Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc. et al v. Barfield et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00327
District Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Martin L.C. Feldman
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 3:15 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Andrew S. Bond, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Dalton Courson +1 504 581 3200 dcourson@stonepigman.com
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo Henry Lambert, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo Jacqueline M. Brettner, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo L Havard Scott, III, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo M. Lauren Brettner, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo R. Carey Bond, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
No Logo Sergio March Prieto, Plaintiff

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com
v.
No Logo Devin George, Defendant

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar Stuart Kyle Duncan +1 202 714 9492 kduncan@duncanpllc.com
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar J. Michael Johnson +1 318 658 9456 +1 318 658 9605 mjohnsonlegal@gmail.com

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
No Logo Tim Barfield, Defendant

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue Stuart Kyle Duncan +1 202 714 9492 kduncan@duncanpllc.com
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by McCabe Weisberg & Conway LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue J. Michael Johnson +1 318 658 9456 +1 318 658 9605 mjohnsonlegal@gmail.com

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Timeline
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None USCA Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels as to 17 Judgment. (cml) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Judgment
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that 14-0327 is consolidated with 13-5090. FURTHER ORDER that Case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/18/2014.(caa) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Status Conference held on 3/14/2014. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (caa) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, as to Tim Barfield answer due 3/27/2014; Devin George answer due 3/27/2014. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/5/2014. (mmm) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Attachment has duplicate description (i.e. Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer). For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk removed duplicate text. (jtd) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/2/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, by Tim Barfield, Devin George. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified docket text on 3/3/2014 (jtd). (Entered: 03/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 8 Motion for Briefing Schedule, Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages & Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/27/2014. (caa, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/14/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(caa, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Appear. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/26/2014. (caa, ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Entry of a Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memoranda in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, by Defendants and by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Courson, James) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Tim Barfield, Devin George. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed order on motion to appear as counsel for Defendants)Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party Tim Barfield(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party Devin George(pty:dft).(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc. (Courson, James) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Devin George served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. (Courson, James) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Tim Barfield served on 2/13/2014, answer due 3/6/2014. (Courson, James) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Tim Barfield, Devin George. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(cml, ) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv, ) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4341180) filed by Henry Lambert, M. Lauren Brettner, R. Carey Bond, Sergio March Prieto, Jacqueline M. Brettner, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Andrew S. Bond. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 141 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?