Michiko Shiota Gingery, et al v. City of Glendale et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-01291
District Judge Percy Anderson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 6:18 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GAHT-US Corporation, Plaintiff
No Logo Koichi Mera, Plaintiff
No Logo Michiko Shiota Gingery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Bari Johns +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 RJohns@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Henry Marmolejo +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 mmarmolejo@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael Soltman +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 nsoltman@mayerbrown.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ruth Zadikany +1 213 229 9500 +1 213 625 0248 rzadikany@mayerbrown.com
v.
No Logo City of Glendale, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glendale City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Rawcliffe +1 818 548 2080 +1 818 547 3402 ARawcliffe@ci.glendale.ca.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank John Broccolo +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 fbroccolo@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley H. Ellis +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bellis@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S Munsey +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 cmunsey@sidley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L Richardson +1 213 896 6052 +1 213 896 6600 laura.richardson@sidley.com
No Logo Scott Ochoa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glendale City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew C Rawcliffe +1 818 548 2080 +1 818 547 3402 ARawcliffe@ci.glendale.ca.us
No Logo Korean American Forum of California, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Rhode Island Legal Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser +1 310 396 0731 +1 310 399 7040 catherine.sdshhh@gmail.com
No Logo The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry A Fisher +1 310 557 1077 bfisher557@aol.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number 14-56440, 9th Circuit regarding Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals 51 as to Plaintiff GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (mat) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. Appeal of Judgment,,, 48 , Order on Ex Parte Application to File Amicus Brief, Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 47 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - MINUTES, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - JUDGMENT)(DeClercq, William) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None ERRATA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. Appeal of Judgment,,, 48 , Order on Ex Parte Application to File Amicus Brief, Order on Ex Parte Application for Leave, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 47 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0973-14387606 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A - MINUTES, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B - JUDGMENT)(DeClercq, William) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Dismiss Case
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
              DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties filed by Amicus Korean American Forum of California (Sweetser, Catherine) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Appear As Amicus And File Two Declarations of Survivors in Support of Defendant City of Glendale's Motion to Dismiss filed by Amicus Korean American Forum of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Il Chul Kang in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Ok-Seon Lee in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Proposed Order)(Attorney Catherine Elizabeth Sweetser added to party Korean American Forum of California(pty:am))(Sweetser, Catherine) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY in support of a motion EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Amicus Brief 39 filed by Movant The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia. (Fisher, Barry) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 43 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to File Amicus Brief 39 with Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (DeClercq, William) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                      PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Movant The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia, re Application for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of Barry A. Fisher 39 , Proposed Order, Proposed Brief, Memorandum of Names, etc. of Counsel Appearing in Action Re Application of Proposed Amicus Curiae to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae 40 , Certification and Notice of Interested Parties 41 , Proof of Service, served on 5/13/2014. (gk) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Movant The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia. (gk) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM of Names, etc. of Counsel Appearing in Action Re Application of Proposed Amicus Curiae to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae 39 filed by Movant The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia. (gk) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 39 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                            APPLICATION for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Barry A. Fisher filed by Proposed Amicus Curiae The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia. Lodged Proposed Order.(Attorney Barry A Fisher added to party The Global Alliance for Preserving the History of WW II in Asia(pty:mov))(gk) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                              LREF
                              Blank 38 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                              REPLY in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY in support of MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William B. DeClercq for Plaintiff Koichi Mera in place of Attorneys Neil M. Soltman, Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany and Rebecca B. Johns 31 . (gk) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William B. DeClercq for Plaintiff GAHT-US Corporation in place of Attorneys Neil M. Soltman, Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany and Rebecca B. Johns 32 . (gk) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney William B. DeClercq for Plaintiff Michiko Shiota Gingery in place of Attorneys Neil M. Soltman, Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany and Rebecca B. Johns 33 . (gk) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                        REQUEST to Substitute attorney William B. DeClercq in place of attorney Neil M. Soltman , Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany and Rebecca B. Johns filed by plaintiff Michiko Shiota Gingery. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          REQUEST to Substitute attorney William B. DeClercq in place of attorney Neil M. Soltman , Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany and Rebecca B. Johns filed by plaintiff GAHT-US Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                            REQUEST to Substitute attorney William B. DeClercq in place of attorney Neil M. Soltman , Matthew H. Marmolejo, Ruth Zadikany, Rebecca B. Johns filed by plaintiff Koichi Mera. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 30 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Matthew H. Marmolejo re Request for Judicial Notice, Request for Relief,, 28 filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                  REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: Before the Court is an Stipulation Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date on City of Glendales Motions to Dismiss and to Strike [Docket No. 25]. On April 11, 2014, Glendale filed motions to dismiss and to strike plaintiffs complaint which are scheduled for hearing on May 12, 2014, at 1:30 p.m. The parties seek an extension to May 12 to file plaintiffs opposition, June 2 to file defendants reply, and to continue the hearing on the motions to June 16. After reviewing the stipulation, the Court grants it in part and denies it in part. Plaintiffs opposition to the motions is to be filed on or before April 28. Defendants reply, if any, is to be filed on or before May 5. The hearing on the motion is vacated and the Court will advise the parties if it desires to have oral argument. 20 , 19 , 25 . (pso) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 , MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Plaintiff GAHT-US Corporation, Michiko Shiota Gingery, Koichi Mera. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Extending Briefing Schedule and Continuing Hearing Date on the City of Glendale's Motions to Dismiss and to Strike)(Marmolejo, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Proposed Order re MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant City of Glendales Special Motion to Strike pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16)(Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                            REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 , MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Karen Cruz in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 , MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Christopher S. Munsey in support of MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) 20 , MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 19 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28)(Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f) filed by Defendant City of Glendale. Motion set for hearing on 5/12/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant City of Glendale's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(6), and 12(f))(Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16 filed by Defendant City of Glendale. Motion set for hearing on 5/12/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley H Ellis on behalf of Defendant City of Glendale (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley H Ellis on behalf of Defendant City of Glendale (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley H Ellis on behalf of Defendant City of Glendale (Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bradley H Ellis on behalf of Defendant City of Glendale (Attorney Bradley H Ellis added to party City of Glendale(pty:dft))(Ellis, Bradley) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Michiko Shiota Gingery, GAHT-US Corporation, Koichi Mera pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Scott Ochoa. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson,READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (pso) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants City of Glendale, Scott Ochoa. (Rawcliffe, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants City of Glendale, Scott Ochoa.(Attorney Andrew C Rawcliffe added to party City of Glendale(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew C Rawcliffe added to party Scott Ochoa(pty:dft))(Rawcliffe, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michiko Shiota Gingery, GAHT-US Corporation, Koichi Mera, upon Defendant Scott Ochoa served on 2/21/2014, answer due 3/14/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Ochoa - Glendale City Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons returned. (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Michiko Shiota Gingery, GAHT-US Corporation, Koichi Mera, upon Defendant City of Glendale served on 2/21/2014, answer due 3/14/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leo Zalyan - City Employee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Marmolejo, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants City of Glendale, Scott Ochoa. (mda) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (mda) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (mda) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, MICHIKO SHIOTA GINGERY, Koichi Mera. Related Case(s): N/A (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying N/A. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, MICHIKO SHIOTA GINGERY, Koichi Mera. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GAHT-US Corporation, MICHIKO SHIOTA GINGERY, Koichi Mera. (Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13399832 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs MICHIKO SHIOTA GINGERY, GAHT-US Corporation, Koichi Mera.(Attorney Neil M Soltman added to party GAHT-US Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Neil M Soltman added to party MICHIKO SHIOTA GINGERY(pty:pla), Attorney Neil M Soltman added to party Koichi Mera(pty:pla))(Soltman, Neil) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,372 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?