Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Does 1-31
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02998
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 11:18 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Kannady, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott T. Kannadyy +1 303 757 3800 scott@brownlegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Doe 10, Defendant
No Logo Doe #11, Defendant
No Logo Doe 12, Defendant
No Logo Doe 13, Defendant
No Logo Doe 14, Defendant
No Logo Doe 15, Defendant
No Logo Doe 16, Defendant
No Logo Doe 17, Defendant
No Logo Doe 18, Defendant
No Logo Doe 19, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Doe 20, Defendant
No Logo Doe #21, Defendant
No Logo Doe 22, Defendant
No Logo Doe 23, Defendant
No Logo Doe 24, Defendant
No Logo Doe 25, Defendant
No Logo Doe 26, Defendant
No Logo Doe 27, Defendant
No Logo Doe #28, Defendant
No Logo Doe 29, Defendant
No Logo Doe #3, Defendant
No Logo Doe 30, Defendant
No Logo Doe 31, Defendant
No Logo DOE #4, Defendant
No Logo Doe #5, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, Defendant
No Logo Doe 7, Defendant
No Logo Doe #8, Defendant
No Logo Doe 9, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014 Terminated Case
Civil Case Terminated Without Prejudice pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 28 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: 4/30/2014 Response to Order to Show Cause
    RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and Notice Dismissing Case re [27] by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/16/2014 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff to show cause why this Court should not recommend dismissal of all claims against Defendant John Does for failure to serve. Show Cause Response due by 4/30/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/16/2014. (cpear)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Status Report
        Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
          MINUTE ORDER granting [23] Plaintiff's Request [Motion] for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants by 3/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/3/2014. (mehcd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM regarding [23] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/3/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                  Party Doe 14 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 02/04/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #14 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                      Party Doe 15 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 01/30/14. Text Only Entry (jhawk, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 15 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                          Party Doe 25 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice in this case on 01/03/14. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #25 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                              Party Doe 10 and Doe 16 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal with prejudice filed in this case on 12/12/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe #10 and 16 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                  Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/14/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                      Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/2013.(ervsl, ) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/5/2013. Text Only Entry. (mehcd) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/4/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/4/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, ) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT against Does 1-31 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3603103), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?