American Civil Liberties Union v. United States
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 13-445

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3895 - Statutes: FOIA 1974
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 01/16/2014 by CM/ECF.[1136303] [13-445]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
    REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from DAVIS WRIGHT, with fee, RECEIVED.[1081741] [13-422, 13-445]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
      POST ARGUMENT LETTER BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/30/2013 by CM/ECF. [1079359] [13-422, 13-445]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        MOTION ORDER, granting motion for permission to file an ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission to address questions posed at oral argument [137] filed by Appellee United States Department of Justice, Appellee United States Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency and United States Department of Defense, by JAC, Circuit Judge, FILED. [1069888][149] [13-422, 13-445]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
          LETTER, on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, RECEIVED. Service date 10/18/2013 by CM/ECF.[1069511] [13-445]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
            OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument [137], on behalf of Appellant American Civil Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, FILED. Service date 10/15/2013 by CM/ECF. [1065578][142] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
              OPPOSITION TO MOTION for leave to file ex parte and in camera classified supplemental submission, addressing questions posed at oral argument, [137], on behalf of Appellant Charlie Savage, Scott Shane and The New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 10/14/2013 by CM/ECF. [1064871][141] [13-422, 13-445]--[Edited 10/15/2013 by JT]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?