Koehn v. Secretary of Health and Human
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 14-5054

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 2:03 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130292176 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
TENDERED from Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Title: OPENING BRIEF W/ APPENDIX. Service: 04/21/2014 by email. [149522]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130270519 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
    Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139486] This document has been rejected. See Doc No.[7]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130270509 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None
      Entry of appearance for P. Leigh O'Dell as principal counsel for Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139480] This document has been rejected. See Doc No.[7]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
        BRIEF FILED for Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn [14]. Title: Brief and Appendix of Appellant, [Non-Confidential version only]. Number of Pages: 29. Service: 04/21/2014 by email. Pursuant to ECF-10, filer is directed to file six copies of the brief in paper format. The paper copies of the brief should be received by the court on or before 04/28/2014. Appellee Secretary of Health and Human Services brief is due 06/05/2014. [150108]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
          TENDERED from Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Title: OPENING BRIEF W/ APPENDIX. Service: 04/21/2014 by email. [149522]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
            Docketing Statement for the Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/19/2014 by email. [142708]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
              Docketing Statement for the Appellee Secretary of Health and Human Services. Service: 03/14/2014 by email. [141760]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                Corrected Entry of appearance for P. Leigh O'Dell as of counsel for Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139843]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                  Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn indicating that a request is made to the reporter for a transcript. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139842]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                    Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139840]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                      Corrected Entry of appearance for P. Leigh O'Dell as of counsel for Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn. Service: 03/04/2014 by email. [139839]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                        Notice of Rejection to Appellants Cheryl Koehn and Vanessia Koehn, the following document(s) cannot be filed: [4] attorney entry of appearance., [5] certificate of interest. A completed certificate of Interest must be submitted in accordance with Fed. Cir. R. 47.4 by 03/19/2014., [6] transcript purchase order form. Reason(s) The documents are not text-searchable. Service: 03/05/2014 by clerk.
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                          Entry of appearance for Darryl R. Wishard as principal counsel for Appellee Secretary of Health and Human Services. Service: 02/28/2014 by email. [138995]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                            Certified list from the United States Court of Federal Claims. Service: 02/21/2014 by clerk. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 04/25/2014. [137298]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                              Appeal docketed. Received: 02/07/2014. [136195] Entry of Appearance due 03/04/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/04/2014. Docketing Statement due 03/20/2014. Certified List due on 03/31/2014.
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?