USA v. Calderon et al
Criminal Case California Central District Court, Case No. 2:14-cr-00103-CAS

Tags
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 1:32 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald S Calderon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Geragos & Geragos, Apc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark John Geragos +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 mark@geragos.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (144) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES OF Hearing Re Government's Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling the Return of Certain Discovery and Defense Compliance with CIPA held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. The Court finds that the government has demonstrated good cause for the return of the specified discovery materials, and accordingly GRANTS the government's application 124 . The Court hereby orders defendants Ronald S. Calderon and Thomas M. Calderon and their counsel to complete the following actions: (1) Within seven days, return to the government discovery materials that the government produced under Bates Nos. EMAIL 000001 through EMAIL 000333 and any copies of such materials created or possessed by the defense; and (2) Comply with Section 5 of the Classified Information Procedures Act, 18 U.S.C. App. III, and file any Section 5(a) written notice to the Court through the Classified Information Security Office or his designee. Upon receipt of the discovery materials returned to it pursuant to this order, the government will examine them, and will re-produce the discovery materials in a redacted or other format as necessary to protect any classified information. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 147 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINDINGS REGARDING EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS PURSUANT TO SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Status Conference set for 4/4/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Final Status Conference set for 6/6/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial is continued to 7/19/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
      Sixth STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from May 10, 2016 to July 19, 2016 Re: Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing, 133 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE 2/22/2016 STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Upon Stipulation 144 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the Status Conference is continued to 4/4/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
          STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from February 22, 2016 to April 4, 2016 filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
            SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S REPLY to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling the Return of Certain Discovery and Defense Compliance with CIPA. (gk) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Government's Ex Parte Application for Sealed Filing 141 is GRANTED. The documents sought to be filed under seal and the Government's Ex Parte Application for Sealed Filing shall both be filed under seal. The Government may produce the underlying documents as permitted or required by applicable law. (gk) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Sealing Document; Declaration of Judith A. Heinz. (gk) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Manual Filing of GOVT'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT RONALD S. CALDERON'S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE RETURN OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY AND DEFENSE COMPLIANCE WITH CIPA/PROPOSED ORDER, UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APP, PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Heinz, Judith) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                    SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT RONALD S. CALDERON'S OPPOSITION to Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling the Return of Certain Discovery and Defense Compliance with CIPA. (gk) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                      SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT. (gk) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
                        SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Sealing Document; Declaration of Mark J. Geragos. (gk) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          COURT ORDER EXTENDING DUE DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' BRIEF ON GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Upon Stipulation 134 , the Court orders that the due date for Defendants' Briefs opposing the Government's Motion For Return of Certain Discovery be extended to 1/16/2016. (gk) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Motion for Return of Certain Discovery filed by Plaintiff Thomas M Calderon as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINDINGS REGARDING EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS PURSUANT TO SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Jury Trial is continued to 5/10/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Final Status Conference is continued to 4/4/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Additional Status Conference is continued to 2/22/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                                  Fifth STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from March 1, 2016 to May 10, 2016 Re: Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing, 72 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - UNDER SEAL. (gk) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION Requesting the Court to Vacate Its Order Compelling the Defendant to Return Discovery [Doc 125] and Request for a Briefing Schedule; and EMERGENCY REQUEST for a Hearing and a Stay of the Order Pending a Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; Declaration of Mark J. Geragos; Declaration of Chris Campbell; Exhibits A Through E. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gk) (Main Document 130 replaced on 1/11/2016) (clee). (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT. (gk) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                          SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Sealing Document; Declaration of Mark J. Geragos. (gk) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
                                            GOVERNMENTS POSITION REGARDING DEFENDANT RONALD S. CALDERONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE COURT ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel 124 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Manual Filing of Ex Parte Application for the Court to Vacate Order; Request for a Briefing Schedule; Alternatively, Emergency Request for a Hearing and a Stay on the Court's Order; Declarations of Mark J. Geragos and Chris Campbell; Exhibits A through E; [Proposed] Order granting request; Ex Parte Application to File Under Seal; [Proposed] Order Sealing filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER COMPELLING THE RETURN OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY AND DEFENSE COMPLIANCE WITH CIPA. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Compelling the Return of Certain Discovery and Defense Compliance with CIPA; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declaration of Mack Jenkins. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order Sealing Document; Declaration of Judith A. Heinz. (gk) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT - SEALED MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS). (gk) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER RE: GOVERNMENT'S AMENDED MOTION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE CLASSIFIED INFORMATION PROCEDURES ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 16(d)(1) by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. IT IS ORDERED that the government continues to be authorized to withhold from discovery to the defense the classified information at issue, specifically, information that could reasonably be expected to reveal the true identities of UCEl, UCE2, and UCE3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entire text of the government's motion, memorandum of points and authorities, and the accompanying declarations/exhibits, shall not be disclosed to the defense, and shall be sealed and maintained in a facility for the storage of such classified information by the Court Security officer as the designee of the clerk of the Court, in accordance with established security procedures, for any future review, until further order of this Court. (gk) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER; GOVERNMENT'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION; PROPOSED ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT;PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Heinz, Judith) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF IN CAMERA FILING filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Heinz, Judith) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. The Court confers with counsel. Counsel argue. Pursuant to Section 4 of the Classified Information Procedures Act (CIPA), the Court held an in camera, under seal hearing with the Government. Record of the transcript is ordered sealed with the Court's Classified Information Security Officer. The Court takes Defendant Ronald S Calderon's Motion to Dismiss for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the Alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 ; Defendant Ronald S Calderon's Motion to Suppress Defendant's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona 70 ; and Defendant Thomas M Calderon's Motion to Dismiss for Outrageous Government Conduct, and Joinder in Motion to Dismiss 69 under submission. Court Reporter: Laura Elias/Debbie Read. (gk) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MINUTES OF DEFT #1'S MOTION TO DISM. FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVT CONDUCT; OR, IN ALT.,FOR A PRE-TRIAL EVID. HRG RE: GOVT MISCONDUCT (Filed 05/26/15)[66 ] DEFT #1'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEFTS STMTS PURS. TO MIRANDA V. ARIZONA (Filed 05/26/15) 70 DEFT #2'S MOTION TO DISM. FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVT CONDUCT AND JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS (Filed 05/26/15) 69 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon: Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel as stated in Court and on the record and continues this matter to November 3, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. for a further hearing to be held In Camera, Under Seal. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (es) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, re: MOTION to Suppress Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona 70 , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 previously scheduled for 10/19/2015 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled. Motions hearing is continued to 10/26/2015 at 1:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 114 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT RONALD S. CALDERON'S REPLY BRIEF Regarding Hypotheticals 1 and 2. (gk) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Manual Filing of DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Defendant's (optional) Reply Brief due September 18, 2015. Further hearing will remain on October 19, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              GOVERNMENT'S ANSWERING BRIEF REGARDING HYPOTHETICALS 1 & 2 AND DEFENDANT RONALD.. CALDERON'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVERNMENT CONDUCT; EXHIBITS 1 (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(pj) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 109 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT (pj) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT-GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATIONFOR ORDER SEALING DOCUMENT; DECLARATION OF LIZABETH A. RHODES (pj) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, 105 Governments Responsive Brief due on September 2, 2015. Defendants (optional) Reply Brief due on September 9, 2015. Further hearing will remain on October 19, 2015 at 1:30p.m. (pj) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Manual Filing of GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION, PROPOSED ORDER, and UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 103 , Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release,, Motion Hearing,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, Set/Reset Motion Hearings and R&R Deadlines,, Minutes Sealed, 102 , Notice of Manual Filing (G-92) 104 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Manual Filing of Under Seal filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of Under Seal filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT - MINUTES UNDER SEAL RE DEFENDANT #1'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVERNMENT CONDUCT; OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A PRE-TRIAL EVIDENTIARY HEARING RE: GOVERNMENT MISCONDUCT; DEFENDANT #1'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANTS STATEMENTS PURSUANT TO MIRANDA V. ARIZONA; DEFENDANT #2'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVERNMENT CONDUCT, AND JOINDER IN MOTION TO DISMISS; DEFENDANT #2'S REQUEST TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE. (gk) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTES OF GOVERNMENT'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO INTRODUCE EVIDENCE OF OTHER ACTS (dkt. 53, filed April 20, 2015) DEFENDANT RONALD CALDERON'S MOTION TO SUPPRESSEVIDENCE (dkt. 67, filed May 26, 2015) DEFENDANT THOMAS CALDERON'S MOTION TO SEVER (dkt. 68, filed May 26, 2015) Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon: In accordance with the foregoing, the Court DENIES without prejudice defendant Thomas Calderon's motion to sever. The Court DENIES without prejudice the government's motion to introduce evidence of defendant Ronald Calderon's "other acts." The Court DENIES defendant Ronald Calderon's motion to suppress evidence seized pursuant to the June 4, 2013 search warrant. *See Order for further details.* Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (es) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFT #1'S MOTION TO DISM. FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVT.CONDUCT; OR, IN THE ALT., FOR A PRE-TRIAL EVID. HRG. RE: GOVT MISCONDUCT(Filed 05/26/15) 66 .DEFT #1'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS (Filed 05/26/15) 67 .DEFT #1"S MOTION TO SUPRESS DEFTS STMTS PURS. TO MIRANDA V. ARIZONA (Filed05/26/15) 70 .DEFT #2'S MOTION TO SEVER, OR IN THE ALT. TO SEVER COUNTS 16-22 (Filed05/26/15) 68 .DEFT #2/S MOTION TO DISM. FOR OUTRAGEOUS GOVT. CONDUCT, AND JOINDER INMOTION TO DISMISS (Filed 05/26/15) 69 .DEFT #2'S REQUEST TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE (Filed 07/03/15) 92 GOVS MIL TO INTRODUCE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE402, 403, AND 404 (Filed 04/20/15) 53 . held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, 69 , 67 , > 70 , Hearing held and counsel are present. The Court confers with counsel and counsel advisethe Court of the status of the case. For reasons stated on the record the Court continues the status conference for August 6, 2015 at 10:00 A.M. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (pj) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed Court Order Permitting Defendant Thomas Calderon to File a Sur-Sur-Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Outrageous Governmental Conduct filed 7/14/2015 97 . The following error(s) was found: This document tendered for the judge's approval should have been submitted as a separate PDF attachment to the document seeking leave, document number 96, or a Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendant seeks leave of court to file his Sur-Sur-Reply to Motion to Dismiss forOutrageous Governmental Conduct filed 7/14/2015 96 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 Proposed court order permitting filing filed by Defendant Thomas Calderon. Proposed court order permitting filing (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 filed by Defendant Thomas Calderon. (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion Related)(CR), 94 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The docket does not reflect leave of court to file a Sur-Reply, Local Rule 7-10.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY in opposition MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon and Thomas M. Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Douglas M. Miller)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING NOTICE CONTINUED by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, re: MOTION to Suppress Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona 70 , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 , MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts 53 , MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd 67 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 , REQUEST to Modify Conditions of Release 92 , MOTION to Sever Defendant 68 , previously scheduled for 7/13/2015 at 1:30 PM has been rescheduled. Motions hearing is continued to 7/16/2015 at 12:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendants are ordered to be present on 7/16/2015 at 12:30 PM, unless advised otherwise by their attorneys of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  REQUEST to Modify Conditions of Release Filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon. Request set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 07/03/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Suppress Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona 70 filed by Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd 67 filed by Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 filed by Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY support of MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts 53 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon and Thomas M. Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit One, # 2 Exhibit Two)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY MOTION to Sever Defendant 68 filed by Defendant Thomas Calderon. (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Opposition to Motion (CR) 77 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s) are specified below: The Government's Motion in Limine was attached as the Main Document. Defendant's Opposition is Attachment 1.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Manual Filing of REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL AND IN CAMERA (UNDER SEAL AND IN CAMERA) [IN CAMERA EXHIBIT D FILED SEPARATELY] filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 , MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct 66 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration D. Miller, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd 67 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Diane Boyer-Vine, # 2 Exhibit A)(Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to MOTION to Suppress Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona 70 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T. Tampubolon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to MOTION to Sever Defendant 68 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Thomas M. Calderon. (Jenkins, Mack) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts 53 filed by Defendant Thomas Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum)(Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Manual Filing of ONE (1) UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT CONTAINING CD filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts 53 filed by Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, Modifying Briefing Schedule for Substantive Pretrial Motions. 73 Motions hearing set for 7/13/15 @ 1:30 p.m. (es) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to MOTION to Sever Defendant 68 , MOTION for Protective Order Pertaining to the Testimony of Undercover Employees at Trial 52 , Notice (Other) 55 , MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts 53 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO CONTINUE Trial by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Trial set for 3/1/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference set for 2/8/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (pj) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss Case 69 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected.: Filer docketed this multi-part motion with the event Motions - Dismiss Case, only. The docket entry should have been made as to both defendants, so that the joinder could be linked to Ronald Calderon's Motion to Dismiss.. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (pj) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Suppress Defendant Ronald S. Calderon's Statements Pursuant to Miranda v. Arizona Filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever Defendant Filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Kopp, Shepard) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Suppress Search Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd Filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark J. Geragos In Support)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Outrageous Government Conduct; or, in the alternative, for a Pre-Trial Evidentiary Hearing Re: Government Misconduct Filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 7/13/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark J. Geragos In Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL DATE from August 11, 2015 to March 01, 2016 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTES OF Status Conference Re Defendant Calderon's Application for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions and Continue the Trial Date 54 held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. The Court confers with counsel and counsel advise the Court of the status of the case. The Court grants the parties' request to continue the dates, as follows: Status Conference re: Trial set for 1/11/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Final Status Conference set for 2/8/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2016 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Counsel shall submit a Stipulation and Order re: Excludable Time forthwith. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUBSTANTIVE PRETRIAL MOTIONS by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. The Courts April 29, 2015 order requiring that the parties appear in the Courts Courtroom (Courtroom 5, Spring Street Courthouse) on May 13, 2015 for a status conference is VACATED. The parties are instead ordered to appear in the Courts Courtroom on May 18, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. for a status conference regarding the August 11, 2015 trial date. *See Order for further details.* (es) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFT CALDERONS APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO FILE PRETRIAL MOTIONS AND CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Court and counsel confer. The Court sets a further status conference for May 13, 2015 at 12:00 pm. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (es) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, re: APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date, APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions 54 , and Response in Opposition 57 . Status Conference set for 4/27/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendants are ordered to be present on 4/27/2015 at 11:00 AM, unless advised otherwise by their attorneys of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY in support of APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions. 54 filed by Defendant Ronald Calderon. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE: GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER PURSUANT TO SECTION 4 OF THE CLASSIFIED INFORMATION PROCEDURES ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 16(d)(1) by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Upon the Government's Motion 52 , IT IS ORDERED that the government is authorized to withhold from discovery to the defense the classified information at issue, specifically, information that could reasonably be expected to reveal the true identities of UCE1, UCE2, and UCE3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entire text of the Government's motion, memorandum of points and authorities, and the accompanying declaration/exhibit, shall not be disclosed to the defense, and shall be sealed and maintained in a facility for the storage of such classified information by the Court Security officer as the designee of the clerk of the Court, in accordance with established security procedures, for any future review, until further order of this Court. (gk) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions. 54 , filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Ex Parte, In Camera, Under Seal, Classified Filing filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heinz, Judith) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION to Continue Trial Date, APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions. Filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION in Limine for Evidence Other Acts Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder.(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Protective Order Pertaining to the Testimony of Undercover Employees at Trial Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2015 at 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Monica) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Monica M Ramirez on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attorney Monica M Ramirez added to party USA(pty:pla))(Ramirez, Monica) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR GOVERNMENT TO FILE CLASSIFIED MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. 48 by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. *See Order for details.* (es) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Judith A Heinz on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attorney Judith A Heinz added to party USA(pty:pla))(Heinz, Judith) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File CLASSIFIED MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER from April 20, 2015 to April 27, 2015. filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO CONTINUE Trial by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Trial set for 8/11/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference set for 7/20/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder.Pretrial Motions April 20, 2015; Oppositions May 4, 2015; Replies May 11, 2015; Pretrial Motions Hearing May 18, 2015 at 1:30 p. (pj) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Third STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from May 19, 2015 to August 11, 2015 Re: Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, 45 , STIPULATION re: excludable delay from May 19, 2015 to August 11, 2015 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/23/2014 Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND FINDINGS REGARDING EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS PURSUANT TO SPEEDY TRIAL ACT by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Jury Trial is continued to 5/19/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Status Conference/Motions Hearing is continued to 4/20/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from September 16, 2014 to May 19, 2015 Re: Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or Sentencing, [29] filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 6/2/2014 Order on Ex Parte Application to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED ORDER UNSEALING CERTAIN PREINDICTMENT PLEADINGS by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Upon the Government's Amended Ex Parte Application [42], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Court's previous order [41] be amended so that the pleadings bearing the following criminal miscellaneous/duty numbers in the Central and Eastern Districts of California be unsealed: (1) 09-2613; (2) 12-2390; (3) 12-2757; (4) 12-0431; (5) 12-2969; (6) 12-2757; (7) 13-0062; (8) 13-0816; (9) 13-0291 (EDCA); (10) 13-0386 (EDCA); (11) 13-0385 (EDCA); (12) 13-0817; (13) 13-0250; (14) 13-2659; (15) 12-0365; (16) 13-2908. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014, Terminated: 5/30/2014 Ex Parte Application to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                              EX PARTE APPLICATION to AMEND Order on Ex Parte Application for Order,, [41] Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/27/2014 Order on Ex Parte Application for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER UNSEALING CERTAIN PREINDICTMENT PLEADINGS by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Upon the Government's Ex Parte Application [40], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the pleadings bearing the following criminal miscellaneous numbers in the Central and Eastern Districts of California be unsealed: (1) 11-0300; (2) 12-2390; (3) 12-2757; (4) 12-0431; (5) 12-2969; (6) 12-2757; (7) 13-0062; (8) 13-0861; (9) 13-0291 (EDCA); (10) 13-0386 (EDCA); (11) 13-0385 (EDCA); (12) 13-0817; (13) 13-0250; (14) 13-2659; (15) 12-3659; (16) 13-2908. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: 5/22/2014, Terminated: 5/23/2014 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Unseal Case Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Miller, Douglas) Modified on 5/27/2014 (gk).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: 4/21/2014 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, re Ex Parte Application for Protective Order [30]. See document for details. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014, Terminated: 4/17/2014 Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Order on Ex Parte Application for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES OF Hearing Re Government's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order as to Ronald S. Calderon held before Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S. Calderon and Thomas M. Calderon. The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Government's Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order [30]. The application is GRANTED as to "financial information and personal information," grand jury transcripts, and documents subpoenaed by the grand jury for which disclosure would reveal a "matter occurring before the grand jury." Fed. R. Crim. P. 6(e)(2)(B). The application is DENIED as to FBI reports and recordings, as well as documents subpoenaed by the grand jury that do not reveal matters occurring before the grand jury. Ronald Calderon and the government are directed to meet and confer to develop a procedure for presenting to the Court any documents for which a dispute has arisen regarding whether disclosure would reveal a matter occurring before the grand jury. Ronald Calderon and the government are further directed to lodge with the Court a proposed protective order that is consistent with this minute order. Court Reporter: Leandra Amber. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Waiver of Defendants Presence (CR 35)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER of Defendants Presence filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon (Kopp, Shepard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: 4/3/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING NOTICE SETTING by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order[30]. Status Conference set for 4/8/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendants are ordered to be present on 4/8/2014, unless advised otherwise by their attorneys of record. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Reply (Motion Related)(CR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY amended in support of First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order [30] filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion Related)(CR)[32]. The following error(s) was found: Case number is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (rne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Reply (Motion Related)(CR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in support of First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order [30] filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: 3/25/2014 Opposition to Motion (CR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order [30] filed by Defendant Ronald S. Calderon. (Geragos, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014, Terminated: 4/8/2014 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Protective Order Filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: 3/14/2014 Order to Continue Trial, Change of Plea or SentencingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE Trial by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Jury Trial set for 9/16/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: 3/12/2014 Stipulation to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First STIPULATION to Continue Trial from April 22, 2014 to September 16, 2014 filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Miller, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding heldCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. This action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE CHRISTINA A. SNYDER, United States District Judge. The Status Conference on March 10, 2014 is hereby vacated. The Court sets a StatusConference/Motions Hearing on 4/7/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Jury Trial is continued to 4/22/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. Defendants shall be present on 4/7/2014 at 1:30 PM, and on 4/22/2014 at 9:30 AM. See document for details. (gk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 224 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - Pursuant to GO 14-03 (CR-102)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 9.2 of General Order 08-05 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Case, as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, is transferred to the calendar of Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CR 14-00103 CAS. (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Text Only Scheduling NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin as to Defendants Ronald S Calderon and Thomas M Calderon. This case has been reassigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Status Conference previously set for hearing on 3/10/2014, is hereby vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 224 Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - Pursuant to GO 14-03 (CR-102)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to Section 9.2 of General Order 08-05 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case, as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon, is transferred to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CR 14-00103 FMO. (rn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Bond and Conditions (CR-1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon conditions of release: $25,000 Appearance Bond, see attached bond for terms and conditions approved by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Mack Eric Jenkins on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Attorney Mack Eric Jenkins added to party USA(pty:pla))(Jenkins, Mack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 50,000 by surety: Ana Calderon for Bond and Conditions (CR-1)[16]. Filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Passport Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PASSPORT RECEIPT from U. S. Pretrial Services as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon. USA passport was received on 2/24/14. Re: Bond and Conditions (CR-1)[22]. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Arraignment - Post IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon (1) Count 1-10,11-14,15,16-22,23-24. Defendant arraigned, states true name: As charged. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Mark John Geragos, Retained present. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Jury Trial set for 4/22/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Status Conference set for 3/10/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (tba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Passport Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PASSPORT RECEIPT from U. S. Pretrial Services as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon. USA passport was received on 2/24/14. Re: Bond and Conditions (CR-1)[16]. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Bond and Conditions (CR-1)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon conditions of release: $50,000 Appearance Bond, see attached for terms and conditions approved by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; filed by Mark John Geragos appearing for Ronald S Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Statement of Constitutional Rights
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Ronald S Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Arrest on Indictment - Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES OF ARREST ON INDICTMENT HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Mark John Geragos for Ronald S Calderon, Retained, present.Court orders bail set as: Ronald S Calderon (1) $50,000 Appearance Bond, see attached bond for terms and conditions. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. Arraignment is held, see separate PIA minutes. RELEASE ORDER NO 33823 Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon; defendants Year of Birth: 1957; date of arrest: 2/24/2014 (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 Affidavit of Surety (No Justification)(CR-4)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (No Justification - Pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 46-5.2.8) in the amount of $ 25,000 by surety: Linda Calderon-Glickstein for Bond and Conditions (CR-1)[22]. Filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Arraignment - Post IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTES OF POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT: held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon (2) Count 15,16-22. Defendant arraigned, states true name: As charged. Defendant entered not guilty plea to all counts as charged. Attorney: Shepard S. Kopp, Retained present. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Status Conference set for 3/10/2014 03:00 PM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (tba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Statement of Constitutional Rights
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Thomas M Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; filed by Shepard S Kopp appearing for Thomas M Calderon (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Arrest on Indictment - Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES OF ARREST ON INDICTMENT HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Shepard S Kopp for Thomas M Calderon, Retained, present.Court orders bail set as: Thomas M Calderon (2) $25,000 Appearance Bond, see attached bond for terms and conditions. Defendant remanded to the custody of the USM. Arraignment held, see separate PIA minutes. Court Reporter: Cindy Nierenberg. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Report Commencing Criminal Action (CR-64)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon; defendants Year of Birth: 1954; date of arrest: 2/21/2014 (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Memorandum by U S Attorney re Investigative ActionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. Re Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh, Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, Magistrate Judge Michael Wilner, Magistrate Judge Jean Rosenbluth, Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, Magistrate Judge Douglas McCormick (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. This criminal action, being filed on 2/20/14, was not pending in the U. S. Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Michael W Fitzgerald and Judge Beverly Reid OConnell began receiving criminal matters. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Notice of Complex Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COURT OF COMPLEX CASE filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon, Thomas M Calderon. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Case Summary (CR-72)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Douglas M Miller as to Defendant Thomas M Calderon; defendants Year of Birth: 1954 (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Case Summary (CR-72)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Douglas M Miller as to Defendant Ronald S Calderon; defendants Year of Birth: 1957 (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/21/2014 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT Filed as to Ronald S Calderon (1) count(s) 1-10, 11-14, 15, 16-22, 23-24, Thomas M Calderon (2) count(s) 15, 16-22. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 606 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?