Fortinet, Inc. v. Sophos, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-05831
District Judge Edward M. Chen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 7:35 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Marie Veglia +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 aliciaveglia@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sophos Ltd., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Sophos, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Jason Clark, Defendant
No Logo Michael Valentine, Defendant
No Logo Sophos, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan W. Cobb +1 619 699 2635 +1 619 699 6635 ryan.cobb@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean C. Cunningham +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 236 1048 sean.cunningham@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Knudson +1 619 699 2700 +1 619 699 2701 david.knudson@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd S Patterson +1 512 457 7017 +1 512 721 2217 todd.patterson@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHRYN RILEY +1 619 699 2842 +1 619 699 2701 kathryn.riley@dlapiper.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Sophos Ltd., Counter-Defendant
No Logo Sophos, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (387) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT Regarding Fortinet's Motion to Enforce Stipulation by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 11/23/2015) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE resetting 293 MOTION to Enforce Stipulation from 1:30 p.m. to 3:00 p.m. on 11/19/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet, Inc. re 313 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Freeman, Miles) (Filed on 11/4/2015) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY (re 293 MOTION to Enforce Stipulation or, in the Alternative, to Vacate (In Part) Arbitration Award ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miles D. Freeman, # 2 Exhibit 29 (Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 30 (Sealed))(Freeman, Miles) (Filed on 11/4/2015) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miles D. Freeman, # 2 Exhibit Redacted Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Stipulation, # 3 Exhibit Unredacted Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Stipulation, # 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 29, # 5 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 29, # 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 30, # 7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 30, # 8 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Miles) (Filed on 11/4/2015) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine re 307 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, D, I, J, M, and S Attached to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion to Enforce Stipulation or, in the Alternative, to Vacate (In Part) Arbitration Award (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE (re 293 MOTION to Enforce Stipulation or, in the Alternative, to Vacate (In Part) Arbitration Award ) Defendants' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion to Enforce Stipulation or, in the Alternative, to Vacate (In Part) Arbitration Award filed byJason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - FUS Slipsheet, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - FUS Slipsheet, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - Redacted, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - FUS Slipsheet, # 11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - Redacted, # 12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - FUS Slipsheet, # 15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 16 Exhibit O to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 17 Exhibit P to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 18 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 19 Exhibit R to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 20 Exhibit S to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham - FUS Slipsheet, # 21 Exhibit T to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 22 Exhibit U to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 23 Exhibit V to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 24 Exhibit W to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 25 Exhibit X to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 26 Exhibit Y to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 27 Exhibit Z to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 28 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, D, I, J, M, and S Attached to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Fortinet's Motion to Enforce Stipulation or, in the Alternative, to Vacate (In Part) Arbitration Award filed by Jason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sean C. Cunningham in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Redacted, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 7 Exhibit I to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 8 Exhibit J to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Redacted, # 9 Exhibit J to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 10 Exhibit M to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed, # 11 Exhibit S to Declaration of Sean Cunningham - Sealed)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation) re 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fortinet's Trade Secrets Exhibits List (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 10/22/2015) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Exhibit List Fortinet's Trade Secrets Exhibits List by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation).. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 10/22/2015) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Fortinet's Trade Secrets Exhibits List filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant N. Margeson, # 2 Redacted Fortinet's Trade Secrets Exhibits List, # 3 Unredacted Fortinet's Trade Secrets Exhibits List, # 4 Proposed Order)(Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 10/22/2015) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2015. re 218 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fortinet, Inc., 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc. P's exhibit list due within 2 weeks (10/22/2015). D's proffer of covenant not to sue filed with the court by 10/9/2015. Motions taken under submission.Court Reporter Name Pam Batalo. Plaintiff Attorneys: John Neukom, Jordan Jaffe, Grant Margeson Defendant Attorneys: Andrew Stein,Sean Cunningham, David Knudson. This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/8/2015) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Grant N. Margeson in Support of 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) Exhibits 37-40 and 44 Attached to the Supplemental Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham in Support Thereto filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Related document(s) 278 ) (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 9/28/2015) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine re 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) Exhibits 37-40 and 44 Attached to the Supplemental Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham in Support Thereto (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 278 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and (2) Exhibits 37-40 and 44 Attached to the Supplemental Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham in Support Thereto filed by Jason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Reply Brief (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit Reply Brief (Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 37 to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (Sealed), # 7 Exhibit 39 to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (Sealed), # 8 Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 44 to Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (Sealed))(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY (re 215 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Sophos Inc., Michael Valentine and Jason Clark filed byJason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 2 Exhibit 37-40 to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (covers only), # 3 Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 4 Exhibit 42 to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 5 Exhibit 43 to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham, # 6 Exhibit 44 to the Declaration of Sean C. Cunningham (cover only))(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 218 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jordan R. Jaffe, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Declaration of William Jeffrey Crawford)(Morad, Leeron) (Filed on 9/24/2015) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration in Support of 268 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 268 ) (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 9/22/2015) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Attachments to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation) re 232 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Fortinet's Motion for Leave (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Aaron Read, # 2 Declaration of Grant N. Margeson, # 3 Exhibit JJ, # 4 Exhibit KK, # 5 Exhibits LL - UU, # 6 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/12/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Fortinet's Motion for Leave filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant N. Margeson, # 2 Exhibit LL, # 3 Exhibit MM, # 4 Exhibit NN, # 5 Exhibit OO, # 6 Exhibit PP, # 7 Exhibit QQ, # 8 Exhibit RR, # 9 Exhibit SS (Part 1), # 10 Exhibit SS (Part 2), # 11 Exhibit TT (Part 1), # 12 Exhibit TT (Part 2), # 13 Exhibit UU, # 14 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/11/2015) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Remove Incorrectly Filed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 209 Terminate Hearings,, Motion Hearing, filed by Sophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 9/1/2015) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Motion Hearing held on 8/27/2015 re 177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, motion taken under submission and 179 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, motion taken under submission. See minute Order for all particulars. FTR Time 12:41-1:57 and 2:00-2:18. Attachment Civil Law and Motion Minute Order.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 202 Terminate Motions, Order, 196 Declaration in Support, Unredacted Exhibits HH and II filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit II)(Related document(s) 202 , 196 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS re 179 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and 28 U.S.C. § 1927, 202 Terminate Motions, Order Unredacted Exhibits Y, Z, and AA filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Z, # 2 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) 179 , 202 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 179 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 and 28 U.S.C. § 1927 ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Grant N. Margeson filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant N. Margeson In Support of Administrative Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal, # 3 Unredacted Exhibit HH to the Margeson Declaration, # 4 Redacted Exhibit HH to the Margeson Declaration, # 5 Unredacted Exhibit II to the Margeson Declaration, # 6 Redacted Exhibit II to the Margeson Declaration)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE. Status conference set for 7/23/15 at 10:30 a.m. Joint status report due 7/16/15. Joint report shall be filed by end of 7/21/15. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery Letter Brief filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO DKT. NO. 170 REGARDING FORTINETS REQUESTS FOR INSPECTIONS by Fortinet, Inc.. (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE: Fortinet has filed an unopposed motion 157 for leave to file two supplemental exhibits to the parties' joint discovery letters 130 138 155 . One of these two supplemental exhibits is the entire 198-page deposition of Jason Clark, which is included without any designation of specific or notable excerpts. If any party intends to rely on any portion of the deposition in today's 11:00 a.m. hearing, that party shall file a letter of no more than one page by 10:30 a.m. indicating which portions of the deposition it intends to use.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation) re 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Exhibits 2 and 3 to Dkt. Nos. 130 and 138 (Margeson, Grant) (Filed on 6/24/2015) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Two Supplemental Exhibits Related to Dkt. Nos. 130 and 138 filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/24/2015) Modified on 6/25/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Exhibits 2 and 3 to Dkt. Nos. 130 and 138 filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Grant N. Margeson, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/24/2015) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Proposed Amended Infringement Contentions filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/18/2015) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE: By June 15, 2015, Fortinet shall call chambers at (510) 637-1006 to arrange a time for a courier to pick up the chambers copies of Fortinet's now-resolved motion for leave to amend its infringement contentions.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief re Fortinet's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/11/2015) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation) re 137 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter re Fortinet's Requests for Inspection (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Letter Briefre Fortinet's Requests for Inspection filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter re Fortinet's Requests for Inspection filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter, # 4 Unredacted Version of Joint Discovery Letter)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/2/2015) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 3/19/2015) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE Status Report due by 3/19/2015. Status Conference reset for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Status Report due by 3/26/2015. Status Conference set for 4/2/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Status Conference Reset from 2/26/15 to Friday 3/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Jaffe, Jordan) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Claims Construction / Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/15/2014 from 10:00 AM to 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing reset for 12/15/2014 from 10:00 a.m. to 09:30 AM. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None Tutorial Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/17/2014) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of 100 Response ( Non Motion ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 101 filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 100 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/12/2014) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of 100 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 100 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/11/2014) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to re 95 Response ( Non Motion ) Fortinet's Reply to Sophos' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/11/2014) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of 96 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 96 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/4/2014) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 91 Claim Construction Statement by Fortinet, Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/4/2014) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of 93 Claim Construction Statement filed byFortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 93 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Fortinet, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Fortinet, Inc.(a corporation). (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE vacating 10/9/14 hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Docket #72). Court to issue order on papers. Further Case Management Conference reset rom 10/9/14 to 11/24/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2014. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Benjamin Olmos (Olmos, Daniel) (Filed on 10/5/2014) (Entered: 10/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further CMC from 10:30 a.m. to 1:30 pm on 10/9/14. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Tutorial from 10:00 a.m. to 2:30 p.m. on 11/24/2014. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/24/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Certification of Mediation Session
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement [PLR 4-3] filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 9/3/2014) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE TIME FOR HEARING RE 72 MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE SOPHOS, INC.S AND SOPHOS LTDS COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. The deadlines for filing briefs shall remain unchanged. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 72 MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE SOPHOS, INC.S AND SOPHOS LTDS COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A)(Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 8/5/2014) (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING PLAINTIFF'S 72 MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE SOPHOS, INC.S AND SOPHOS LTDS COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE from 8/28/14 to 9/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Briefing schedule remains the same. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE SOPHOS, INC.S AND SOPHOS LTDS COUNTERCLAIMS AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/29/2014. Replies due by 8/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 7/15/2014) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ANSWER to , Affirmative Defenses, and , COUNTERCLAIM to Fortinet, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint against Fortinet, Inc. bySophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 7/1/2014) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE resetting Further CMC from 10/2/14 to 10/9/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 6/5/14, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:00 - 1:26. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 67 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2014. (Related documents(s) 67 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fortinet, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2014 before Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 6/5/2014) re 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Deposition of Kris Hagerman filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Recording #1:00:30 - 1:26:50.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/5/2014) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief, previously set for June 5, 2014, at 11:00 a.m., is continued to June 5, 2014, at 1:00 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/13/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Case referred to mediation. Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/8/2014 and 12/9/2014 02:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #FTR 9:34-9:41.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 5/15/2014) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Amended filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 5/14/2014) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Deposition of Kris Hagerman : Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/12/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/12/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Deposition of Kris Hagerman filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 4/30/2014) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing the Date of the Parties' Case Management Conference from April 24, 2014 to May 1, 2014 filed by Fortinet, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 5/13/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Changing the Date of the Parties' Case Management Conference from April 24, 2014 to May 1, 2014 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 4/14/2014) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Fortinet, Inc. filed by Fortinet, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Fortinet, Inc. filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Riley Grasso, Kathryn) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jason Clark, Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/27/2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014. (Related documents(s) 46 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Fortinet, Inc. for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 3/28/2014) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/27/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 3/27/2014) re 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Non-Patent Claims Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Michael Valentine, Sophos, Inc., 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jason Clark. Defendant Clark's Motion to Dismiss for lack of Personal Jurisdiction is denied as moot without prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration is granted as to Valentine and Clark pursuant to stipulation of the parties. Defendant Sophos' motion to stay non-patent related claims is denied. ***Motions terminated (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2014) Modified on 4/11/2014 (bpf, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice(Stein) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ANDREW STEIN ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25ERJEF2.) Filing fee previously paid on 03/17/2014 filed by Sophos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stein, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8456486.) filed by Sophos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stein, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2014) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 30 Answer to Counterclaim, of Fortinet bySophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc.. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJason Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 22 ) (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/5/2014) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Ryan William Cobb (Cobb, Ryan) (Filed on 3/3/2014) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date on Clark Motion to Dismiss and Valentine Motion to Compel Arbitration and Sophos Motion to Stay from March 13, 2014 to March 27, 2014 filed by Fortinet, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date on Clark Motion to Dismiss and Valentine Motion to Compel Arbitration and Sophos Motion to Stay from March 13, 2014 to March 27, 2014, 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Non-Patent Claims Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Non-Patent Claims Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion ) filed bySophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Moving Hearing Date on Clark Motion to Dismiss and Valentine Motion to Compel Arbitration and Sophos Motion to Stay from March 13, 2014 to March 27, 2014 filed by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 2/26/2014) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss ) filed byJason Clark. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/25/2014) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE resetting CMC from 4/3/14 to 4/24/14 at 9:00 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (re 24 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Non-Patent Claims Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel and Granting and Denying in Part Motion to Stay)(Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 31 Opposition/Response to Motion Denying Defendant Jason Clark's Motion to Dismiss by Fortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (re 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss ) filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fortinet's ANSWER to Counterclaim , First COUNTERCLAIM in response to Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint, against Sophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc. byFortinet, Inc.. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE - LETTER FROM JUDGE CHEN RE: CONSENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M.Chen on 2/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Todd S. Patterson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8352616.) filed by Jason Clark, Sophos Ltd., Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Patterson, Todd) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Non-Patent Claims Pending Arbitration and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/19/2014. Replies due by 2/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byJason Clark. (Related document(s) 22 ) (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Jason Clark. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 2/18/2014. Replies due by 2/25/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/4/2014) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/28/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortinet, Inc.. Michael Valentine served on 1/18/2014, answer due 2/10/2014. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortinet, Inc.. Jason Clark served on 1/17/2014, answer due 2/7/2014. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fortinet, Inc... (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sophos, Inc. re 15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, 14 Notice (Other), 13 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Fortinet, Inc. bySophos, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 exh a, # 2 exh b, # 3 exh c, # 4 exh d, # 5 exh e, # 6 exh f, # 7 exh g)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sophos, Inc. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sophos, Inc. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortinet, Inc.. Sophos, Inc. served on 1/14/2014, answer due 2/4/2014. (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Jason Clark. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Fortinet, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byFortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Report to the USPTO)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge due January 27, 2014. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by Fortinet, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3-16 (Veglia, Alicia) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Summons. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2013) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Sophos, Inc., Michael Valentine. (Fee Paid $400.00, Receipt No. 0971-8235373). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Report on the Filing of an Action Involving a Patent)(Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2013) Modified on 12/17/2013 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/17/2013 (farS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 358 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?