Everbank v. Blair et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Northern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00022
District Judge John E Dowdell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 11:21 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Everbank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro & Cejda

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Mueller +1 405 848 1819 +1 405 848 2009
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesli Bailey Peterson +1 405 848 1819 +1 405 848 2009
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K Templeton +1 405 848 1819 +8482 848 848 2009

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro & DiCaro, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J Cejda +1 405 848 1819 +1 405 848 2009 okecfwestern@logs.com
v.
No Logo Darrell R Matlock, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Howard, Widdows, Bufogle & Vaughn, P.C., Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Michael Staggs, Defendant
No Logo Spouse, if any of William Lee Blair, Defendant
No Logo William Lee Blair, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by William Lee Blair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lee Blair +1 918 447 7703
Affiliated Computer Services, Inc. Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham Wagner Steele Lehman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lindsey Elizabeth Albers +1 918 970 2000 +1 918 970 2002 lalbers@lswsl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Fowler Lehman +1 918 970 2000 +1 918 970 2002 slehman@lswsl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Steele +1 918 970 2000 +1 918 970 2002 msteele@lswsl.com
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben S Bernanke"
No Logo Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cathryn Dawn McClanahan +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7939 cathy.mcclanahan@usdoj.gov
No Logo Charles Bradford Henry, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Chea Redditt, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Chuck Patterson, Third Party Defendant
Comerica Bank Comerica Bank, Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "Comercia Bank"
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Ramay & Co
No Logo Daniel K Tarullo, Third Party Defendant
No Logo E Scott Pruitt, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth A Duke, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Everbank Financial Corp, Third Party Defendant
Yellen, Janet Yellen, Janet, Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "Janet L Yellen"
No Logo Jefferey J Burns, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Jeremy C Stein, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Jerome H Powell, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Ken Miller, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Ladeanna Anderson, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Lloyd L Fields, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Mark Costello, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Mary Fallon, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by OKLAHOMA OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Jacob Stewart +1 405 521 3921 +1 405 521 4518 aaron.stewart@oag.ok.gov
MasterCard International, Inc. MasterCard International, Inc., Third Party Defendant
Officially listed as "Mastercard"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mary B Scott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Derek Cowan +1 405 236 4645 +1 405 239 2843 jdc@abowitzlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah J Timberlake +1 405 236 4645 +1 405 239 2843 mainmail@abowitzlaw.com
Space Sarah J Timberlake +1 405 236 4645 +1 405 239 2843 mainmail@abowitzlaw.com
No Logo Melody Garner, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Reuben Gant, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Ruth K Nelson, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moyers Martin Santee & Imel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Michael Kollmorgen +1 918 582 5281 +1 918 585 8318 tmk@moyersmartin.com
No Logo Sarah Bloom Raskin, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Sheila Jackson-Johnson, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Thomas Kemp, Jr, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Vickie Williams, Third Party Defendant
No Logo William Andrew Edmondson, Third Party Defendant
No Logo William Lee Blair, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lee Blair +1 918 447 7703
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
EXHIBIT(S) (CD) (Re: 41 MOTION to Amend ) by William Lee Blair (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION to Amend (Re: Cross-claim filed in State Court ) by William Lee Blair (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to Motion (Re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by William Lee Blair ; (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
        Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Everbank (Cejda, Kirk) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Everbank (Cejda, Kirk) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE Notice of Third Party Plaintiff Blair's Failure to Repond to Dispositive Motion (Re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Mastercard (Cowan, John) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kirk J Cejda on behalf of Everbank (Cejda, Kirk) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION to Vacate Order/Judgment by William Lee Blair (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Strike Document(s) (Re: 33 Response to Motion ) by Ben S Bernanke, Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve, Elizabeth A Duke, Jerome H Powell, Sarah Bloom Raskin, Jeremy C Stein, Daniel K Tarullo, Janet L Yellen (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE to Motion (Re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) by William Lee Blair ; (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE to Motion (Re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, 19 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by William Lee Blair ; (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mastercard (Cowan, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Derek Cowan on behalf of Mastercard (Cowan, John) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent MasterCard Incorporated for Mastercard) by Mastercard (Cowan, John) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Comerica Incorporated for Comercia Bank) by Comercia Bank (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mastercard to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                  MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Comerica Corporation be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: 25 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Comerica Corporate Headquarters (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Xerox Corporation for Affiliated Computer Services, Inc.) by Affiliated Computer Services, Inc. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Murray E Abowitz on behalf of Mastercard (Abowitz, Murray) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., and Comerica Corporate Headquarters to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Paul J Cleary, Magistrate Judge T Lane Wilson no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 14-cv-22-JED-PJC (crp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Mary Fallon, Thomas Kemp, Jr, Ken Miller (With attachments) (Stewart, Aaron) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by William Andrew Edmondson, E Scott Pruitt (Stewart, Aaron) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Jacob Stewart on behalf of William Andrew Edmondson, Mary Fallon, Thomas Kemp, Jr, Ken Miller, E Scott Pruitt (Stewart, Aaron) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Affiliated Computer Services, Inc and Comerica Corporation by Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Comerica Corporate Headquarters (With attachments) (Steele, Mark) Modified on 2/4/2014 to correct event (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Comerica Corporate Headquarters (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsey Elizabeth Albers on behalf of Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Comerica Corporate Headquarters (Albers, Lindsey) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Scott Fowler Lehman on behalf of Affiliated Computer Services, Inc., Comerica Corporate Headquarters (Lehman, Scott) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            First MOTION to Dismiss by Ladeanna Anderson, Jefferey J Burns, Reuben Gant, Melody Garner, Sheila Jackson-Johnson, Ruth K Nelson, Chuck Patterson, Chea Redditt, Vickie Williams (Kollmorgen, Terry) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Terry Michael Kollmorgen on behalf of Ladeanna Anderson, Jefferey J Burns, Reuben Gant, Melody Garner, Sheila Jackson-Johnson, Ruth K Nelson, Chuck Patterson, Chea Redditt, Vickie Williams (Kollmorgen, Terry) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: 2 Notice of Removal, ) by Ben S Bernanke, Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve, Elizabeth A Duke, Jerome H Powell, Sarah Bloom Raskin, Jeremy C Stein, Daniel K Tarullo, Janet L Yellen (With attachments) (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Leave of Court (filed in State Court) by William Lee Blair (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing David J. Mueller to file by February 6, 2014 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lal, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: personal identifiers not redacted; Correction: redacted personal identifiers (Re: 5 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (filed in State Court) ) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss (filed in State Court) by William Andrew Edmondson, E Scott Pruitt (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Everbank to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (filed in State Court) by William Lee Blair (sc, Dpty Clk). Modified on 1/15/2014 to redact personal identifiers (sc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2013-3525 by Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve (With attachments) (McClanahan, Cathryn) Modified on 1/17/2014 to seal Exhibit 2 as document was filed unredacted. Counsel will file redacted version (sdc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of Governors, United States Federal Bank Reserve (McClanahan, Cathryn) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 266 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?