Liriano v. The Bank of New York Company, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-05327
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 6, 2016 at 1:26 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Maritza Liriano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Christopher K Jafari

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Allen Grochow +1 212 233 5400 +1 212 233 0919 rgrochow@aol.com
v.
No Logo 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO # 871), Defendant
No Logo 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 120 Broadway, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 715 Realty Co., Defendant
No Logo 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Capital Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Century 21 Department Stores LLC, Defendant
No Logo Century 21, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Kemet Corporation
Officer/Director, STRATOS LIGHTWAVE, INC.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Citicorp Holdings, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Officer/Director, Citigroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F&G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies, Defendant
No Logo Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hillman Environmental Group, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenyon & Kenyon"
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Logany L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mayore Estates L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Bender +21268701 00x 313 5405 +1 212 687 0659 jsavitsky@harrisbeach.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maloof, Lebowitz, Connahan & Oleske, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles John Gayner +1 212 233 9604 +1 212 233 3984 cgayner@mlcolaw.com
No Logo Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
No Logo Moody's Investors Service Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Moody's Investors Service"
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo One Broadway, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo One Broadway, LLC, Defendant
No Logo One Wall Street Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Stoner and Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Bank Of New York Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trinity Centre L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Yablon, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Salvatore J. Calabrese +1 914 948 5700 +1 914 948 9612 salvatore.calabrese@admlaw.com
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for failure to prosecute, filed and served on May 24, 2013, originally set for June 7, 2013, shall be and hereby extended for 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 14, 2013. The Defendants Reply papers shall be filed and served on or before Friday June 21, 2013., ( Responses due by 6/14/2013., Replies due by 6/21/2013.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/31/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(lmb) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is resolved as follows: Defendant NYSE Euronext will produce Antoine P. Sultana, Managing Director, Global Real Estate and Corporate Services, for a deposition pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 3, 2013 at 10:00 AM at a location to be agreed upon by the parties. This deposition will continue day to day until completed. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant NYSE Euronext to appear for depositions, that was filed and served on May 14, 2013 is withdrawn without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/20/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (rjm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION: Please take notice, that McGivney & Kluger, P.C. 80 Broad Street, 23rd Floor, New York, New York 10004, has been substituted as counsel in place and stead of Callan, Koster, Brady & Brennan, LLP. as attorneys for defendants Hudson View East Condominium and Board of Managers of the Hudson View East Condominium in the 21 MC 102 Docket for the Civil Action Numbers listed in Exhibit "A" attached hereto. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/7/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(js) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/22/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/16/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                PROTECTIVE ORDER NO. 1 GOVERNING THE DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND CONFIDENTIAL INSURANCE INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT GRUBB AND ELLIS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. ONLY FOR THE CASES LISTED IN THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A: IT IS 'HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned for the parties in the cases listed in the attached exhibit, that whereas no party herein is an infant,incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action and based on the representation of the within defendant, and to the extent of Plaintiff(s) can so Stipulate that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against defendant GRUBB & ElLlS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 22 Cortland Street, New York, New York for the cases listed in the attached exhibit shall be Bud the same hereby are discontinued without prejudice without costs to any party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/4/2012) (js) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMO-ENDORSEMENT: re: in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (4073) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. These law suits, approximately 2,000 in number, cannot be prosecuted effectively unless liaison counsels direct costs are equitably shared on a current basis. My order of August 19, 2011 so provides. Movants argument based on consensus and inequitable and partial sharing is rejected. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/29/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(pl) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/2/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT WITH TAYLOR RECYCLING AND DISMISSING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE: The Court has been advised that Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel, Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP, and counsel for Taylor Recycling, LLP, have reached a settlement of all claims against Taylor Recycling in the above-captioned cases. The Court has received a pair of stipulations to dismiss settled cases. I rule as follows. The Settlement with Taylor Recycling is Fair and Reasonable, and the Claims of the 1,802 Plaintiffs who Filed Proper Settlement Paperwork is Endorsed. The Complaints of 26 Derivative Plaintiffs who Alleged Claims Against Taylor Recycling, but who did not File Proper Settlement Paperwork, Are Dismissed Involuntarily for Failure to Prosecute. A group of Plaintiffs who had to cure their paperwork held claims against Taylor Recycling. I have been informed that 26 of these Plaintiffs have not cured the defects in their paperwork. Accordingly, I dismiss the complaints of these 26 Plaintiffs for failure to prosecute under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The dismissals are with prejudice. The list of 26 Plaintiffs is attached to this Order. One final point deserves notice. Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel submitted a proposed stipulation dismissing these 26 Plaintiffs, which suggests the dismissals are voluntary, that is, specifically requested by each such Plaintiff. It seems that this is not the case. Liaison Counsel's stipulation and proposed order of dismissal is rejected, and is being returned. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/21/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James E. Tyrrell, Jr. dated 1/19/2011 re: Requesting an extension of time to object to the terms contained in the Order Accepting Report of Special Counsel and Providing for Effectiveness of Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER ADJOURNING STATUS CONFERENCE 11/18/10 Status Conference reset for 12/3/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against Capital Properties, Inc., Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, 120 Broadway, L.L.C., 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO # 871), 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein Properties, Inc., 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C., Citibank, NA, Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C., Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C., Century 21, Inc., B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc., Stoner and Company, Inc., HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies, One Broadway, LLC, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., One Wall Street Holdings, L.L.C., Trinity Centre L.L.C. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maritza Liriano.(mbe) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON NOTICE OF MOTION for Sanctions against the Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP Firm in case 1:04-cv-05338-AKH; denying (3450) Motion for Sanctions in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. ENDORSEMENT: Motion for sanctions is denied. There has been no showing that a ruling in 21 MC 100 is applicable to litigation in 21 MC 102 or 21 MC 103. Defendants may consider filing a motion for injunction against plaintiff's splitting essentially the same courses of action: suing some defendants in federal court, and other defendants in state court. An Order to Show Course may be presented immediately following the oral arguments scheduled to be heard 7/28/09. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/24/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the Defendant, Battery Park City Authority's time to submit a Reply to its Motion to Dismiss Complaint which was filed and served on May 14, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended until July 24, 2009. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                  FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC. (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaints on behalf of the Battery Park City Authority, filed and served on May 14, 2009, originally set for May 28, 2009, shall be and hereby is extended for 21 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Friday, June 19, 2009. SO ORDERED ( Responses due by 6/19/2009) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/28/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jmi) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER. That the Defendant's motion to have Thomas R. Harrington, Esquire admitted to practice law in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York pro hac vice in connection with the above-captioned case is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to immediately apply for an ECF password at www.nysd.uscourts.gov and shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL CASES IN THE WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION IN WHICH AIG REALTY, INC., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC. AND AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL REALTY CORP. IS A DEFENDANT. Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. granting (3250 in Case No. 21mc102) Motion for Thomas R. Harrington to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/09). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/25/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the defendant's time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., filed and served on October 31, 2008, and originally set for February 24, 2009 shall be and hereby is extended for an additional 7 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, March 3, 2009. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER LOWER MANHATTAN DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/26/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C.. (Gayner, Charles) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles John Gayner on behalf of Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C. (Gayner, Charles) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant WILLIAM F. COLLINS, AIA ARCHITECTS. LLP i/s/h/a WILLIAM F. COLLINS ARCHITECTS in the above~captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for William F. Collins, William F. Collins Architects, added. This Document relates to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/13/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's Syska Hennessy Group, Inc., Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel that the Defendant's William F. Collins, AIA Architects LLP, Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint, filed and served on October 31, 2008. is amended to include the new and/or amended complaints listed in the attached service riders, as well as any future new and/or amended complaints served upon William F. Collins, AIA Architects, LLP. This Document Applies to All World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. Also 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendant SYSKA HENNESSY GROUP, Inc. s/h/a SYSKA AND HENNESSY in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP.THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. Attorney David M. Pollack for Syska and Hennesy added. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER Consent to Change Attorney. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP be substituted as counsel for Defendants, ACTA Realty Corp. and 25 Broadway Office Properties, LLC, in the above-captioned action as of this date, in place and instead of Donovan Hatem LLP. Attorney David M. Pollack for 25 Broadway Office Properties LLC, ACTA Realty Corp. added. THIS DOCUMENT APPLIES TO ALL WORLD TRADE CENTER DISASTER SITE LITIGATION. Also Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUND RECORDS... ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552a(b)(11), the USDOJ shall cooperate and make all reasonable efforts to make available and produce the VCF Claimant List. For every individual who has submitted an application and other material to the VCF seeking compensation for death or personal injury, the VCF Claimant List will set forth the claimant's and/or decedent's full name; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of the VCF Claimant List from USDOJ, the Parties shall, upon request, provide copies of same to any other Co-Liaison Counsel in both 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102 and 21 MC103 matters; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to the Parties under this Order shall be held in the strictest confidence, used only for purposes of the above-captioned litigations, not divulged to any third party, either in whole or in part, without the express written permission of this Court, and not filed with the Court unless under seal or with the Court's express written permission; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon final resolution of all matters contained within the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 litigations, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to any party's counsel under this Order, shall be returned to the USDOJ within ninety (90) days or destroyed. This Document applies to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also applies to 21mc 100, 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER DIRECTING PRODUCTION OF VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUND RECORDS... ORDERED that, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552a(b)(11), the USDOJ shall cooperate and make all reasonable efforts to make available and produce the VCF Claimant List. For every individual who has submitted an application and other material to the VCF seeking compensation for death or personal injury, the VCF Claimant List will set forth the claimant's and/or decedent's full name; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon receipt of the VCF Claimant List from USDOJ, the Parties shall, upon request, provide copies of same to any other Co-Liaison Counsel in both 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102 and 21 MC103 matters; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to the Parties under this Order shall be held in the strictest confidence, used only for purposes of the above-captioned litigations, not divulged to any third party, either in whole or in part, without the express written permission of this Court, and not filed with the Court unless under seal or with the Court's express written permission; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that, upon final resolution of all matters contained within the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 litigations, the VCF Claimant List produced by the USDOJ to any party's counsel under this Order, shall be returned to the USDOJ within ninety (90) days or destroyed. This Document applies to All World Trade Center Disaster Site Litigation. Also applies to 21mc 100, 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT Cozen O'Connor, with offices at 45 Broadway Atrium, 16th Floor, New York, New York 10006, telephone number (212) 509-9400, be substituted as counsel of record for defendant TRC Engineers, Inc. in the above-entitled action in the place and stead of the undersigned attorneys. This document applies to All Cases in the World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation in which TRC Engineers, Inc. is a defendant., Motions terminated: (2930 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP, New Attorney: Cozen O'Connor. filed by TRC Engineers, Inc. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  STIPULATION IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the parties' counsel, that the plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motions to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint by Syska Hennessy Group, Inc. and William F. Collins, AlA Architects, LLP, filed and served on October 31, 2008, originally set for November 14, 2008, shall be and hereby is extended for 60 days, and thus shall be filed and served on or before Tuesday, January 13,2009 with defendants' Reply papers to be tiled and served on or before Thursday February 12, 2009., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (2997 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)., (2993 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended master Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). :( Responses due by 1/13/2009, Replies due by 2/12/2009.). Relates to 21mc102, 21mc103. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kevin Gerard Horbatiuk on behalf of The Board of Managers of The One Liberty Plaza Condominium BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC. New Address: Russo, Keane & Toner, LLP, 33 Whitehall Street, 16th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10004, 212-482-0001. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Horbatiuk, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION DISCONTINUING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be hereby discontinued against the defendant 715 Realty Corp., only, without prejudice without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to 21mc102, 06-1519, 06-5164, 06,5327, 05-1092, 05-5666, 05-1093, 05-1091. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of William F. Collins Architects. Document filed by Syska and Hennessy.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Pollack, David) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 Regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Case Management Order No. 6. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            (DUPLICATE) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5 (AMENDING THE MASTER COMPLAINT AND CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT). Leave is hereby granted for the filing of the First Amended Master Complaint and First Amended Check-Off Complaint in this Litigation... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this Case Management Order No. 5. This Document Applies to All In Re World Trade Center Lower Manhattan Disaster Site Litigation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/08) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Case Management Order # 5, # 2 Exhibit B to Case Management Order # 5) Filed in ALL Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION. It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between counsel for the parties in cases 07-8722, 07,5701, and 07,8721 that these cases which were filed by plaintiffs in 21mc100 are hereby transferred from 21mc100 to 21mc102 for all purposes. This Document also relates to 07-8722, 07-5701, 07-8721 as well as member cases for 21mc102. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al. (rjm) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice against Verizon New York Inc., only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to claims against Verizon New York Inc. only in: All Cases listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/6/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND COURT ORDER... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed on Schedule A are discontinued without prejudice as against The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, as successor to The Bank of New York Company, Inc., The Bank of New York, One Wall Street Holding LLC, 4101 Austin Blvd. Corporation and The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A., and as to the 130 Liberty Street locations only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE that each claim, cross-claim, and counter-claim asserted by and against -Brookfield Properties Holdings Inc.- only, shall be discontinued without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/3/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against - Verizon Properties Inc. only- without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against -Verizon Communications Inc. only- without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/15/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Notice of the Trinity Centre LLC and Capital Properties NY LLC Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint.. Document filed by Capital Properties, Inc., Trinity Centre L.L.C.. (Ritzert, Gail) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by Hillman Environmental Group, L.L.C.. (Rosmarin, Sam) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Grubb & Ellis Management Services, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, 120 Broadway, L.L.C., 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO # 871), 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein Properties, Inc., 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C.. (Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C.. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Century 21, Inc.. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C.. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Goos on behalf of Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Goos on behalf of Century 21 Department Stores, LLC, Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Stoner and Company, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Logany L.L.C.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Kenyon & Kenyon. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER in case 1:04-cv-09003-AKH; granting (490) Motion for Anita B. Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00102-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney W. Steve Berman for Worby Groner Edelman & Napoli Bern, LLP admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO ONE BROADWAY, LLC (this document relates to 06cv5327): the cross claims asserted against One Broadway, LLC are discontinued without prejudice, without any costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/4/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05327-AKH(kkc) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE as to Defendant, New York City Economic Development Corporation Only: each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against defendant New York City Economic Development Corporation, only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York and 76/78 Trinity Place, New York, New York are discontinued without prejudice and without costs to any party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/7/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(kkc) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (122 in 1:21-mc-00102-AKH) MOTION to Stay all claims against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103 and to confirm the stay against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103. (Filing Fee $ 39.00.) MOTION to Stay all claims against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103 and to confirm the stay against Verizon New York Inc. in 21 MC 103. (Filing Fee $ 39.00.). Document filed by Verizon New York Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE that the entitled action 06-5327(AKH) is discontinued against One Broadway, LLC without prejudice... without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH, 1:06-cv-05327-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 4 (this document applies to all cases): Plaintiffs Master Complaint is filed as part of this Order under docket number 21-MC-102. The Master Complaint contains allegations that may be suitable for incorporation by reference in individual cases. The Master Complaint shall apply to all cases filed before or after the entry of this Order. Plaintiffs format for the Check-Off Complaint is filed as part of this Order under docket number 21-MC-102... The Check-Off Complaint contains allegations that may be suitable for individual cases. The Check-Off Complaint shall be used in all cases filed before or after entry of this Order and shall be utilized as the format for all actions to be filed by all Plaintiffs... Consolidation is hereby ordered as to Check-Off Complaints filed pursuant to the Courts June 4, 2007 Order and March 21, 2007 Case Management Order No. 3, and the Clerk of the Court is so advised. Leave is hereby granting for filing a Check-Off Complaint under the earliest civil action number, as indicated above... Every Plaintiff commencing an action after the entry of this Order shall do so by the filing of a Summons and Check-Off Complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or as otherwise required by the terms of this Order or subsequent Case Management Orders entered in 21-MC-102... Except as the Court may otherwise establish by separate motion schedule, each Defendant or group of Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Master Complaint by August 3, 2007. Defendants are granted leave to file motions, through liaison counsel, pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure... Plaintiffs and Defendants Liaison Counsel are hereby directed to provide a copy of this Order to all counsel who have appeared in these actions for Plaintiffs and Defendants, respectively... Discovery is not stayed, and may commence at any time consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court declines to appoint a Special Master at this time. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/29/2007) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A# 2 Appendix B# 3 Appendix C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(kkc) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. One Broadway, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Sabrina Ambrose. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Century 21, Inc. served on 11/9/2006, answer due 11/29/2006. Service was accepted by Fania Vazquez. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Century 21 Department Stores, LLC served on 11/9/2006, answer due 11/29/2006. Service was accepted by Fania Vazquez. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Citibank, NA served on 11/9/2006, answer due 11/29/2006. Service was accepted by Greorge Stronghilos. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hillman Environmental Group, L.L.C. served on 11/9/2006, answer due 11/29/2006. Service was accepted by Kristen Sleys. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stoner and Company, Inc. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kenyon & Kenyon served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Silverstein Properties, Inc. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Trinity Centre L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. 120 Broadway, L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Capital Properties, Inc. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Mayore Estates L.L.C. served on 11/8/2006, answer due 11/28/2006. Service was accepted by Carol Vogt. Document filed by Maritza Liriano. (Grochow, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Moody's Investors Service, MRA Engineering, P.C., Capital Properties, Inc., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, 120 Broadway, L.L.C., 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO # 871), 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C., 715 Realty Co., Silverstein Properties, Inc., 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C., Citibank, NA, Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C., Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C., Century 21, Inc., B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc., Stoner and Company, Inc., Hillman Environmental Group, L.L.C., Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies, Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C& D FireProofing & Plastering Corp., The Bank of New York Company, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., One Wall Street Holdings, L.L.C., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Kenyon & Kenyon, DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., Logany L.L.C., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli, Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., One Broadway, L.L.C., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise-Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Trinity Centre L.L.C.Document filed by Maritza Liriano. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Maritza Liriano.(db, ) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Capital Properties, Inc., Board of Managers of the 120 Broadway Condominium, 120 Broadway, L.L.C., 120 Broadway Condominium (CONDO # 871), 120 Broadway Properties, L.L.C., 715 Realty Co., Silverstein Properties, Inc., 120 Broadway Holding, L.L.C., Citibank, NA, Mayore Estates L.L.C., 80 Lafayette Associates, L.L.C., Mayore Estates L.L.C. and 80 Lafayette Association L.L.C., Blue Millenium Realty L.L.C., Century 21, Inc., B.R. Fries & Associates, Inc., Stoner and Company, Inc., Hillman Environmental Group, L.L.C., Grubb & Ellis Management Servcies, The Bank of New York Company, Inc., One Wall Street Holdings, L.L.C., Kenyon & Kenyon, Logany L.L.C., One Broadway, L.L.C., Trinity Centre L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 584704)Document filed by Maritza Liriano.(laq, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?