Howard Town Center Developer, v. Howard University
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 13-7198

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 7:54 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3230 - Real Property: Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207596660 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
JOINT APPENDIX [1494542] filed by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029. [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 05/27/2014 ] [13-7198, 14-7029] (Schmidtlein, John)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 01207596649 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
    APPELLANT BRIEF [1494539] filed by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029 [Service Date: 05/27/2014 ] Length of Brief: 12,240 Words. [13-7198, 14-7029] (Schmidtlein, John)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207587466 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE FILED [1489394] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC in 13-7198, 14-7029 to substitute attorney Glenn C. Etelson substituted by John E. Schmidtlein, Kenneth C. Smurzynski, and Masha G. Hansford [Service Date: 04/22/2014 ] [13-7198, 14-7029] (Hansford, Masha)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207585636 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1488410] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 05/27/2014. APPENDIX due 05/27/2014. APPELLEE Brief due on 06/26/2014. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 07/10/2014 [13-7198, 14-7029]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207579903 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
          CLERK'S ORDER filed [1485270] consolidating cases 14-7029 (Consolidation started 03/25/2014) with 13-7198 [13-7198, 14-7029]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207579897 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1485267] considering motion for determination of finality of order [1477671-2]. ORDERED that the Clerk process this appeal in the normal course. The decision is final for purposes of 12 U.S.C. § 1291. Before Judges: Griffith, Kavanaugh and Millett. [13-7198]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566530 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1477666] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566377 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                STATEMENT FILED [1477578] by Howard University with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (McCormack, Timothy)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566371 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1477575] by Howard University [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (McCormack, Timothy)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566362 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1477572] by Timothy F. McCormack on behalf of Appellee Howard University. [13-7198] (McCormack, Timothy)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207560274 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE [1473882] filed from Clerk, District Court: MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING the plaintiff-counter-defendant's [43] Motion to Hold in Abeyance Filings Regarding, and Hearing On, Attorneys' Fees, Expenses and Costs Pending Appeal. [13-7198]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207558810 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK'S ORDER filed [1473091] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT statement of issues due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT underlying decision due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT transcript status report due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT procedural motions due 01/30/2014. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 02/14/2014; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 01/30/2014. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 01/30/2014. APPELLEE procedural motions due 01/30/2014. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 02/14/2014 [13-7198]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207558804 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1473087] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-01075-BAH. Assigned USCA Case Number [13-7198]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207570180 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                            SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1479851] by Howard University to motion for other relief [1477671-2] [Service Date: 02/12/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7198] (McCormack, Timothy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207567865 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1478424] by Howard University to motion for other relief [1477671-2] [Service Date: 02/05/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7198] (McCormack, Timothy)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566616 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                STATEMENT FILED [1477706] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC with Disclosure Listing [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566576 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1477679] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566561 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1477674] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566558 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1477673] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566555 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1477672] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566547 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION filed [1477671] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC. FOR DETERMINATION OF FINALITY OF ORDER (Response to Motion served by mail due on 02/13/2014) [Service Date: 01/30/2014 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566544 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                            ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1477670] by Glenn C. Etelson on behalf of Appellants Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC. [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207566534 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1477667] by Castlerock Partners, LLC and Howard Town Center Developer, LLC [Service Date: 01/30/2014 ] [13-7198] (Etelson, Glenn)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?