Taylor v. Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Northern District Court, Case No. 4:14-cv-00063
District Judge Terence Kern, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 28, 2017 at 6:09 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Michael Taylor, Plaintiff

Represented by Frederic Dorwart Lawyers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul DeMuro +1 918 583 9922 +1 918 583 8251 pdemuro@fdlaw.com

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie F Apfel +1 202 639 6045 capfel@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S Hellman +1 202 639 6861 +1 202 639 6066 mhellman@jenner.com
v.
No Logo Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The, Defendant

Represented by Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G Michael Lewis +1 918 591 5314 +1 918 925 5314 mlewis@dsda.com

Represented by Frier & Levitt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan E. Levitt +1 973 535 1660 +1 973 535 0650 jlevitt@frierlevitt.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - The Temporary Restraining Order is dissolved and the case is dismissed with prejudice ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; vacating/setting aside order(s); finding as moot 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 19 Motion to Seal Document(s) (Re: 8 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ) (vah, Chambers)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION to Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order (submitted as dkt # 26 ) by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The, Michael Taylor (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: Attorney Jonathan E. Levitt ; granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - The Temporary Restraining Order is dissolved and the case is dismissed with prejudice ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; vacating/setting aside order(s); finding as moot 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 19 Motion to Seal Document(s) (Re: 8 Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, ) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Michael Taylor (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , vacating/setting aside order(s) (Re: 15 Order, Ruling on Motion for Discovery ) (Documents Terminated: 15 Order, Ruling on Motion for Discovery ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
              PRO HAC VICE FEES Paid for attorney(s) Jonathan E Levitt in the amount of $75 (Re: 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan E Levitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice ) by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 2/14/2014 to change text to reflect correct name of attorney applying for pro hac (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan E Levitt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 2/14/2014 to correct name of attorney applying for pro hac (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                  SEALED DOCUMENT (Lewis, G) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (Lewis, G) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                      BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: 19 MOTION to Seal Document ) by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The ; (With attachments) (Lewis, G) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Seal Document by Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (Lewis, G) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by G Michael Lewis on behalf of Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (Lewis, G) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE (Re: 16 Order, ) by Michael Taylor (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - modifying Doc. 15 Order (Re: 15 Order, Ruling on Motion for Discovery ) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting 9 Motion for Discovery (vah, Chambers) Modified on 2/14/2014; - VACATED per 25  (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: Attorney Matthew S. Hellman ; granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: Attorney Carrie F. Apfel ; granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew S. Hellman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1270952) by Michael Taylor (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Carrie F. Apfel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1270943) by Michael Taylor (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                          MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Matthew S. Hellman and Carrie F. Apfel to file by March 6, 2014 a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice per Local Civil Rule 83.2. Additionally, if you intend to practice in this district in the future and want to become a member of this district, please submit an application for attorney admission. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lal, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) by Michael Taylor (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Temporary Restraining Order ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/18/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern); granting 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) by Michael Taylor ; (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (submitted as dkt #3) by Michael Taylor (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The (sc, Dpty Clk) Modified on 2/13/2014 to change text to reflect correct filers (sc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                    FILING FEES Paid in Full by Michael Taylor (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Michael Taylor (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT against Apothecary Shoppe, LLC, The by Michael Taylor (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael Taylor (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?