04 before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter: Debra Pas.. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/19/04. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 3/19/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (Pltf's Motion in Limine to Preserve Anonymity of Dr. Doe at Trial, asModified---GRANTED). Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/19/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference---HELD. Defendant's Motions were resolved by the court. Next week - Deadline for Final Trial Filings, Updated Exhibit Lists. Opening Statements waived. The court placed the following limits: 25 hours/per side limit as to trial time; 7 live witnesses and 6 by depositions/per side as stated on the Record.. Extending the Temporary Restraining Order was addressed. The court will be issuing a written Order. Matter was continued to 3/29/04 at 8:30 A.M. for Jury Trial (3 weeks). (Date Filed: 3/19/2004). (Court Reporter: Diane Skillman.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re extension of TRO. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/19/04. (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 3/19/2004) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 156 and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by John Ashcroft.. (Noronha, Preeya) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Counterdesignations to Defendant's Deposition Designations re 158 Exhibit List filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2004 03:00 PM. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/17/2004) Modified on 3/31/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply to Opposition re 149 , 150 Response to Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to 1) Planned Parenthood's Request for Introduction of a Few Expert Depositions, and 2) Offer of Proof filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/17/2004) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 31 Order Stipulated Extension of Temporary Restraining Order; [Proposed] Order by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/16/2004) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 161 of Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 161 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/16/2004) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION & ORDER (Non-Disclosure of Certain Confidential Information): Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/16/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2004) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 152 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Fetal Pain filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Preeya M. Noronha# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2)# 5 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2)# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Proposed Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Filed on 3/15/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION re 146 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Confidential Information by John Ashcroft. (Clark, Kaija) (Filed on 3/15/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 149 MOTION Request for Introduction of a Few Expert Depositions, 150 MOTION Offer of Proof of Deposition Testimony of Physicians to Show "Significant Body of Medical Opinion" filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support re 144 MOTION in Limine to Preserve Anonymity of Dr. Doe at Trial as Modified filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 3/15/2004) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Fact (Joint) by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 3/11/2004) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List JOINDER IN PP EXHIBIT LIST, DEPOSITION DESIGNATION, MOTION FOR INTRODUCTION OF DESPOSITION TESTIMONY, AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by City and County of San Francisco.. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Defendant's Pretrial Documentary Designations by John Ashcroft.. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEPOSITION Designations filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2004 03:00 PM. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/10/2004) Modified on 3/31/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate.. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/5/04 before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini.. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Deborah A. Adler in Support of 152 Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Fetal Pain filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Fetal Pain filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2004 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Eve C. Gartner in Support of 149 , 150 Plaintiffs' Request for Introduction of a Few Expert Depositions and Plaintiffs' Offer of Proof of Deposition Testimony of Physicians to Show "Significant Body of Medical Opinion" filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 149 , 150 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OFFER of Proof of Deposition Testimony of Physicians to Show "Significant Body of Medical Opinion" filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2004 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) Modified on 3/31/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Request for Introduction of a Few Expert Depositions filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2004 03:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINDER Plaintiff City and County of San Francisco's Joinder in Planned Parenthood's Motions in Limine filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Van Runkle, Aleeta) (Filed on 3/9/2004) Modified on 3/31/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Teresa L. Federer in Support of 146 of Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Confidential Information filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 146 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Argument Regarding Confidential Information filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Teresa L. Federer in Support of 144 Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Motion in Limine to Preserve Anonymity of Dr. Doe at Trial filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 144 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Preserve Anonymity of Dr. Doe at Trial filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/9/2004) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION & ORDER (Pretrial Schedule): (1) Deadline for Designations of Deposition Testimony & Discovery Responses under paragraph 9(b) of the Pretrial Scheduling Order changed to 3/10/04; (2) Deadline List of Trial Exhibits - 3/10/04; (3) Particularized showing - Any Witness designated as an expert whose testimony a party seeks to submit by deposition - 3/9/04... Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than 3/9/04, Oppositions - 3/15/04. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2004) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate re 139 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion to Seal Document Exhibit A to Declaration of Maureen E. Paul, M.D. In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel (Redacted Medical Record) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Pretrial Schedule by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Defendant's Motion to Compel---DENIED as stated on the Record. The court would like to receive the Amicus Brief before the Court Trial begins. Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law - First Day of Trial. The court will be issuing a written Order.(Court Reporter: Joan Columbini)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 102 Motion to Compel, granting 103 Motion, granting 104 Motion, denying 105 Motion, granting 126 Motion to Seal Document (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DOCUMENT by City and County of San Francisco. Plaintiff City and County of San Francisco's Amended Witness Disclosures. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/5/2004) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dr. Eleanor Drey in Support of Plaintiff City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/4/2004) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Dr. Eleanor Drey in Support of Plainiff City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to Defendant John Ashcroft's Motion to Compel filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/4/2004) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Amicus Brief filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order Granting Amended Leave to File Amicus Brief by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kathleen S. Morris in Support of Plaintiff City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to John Ashcroft's Motion to Compel filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Dr. Eleanor Drey in Support of Opposition to John Ashcroft's Motion to Compel filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of James J. Gilligan (Henry, Terry) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 3/3/2004) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Teresa L. Federer in Support of 126 Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Have Exhibit A to Declaration of Maureen E. Paul, M.D. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 126 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document 124 Declaration in Support, Plaintiff's Administrative Request to Have Exhibit A to Declaration of Maureen E. Paul, M.D. in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed under seal pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Suellen Craig in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Maureen E. Paul, M.D., M.P.H. in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Joan Malin in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Katharine Sheehan, M.D. in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Mark Salo in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's motion to compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Helene T. Krasnoff in Support of 117 Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Deborah A,. Adler in Support of 117 in support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 117 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Re: Hrg on Defendant's Mot to Compel (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 102 MOTION to Compel Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: California Medical Association Motion to File Amicus Brief---GRANTED.Brief shall be filed by 3/3/04 by 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/2/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2004) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting California Medical Association's Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (in Opposition to Motion to Compel) filed by California Medical Association. (Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Telephone Status Conference---HELD for the purpose of setting briefing and hearing schedule for Defendant's Motion to Compel: PPFA/PPGG Opposition including any Declarations - 3/2/04 by noon. CCSF Opposition - 3/3/04 by 9:00, and all Declarations by 3/3/04 by noon. A telephonic hearing will be held on 3/5/04 at 2:00 P.M. Defendant's counsel to initiate conference call... (Not Reported)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate Plaintiffs' Witness List. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Witness List by John Ashcroft (Amended). (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List by John Ashcroft. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2004) (Entered: 03/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief Amicus Brief in Regard to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by David L. Faigman. (Faigman, David) (Filed on 2/29/2004) (Entered: 02/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: David L. Faigman's & Vikram Amar's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief---GRANTED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/24/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2004) (Entered: 02/25/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Ashcroft re 102 MOTION to Compel, 103 MOTION Exceed Page Limitations re 102 MOTION to Compel, 104 MOTION for Shortened Briefing Schedule re 102 MOTION to Compel, 105 MOTION to Extend Time for Completion of Depositions and/or for Leave to Take Additional Depositions re 102 MOTION to Compel (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2004) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Extend Time for Completion of Depositions and/or for Leave to Take Additional Depositions re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2004) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Shortened Briefing Schedule re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2004) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Exceed Page Limitations re 102 MOTION to Compel filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2004) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel filed by John Ashcroft. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit # 12 Exhibit # 13 Exhibit # 14 Proposed Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2004) (Entered: 02/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Motion to File Amicus Brief by David L. Faigman. (Faigman, David) (Filed on 2/18/2004) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by David L. Faigman. (Faigman, David) (Filed on 2/18/2004) Modified on 2/19/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by David L. Faigman. (Faigman, David) (Filed on 2/18/2004) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Permitting the Use of Up to 23 Expert Depositions...Telephonic Hearing held on 2/11/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Court Reporter: Debra Pas)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2004) (Entered: 02/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief re 96 , 91 , 93 , 94 Reply Letter Brief re witnesses outside 100-mile subpoena power of the Court filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 96 , 91 , 93 , 94 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/9/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re 93 regarding whether the discovery depositions of experts beyond the 100-mile subpoena power of the Court can be intro as evidence at trial -- Defendant's Reply Letter Brief filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings, February 5, 2004)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/9/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION & ORDER (Injunction Extension - City & County of San Francisco): Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/9/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2004) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief regarding whether the discovery depositions of designated expert witnesses who are beyond the 100-mile subpoena limit of the Court can be introduced into evidence at trial filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix containing unreported opinions)(Noronha, Preeya) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief re 90 seeking a ruling that it may introduce into evidence deposition testimony of any expert witness who is outside the 100 mile subpoena power of the court filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 90 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order (Stipulated) Extending Injunction to the City and County of San Francisco by City and County of San Francisco. (Morris, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION & ORDER (Whether Depositions of Expert Witnesses Beyond the 100 Mile Subpoena Limit of the District Court Can be Introduced into Evidence at Trial): Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/6/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION requesting resolution of the issue as to whether depositions of expert witnesses who are beyond the 100 mile subpoena limit can be introduced into evidence at trial by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/6/2004) (Entered: 02/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton re 76 Motion to Seal Document (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 2/5/2004) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION & PROTECTIVE ORDER: Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/5/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2004) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL expert witnesses-EXHIBIT E filed by Plaintiffs. FILED UNDER SEAL. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/2/2004) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 76 MOTION to Seal Document 75 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Have Expert Report Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2004) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDERORDER: GRANTING Plft Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request, the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the Rebuttal Expert Report of DR. DOE. Pltf may file a redacted version of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Doe in the public file that has Dr. Doe's name, medical affiliation, and other identifying information redacted. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/4/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2004) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: GRANTING Plft Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request, the Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the Rebuttal Expert Report of DR. DOE. Pltf may file a redacted version of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Doe in the public file that has Dr. Doe's name, medical affiliation, and other identifying information redacted. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/4/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2004) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: GRANTING Pltf Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Remove fromthe public file the Rebuttal Expert Report of DR. JACKSON, filed on 1/30/04. Plft may file a redacted version of the Rebuttal Report of Dr. Jackson in the public file that has the names and contact information of Dr. Jackson's references and mentees' redacted. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/4/04. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2004) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate re 75 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Notice of Filing: Corrected Rebuttal Expert Report of Eleanor A. Drey, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Rebuttal Report of Eleanor A. Drey, M.D.)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/3/2004) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Adler, Deborah) (Filed on 2/3/2004) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Beth H. Parker in Support of 75 , 79 Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Remove Unredacted Expert Report from Public File Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 75 , 79 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/2/2004) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document 75 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Remove Redacted Expert Report from Public File Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Redacted Expert Report)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 2/2/2004) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Ashcroft of Testimony List of Steven L. Clark, M.D. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 2/2/2004) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Beth H. Parker in Support of 75 , 76 In Support of Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Have Expert Report Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 75 , 76 ) (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document 75 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request to Have Expert Report Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5 filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff Planned Parenthood's Administrative Request Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-10 to Have Expert Report Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Rebuttal Expert Report of Maureen Paul, M.D., M.P.H.# 2 Exhibit B - Rebuttal Expert Report of Fredrik F. Broekhuizen, M.D.# 3 Exhibit C - Rebuttal Expert Report of Mitchell D. Creinin, M.D.# 4 Exhibit D - Rebuttal Expert Report of Eleanor A. Drey, M.D.# 5 Exhibit E - Rebuttal Expert Report of John Doe, M.D.# 6 Exhibit F - Expert Report of Rebecca A. Jackson, M.D.)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum Regarding the Deference to be Accorded to Congressional Findings filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Ashcroft Defendant's Rule 26(e) Supplemental Disclosures (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (Granting Withdrawal Attys of Record - ECF Electronic Noticing System):...Roni R. Reed shall be removed as atty of record. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/04.(lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2004) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re proposed protective order. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/29/04. (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 1/29/2004) (Entered: 01/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and (Proposed) Protective Order by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Adler, Deborah) (Filed on 1/28/2004) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate Corrected Expert Report of Fredrik F. Broekhuizen, M.D. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/28/2004) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDICES-VOLUME VI to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiffs./MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDICES-VOLUME V to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiffs./MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPENDICES-VOLUME IV to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiffs./MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPENDICES-VOLUME III to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiff./MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDICES-VOLUME II to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiff./MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDICES-VOLUME I to the Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re deference to congressional findings filed by Plaintiff./ MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate re 61 Brief,, Proof of Service by Federal Express of Voluminous Documents - Appendices - Volumes I-VI to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities re Deference to Congresssional Findings (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/23/2004) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Points and Authorities re Deference to Congressional Findings filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Supplement Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Appendix Volume I# 7 Appendix Volume II# 8 Appendix Volume III# 9 Appendix Volume IV# 10 Appendix Volume V# 11 Appendix Volume VI)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/23/2004) Modified on 1/26/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder in Planned Parenthood's Brief re Deference to Congressional Findings filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Van Runkle, Aleeta) (Filed on 1/23/2004) Modified on 1/26/2004 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Ashcroft of Omitted Articles Referenced in Expert Report of Kanwaljeet Anand (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/21/2004) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by John Ashcroft of Filing: Corrected Expert Report of Charles J. Lockwood, M.D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Expert Report of Charles J. Lockwood, M.D.)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/19/2004) (Entered: 01/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by John Ashcroft of Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Expert Report of Kanwaljeet Anand# 2 Exhibit Expert Report of Watson Bowes# 3 Exhibit Expert Report of Steven Clark# 4 Exhibit Expert Report of Curtis Cook# 5 Exhibit Expert Report of Charles Lockwood# 6 Exhibit Expert Report of Elizabeth Shadigian# 7 Exhibit Expert Report of LeRoy Sprang)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 1/16/2004) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Expert Witnesses filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Report# 2 Exhibit A - CV# 3 Exhibit B - Report# 4 Exhibit B - CV# 5 Exhibit C - Report# 6 Exhibit C - CV# 7 Exhibit D - Report# 8 Exhibit D - CV# 9 Exhibit E - Report# 10 Exhibit F - Report# 11 Exhibit F - CV# 12 Exhibit G - Report# 13 Exhibit G - CV# 14 Exhibit H - Report# 15 Exhibit H - CV# 16 Exhibit I - Report# 17 Exhibit I - CV# 18 Exhibit J - Report# 19 Exhibit J - CV# 20 Exhibit K - Report# 21 Exhibit K - CV# 22 Exhibit L - Report# 23 Exhibit L - CV# 24 Exhibit M - Report# 25 Exhibit M - CV# 26 Exhibit N - Report# 27 Exhibit N - CV# 28 Exhibit O - Report# 29 Exhibit O - CV# 30 Exhibit P - Report# 31 Exhibit P - CV# 32 Exhibit Q - Report# 33 Exhibit Q - CV# 34 Exhibit R - Report# 35 Exhibit R - CV# 36 Exhibit S - Report# 37 Exhibit S - CV# 38 Exhibit T - Report# 39 Exhibit T - CV# 40 Exhibit U - Report# 41 Exhibit U - CV# 42 Exhibit V - Report# 43 Exhibit V - CV)(Parker, Beth) (Filed on 1/16/2004) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Regarding the Deference to Be Accorded to Congressional Findings filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 1/9/2004) (Entered: 01/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: granting 42 Motion to Intervene - City & County of San Francisco.The pretrial schedule already entered shall apply equally to CCSF by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.(lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2004) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff by City & County of San Francsico Hearing held on 1/7/2004 before Phyllis J. Hamilton. Motion GRANTED as stated on the Record. (Date Filed: 1/8/2004)(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt) (lm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2004) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record in ECF Electronic Filing System filed by California Medical Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Calia, Kurt) (Filed on 1/6/2004) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer and Affirmative Defenses to plaintiffs' Supplemental Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint by John Ashcroft. (Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 12/30/2003) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson and Kaija M. Clark as additional counsel for defendant (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 12/9/2003) (Entered: 12/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/6/03 before Judge Hamilton. Court Reporter: Leo T. Mankiewicz.. (fb, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/8/2003) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Non-Opposition re 42 Motion of the City and County of San Francisco to Intervene as Plaintiff filed by John Ashcroft. (Related document(s) 42 ) (Quinlivan, Mark) (Filed on 12/5/2003) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/4/03. (pjhlc2, ) (Filed on 12/4/2003) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Pretrial Order Joint Proposed Pre-Trial Scheduling Order by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 12/3/2003) (Entered: 12/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION & ORDER: (Posting Security) Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/26/03. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2003) (Entered: 11/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order on Posting Security by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Filed on 11/25/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED DOCUMENT by City and County of San Francisco. Amendment to 42 MOTION to Intervene Points and Authorities in Support; Complaint in Intervention AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION etc.. (Stewart, Therese) (Filed on 11/25/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene Points and Authorities in Support; Complaint in Intervention filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2004 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint in Intervention# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Mitchell Katz in Support of Motion of the City and County of San Francisco to Intervene as Plaintiff# 4 Affidavit Attestation by Therese Stewart to the Declaration of Mitchell Katz)(Stewart, Therese) (Filed on 11/25/2003) (Entered: 11/25/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Campbell Crosby by on behalf of California Medical Association. (Crosby, Margaret) (Filed on 11/24/2003) (Entered: 11/24/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by John Ashcroft of filing legislative materials pertaining to the Partial-Birth Abortion Ban Act of 2003 by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew I. Warden# 2 Exhibit CD-ROM Containing Legislative Materials Pertaining to Partial-Birth Abortion Ban Act of 2003)(Warden, Andrew) (Filed on 11/19/2003) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge Hamilton on November 19, 2003. (pjhlc3, ) (Filed on 11/19/2003) (Entered: 11/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by John Ashcroft of Recent Order in Other Proceeding by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order)(Noronha, Preeya) (Filed on 11/18/2003) (Entered: 11/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate re 1 Complaint, summons, Pro hac vice applications and proposed orders (Entered: 11/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Ashcroft. (Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Recent Order in Other Proceeding by John Ashcroft. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Noronha, Preeya) (Entered: 11/14/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Ashcroft. Filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - The Act)(Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re 31 Joint Letter as directed by November 7, 2003 Temporary Restraining Order filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order): Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/7/03. (lm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 23 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief (pjhlc2, ) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order held on 11/6/2003 before Phyllis J. Hamilton---GRANTED as stated on the Record. A written order will issue tomorrow. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief re 7 re Memorandum and Order issued by S,D.N.Y. granting temporary restraining order filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eve C. Gartner (fb, Court Staff) Modified on 11/13/2003 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Helene T. Krasnoff (fb, Court Staff) Modified on 11/13/2003 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Roger K. Evans (fb, Court Staff) Modified on 11/13/2003 (fb, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re 22 filed by John Ashcroft. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by California Medical Association. (Attachments: # 1 California Medical Association's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief# 2 Proposed Order Granting California Medical Association's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief)(Calia, Kurt) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Brief re 7 Temporary Restraining Order filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nebraska Memorandum & Order)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 7 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Phone Conference held on 11/4/2003 before Phyllis J. Hamilton in an attempt to schedule the briefing and hearing on Plfts' Motion for TRO filed yesterday, ll/3/03. Deft shall immediately send by electronic mail a copy of his opposition brief filed in the District of Nebraska, and shall file electronically with this court an opposition brief, not to exceed 40 pages, by noon on 11/5/03. A Hearing will be held on 11/6/03 at 2:00 PM (Not Reported)(lm, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to John Ashcroft (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Brief re 15 filed by John Ashcroft. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application re 7 Extension of Page Limits filed by John Ashcroft. (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief re 7 Letter to counsel for plaintiffs filed by John Ashcroft. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Quinlivan, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Brief re 7 Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Partial Birth Abortion Action pending 11/10/03 hearing filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/3/03. (as, ) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (sp, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE/PROOF OF SERVICE by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate re 9 , 10 , 11 , 7 , 8 by Federal Express and Hand Delivery (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Maureen E. Paul, M.D., M.P.H. in Support of 8 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Paul Declaration# 2 Exhibit B to Paul Declaration)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Fredrik F. Broekhuizen, M.D. in Support of 8 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appendix re 8 Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum# 2 Exhibit 2 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum# 3 Exhibit 3 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum# 4 Exhibit 4 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum# 5 Exhibit 5 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of memorandum# 6 Exhibit 6 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of Memorandum# 7 Exhibit 7 to Appendix of Unpublished Cases in Support of memorandum# 8 Exhibit 8 to Appendix of Unpublished cases in support of Memorandum)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 7 of Plaintiffs' Request for a Temporary Restraining Order and a Preliminary Injunction filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Notice of Ex Parte Motion and Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and An Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2003 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Regarding Preliminary Injunction)(Parker, Beth) (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed, by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. John Ashcroft (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Eve C. Gartner filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Roger K. Evans filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of attorney Helene T. Krasnoff filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2004. Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2004 at 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against John Ashcroft (Filing fee $150.00 receipt number 3353053). Filed by Planned Parenthood Federation of America, Inc., Planned Parenthood Golden Gate. (gba, COURT STAFF) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2003 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 280 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?