USA v. PLOTKIN et al

Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:05-cr-00249
District Judge Jose L. Linares, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jose L. Linares
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 5:35 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo MARCI PLOTKIN, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained K. ROGER PLAWKER +1 973 992 5300 krplawker@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained ALAN SILBER +1 973 992 5300 asilber@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained LIN CLAIRE SOLOMON +1 973 992 5300 lcsolomon@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
Letter from Donna Wolf, Administrative Assistant, Generals Counsel's Office, AICPA. Letter to request a certified copy of Judgment re 335 Judgment, (jn, ) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 5/20/2009, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2009. (mn, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Marci Plotkin by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), Count(s) 1s,Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment of $100 due immediately; Fine of $40,000 due immediately, Count(s) 11ss, 12ss, 13ss, 14ss-16ss, 17ss, 18ss, 19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss-25ss, 26ss-29ss, 2ss, 30ss, 31s, 31ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss, 8ss-10ss, Dismissed. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/20/09. (NR ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Sentencing held on 5/20/2009 for MARCI PLOTKIN (1), Count(s) 1s, Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment of $100 due immediately; Fine of $40,000 due immediately;Count(s) 11ss, 12ss, 13ss, 14ss-16ss, 17ss, 18ss, 19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss-25ss, 26ss-29ss, 2ss, 30ss, 31s, 31ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss, 8ss-10ss, Dismissed.(Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS LEWIS.) (NR ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 306 MOTION to Produce (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER authorizing representatives of NorthStar Lit to remove trial presentation equipment from the Courtroom on June 16, 2008 as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/12/08. (jgb) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for removal of equipment as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/29/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on February 11, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on government notions as to MARCI PLOTKIN, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 208 Motion Hearing,. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/21/08. (jn2, ) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of Guilty as to MARCI PLOTKIN. (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Change of Plea Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 2/11/2008. Plea entered by MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Guilty Count 1s., ( Sentencing set for 6/17/2008 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares.) (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 161 Motion in Limine as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/6/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 179 MOTION in Limine Opposition to Government's Motion In Limine to Admit Summary Charts and Summary Testimony (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 157 MOTION in Limine to Bar Opinions of Agent Grant or in the Alternative for a Daubert Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by MARCI PLOTKIN re 154 MOTION in Limine to bar testimony relative to attorney-client privileged communications (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 156 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and For a Daubert Hearing (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 162 MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Certificate of Service by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 184 Proposed Voir Dire (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Voir Dire by MARCI PLOTKIN, USA, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 2/6/2008 (lr, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/4/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 156 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and for a Daubert Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by STANLEY BEKRITSKY as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 154 MOTION in Limine by Marci Plotkin to Suppress Affidavits and Bar Testimony Relative to Attorney-Client Privileged Communications (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine in Opposition to USA Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 404(B) by STANLEY BEKRITSKY as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 162 MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2)(E) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 154 MOTION in Limine (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 157 MOTION in Limine Regarding IRS Revenue Agent Susan Grant (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Opposition)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 164 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER-ORDER authorizing the Government to file its motion to admit evidence and that the briefing schedule set forth in this Court's January 31st Order shall be adhered to by the parties as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/08. (jgb) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE STEVEN G. SANDERS appearing for USA. (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
Letter from Carl Greenfeld, Esq. on behalf of non-party Schonbraun McCann Group LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support of Discovery Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Protective Order)(GREENFELD, CARL) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: filing motions as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/31/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to admit summary charts and summary testimony by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of motion in limine to admit summary charts and summary testimony)(MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to preclude claims of selective prosecution by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of motion in limine to preclude claims of selective prosecution)(MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion 1.30.08, # 2 Exhibit A-C to Brief, # 3 Certificate of Service of Alan Silber, Esq. 1.30.08)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and for a Daubert Hearing by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig In Support of Motion)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of defendant Marci Plotkin's motion to suppress affidavits and bar testimony relative to attorney-client privileged communications, # 2 Certification of K. Roger Plawker, Esq, with Exhibits, # 3 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 141 MOTION to Suppress By Defendant Stadtmauer (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Yontef# 2 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/17/08. (jgb) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 144 MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF THE GOVERNMENT'S INTERVIEW NOTES (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Opinion & ORDER re: motions ro quash subpoenas as to MARCI PLOTKIN, RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/10/08. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (jn, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on December 20, 2007 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE HALLIE MITCHELL appearing for USA. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 12/20/2007 re 126 MOTION to Quash filed by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP, 115 MOTION to Quash filed by MURRAY KUSHNER, 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS filed by USA, 116 MOTION to Quash filed by JANET SCHENKMAN, NEIDICH & COMPANY, EUGENE SCHENKMAN (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE HALLIE MITCHELL appearing for USA. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER and HALLIE MITCHELL for USA added. Attorney HALLIE MITCHELL terminated. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney HALLIE MITCHELL and HALLIE MITCHELL for USA added. Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER terminated. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ROBERT J. KIPNEES appearing on behalf of the SCHONBRAUN MCCAN GROUP as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash (KIPNEES, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Greenfeld In Further Support Of Motion To Quash Subpoena with Exhibits A and B attached thereto# 2 Certificate of Service)(GREENFELD, CARL) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash, 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS (Attachments: # 1 Certification of K. Roger Plawker with Exhibits# 2 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ALAN SILBER appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Carole Ann Steiger on behalf of Kale Co., LLC re: subpoena. (jgb) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP as to MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion to quash# 2 Certification of Carol Donatiello in support of motion# 3 Certification of service)(jn2, ) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Robert M. Leonard, Esq. (LEONARD, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Quash# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by NEIDICH & COMPANY, EUGENE SCHENKMAN, JANET SCHENKMAN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 116 MOTION to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DAUBER, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: issuance of subpoenas as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/22/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for early production of statements as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/10/07. (jgb) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER OPINION denying defendant's motion for early production of the Himmel and Kipnees statements as to MARCI PLOTKIN. OTBS.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/9/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on June 6 & 7, 2007 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for a seperate trial on cts. 26-29 and 30-31 granting as to cts. 26-29 and ct. 31 and denied as to ct. 30. granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Release of Brady Materials as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); denying 47 Motion to Dismiss as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); denying 48 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); granting 89 Motion to Quash as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4); denying 52 Motion to Dismiss as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); denying 54 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); granting 55 Motion for Joinder as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); denying 56 Motion to Compel as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 57 Motion to Dismiss as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Release of Brady Materials as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 59 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 60 Motion to Strike as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 61 Motion seperate trial on cts. 26-29 and 30-31 as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Discovery as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 67 Motion to Amend/Correct as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 68 Motion to Amend/Correct as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 49 Omnibus Motion as to ANNE AMICI (4); granting 66 Motion to Amend/Correct as to ANNE AMICI (4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/29/07. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum re: motions) (jn, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant (EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Justin P. Walder re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant (WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 6/8/2007 re [#52] MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#47] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#45] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#48] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#53] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#54] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#46] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#58] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#62] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#59] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#60] MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 6/6/2007 re [#52] MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#47] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#45] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#48] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#53] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#54] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#46] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#57] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#58] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#62] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#59] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#60] MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER taking under advisement 89 Motion to Quash as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Ordered Mr. Timpone shall produce any documents responsive to the subpoena.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/16/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 5/10/07 until 2/8/08.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/10/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION to Quash Subpoena by WALTER F. TIMPONE as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Walter F. Tampone, Esq. in support of motion to quash subpoena# 2 Certification of John T. Coyne, Esq.)(jn2, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JOHN T. COYNE appearing for Walter F. Tampone, Esq. (jn2, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER OPINION AND ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Government's motion to sever the trial of Anne Amici is denied. Pending pretrial motions pending in this mater shall be heard before the court on 4/16/07. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/9/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER,, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E (Declaration of Charles Davenport)# 2 Exhibit A (Resume of Prof. Charles Davenport))(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 46 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by MARCI PLOTKIN re 48 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 3/1/2007 (lr,) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Government may file overlength brief.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/20/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
Certificate of Service by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct 49 Omnibus MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION filed by ANNE AMICI,, 51 Certificate of Service filed by ANNE AMICI,, 55 MOTION for Joinder to Other Motions, 58 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials, 56 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16, 46 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio, 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant, 61 MOTION Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum, 52 MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment, 63 MOTION for Discovery, 53 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment, 48 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 59 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 62 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25, 54 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 60 MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment, 47 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (vol 1)# 2 Exhibit A (vol 2)# 3 Exhibit A (vol 3)# 4 Exhibit B)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE to Join in the Motions of Co-Defendants as to MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Affidavit # 3 Exhibit A-F# 4 Exhibit G, part 1# 5 Exhibit G, part 2# 6 Exhibit H-I# 7 Exhibit J-N# 8 Certificate of Service # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Affidavit # 3 Exhibit 1-11# 4 Exhibit 12-17# 5 Exhibit 18-28# 6 Exhibit 19-35# 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss, MOTION to Sever Defendant by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: LIN CLAIRE SOLOMON appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SOLOMON, LIN) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: K. ROGER PLAWKER appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 11/20/2006 until 4/16/2007. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/20/2006. (mn, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 11/1/2006 (lr,) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER LIFTING LEIN ON PROPERTY POSTED AS BOND FOR THE PURPOSE OF REFINANCING as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/24/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE RACHAEL HONIG appearing for USA. (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 6/5/06 until 4/2/07. FURTHER ORDERED that discovery shall be completed by 9/15/06, and a status conference is scheduled for 11/1/06 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5D of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file pretrial motions, if any, no later than 11/15/06, the Government shall file a response to such motions no later than 12/15/06, defendants' replies shall be filed no later than 1/9/07, argument on the motions is scheduled for 1/22/07 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5D of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building, and trial in this matter is scheduled to commence at 10:00 a.m. on 4/2/07.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/5/06. (dj, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER,ANNE AMICI held on 6/5/2006. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2007 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. Status Conference set for 11/1/2006 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS LEWIS.)(lr,) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1)(EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Letter from Justin P. Walder, Esq. (WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Discovery and Inspection as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER. Motions due by 5/15/2006. Opposition due by 5/30/2006.Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on MAY 8, 2006. (lr,). (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Arraignment as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25; STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 1,3,6,11,12,13,18,21,30; and MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 1-31s held on 5/8/2006. Plea entered: NOT GUILTY.Responses due by 5/15/2006 Replies due by 5/30/2006. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr,). (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 8s-10s, 11s, 12s, 13s, 14s-16s, 17s, 18s, 19s, 20s, 21s, 22s, 23s, 24s-25s, 26s-29s, 30s, 31s, INDICTMENT as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) count(s) 1, 3, 6, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 30, RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 11, 12, 13, 14-16, 18, 19, 21, 22, 23, 24-25, ANNE AMICI (4) count(s) 1, 4, 6, 7, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 22, 24-25. (dj, ). (Entered: 04/28/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice delay until trial is excluded under STA as to MARCI PLOTKIN Discovery to be complete by 5/1/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Jose L. Linares. Status Conference set for 6/5/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Jose L. Linares.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/20/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge jose L.Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 9/20/2005 (lr, ). (Entered: 09/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER and THOMAS JEFFREY EICHER for USA added. Attorney SCOTT A. RESNIK terminated. (EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice discovery be completed by 9/12/05 as to MARCI PLOTKIN . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/25/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to MARCI PLOTKIN. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/10/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1,660 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?