Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Does 1, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02921
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 12:10 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo Doe 18, Defendant
No Logo Doe 19, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo Doe #21, Defendant
No Logo Doe 22, Defendant
No Logo Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo Doe 24, Defendant
No Logo Doe 25, Defendant
No Logo Doe 26, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo DOE #4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with the Notice of Dismissal of Case filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) on March 26, 2014 ECF No. 41 , it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to all remaining John Doe Defendants, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/1/2014. (evana, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER re: 39 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Doe 17 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/17/2014. (evana, ) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 17 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Plaintiff's Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants by 3/24/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/19/2014. (mehcd) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            MEMORANDUM regarding 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/19/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER. ORDERED that Doe # 25 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/30/14. (jhawk, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 25 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER. ORDERED that Doe # 7 and Doe # 14 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/21/14. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does #7 and 14 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding 29 MOTION to Quash. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/02/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                            (NOTICE) Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena by John Doe (jjhsl, ) Modified on 1/2/2014 to change into a motion (jjhsl, ). Modified on 1/2/2014 terminated pursuant to MEH instruction (jjhsl, ). (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                              (NOTICE) Motion to Proceed Anonymously by by John Doe #18 and #20. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Doe #18/20 [Renewed] Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously 23 is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. The Court notes that the Clerk of the Court properly filed the present motion and the document found at docket #24 under restriction due to Doe #18/20's notation of his/her telephone number on the filing sheets. However, to the extent it may do so, the Clerk of the Court is directed to place only the filing sheets under Restriction Level 2 until further order of the Court and remove the remainder of the documents at dockets #23 and #24 from restriction by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/13. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER. The Court finds that Doe #18/20 has not met his burden of showing that the subpoena served on Century Link must be quashed. Therefore, Defendant Doe #18/20's Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena 24 is denied by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/31/13. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MEMORANDUM regarding Motions 23 and 24 referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/30/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                      RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                        RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 21 Minute Order to John Doe #18 and #20. Text Only Entry. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER striking 17 Defendant Doe #18/20's [Renewed] Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena and 18 Defendant Doe #18/20's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Minute Order to Doe #18/20 at the address provided in docket #18, but Doe #18/20's address shall not be included in the publicly-entered Certificate of Service. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                              Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM regarding Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/9/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                    RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 14 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena If Doe #18/20 wishes to re-file his motion in accordance with this order and all applicable local and federal court rules, he may do so on or before December 6, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/13.(jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 14 MOTION to Quash filed by Doe 1. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/20/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Restricted LEVEL 2 by Defendant Doe 75.163.198.142 (ervsl, ) Modified on 11/21/2013 to restrict (jjhsl, ). (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER denying 11 Motion to Quash Subpoena, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2013.(ervsl, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM regarding 11 MOTION to Quash. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/18/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by John Doe 75.163.161.217. (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/30/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/29/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/29/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agarc, ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Does 1-26 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3592939), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?