USA v. Mills
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-mj-70160-MEJ
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 6:27 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Douglas Sprague +1 510 637 3699 +1 510 637 3724 doug.sprague@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jonathan Edward Mills, Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 2/7/2014
County San Francisco
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Citation
Offense Level 4
181343 Wire fraud
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Edward Mills held on 2/26/2014; Remanded to custody. Bond Hearing set for 2/27/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Preliminary Examination or Arraignment (and sumbission of a financial affidavit should Defendant not retain private counsel by that time) set for 3/7/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (Recording #FTR 9:54-10:22.) (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Edward Mills NOT held on 2/25/2014. Defendant requests continuance to research viable sureties. Detention Hearing set for 2/26/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Recording #FTR 10:31-10:33.) (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James: I.D. of Counsel Hearing and Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Edward Mills NOT held on 2/21/2014; Added attorney Jodi Linker, Provisionally Appointed for Jonathan Edward Mills. Defendant may seek retained Counsel. FPD provisionally appointed to represent him at this hearing. Remanded to custody. Detention Hearing set for 2/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Recording #FTR 10:01-10:04.) (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
        Warrant Returned Executed on 2/19/14. as to Jonathan Edward Mills. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James:Initial Appearance as to Jonathan Edward Mills held on 2/20/2014, Jodi Linker AFPD SPECIALLY APPEARING. Attorney Appointment Hearing/set detention hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. True name as charged. Remanded to custody. Ordered entire case unsealed.(Recording #9:37-9:45.) (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Order to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
            Order to unseal complaint and arrest warrant as to Jonathan Edward Mills. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/20/14. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Set/Reset Hearings
              Set/Reset Hearing re [1] Complaint Initial Appearance set for 2/20/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                Order to Seal Case as to Jonathan Edward Mills. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/7/14. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (lskS, COURT STAFF).
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: 2/7/2014 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Edward Mills (1). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) (lskS, COURT STAFF).
                    LREF
                    Blank  Case Referred to ECF
                    CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 495 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?