USA v. PLOTKIN et al

Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:05-cr-00249
District Judge Jose L. Linares, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jose L. Linares
Last Updated September 24, 2016 at 6:51 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo MARCI PLOTKIN, Defendant

Represented by Walder Hayden and Brogan, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained K. ROGER PLAWKER +1 973 992 5300 krplawker@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained ALAN SILBER +1 973 992 5300 asilber@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained LIN CLAIRE SOLOMON +1 973 992 5300 lcsolomon@whbesqs.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained JUSTIN P. WALDER +1 973 992 5300 jpwalder@whbesqs.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (334) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 347 Motion to Terminate Supervised Release and Discharge Defendant as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/28/13. (dc, ) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
Letter from Counsel for Defendant Richard Stadtmauer re 347 MOTION to Terminate Supervised Release and Discharge Defendant , 348 Brief in Opposition (AZZARELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 347 MOTION to Terminate Supervised Release and Discharge Defendant (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Terminate Supervised Release and Discharge Defendant by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Certification of Counsel with Exhibits, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(AZZARELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 346 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JOHN A. AZZARELLO appearing for RICHARD STADTMAUER (AZZARELLO, JOHN) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting application for termination of Probation as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 343 Application/Petition filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, 344 Application/Petition filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/9/11. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
Letter APPLICATION/PETITION for Early Termination of Probation. (jn, ) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
APPLICATION/PETITION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Letter from BBBS)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 324 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 mandate letter, # 2 opinion)(ca3th, ) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 324 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (ca3mb, ) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
Letter from Donna Wolf, Administrative Assistant, Generals Counsel's Office, AICPA. Letter to request a certified copy of Judgment re 335 Judgment, (jn, ) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 5/20/2009, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2009. (mn, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Marci Plotkin by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED JUDGMENT as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), Count(s) 1, 5K1.1 application granted, 3 years probation w/ conditions, Special Assessment: $100.00 due immediately Fine $40,000 due immediately; Count(s) 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 3, 30, 6, Dismissed (AMENDMENT: Modification of Special Conditions of Probation; See pg. 2). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/20/09. (NR ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), Count(s) 1s,Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment of $100 due immediately; Fine of $40,000 due immediately, Count(s) 11ss, 12ss, 13ss, 14ss-16ss, 17ss, 18ss, 19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss-25ss, 26ss-29ss, 2ss, 30ss, 31s, 31ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss, 8ss-10ss, Dismissed. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/20/09. (NR ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Sentencing held on 5/20/2009 for MARCI PLOTKIN (1), Count(s) 1s, Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment of $100 due immediately; Fine of $40,000 due immediately;Count(s) 11ss, 12ss, 13ss, 14ss-16ss, 17ss, 18ss, 19ss, 20ss, 21ss, 22ss, 23ss, 24ss-25ss, 26ss-29ss, 2ss, 30ss, 31s, 31ss, 3ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss, 8ss-10ss, Dismissed.(Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS LEWIS.) (NR ) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY held on 5/6/09, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number (732) 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2009. (cs, ) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for the return of passport as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 17 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/12/09. (jn2, ) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), Count(s) 1, 5K1.1 application granted, 3 years probation w/ conditions, Special Assessment: $100.00 due immediately Fine $40,000 due immediately; Count(s) 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 3, 30, 6, Dismissed. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/6/2009. (NR, ) (Entered: 05/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Sentencing held on 5/6/2009 for STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), Count(s) 1, 5K1.1 application granted, 3 years probation w/ conditions, Special Assessment: $100.00 due immediately Fine $40,000 due immediately; Count(s) 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 3, 30, 6, Dismissed. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS LEWIS.) (NR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2009: # 1 Amended Minute) (lr, ). (Entered: 05/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT as to Richard Stadtmauer (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER amending bail conditions by allowing the defendant's return of passport and to travel to Israel from 4/21/09 to 5/3/09 as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 17 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/26/09. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that defendant pay cost of prosecution as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/5/09. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting request for extension of time to surrender. Defendant to surrender 4/21/09 at or before noon as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/26/09. (jn2, ) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by RICHARD STADTMAUER Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03120000000002410720. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 2/11/2009, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2009. (mn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), Count(s) 1r, Imprisonment for a term of 38 months; Count(s) 2r, 3r, 4r, 5r, 12r, 13r, 17r-18r Imprisonment for a term of 36 months on counts 2-5, 12-13, 17-18 to run concurrently; Supervised release for a term of 3 years on all counts to run concurrently w/ conditions; Special assessment of $900 due immediately; Fine of $100,000 due immediately; Ordered defendant to voluntarily surrender; Count(s) 14r, 15r, 16r, 6r, 7r, 8r, 9r-11r, Discharged. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/17/09. (NR ) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Sentencing held on 2/11/2009 for RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), Count(s) 1r, Imprisonment for a term of 38 months; Count(s) 2r, 3r, 4r, 5r, 12r, 13r, 17r-18r Imprisonment for a term of 36 months on counts 2-5, 12-13, 17-18 to run concurrently; Supervised release for a term of 3 years on all counts to run concurrently w/ conditions; Special assessment of $900 due immediately; Fine of $100,000 due immediately; Ordered defendant to voluntarily surrender; Count(s) 14r, 15r, 16r, 6r, 7r, 8r, 9r-11r, Discharged. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS LEWIS.) (NR ) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 2/3/2009, before Judge Jose L. Linares. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis T. Lewis, Telephone number 732 735-4522. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2009. (mn, ) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/9/09. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 2/3/2009 (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT ANNE AMICI by USA (BYNON, LEAH) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter ORDER re: sentencing memorandum as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/6/09. (jn, ) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER sentencing in this matter shall take place on 2/3/09 as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Government's submission 1/7/09,defendant's submission 1/21/09 and government,reply 1/28/09.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/5/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to ANNE AMICI (4), Count(s) 1, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 22, 24-25, 4, 6, Dismissed; Count(s) 7, Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment $100 due immediately; Fine of $1,000 due immediately. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 12/4/08. (NR ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Sentencing held on 12/4/2008 for ANNE AMICI (4), Count(s) 1, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 22, 24-25, 4, 6, Dismissed; Count(s) 7, Probation for a term of 3 years w/ conditions; Special assessment $100 due immediately; Fine of $1,000 due immediately. (Court Reporter/Recorder PHYLLIS LEWIS.) (NR ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: STATUS CONFERENCE as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 12/1/2008 (lr, ) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION & ORDER denying 303 Motion to Produce as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 306 Motion to Produce as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/13/08. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (jn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on March 31 and April 1 & 2, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter/Recorder: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 306 MOTION to Produce (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 306 MOTION to Produce (FINK, ROBERT) Modified on 10/7/2008 (NR, ). (Entered: 10/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 307 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 306 MOTION to Produce (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Produce by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
CERTIFICATION in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 303 MOTION to Produce Tax Returns (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 303 MOTION to Produce Tax Returns (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Produce by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 294 MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER. MOTION AND REQUESTS DENIED.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/5/08. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (jn, ) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/2/08 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (jgb) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER permitting defendant to travel outside the State of New Jersey to the State of Virginia between the dates of 8/23/08 through or about 8/30/08; Further Ordered that all of the remaining conditions of bail remain in full force and effect as to ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 7/16/08. (jgb) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 294 MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 294 MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/22/08, 5/23/08, 5/27/08. 5/28/08, 5/29/08, 5/30/08, 6/2/08, 6/3/08 before Judge LINARES. Court Reporter: PHYLLIS LEWIS. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (jgb) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER ORDER authorizing representatives of NorthStar Lit to remove trial presentation equipment from the Courtroom on June 16, 2008 as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/12/08. (jgb) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 294 MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c) by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: jurors per diem as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/9/08. (jn2, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER modifying conditions of release as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 98 Order, 18 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/6/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (lr,) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
JURY VERDICT as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Guilty on Count 1r,2r,3r,4r,5r,12r,13r,17r-18r. (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
Jury Notes [#12-15] as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
Jury Notes [#8-#11] as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None
Jury Notes [#2-7] as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
Jury Note [#1] as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER completed on 6/3/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
REDACTED INDICTMENT as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 3 is now count 2r. Former count 4 is now count 3r. Former count 6 is now count 4r. Former count 7 is now count 5r. Former count 11 is now count 6r. Former count 12 is now count 7r. Former count 13 is now count 8r. Former count 14-16 is now count 9r-11r. Former count 18 is now count 12r. Former count 19 is now count 13r. Former count 21 is now count 14r. Former count 22 is now count 15r. Former count 23 is now count 16r. Former count 24-25 is now count 17r-18r.. (lr, ) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Letter ORDER granting request for the removal of defense exhibts as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/3/09. (jn, ) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 6/2/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/30/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/29/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/28/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/27/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on May 21, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/23/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/22/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
Letter from Thomas J. Eicher (EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF by RICHARD STADTMAUER in Opposition to the Government's Request for a Deliberate Ignorance or Willful Blindness Charge (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/21/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/20/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on May 15, 2008, May 16, 2008, May 19, 2008 & May 20, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) Modified on 7/21/2008 (jgb). (Entered: 05/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/19/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 262 MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Declaration of Mistrial by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/16/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/15/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on April 22-25 & 28-30 and May 1, 2, 13 & 14, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/14/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/13/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 256 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 250 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
LREF
Blank 255 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 251 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Stanley Bekritsky Regarded the Intended Meaning of a Question Posed by Richard Stadtmauer (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 250 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 251 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Stanley Bekritsky Regarded the Intended Meaning of a Question Posed by Richard Stadtmauer (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 251 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Stanley Bekritsky Regarded the Intended Meaning of a Question Posed by Richard Stadtmauer Declaration of Robert S. Fink (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Stanley Bekritsky Regarded the Intended Meaning of a Question Posed by Richard Stadtmauer by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Proposed Motion, # 2 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig In Support of Proposed Motion)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/2/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 5/1/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/30/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/29/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None
Letter from USA re attorney submissions to DOJ (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 04/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 244 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
Letter from United States of America (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/28/2008 (Court Reporter phyllis t. lewis.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/25/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/24/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/23/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/22/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on April 3, 7-10, 14, 15 & 17, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/17/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/15/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/14/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/10/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/9/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/8/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/7/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.)(lr,) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER permitting the staff of Kostelanetz & Fink to bring trial exhibits into the Courthouse on 4/7/2008. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 04/04/2008. (nr, ) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/3/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Trial as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/2/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Jury Selection as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on 4/1/2008. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on March 31, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER held on March 24, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Voir Dire begun on 3/31/2008 RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) on Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/25/08. (jgb) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 3/24/2008 (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 03/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to ANNE AMICI held on March 10, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY held on February 14, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to ANNE AMICI (lr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of Guilty as to ANNE AMICI. (lr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Change of Plea Hearing as to ANNE AMICI held on 3/10/2008. Plea entered by ANNE AMICI (4) Guilty Count 7s. Sentencing set for 6/23/2008 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER to produce exhibits no later than 3/14/08 as to RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/4/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for removal of equipment as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/29/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on February 19, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on February 11, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on February 14, 2008 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on government notions as to MARCI PLOTKIN, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 208 Motion Hearing,. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/21/08. (jn2, ) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Motion Hearing as to RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 2/19/2008 re [#163] MOTION in Limine filed by USA, [#157] MOTION in Limine filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#158] MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 206 Motion Hearing,. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/15/08. (jn2, ) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Motion Hearing as to RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 2/14/2008 re [#176] MOTION in Limine filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#164] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#156] MOTION in Limine filed by USA (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (lr, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of Guilty as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (lr, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Change of Plea Hearing as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY held on 2/14/2008. Plea entered by STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Guilty Count 1s., ( Sentencing set for 6/17/2008 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares.) (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: DAVID M. ZINN appearing for RICHARD STADTMAUER (jn, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Status Conference as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 2/11/2008 (lr, ) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION & ORDER denying 141 Motion to Suppress as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 144 Motion to Compel as to ANNE AMICI (4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/08. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (jn2, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of Guilty as to MARCI PLOTKIN. (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Change of Plea Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 2/11/2008. Plea entered by MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Guilty Count 1s., ( Sentencing set for 6/17/2008 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares.) (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 161 Motion in Limine as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/6/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 179 MOTION in Limine Opposition to Government's Motion In Limine to Admit Summary Charts and Summary Testimony (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 164 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 157 MOTION in Limine to Bar Opinions of Agent Grant or in the Alternative for a Daubert Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by MARCI PLOTKIN re 154 MOTION in Limine to bar testimony relative to attorney-client privileged communications (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 156 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and For a Daubert Hearing (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 162 MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Certificate of Service by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 184 Proposed Voir Dire (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None
Proposed Voir Dire by MARCI PLOTKIN, USA, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 2/6/2008 (lr, ) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/4/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine Opposition to the Government's Motion in Limine to Admit Summary Charts and Summary Testimony by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/06/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 179 MOTION in Limine Opposition to Government's Motion In Limine to Admit Summary Charts and Summary Testimony (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine Opposition to Government's Motion In Limine to Admit Summary Charts and Summary Testimony by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 156 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and for a Daubert Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by STANLEY BEKRITSKY as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 154 MOTION in Limine by Marci Plotkin to Suppress Affidavits and Bar Testimony Relative to Attorney-Client Privileged Communications (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine in Opposition to USA Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 404(B) by STANLEY BEKRITSKY as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 162 MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2)(E) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 174 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
LREF
Blank 173 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 154 MOTION in Limine (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
LREF
Blank 172 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 157 MOTION in Limine Regarding IRS Revenue Agent Susan Grant (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Opposition)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
LREF
Blank 171 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 164 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER-ORDER authorizing the Government to file its motion to admit evidence and that the briefing schedule set forth in this Court's January 31st Order shall be adhered to by the parties as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/1/08. (jgb) (Entered: 02/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE STEVEN G. SANDERS appearing for USA. (SANDERS, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
Letter from Carl Greenfeld, Esq. on behalf of non-party Schonbraun McCann Group LLP (Attachments: # 1 Certification in Support of Discovery Protective Order, # 2 Proposed Protective Order)(GREENFELD, CARL) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: filing motions as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/31/08. (jn, ) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 164 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 164 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Relating to New Jersey Sales Tax Rules by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to admit summary charts and summary testimony by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of motion in limine to admit summary charts and summary testimony)(MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Admit Statements of Co-Conspirators by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to preclude claims of selective prosecution by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of motion in limine to preclude claims of selective prosecution)(MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List Declartion of Megan L. Brackney (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 3), # 5 Errata C)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 158 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Government from Introducing Certain Evidence, and for an Order Requiring the Government to Produce an Amended Exhibit List by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion 1.30.08, # 2 Exhibit A-C to Brief, # 3 Certificate of Service of Alan Silber, Esq. 1.30.08)(SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and for a Daubert Hearing by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion, # 2 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig In Support of Motion)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT by RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine by MARCI PLOTKIN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of defendant Marci Plotkin's motion to suppress affidavits and bar testimony relative to attorney-client privileged communications, # 2 Certification of K. Roger Plawker, Esq, with Exhibits, # 3 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion For A Suppression Hearing by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 141 MOTION to Suppress Declaration of Megan L. Brackney in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for a Suppression Hearing (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 141 MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # 1 Brief Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for a Suppression Hearing, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by ANNE AMICI re 144 MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF THE GOVERNMENT'S INTERVIEW NOTES (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 149 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 141 MOTION to Suppress By Defendant Stadtmauer (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Yontef# 2 Declaration of Rachael A. Honig)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/17/08. (jgb) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 147 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 144 MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF THE GOVERNMENT'S INTERVIEW NOTES (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Opinion & ORDER re: motions ro quash subpoenas as to MARCI PLOTKIN, RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 1/10/08. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion) (jn, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on December 20, 2007 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel THE PRODUCTION OF THE GOVERNMENT'S INTERVIEW NOTES by ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward J. Plaza, Esq.# 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B TO DECLARATION# 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E TO DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F TO DECLARATION OF COUNSEL# 8 Brief IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL# 9 Certificate of Service)(PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 141 MOTION to Suppress Declaration of Stacey Nortrup (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 141 MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Suppress by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE HALLIE MITCHELL appearing for USA. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 01/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 12/20/2007 re 126 MOTION to Quash filed by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP, 115 MOTION to Quash filed by MURRAY KUSHNER, 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS filed by USA, 116 MOTION to Quash filed by JANET SCHENKMAN, NEIDICH & COMPANY, EUGENE SCHENKMAN (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE HALLIE MITCHELL appearing for USA. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER and HALLIE MITCHELL for USA added. Attorney HALLIE MITCHELL terminated. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney HALLIE MITCHELL and HALLIE MITCHELL for USA added. Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER terminated. (MITCHELL, HALLIE) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ROBERT J. KIPNEES appearing on behalf of the SCHONBRAUN MCCAN GROUP as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash (KIPNEES, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 134 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ROBERT S. FINK appearing for RICHARD STADTMAUER Megan L. Brackney (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Greenfeld In Further Support Of Motion To Quash Subpoena with Exhibits A and B attached thereto# 2 Certificate of Service)(GREENFELD, CARL) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Issued to IRS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to the IRS (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by MARCI PLOTKIN re 126 MOTION to Quash, 124 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS (Attachments: # 1 Certification of K. Roger Plawker with Exhibits# 2 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ALAN SILBER appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (SILBER, ALAN) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Carole Ann Steiger on behalf of Kale Co., LLC re: subpoena. (jgb) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by SCHONBRAUN MCCANN GROUP LLP as to MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion to quash# 2 Certification of Carol Donatiello in support of motion# 3 Certification of service)(jn2, ) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Robert M. Leonard, Esq. (LEONARD, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Issued to IRS by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Motion to Quash# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by NEIDICH & COMPANY, EUGENE SCHENKMAN, JANET SCHENKMAN as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 116 MOTION to Quash (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(DAUBER, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 122 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support of motion to by MURRAY KUSHNER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 115 MOTION to Quash (jn, ) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 11/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 115 MOTION to Quash, 116 MOTION to Quash by Robert S. Fink in Opposition to Motions to Quash Subpoenas filed by Murray Kushner, Neidich & Co., the Schonbraun McCann Group, Eugene Schenkman, and Janet Schenkman (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 115 MOTION to Quash, 116 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Filed By Murray Kushner, Neidich & Company, the Schonbraun McCann Group, Eugene Schenkman, and Janet Schenkman (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: issuance of subpoenas as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/22/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of appearance of Edward J. Dauber, Esq. on behalr of Neidich & Co., Eugene & Janet Schenkman as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 116 MOTION to Quash (jn, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by NEIDICH & COMPANY, EUGENE SCHENKMAN, JANET SCHENKMAN as to the subpoena served on them by counsel for the defendant RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Leter brief in support of motion# 2 Notice of motion to quash subpoena issued to Eugene Schenkman# 3 Leter brief in support of motion# 4 Notice of motion to quash subpoena issued to Janet Schenkman# 5 Certificate of Service)(jn, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Quash by MURRAY KUSHNER as to the subpoena propounded by counsel for RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Murray Kushner in support of motion to quash subpoena)(jn, ) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
  • Attachment 1 Brief of Murray Kushner in support of motion to quash subpoena
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying Plaintiff's request for early production of statements as to MARCI PLOTKIN. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/10/07. (jgb) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER OPINION denying defendant's motion for early production of the Himmel and Kipnees statements as to MARCI PLOTKIN. OTBS.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/9/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that Defendant Stadmauer may make the subpoenas duces tocum in question returnable within (30) days of service as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/18/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on June 6 & 7, 2007 before Judge Linares. Court Reporter: Phyllis T. Lewis. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (ji, ) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for a seperate trial on cts. 26-29 and 30-31 granting as to cts. 26-29 and ct. 31 and denied as to ct. 30. granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Release of Brady Materials as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); denying 47 Motion to Dismiss as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); denying 48 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1); granting 89 Motion to Quash as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4); denying 52 Motion to Dismiss as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); denying 54 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); granting 55 Motion for Joinder as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2); denying 56 Motion to Compel as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 57 Motion to Dismiss as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Release of Brady Materials as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 59 Motion for Bill of Particulars as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); denying 60 Motion to Strike as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 61 Motion seperate trial on cts. 26-29 and 30-31 as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Discovery as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 67 Motion to Amend/Correct as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 68 Motion to Amend/Correct as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3); granting 49 Omnibus Motion as to ANNE AMICI (4); granting 66 Motion to Amend/Correct as to ANNE AMICI (4). Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 8/29/07. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum re: motions) (jn, ) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant (EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None
Letter from Justin P. Walder re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant (WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directing that the Office of Pretrial Services release to deft. Stadtmauer his passport on June 25, 2007 in order to permit the renewal of such passport. Further Ordered that deft. Stadtmauer use an expedited passport renewal service. Further Ordered that deft. Stadtmauer will turn over his renewed passport to Pretrial Services within 24-hours of receiving it. Further Ordered that all other existing conditions of Pretrial release on bail for deft. Stadtmauer remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/26/07. (jgb) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER modifying conditions of release to allow travel as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 17 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/13/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Unopposed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(RAFFERTY, BRIAN) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 6/8/2007 re [#52] MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#47] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#45] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#48] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#53] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#54] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#46] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#58] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#62] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#59] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#60] MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Motion Hearing as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 6/6/2007 re [#52] MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#47] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#45] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#48] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#53] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#54] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by STANLEY BEKRITSKY, [#46] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio filed by MARCI PLOTKIN, [#57] Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#58] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#62] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#59] MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, [#60] MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr, ) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: BRIAN RAFFERTY appearing for STANLEY BEKRITSKY (RAFFERTY, BRIAN) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 89 MOTION to Quash Surreply (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F Part 1# 2 Errata F Part 2# 3 Exhibit G Part 1# 4 Exhibit G Part 2# 5 Exhibit G Part 3# 6 Exhibit G Part 4# 7 Exhibit H)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 89 MOTION to Quash (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER amending bail conditions as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 18 Order Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/21/07. (jn2, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER taking under advisement 89 Motion to Quash as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Ordered Mr. Timpone shall produce any documents responsive to the subpoena.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/16/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on the request of the defendant to submit additional papers in connection with defendant's opposition to a pending motion to quash. Defendant shall be permitted to file as to RICHARD STADTMAUER. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/14/07. (jn2, ) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 5/10/07 until 2/8/08.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/10/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 93 MOTION to Travel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Travel by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by WALTER F. TIMPONE as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 89 MOTION to Quash (COYNE, JOHN) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 89 MOTION to Quash Suboena of Walter F. Timpone Esq. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Opposition to Walter F. Timpone Esq. Motion to Quash Subpoena# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 90 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION to Quash Subpoena by WALTER F. TIMPONE as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Walter F. Tampone, Esq. in support of motion to quash subpoena# 2 Certification of John T. Coyne, Esq.)(jn2, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JOHN T. COYNE appearing for Walter F. Tampone, Esq. (jn2, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER OPINION AND ORDER as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. Government's motion to sever the trial of Anne Amici is denied. Pending pretrial motions pending in this mater shall be heard before the court on 4/16/07. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 3/9/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER,, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E (Declaration of Charles Davenport)# 2 Exhibit A (Resume of Prof. Charles Davenport))(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 59 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 68 MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 61 MOTION Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 62 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25, 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 60 MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 58 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by RICHARD STADTMAUER re 56 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Declaration of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 53 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 52 MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit B and C (Part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit D and E (Part 3 of 3)# 4 Affidavit of Service)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 47 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by MARCI PLOTKIN re 46 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio Reply Brief in further support of motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support by MARCI PLOTKIN re 48 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 03/05/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER & ANNE AMICI held on 3/1/2007 (lr,) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to File as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1), STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2), RICHARD STADTMAUER (3), ANNE AMICI (4). Government may file overlength brief.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 2/20/07. (jn, ) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
Certificate of Service by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 70 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI. (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
BRIEF in Opposition by USA as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI re 66 MOTION to Amend/Correct 49 Omnibus MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION filed by ANNE AMICI,, 51 Certificate of Service filed by ANNE AMICI,, 55 MOTION for Joinder to Other Motions, 58 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials, 56 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16, 46 MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio, 45 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss MOTION to Sever Defendant, 61 MOTION Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum, 52 MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment, 63 MOTION for Discovery, 53 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment, 48 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 59 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 62 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25, 54 MOTION for Bill of Particulars, 60 MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence, 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment, 47 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (vol 1)# 2 Exhibit A (vol 2)# 3 Exhibit A (vol 3)# 4 Exhibit B)(HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct 59 MOTION for Bill of Particulars filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A1# 2 Exhibit A2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct 57 Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment filed by RICHARD STADTMAUER, by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D1# 5 Exhibit D2)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct 49 Omnibus MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION filed by ANNE AMICI,, 51 Certificate of Service filed by ANNE AMICI, by ANNE AMICI. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE that Defendant Richard Stadtmauer Joins in the Motions of Co-Defendants as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Discovery by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Discovery# 2 Exhibit D# 3 Exhibit E# 4 Exhibit F# 5 Exhibit G# 6 Exhibit H# 7 Exhibit I# 8 Errata J# 9 Exhibit K# 10 Exhibit L# 11 Exhibit M# 12 Errata N# 13 Errata O# 14 Exhibit P# 15 Exhibit Q# 16 Exhibit R# 17 Exhibit S# 18 Exhibit T# 19 Exhibit U# 20 Exhibit V# 21 Exhibit W# 22 Brief in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Discovery)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25 by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Sever Counts 26-31 of the Superseding Indictment)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoenas# 2 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for Issuance of Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoenas Duces Tecum# 3 Errata A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike Surplussage and Supress Evidence by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Strike Surplusage and Suprress Evidence# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Errata F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Brief in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Strike Surplusage and Suppress Evidence)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for Bill of Particulars# 2 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion for Bill of Particulars# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Release of Brady Materials by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Immediate Disclosure of Brady/Giglio Material and for Early Production of Jencks Act Material# 2 Affidavit of Robert S. Fink in Support of Defendant Richard Stadtmauer's Motion to Compel Immediate Disclosure of Brady/Giglio Material and for Early Production of Jencks Act Material# 3 Errata A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Joint Motion to Dismiss and Strike, in Part, Counts 1-25 of the Superseding Indictment# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16 by RICHARD STADTMAUER. (FINK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Joinder to Other Motions by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit # 3 Affidavit of Service# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2# 3 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Affidavit of Service# 6 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Count 30 of the Superseding Indictment by STANLEY BEKRITSKY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit # 3 Affidavit of Service# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
Certificate of Service by ANNE AMICI re 49 Omnibus MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE to Join in the Motions of Co-Defendants as to MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
Omnibus MOTION TO JOIN CO-DEFENDANTS' MOTION by ANNE AMICI. (PLAZA, EDWARD) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Affidavit # 3 Exhibit A-F# 4 Exhibit G, part 1# 5 Exhibit G, part 2# 6 Exhibit H-I# 7 Exhibit J-N# 8 Certificate of Service # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 30-31 by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Affidavit # 3 Exhibit 1-11# 4 Exhibit 12-17# 5 Exhibit 18-28# 6 Exhibit 19-35# 7 Certificate of Service # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Release of Brady Materials and Giglio by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 26-29,26ss-29ss,30,30ss,31s,31ss, MOTION to Sever Defendant by MARCI PLOTKIN. (Attachments: # 1 Brief # 2 Certificate of Service # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: LIN CLAIRE SOLOMON appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(SOLOMON, LIN) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: K. ROGER PLAWKER appearing for MARCI PLOTKIN (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(PLAWKER, K.) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re: renewal of passports . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 12/11/06. (nm, ) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 11/20/2006 until 4/16/2007. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/20/2006. (mn, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 11/1/2006 (lr,) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re: return of passports . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 10/23/06. (nm, ) (Entered: 10/25/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER LIFTING LEIN ON PROPERTY POSTED AS BOND FOR THE PURPOSE OF REFINANCING as to MARCI PLOTKIN re 6 Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/24/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
CONSENT ORDER permitting the defendant to travel as to ANNE AMICI re 19 Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 10/5/06. (jn2, ) (Entered: 10/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE RACHAEL HONIG appearing for USA. (HONIG, RACHAEL) (Entered: 06/14/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI Time excluded from 6/5/06 until 4/2/07. FURTHER ORDERED that discovery shall be completed by 9/15/06, and a status conference is scheduled for 11/1/06 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5D of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file pretrial motions, if any, no later than 11/15/06, the Government shall file a response to such motions no later than 12/15/06, defendants' replies shall be filed no later than 1/9/07, argument on the motions is scheduled for 1/22/07 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5D of the Martin Luther King Jr. Building, and trial in this matter is scheduled to commence at 10:00 a.m. on 4/2/07.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 6/5/06. (dj, ) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER,ANNE AMICI held on 6/5/2006. Jury Trial set for 4/2/2007 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. Status Conference set for 11/1/2006 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS LEWIS.)(lr,) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: None
Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1)(EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None
Letter from Richard J. Schaeffer, Esq. (SCHAEFFER, RICHARD) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: None
Letter from Justin P. Walder, Esq. (WALDER, JUSTIN) (Entered: 05/26/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER modifying conditions of release as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY re 17 Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/10/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Discovery and Inspection as to ANNE AMICI. Motions due by 5/15/2006 Opposition due by 5/30/2006. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on May 10, 2006.(lr,). (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares: Arraignment as to ANNE AMICI (4) Counts 1,4,6,7,11,12,13,18,21,22,24-25 held on 5/10/2006. Plea entered by ANNE AMICI Not Guilty on Counts 1,4,6,7,11-13,18,21,22,24-25. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2006 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. Omnibus Hearing set for 6/12/2006 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5D before Judge Jose L. Linares. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.)(lr,). (Entered: 05/11/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for Discovery and Inspection as to MARCI PLOTKIN, STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER. Motions due by 5/15/2006. Opposition due by 5/30/2006.Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on MAY 8, 2006. (lr,). (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose L. Linares:Arraignment as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) Count 1,3,4,6,7,11,12,13,14-16,18,19,21,22,23,24-25; STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) Count 1,3,6,11,12,13,18,21,30; and MARCI PLOTKIN (1) Count 1-31s held on 5/8/2006. Plea entered: NOT GUILTY.Responses due by 5/15/2006 Replies due by 5/30/2006. (Court Reporter PHYLLIS T. LEWIS.) (lr,). (Entered: 05/09/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: RICHARD J. SCHAEFFER appearing for STANLEY BEKRITSKY (jn, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER for return of passports as to RICHARD STADTMAUER re 18 Order Setting Conditions of Release . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 5/3/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANNE AMICI (4) $250,000.00 unsecured . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 4/11/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) $1,000,000.00 secured by property . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 4/11/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) $500,000.00 secured by property . Signed by Judge Ronald J. Hedges on 4/11/06. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald J. Hedges :Initial Appearance as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY, RICHARD STADTMAUER, ANNE AMICI held on 4/11/2006, Bond set as to RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) $1,000,00.00 secured by property and ANNE AMICI (4) $25,000.00 PR bond and STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) $500,000.00 secured by property (Tape #CD 06-09.) (jn, ) (Entered: 05/02/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to MARCI PLOTKIN (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, 8s-10s, 11s, 12s, 13s, 14s-16s, 17s, 18s, 19s, 20s, 21s, 22s, 23s, 24s-25s, 26s-29s, 30s, 31s, INDICTMENT as to STANLEY BEKRITSKY (2) count(s) 1, 3, 6, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 30, RICHARD STADTMAUER (3) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 11, 12, 13, 14-16, 18, 19, 21, 22, 23, 24-25, ANNE AMICI (4) count(s) 1, 4, 6, 7, 11, 12, 13, 18, 21, 22, 24-25. (dj, ). (Entered: 04/28/2006)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice delay until trial is excluded under STA as to MARCI PLOTKIN Discovery to be complete by 5/1/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Jose L. Linares. Status Conference set for 6/5/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Jose L. Linares.. Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/20/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge jose L.Linares: Status Conference as to MARCI PLOTKIN held on 9/20/2005 (lr, ). (Entered: 09/20/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS J. EICHER and THOMAS JEFFREY EICHER for USA added. Attorney SCOTT A. RESNIK terminated. (EICHER, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice discovery be completed by 9/12/05 as to MARCI PLOTKIN . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/25/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to MARCI PLOTKIN. . Signed by Judge Jose L. Linares on 5/10/05. (jn, ) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 448 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?