Summit v. Cessna Aircraft Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-07654
District Judge David G. Trager, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 7:35 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jean Summit, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolk & Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ARTHUR ALAN WOLK +1 215 545 4220 courtfilings@airlaw.com
v.
No Logo Allied-Signal, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Advansix Inc.
Unknown Role, Garrett Motion Inc.
Unknown Role, HH Spinco Inc.
Unknown Role, Honeywell, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
No Logo Business Express Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Business Express, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKeegan & Shearer, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Phillip McKeegan +1 212 661 4200 +1 212 661 4813 gmckeegan@mckeeganlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/27/1999 George Phillip McKeegan +1 212 661 4200 +1 212 661 4813 gmckeegan@mckeeganlaw.com
No Logo Cessna Aircraft "C9270R", Defendant
No Logo Rockwell Collins, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Rockwell Colins Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo The Cessna Aircraft Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RAYMOND M. TIERNEY, JR. +1 973 360 1100
No Logo Allied-Signal, Inc., Third Party Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Advansix Inc.
Unknown Role, Garrett Motion Inc.
Unknown Role, HH Spinco Inc.
Unknown Role, Honeywell, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Herrick Feinstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/29/1999 Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
Space Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
No Logo The Cessna Aircraft Company, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo The Estate of Charle, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo The personal representative of the Estate Charles M. Kahn, Deceased, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo U.s. Dynamics Corporation, ThirdParty Defendant
United States of America United States of America, ThirdParty Defendant
No Logo U.S. Dynamics, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dombroff & Gilmore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward C. DeVivo +1 212 612 9550
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1407
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/4/2000, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT of Settlment Conference before Mag. Mann filed for dates of 6/21/00; Court Transcriber: Elizabeth Barran. (Permaul, Jenny) (Entered: 08/09/2000)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL that any an all claims are dismissed without prejudice as against ROCKWELL COLLINS INC., with costs. ( signed by Judge David G. Trager , on 5/19/00) (Jean (Entered: 05/23/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2000, Entered: None
      MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER(1/00); all motions to dismiss shall be filed by 5/17/99; all non-expert discovery set for 2/15/00; plaintiffs' expert due 3/18/00; defts' and 3rd party defts' expert reports due 4/17/00; disclosure respecting plaintiffs' rebuttal made by 5/5/00; disclosure respecting defts' rebuttal by 6/1/00; settlement confernce reset to 6/20 and 6/21/00. ( signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann , on 1/14/00) (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 01/27/2000)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER ( signed by Judge David G. Trager , on 12/8/99) (Jean (Entered: 12/09/1999)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION of dismissal that the action and all claims as against deft Business Express, Inc are dismissed without prejudice, costs and attorneys' fees. ( Signed by Judge David G. Trager dated: 10/25/99 (Jean (Entered: 10/27/1999)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
            STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice as against deft Business Express Airways Inc without costs or attorneys' fees. ( Signed by Judge David G. Trager dated: 10/25/99 (Jean (Entered: 10/27/1999)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: None
              ANSWER by U.S. Dynamics, Inc. to [8-2] third-party complaint (Dobkin, David) (Entered: 07/22/1999)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: None
                ANSWER by United States of to [8-2] third-party complaint (Jean (Entered: 07/01/1999)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STIPULATION of dismissal that all claims against AlliedSignal Inc. are dismissed without costs, or attorney fees to any party as against the other. ( Signed by Judge David G. Trager dated: 6/27/99 (Jean (Entered: 06/29/1999)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: None
                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to U.S. Dynamics, Inc. 2/22/99 Answer due on 3/14/99 for U.S. Dynamics, Inc. (Jean (Entered: 03/11/1999)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: None
                      (faxed) LETTER dated 2/22/99 from Arthur Wolk, Esq., to Magistrate Mann, requesting that parties have until 2/26/99 to submit a joint modified proposed scheduling order. (Asreen, Wendy) (Entered: 03/01/1999)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: None
                        AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Business Express, In : amends [7-1] answer (Jean (Entered: 02/10/1999)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting the parties' request for an extension of time until 02.19.99 to submit a proposed discovery schedule. (signed by Magistrate Roanne L. Mann, dtd 02.04.99) Copies faxed by Chambers on 02.04.99. See letter dtd 02.03.99 from All Counsel to Magistrate Judge Mann. Galeano, Sonia (Entered: 02/09/1999)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and THIRD-PTY CMP by Alliedsignal Inc. against U.S. Dynamics Corp., The Estate of Charle, United States of Ame (Jean (Entered: 02/03/1999)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                              STIPULATION and ORDER the time within which deft Cessna Aricraft Co may file and serve its answer is extended to 1/25/99. signed by Judge David G. Trager, dated 1/29/99 (Jean (Entered: 02/02/1999)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATION and ORDER the time of the deft is answer is extended to and including 2/1/99. signed by Judge David G. Trager (Jean (Entered: 01/28/1999)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: None
                                  Disclosure of interested parties by Cessna Aircraft Co (Jean (Entered: 01/27/1999)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand and THIRD-PTY CMP by Cessna Aircraft Co against U.S. Dynamics, Inc., Estate of Charles Kahn, United States of America. (Jean (Entered: 01/27/1999)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Business Express, In (Jean (Entered: 01/22/1999)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure of interested parties by Business Express, In (Jean (Entered: 01/22/1999)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Rockwell Colins Inc. (Jean (Entered: 01/22/1999)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            STIPULATION and ORDER that the time of deft to answer the complaint is extended to and including 1/20/99. signed by Judge David G. Trager, dated 1/19/99 (Jean (Entered: 01/22/1999)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: None
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Alliedsignal Inc., Rockwell Colins Inc. 12/14/98 Answer due on 1/3/99 for Rockwell Colins Inc., for Alliedsignal Inc. (Jean (Entered: 01/19/1999)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AND OF SALE INJUNCTION (Jean (Entered: 01/05/1999)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT filed and summons(es) issued for Cessna Aircraft Co, Alliedsignal Inc., Rockwell Colins Inc., Business Express, In, Business Express Air, Cessna Aircraft FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 213887 (Chow, Alice) (Entered: 12/16/1998)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?